Arizona Bankruptcy Court
Chapter 11
Judge:Daniel P Collins
Case #: 2:23-bk-07975
Case Filed:Nov 06, 2023
Creditor Meeting:Dec 12, 2023
Dismissed:Nov 27, 2023
Terminated:Dec 19, 2023

TypeCorporation
Tax IDsubscribers only
# of Creditors1-49
Est. Assets$1,000,001 to $10 million
Est. Liabilities $1,000,001 to $10 million
Nature of Business Other
Nature of Debts Primarily Business

Debtor
IN-POWER MOTORS LLC
PO Box 18231
Phoenix, AZ 85005-8231
Represented By
ALLAN 2 NEWDELMAN
Allan D Newdelman PC
contact info
Last checked: never
Trustee
ZCHAPTER 11 FMC
U.S. Trustee
U.S. TRUSTEE
OFFICE OF THE U.S. TRUSTEE 230 NORTH FIRST AVENUE SUITE 204
PHOENIX, AZ 85003


Docket last updated: 60 minutes ago
Tuesday, December 19, 2023
30 30 court Close Bankruptcy Case (ALL) (DISMISSED) Tue 12/19 7:55 AM
The case having been dismissed; IT IS ORDERED that the case is closed and if a trustee has been appointed, the trustee is discharged from and relieved of his trust. Judge Daniel P. Collins (WES)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, December 05, 2023
29 29 vCal Virtual Minute Entry Tue 12/05 8:42 AM
Minutes of Hearing held on: 12/12/2023 Subject: CHAPTER 11 STATUS CONFERENCE Appearances: NONE Proceedings: VACATED: Dismissed 11/27/23. (vCal Hearing ID (1604564)). Related [+](RSB)
Related: [-] 11
Monday, November 27, 2023
28 28 court zNotice of Dismissal Order and Certificate of Notice (DO NOT USE) Wed 11/29 10:35 PM
BNC Certificate of Notice - Notice of Dismissal Order Related [+] (Admin.)
Related: [-] 26 Order Dismissing Case
27 27 1 pgs trustee Ch 11 Subchapter V Trustee's Report of No Distribution C-case dism or conv, fee award not recd Mon 11/27 10:38 AM
Chapter 11 Subchapter V Trustees Report of No Distribution. Funds Collected: $0.00. Key information about this case as reported in schedules filed by the debtor(s) or otherwise found in the case record: This case was pending for 1 months. Assets Abandoned (without deducting any secured claims): Not Applicable, Assets Exempt: Not Applicable, Claims Scheduled: $3091608.00, Claims Asserted: Not Available, Claims scheduled to be discharged without payment (without deducting the value of collateral or debts excepted from discharge): Not Applicable. filed by DAWN M. MAGUIRE of TRUSTEE MAGUIRE on behalf of DAWN M. MAGUIRE.(MAGUIRE, DAWN)
Related: [-]
26 26 2 pgs order oDismissing Case - VAN Form Mon 11/27 8:30 AM
ORDER Dismissing Case Debtor Related [+] . (WES)
Related: [-] 9 Deficiency Notice to Debtor (Missing Documents Form)
Wednesday, November 22, 2023
25 25 other Certificate of Mailing Wed 11/22 7:08 AM
Certificate of Mailing filed by SCOTT K BROWN of Anderson Clarkson Brown PLLC on behalf of ARK FINANCIAL LLC. Related [+] (BROWN, SCOTT)
Related: [-] 22 Motion for Relief from Stay (188.00 fee),23 Declaration,24 Notice of Motion for Relief from Stay
Tuesday, November 21, 2023
24 24 notice Motion for Relief from Stay (Notice of) Tue 11/21 5:38 PM
Notice of Motion for Relief from Stay Notice of Filing Ark Financial LLC's Motion for Relief From the Automatic Stay Concerning Personal Property Collateral filed by SCOTT K BROWN of Anderson Clarkson Brown PLLC on behalf of ARK FINANCIAL LLC Related [+] Objections/Responses due by 12/6/2023,.(BROWN, SCOTT)
Related: [-] 22 Motion for Relief from Stay (188.00 fee)
23 23 5 pgs other Declaration Tue 11/21 5:32 PM
Declaration of Lars Christensen filed by SCOTT K BROWN of Anderson Clarkson Brown PLLC on behalf of ARK FINANCIAL LLC. Related [+](BROWN, SCOTT)
Related: [-] 22 Motion for Relief from Stay (188.00 fee)
Att: 1 18 pgs Exhibit 1
Att: 2 Exhibit 2
Att: 3 Exhibit 3
Att: 4 Exhibit 4
Att: 5 Exhibit 5
22 22 motion Relief from Stay (Motion for) (188.00 fee) Tue 11/21 5:28 PM
Motion for Relief from Stay (188.00 fee) Ark Financial LLC's Motion for Relief From the Automatic Stay Concerning Personal Property Collateral filed by SCOTT K BROWN of Anderson Clarkson Brown PLLC on behalf of ARK FINANCIAL LLC. (BROWN, SCOTT)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A
crditcrd Auto-Docket of Credit Card Payment Tue 11/21 5:39 PM
Receipt of Motion for Relief from Stay (188.00 fee)([LINK:2:23-bk-07975-DPC] ) [motion,185] ( 188.00) Filing Fee. Receipt number A36122951. Fee amount 188.00. (U.S. Treasury)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, November 15, 2023
21 21 court zNotice of Meeting of Creditors and Certificate of Notice (DO NOT USE) Fri 11/17 10:37 PM
BNC Certificate of Notice - Notice of Meeting of Creditors Related [+] (Admin.)
