Kentucky Western District Court
Judge:Rebecca Grady Jennings
Referred: Colin H Lindsay
Case #: 3:23-cv-00575
Nature of Suit190 Contract - Other Contract
Cause28:1441 Petition for Removal
Case Filed:Nov 06, 2023
Terminated:Mar 06, 2024
Case in other court:Jefferson Circuit Court, 23-CI-401044
Last checked: Saturday May 04, 2024 5:01 AM EDT
Defendant
AT Forum Louisville KY II, LLC
Represented By
Carolyn A. Taggart
Porter Wright Morris & Arthur, Llp -Cincinnati
contact info
Defendant
First Guaranty Bank
Represented By
Peter M. Cummins
Frost Brown Todd Llc - Louisville
contact info
Bradley L. Drell
Gold, Weems, Bruser, Sues & Rundell
contact info
Heather M. Mathews
Gold, Weems, Bruser, Sues & Rundell Aplc
contact info
Defendant
JB Forum Land, LLC
Represented By
Carolyn A. Taggart
Porter Wright Morris & Arthur, Llp -Cincinnati
contact info
Defendant
Jonathan M. Larmore
Represented By
Carolyn A. Taggart
Porter Wright Morris & Arthur, Llp -Cincinnati
contact info
Plaintiff
UMB Bank, N.A.
Represented By
Guy M. Graves
Gess, Mattingly & Atchison
contact info
Stephen P. Stoltz
Gess Mattingly & Atchison, P.S.C.
contact info
Stephen Paul Stoltz
Gess, Mattingly & Atchison, Psc
contact info

GPO Mar 06 2024
UMB's complaint is DISMISSED in its entirety. The Court will enter a separate Judgment. cc: Counsel (SMJ)MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER Signed by Judge Rebecca Grady Jennings on 3/5/2024. JB Forum, AT Forum, and Larmore's motion to dismiss (DE 15) is DENIED and FGB's motion to dismiss (DE 13) is GRANTED. Accordingly, the Court ORDERS that
GPO Jun 11 2024
MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER Signed by Judge Rebecca Grady Jennings on 6/11/2024 denying 35 Motion to Alter Judgment. Because UMB has not demonstrated (1) "a clear error of law," (2) "newly discovered evidence," (3) "an intervening change in controlling law," or (4) "a need to prevent manifest injustice," Leisure Caviar, LLC, 616 F.3d at 615, the Court will not alter its conclusions or vacate its previous order. cc: Counsel (SMJ)

Docket last updated: 4 hours ago
Tuesday, June 11, 2024
42 42 10 pgs order Order on Motion to Alter Judgment Tue 06/11 2:04 PM
MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER Signed by Judge Rebecca Grady Jennings on 6/11/2024 denying35 Motion to Alter Judgment. Because UMB has not demonstrated (1) "a clear error of law," (2) "newly discovered evidence," (3) "an intervening change in controlling law," or (4) "a need to prevent manifest injustice," Leisure Caviar, LLC, 616 F.3d at 615, the Court will not alter its conclusions or vacate its previous order. cc: Counsel (SMJ)
Related: [-]
Thursday, May 23, 2024
41 41 notice Deficiency Thu 05/23 12:30 PM
ATTORNEY NOTICE of Deficiency to Heather M. Mathews re12 Order on Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice.Reason for Deficiency: failure to register to file electronically pursuant to GO 2008-03. Failure to comply will be brought to the attention of the Court. Response due by 6/7/2024. (KJA)
Related: [-]
40 40 notice Deficiency Thu 05/23 12:28 PM
ATTORNEY NOTICE of Deficiency to Guy M. Graves re1 Notice of Removal.Reason for Deficiency: motion to appear pro hac vice. Failure to comply will be brought to the attention of the Court. Response due by 6/7/2024. (KJA)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, May 14, 2024
39 39 respm Reply to Response to Motion Tue 05/14 2:58 PM
REPLY to Response to Motion re35 MOTION to Alter Judgment , Opinion & Order [DE 33 & 34] per FRCP 59 filed by UMB Bank, N.A.. (Stoltz, Stephen)
Related: [-]
Friday, May 10, 2024
38 38 2 pgs order Order on Proposed Agreed Order Fri 05/10 10:13 AM
