Consolidated
Lead case: 3:16-md-02738

New Jersey District Court
Judge:Michael A Shipp
Referred: Rukhsanah L Singh
Case #: 3:23-cv-21968
Nature of Suit367 Torts - Personal Injury - Health Care/Pharmaceutical Personal Injury/Product Liability
Cause28:1332 Diversity-Product Liability
Case Filed:Nov 06, 2023
Last checked: Saturday May 04, 2024 5:21 AM EDT
Defendant
JOHNSON & JOHNSON CONSUMER, INC.
Defendant
JANSSEN PHARMACEUTICALS, INC.
Defendant
JOHNSON & JOHNSON HOLDCO (NA), INC.
Defendant
KENVUE, INC.
Defendant
LTL MANAGEMENT, LLC
Defendant
PERSONAL CARE PRODUCTS COUNSEL (PCPC)
Defendant
JOHNSON & JOHNSON
Represented By
SUSAN M. SHARKO
Faegre Drinker Biddle & Reath LLP
contact info
In Re
JOHNSON & JOHNSON TALCUM POWDER PRODUCTS MARKETING, SALES PRACTICES, AND PRODUCTS LIABILITY LITIGATION
Plaintiff
SAUNDRA PEARSON
Represented By
OSCAR ANTHONY DE LA ROSA
Counsel Not Admitted To Usdc-Nj Bar
contact info


Docket last updated: 05/20/2025 11:59 PM EDT
Thursday, September 12, 2024
5 5 notice Notice of Appearance Thu 09/12 1:06 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by GINO PETER MECOLI on behalf of PERSONAL CARE PRODUCTS COUNSEL (PCPC) (MECOLI, GINO)
Related: [-]
Monday, January 01, 2024
4 4 notice Notice of Appearance Mon 01/01 6:12 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by SUSAN M. SHARKO on behalf of JOHNSON & JOHNSON, INC. (SHARKO, SUSAN)
Related: [-]
Thursday, November 16, 2023
3 3 service Certificate of Service Thu 11/16 10:07 AM
CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by SAUNDRA PEARSON (DE LA ROSA, OSCAR)
Related: [-]
Monday, November 06, 2023
2 2 service Summons Issued Mon 11/06 4:51 PM
SUMMONS ISSUED as to JOHNSON & JOHNSON CONSUMER, INC., JANSSEN PHARMACEUTICALS, INC., JOHNSON & JOHNSON HOLDCO (NA), INC., JOHNSON & JOHNSON, INC., KENVUE, INC., LTL MANAGEMENT, LLC, PERSONAL CARE PRODUCTS COUNSEL (PCPC). Attached is the official court Summons, please fill out Defendant and Plaintiffs attorney information and serve. (jjc, )
Related: [-]
1 1 cmp Complaint Mon 11/06 3:53 PM
COMPLAINT against JOHNSON & JOHNSON CONSUMER, INC., JANSSEN PHARMACEUTICALS, INC., JOHNSON & JOHNSON HOLDCO (NA), INC., JOHNSON & JOHNSON, INC., KENVUE, INC., LTL MANAGEMENT, LLC, PERSONAL CARE PRODUCTS COUNSEL (PCPC) ( Filing and Admin fee $ 402 receipt number ANJDC-14851328) with JURY DEMAND, filed by SAUNDRA PEARSON.(DE LA ROSA, OSCAR)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet
mdl MDL Direct File Mon 11/06 4:52 PM
Member Case Direct File on 11/6/2023, for MDL 2738.(jjc, )
Related: [-]