Related: [-] 20 BNC Form Request--341 Notice--Chapter 11 Corp/Part
20 20 2 pgs court BNC Form Request--341 Notice--Chapter 11 Corp/Part Wed 11/15 2:50 PM
Chapter 11 Corp/Part Notice of Meeting of Creditors. 341(a) meeting to be held on 12/12/2023 at 09:00 AM as a Telephonic Hearing (341) Proof of Claims due by 1/16/2024, (MAT)
Related: [-]
19 19 notice Appearance (Notice of) Wed 11/15 12:10 PM
Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice filed by STEVEN J. BROWN of STEVE BROWN & ASSOCIATES, LLC on behalf of CAR FINANCIAL SERVICES, INC..(BROWN, STEVEN)
Related: [-]
Monday, November 13, 2023
18 18 other Certificate of Service Mon 11/13 1:27 PM
Certificate of Service filed by ALLAN 2 NEWDELMAN of ALLAN D NEWDELMAN PC on behalf of IN-POWER MOTORS LLC. Related [+] (NEWDELMAN, ALLAN)
Related: [-] 11 Order Setting Chapter 11 Status Conference
17 17 other Amendment to Mailing List (32.00 fee) Mon 11/13 10:52 AM
Amendment to Mailing List (32.00 fee) filed by ALLAN 2 NEWDELMAN of ALLAN D NEWDELMAN PC on behalf of IN-POWER MOTORS LLC. (NEWDELMAN, ALLAN)
Related: [-]
crditcrd Auto-Docket of Credit Card Payment Mon 11/13 10:54 AM
Receipt of Amendment to Mailing List (32.00 fee)([LINK:2:23-bk-07975-DPC] ) [other,1559] ( 32.00) Filing Fee. Receipt number A36099169. Fee amount 32.00. (U.S. Treasury)
Related: [-]
Thursday, November 09, 2023
14 14 notice Appearance (Notice of) Thu 11/09 3:56 PM
Notice of Appearance and Request for Notices filed by SCOTT K BROWN of Anderson Clarkson Brown PLLC on behalf of ARK FINANCIAL LLC.(BROWN, SCOTT)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, November 08, 2023
13 13 notice Appearance (Notice of) Wed 11/08 10:05 AM
Notice of Appearance filed by DAWN M. MAGUIRE of TRUSTEE MAGUIRE on behalf of DAWN M. MAGUIRE.(MAGUIRE, DAWN)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, November 07, 2023
16 16 court BNC Certificate of Notice Thu 11/09 10:32 PM
BNC Certificate of Notice Related [+] (Admin.)
Related: [-] 11 Order Setting Chapter 11 Status Conference
15 15 court BNC Certificate of Notice Thu 11/09 10:32 PM
BNC Certificate of Notice Related [+] (Admin.)