AGREED ORDER Signed by Judge Rebecca Grady Jennings on 5/9/2024 granting37 Proposed Agreed Order. Plaintiff UMB Bank, N.A. SHALL have an additional seven (7) days, up to and including Wednesday, 5/15/2024, in which to file its reply to Defendant First Guaranty Bank's response (R.36 ) to UMB's pending Motion to Alter, Amend, or Vacate (R.35 ). cc: Counsel (SMJ)
Related: [-]
Thursday, May 02, 2024
37 37 motion Proposed Agreed Order Thu 05/02 4:46 PM
Proposed Agreed Order Extending Time to File Reply to R. 36 Thru 5/15/24 by UMB Bank, N.A.. (Stoltz, Stephen)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, April 24, 2024
36 36 respm Response to Motion Wed 04/24 3:14 PM
RESPONSE to Motion re35 MOTION to Alter Judgment , Opinion & Order [DE 33 & 34] per FRCP 59 filed by First Guaranty Bank. (Drell, Bradley)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, April 03, 2024
35 35 motion Alter Judgment Wed 04/03 4:14 PM
MOTION to Alter Judgment , Opinion & Order [DE 33 & 34] per FRCP 59 by Plaintiff UMB Bank, N.A. (Stoltz, Stephen)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proposed Order
Wednesday, March 06, 2024
34 34 order Judgment Wed 03/06 10:46 AM
JUDGMENT signed by Judge Rebecca Grady Jennings on 3/5/2024. UMB Bank, N.A.'s complaint is DISMISSED in its entirety. This is a FINAL and APPEALABLE Judgment, and there is no just cause for delay. cc: Counsel (SMJ)
Related: [-]
33 33 17 pgs order Order on Motion to Dismiss Order on Motion to Stay Order on Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim Wed 03/06 10:38 AM
MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER Signed by Judge Rebecca Grady Jennings on 3/5/2024. JB Forum, AT Forum, and Larmore's motion to dismiss (DE15 ) is DENIED and FGB's motion to dismiss (DE13 ) is GRANTED. Accordingly, the Court ORDERS that UMB's complaint is DISMISSED in its entirety. The Court will enter a separate Judgment. cc: Counsel (SMJ)
Related: [-]
Friday, March 01, 2024
32 32 respm Response Fri 03/01 2:49 PM
RESPONSE to re31 Status Report filed by First Guaranty Bank. (Drell, Bradley)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, February 28, 2024
31 31 misc Status Report Wed 02/28 12:38 PM
STATUS REPORT per 2/13/24 Order (DN 29, at PgID 656) by UMB Bank, N.A.. (Stoltz, Stephen)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit 1 - SEC Order,
Att: 2 Exhibit 2 - SEC Order (cont'd)
Thursday, February 15, 2024
30 30 1 pgs order Order Thu 02/15 2:39 PM
ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Colin H. Lindsay on 2/15/2024. In light of the Court's 2/13/2024 Order (DN29 ), the Court's 2/12/2024 Order for Meeting and Report (DN28 ) is SET ASIDE and the 3/25/2024 telephonic scheduling conference is REMANDED. The Court will address entry of a scheduling order after resolution of all issues related to representation of Defendants JB Forum Land, LLC; AT Forum Louisville KY II, LLC; and Jonathan Larmore. cc: Counsel, defendants as directed (SMJ)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, February 13, 2024
29 29 3 pgs order Order on Motion to Withdraw as Attorney Tue 02/13 1:28 PM
ORDER Signed by Magistrate Judge Colin H. Lindsay on 2/12/2024. The Motion for Carolyn Taggart to Withdraw as Attorney (DN23 ) is GRANTED. On or before 4/12/2024: a) Defendants JB Forum Land, LLC and AT Forum Louisville KY II, LLC shall cause new counsel to enter an appearance on their behalf; and b) Defendant Jonathan M. Larmore shall either cause new counsel to enter an appearance on his behalf or notify the Court that he intends to proceed pro se. On or before 2/29/2024, Plaintiff shall file a status report regarding the impact of Securities and Exchange Commission v. Jon Larmore, et al., No. 2:23-CV-02470 (D. Ariz. Filed Nov. 28, 2023). cc: Counsel, defendants as directed (SMJ)
Related: [-]
Monday, February 12, 2024
28 28 4 pgs order Order Mon 02/12 4:42 PM
ORDER FOR MEETING AND REPORT (EBOC) by Magistrate Judge Colin H. Lindsay on 02/12/2024. The Court will conduct a telephonic Rule 16 case-management conference on March 25, 2024, at 10:00 a.m. before the Honorable Colin H. Lindsay, United States Magistrate Judge. Counsel shall connect to the conference by dialing 1-888-808-6929, access code 2773744. cc: Counsel (HMC)
Related: [-]
Friday, February 02, 2024
27 27 order Order - TEXT ONLY Fri 02/02 11:03 AM
TEXT ORDER by Judge Rebecca Grady Jennings on 2/2/2024; pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 636(b)(1)(A), this matter is REFERRED to U.S. Magistrate Judge Colin H. Lindsay for resolution of all litigation planning issues, a scheduling conference, entry of scheduling orders, consideration of amendments thereto, and resolution of all non-dispositive matters, including discovery issues. Magistrate Judge Lindsay is further authorized to conduct a settlement conference in this matter at any time. A separate order scheduling the Rule 16 Conference will be issued by the Chambers of United States Magistrate Judge Lindsay.Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c), and in accordance with Rule 73(b)(1) of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure and Local Rule 73.1, the parties are notified that a United States magistrate judge of this court is available to conduct all proceedings in this civil action including a (jury or nonjury) trial and to order the entry of a final judgment. You may consent to have your case referred to a magistrate judge, or you may withhold your consent without adverse consequences. Should all parties consent to having a United States magistrate judge conduct all proceedings in this case, please complete the Notice, Consent, and Reference of a Civil Action to a Magistrate Judge (https://www.kywd.uscourts.gov/sites/kywd/files/forms/ao085-1-Notice-Consent.pdf) and send a copy of this document to the clerks office via regular mail or email at intake-kywECF@kywd.uscourts.gov. This Notice of Electronic Filing is the Official ORDER for this entry. No document is attached. cc:counsel.CM-CHL. (ARM)
Related: [-]
Monday, January 22, 2024
26 26 respm Reply to Response to Motion Mon 01/22 3:00 PM
REPLY to Response to Motion re13 MOTION to Dismiss and Alternative MOTION to Stay filed by First Guaranty Bank. (Drell, Bradley)
Related: [-]
Friday, January 12, 2024
25 25 respm Response to Motion Fri 01/12 6:48 PM
RESPONSE to Motion re15 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM filed by UMB Bank, N.A.. (Stoltz, Stephen)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit 1 - SEC Order,
Att: 2 Exhibit 2 - Fee Mortgage,
Att: 3 Exhibit 3 - LA Fed Docket,
Att: 4 Exhibit 4A - Land Records Pt. 1,
Att: 5 Exhibit 4B - Land Records Pt. 2,
Att: 6 Exhibit 4C - Land Records Pt. 3,
Att: 7 Exhibit 5 - ATF Disclosure,
Att: 8 Exhibit 6 - JBF Disclosure,
Att: 9 Exhibit 7 - Organizational Chart
24 24 respm Response to Motion Fri 01/12 6:34 PM
RESPONSE to Motion re13 MOTION to Dismiss and Alternative MOTION to Stay filed by UMB Bank, N.A.. (Stoltz, Stephen)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit 1 - SEC Order,
Att: 2 Exhibit 2 - FGB Memo,
Att: 3 Exhibit 3 - Fee Mortgage
Wednesday, January 10, 2024
23 23 motion Withdraw as Attorney Wed 01/10 12:19 PM
MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney for Defendants JB Forum Land, LLC, AT Forum Louisville KY II, LLC, and Jonathan M. Larmore. . (Continue to receive notice:Yes) by Defendants AT Forum Louisville KY II, LLC, JB Forum Land, LLC, Jonathan M. Larmore (Taggart, Carolyn)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Declaration of David P. Shouvlin,