Related: [-] 9 Deficiency Notice to Debtor (Missing Documents Form)
12 12 order oEmploy (Application to) Wed 11/08 8:17 AM
ORDER Approving Application to Employ Related [+] signed on 11/7/2023 . (ETS)
Related: [-] 7
11 11 order oChapter 11 Status Conference (DPC Form) Tue 11/07 3:12 PM
ORDER Setting Chapter 11 Status Conference signed on 11/7/2023 Hearing set for 12/12/2023 at 11:00 AM as a Videoconference Hearing Pre-Status Conference Report Due By 11/28/2023 . (RSB)
Related: [-]
10 10 4 pgs trustee Notice Appointing Subchapter V Trustee Tue 11/07 2:03 PM
Notice of Appointment of Subchapter V Trustee . filed by JENNIFER A. GIAIMO of OFFICE OF THE U.S. TRUSTEE on behalf of U.S. TRUSTEE.(GIAIMO, JENNIFER)
Related: [-]
9 9 court Deficiency Notice to Debtor (Missing Documents Form) Tue 11/07 11:25 AM
Deficiency Notice to Debtor and Attorney for Debtor That All Required Documents Were Not Filed. (MAT)
Related: [-]
8 8 4 pgs notice Lodging Proposed Order (Notice of) Tue 11/07 7:49 AM
Notice of Lodging Proposed Order filed by ALLAN 2 NEWDELMAN of ALLAN D NEWDELMAN PC on behalf of IN-POWER MOTORS LLC Related [+].(NEWDELMAN, ALLAN)
Related: [-] 7 Application to Employ
7 7 8 pgs motion Employ (Application to) Tue 11/07 7:48 AM
Application to Employ filed by ALLAN 2 NEWDELMAN of ALLAN D NEWDELMAN PC on behalf of IN-POWER MOTORS LLC. (NEWDELMAN, ALLAN)
Related: [-]
6 6 34 pgs notice Notice of Filing Tue 11/07 7:45 AM
Notice of Filing Addendum to the Petition filed by ALLAN 2 NEWDELMAN of ALLAN D NEWDELMAN PC on behalf of IN-POWER MOTORS LLC.(NEWDELMAN, ALLAN)
Related: [-]
5 5 notice Appearance (Notice of) Tue 11/07 7:37 AM
Notice of Appearance & Request for Notices filed by JENNIFER A. GIAIMO of OFFICE OF THE U.S. TRUSTEE on behalf of U.S. TRUSTEE.(GIAIMO, JENNIFER)
Related: [-]
Monday, November 06, 2023
4 4 other Disclosure of Compensation by Attorney FRBP 2016 Mon 11/06 4:18 PM
Disclosure of Compensation by Attorney FRBP 2016 filed by ALLAN 2 NEWDELMAN of ALLAN D NEWDELMAN PC on behalf of IN-POWER MOTORS LLC. (NEWDELMAN, ALLAN)
Related: [-]
3 3 other Verified Statement of Professional FRBP 2014 Mon 11/06 4:18 PM
Verified Statement of Professional FRBP 2014 filed by ALLAN 2 NEWDELMAN of ALLAN D NEWDELMAN PC on behalf of IN-POWER MOTORS LLC. (NEWDELMAN, ALLAN)
Related: [-]
2 2 court Meeting of Creditors 11 (Business) Mon 11/06 4:02 PM
Meeting of Creditors scheduled for 12/12/2023 at 09:00 AM as a Telephonic Hearing (341). (NEWDELMAN, ALLAN)
Related: [-]
1 1 8 pgs other 2Voluntary Petition (Chapter 11) (1738.00 fee) Mon 11/06 3:56 PM
Chapter 11 Subchapter V Voluntary Petition for Non-Individual, Schedules and Statements (except for those listed below). Failure to timely upload the list of creditors, may result in dismissal of the case without further notice. Electronic Filing Declaration due 11/27/2023, Master Mailing due 11/13/2023, Schedules A/B-J due 11/20/2023. Statement of Financial Affairs due 11/20/2023, Chapter 11 Statement of Current Monthly Income due by 11/20/2023, Chapter 11 Plan Small Business Subchapter V Due by 02/5/2024. filed by ALLAN 2 NEWDELMAN of ALLAN D NEWDELMAN PC on behalf of IN-POWER MOTORS LLC (NEWDELMAN, ALLAN)
Related: [-]
crditcrd Auto-Docket of Credit Card Payment Mon 11/06 4:00 PM
Receipt of Voluntary Petition (Chapter 11)([LINK:2:23-bk-07975] ) [other,volp11] (1738.00) Filing Fee. Receipt number A36085454. Fee amount 1738.00. (U.S. Treasury)
Related: [-]