Att: 2 Proposed Order
Monday, January 08, 2024
22 22 1 pgs order Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply Mon 01/08 3:09 PM
ORDER GRANTING PLAINTIFF'S SECOND MOTION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME TO RESPOND TO DEFENDANTS' MOTIONS TO DISMISS signed by Judge Rebecca Grady Jennings on 01/08/2024. Plaintiff SHALL have up to and including Friday, January 12, 2024, within which to respond to the pending Motions to Dismiss [R.13 and15 ]. cc: Counsel (HMC)
Related: [-]
Thursday, January 04, 2024
21 21 motion Extension of Time to File Response/Reply Thu 01/04 1:09 PM
Second MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to15 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM ,13 MOTION to Dismiss and Alternative MOTION to Stay by Plaintiff UMB Bank, N.A. (Stoltz, Stephen)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proposed Order
Thursday, December 21, 2023
20 20 1 pgs order Order of Recusal Thu 12/21 2:44 PM
ORDER OF RECUSAL by Judge Claria Horn Boom on 12/21/23: IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that Judge Claria Horn Boom RECUSES from this matter, and the action is hereby REASSIGNED to the docket of the Honorable Rebecca Grady Jennings, United States District Judge, for all further proceedings. Counsel are requested to change the civil action number to reflect the initials RGJ on all further pleadings. cc: Counsel, CM-RGJ (DJT)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, December 20, 2023
19 19 misc Proposed Order Wed 12/20 5:43 PM
Proposed Order new proposed order correcting due date for responses re18 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to15 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM ,13 MOTION to Dismiss and Alternative MOTION to Stay by UMB Bank, N.A.. (Stoltz, Stephen)
Related: [-]
18 18 motion Extension of Time to File Response/Reply Wed 12/20 4:48 PM
MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to15 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM ,13 MOTION to Dismiss and Alternative MOTION to Stay by Plaintiff UMB Bank, N.A. (Stoltz, Stephen)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proposed Order
Friday, December 08, 2023
17 17 misc Corporate Disclosure Statement (pursuant to Rule 7.1(a)(1)) Fri 12/08 1:28 PM
Corporate Disclosure Statement (pursuant to Rule 7.1(a)(1)) by JB Forum Land, LLC. (Taggart, Carolyn)
Related: [-]
16 16 misc Corporate Disclosure Statement (pursuant to Rule 7.1(a)(1)) Fri 12/08 1:26 PM
Corporate Disclosure Statement (pursuant to Rule 7.1(a)(1)) by AT Forum Louisville KY II, LLC. (Taggart, Carolyn)
Related: [-]
Thursday, November 30, 2023
15 15 motion Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim Thu 11/30 7:10 PM
MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM by Defendants AT Forum Louisville KY II, LLC, JB Forum Land, LLC, Jonathan M. Larmore (Taggart, Carolyn)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Memorandum in Support,
Att: 2 Exhibit 1 - Declaration of Jonathan M. Larmore,
Att: 3 Exhibit 2 - Mortgage,
Att: 4 Exhibit 3 - Order of Appointment of Receiver,
Att: 5 Proposed Order
14 14 misc Corporate Disclosure Statement (pursuant to Rule 7.1(a)(1)) Thu 11/30 5:37 PM
Corporate Disclosure Statement (pursuant to Rule 7.1(a)(1)) identifying Corporate Parent First Guaranty Bancshares, Inc. for First Guaranty Bank. by First Guaranty Bank. (Drell, Bradley)
Related: [-]
13 13 motion Dismiss Stay Thu 11/30 2:40 PM
MOTION to Dismiss and , Alternative MOTION to Stay by Defendant First Guaranty Bank (Drell, Bradley)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A,
Att: 2 Exhibit B,
Att: 3 Exhibit C,
Att: 4 Memorandum in Support,
Att: 5 Proposed Order
Wednesday, November 29, 2023
12 12 1 pgs order Order on Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice Wed 11/29 4:55 PM
ORDER GRANTING MOTION FOR ADMISSION PRO HAC VICE OF HEATHER M. MATHEWS signed by Judge Claria Horn Boom on 11/29/23; granting11 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice as to Heather M. Mathews. cc: Counsel, QC(DJT)
Related: [-]
Monday, November 27, 2023
11 11 motion Appear Pro Hac Vice Mon 11/27 4:39 PM
MOTION for Heather M. Mathews to Appear Pro Hac Vice Filing fee $ 150, receipt number AKYWDC-3928585. by Defendant First Guaranty Bank (Drell, Bradley)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proposed Order
Thursday, November 16, 2023
10 10 1 pgs order Order on Motion for Extension of Time to Answer Thu 11/16 4:22 PM
ORDER GRANTING JOINT MOTION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME signed by Judge Claria Horn Boom on 11/16/23; granting8 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer re8 Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer : The Defendants SHALL have up to and including 11/30/2023, within which to answer, move, or otherwise plead to the Plaintiffs Complaint. cc: Counsel(DJT)
Related: [-]
9 9 1 pgs order Order on Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice Thu 11/16 4:19 PM
ORDER GRANTING MOTION FOR ADMISSION PRO HAC VICE OF BRADLEY L. DRELL signed by Judge Claria Horn Boom on 11/16/23; granting7 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice as to Bradley L. Drell. cc: Counsel(DJT)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, November 15, 2023
8 8 motion Extension of Time to File Answer Wed 11/15 6:11 PM
Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer by Defendant First Guaranty Bank (Cummins, Peter)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proposed Order -Agreed Order for Extension of Time
Tuesday, November 14, 2023
7 7 motion Appear Pro Hac Vice Tue 11/14 11:10 AM
MOTION for Bradley L. Drell to Appear Pro Hac Vice Filing fee $ 150, receipt number AKYWDC-3921272. by Defendant First Guaranty Bank (Drell, Bradley)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proposed Order
Monday, November 13, 2023
6 6 notice Notice (Other) Mon 11/13 2:29 PM
NOTICE Rule 7.1 Disclosure Statement by UMB Bank, N.A. (Stoltz, Stephen)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, November 07, 2023
5 5 misc Diversity Case Disclosure Statement (pursuant to Rule 7.1(a)(2)) Tue 11/07 12:35 PM
Diversity Case Disclosure Statement (pursuant to Rule 7.1(a)(2)) by Jonathan M. Larmore. (Taggart, Carolyn)
Related: [-]
Monday, November 06, 2023
4 4 notice Deficiency Mon 11/06 5:09 PM
NOTICE of Deficiency re1 Notice of Removal. Reason for Deficiency: Rule 7.1(a)(1) Corporate Disclosure Statement and Rule 7.1(a)(2) Disclosure Statement. Failure to comply will be brought to the attention of the Court. Response due by 11/13/2023. (MNM)
Related: [-]
3 3 notice Notice (Other) Mon 11/06 5:07 PM
CLERK'S NOTICE re1 Notice of Removal. cc: Counsel of Record, Jefferson Circuit Court (MNM)
Related: [-]
2 2 utility Case Assignment Mon 11/06 4:58 PM
Case Assignment (Random Selection): Case Assigned to Judge Claria Horn Boom. (MNM)
Related: [-]
1 1 cmp Notice of Removal Mon 11/06 4:57 PM
NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Jonathan M. Larmore from Jefferson Circuit Court, case number 23-CI-401044 (filing fee $402, receipt number AKYWDC-3916418). (MNM)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A - State Court File,
Att: 2 Cover Sheet