New York Eastern Bankruptcy Court
Chapter 11
Judge:Elizabeth S Stong
Case #: 1:23-bk-44074
Case Filed:Nov 06, 2023
Dismissed:Feb 26, 2024
Terminated:Apr 25, 2024

TypeCorporation
Tax IDsubscribers only
# of Creditors1-49
Est. Assets$1,000,001 to $10 million
Est. Liabilities $1,000,001 to $10 million
Nature of Business Other
Nature of Debts Primarily Business

Debtor
962 972 Bushwick Ave LLC
1828 61st St
Brooklyn, NY 11204-2352
Represented By
Isaac Nutovic
Law Offices Of Isaac Nutovic
contact info
Last checked: never
U.S. Trustee
Office of the United States Trustee
Eastern District of NY (Brooklyn) Alexander Hamilton Custom House One Bowling Green Room 510
New York, NY 10004


Docket last updated: 05/02/2025 6:05 PM EDT
Thursday, April 25, 2024
49 49 order Close Dismissed Case (BK Cases Only) Thu 04/25 2:52 PM
Order to Close Dismissed Case. Signed on 4/25/2024. (jag)
Related: [-]
court Close Bankruptcy Case Thu 04/25 2:52 PM
Bankruptcy Case Closed (jag)
Related: [-]
Friday, March 15, 2024
court zMinute Entry - Hearing Settled/Withdrawn/Marked Off Without Hearing (Case Owned BK) Fri 03/15 7:29 AM
Marked Off without hearing Related [+] - Case previously dismissed (sej)
Related: [-] 11 Order Scheduling Initial Case Management Conference,47 Order Dismissing Case with Notice of Dismissal
Thursday, February 29, 2024
48 48 court BNC Certificate of Mailing with Notice of Dismissal Fri 03/01 12:10 AM
BNC Certificate of Mailing with Notice of Dismissal Notice Date 02/29/2024. (Admin.)
Related: [-]
Monday, February 26, 2024
47 47 order Dismissing Case with Notice of Dismissal Tue 02/27 8:44 AM
Order Dismissing Case with Notice of Dismissal Related [+]. Signed on 2/26/2024. (jag)
Related: [-] 40 Motion to Dismiss Case filed by Debtor 962 972 Bushwick Ave LLC
46 46 order Compensation Mon 02/26 2:40 PM
Order Granting Compensation for the Law Offices of Isaac Nutovic, fees awarded: $33,312.50 Related [+]. Signed on 2/26/2024. (jag)
Related: [-] 39 Application for Compensation filed by Debtor 962 972 Bushwick Ave LLC
Att: 1 Exhibit
Sunday, February 25, 2024
45 45 notice Notice of Submission of Proposed Order Sun 02/25 5:07 PM
Notice of Submission of Proposed Order Filed by Isaac Nutovic on behalf of 962 972 Bushwick Ave LLC Related [+] (Nutovic, Isaac)
Related: [-] 40 Motion to Dismiss Case filed by Debtor 962 972 Bushwick Ave LLC
44 44 notice Notice of Submission of Proposed Order Sun 02/25 5:05 PM
Notice of Submission of Proposed Order Filed by Isaac Nutovic on behalf of 962 972 Bushwick Ave LLC Related [+] (Nutovic, Isaac)
Related: [-] 39 Application for Compensation filed by Debtor 962 972 Bushwick Ave LLC
Att: 1 Schedule A
Friday, February 23, 2024
court zMinute Entry - Hearing Held (Document BK & AP) Fri 02/23 2:45 PM
Hearing Held; Appearances: Debtor, Office of the United States Trustee. Related [+] No opposition - Granted on consent as to form of UST - Submit order (sej)
Related: [-] 39 Application for Compensation Filed by Debtor 962 972 Bushwick Ave LLC
court zMinute Entry - Hearing Held (Document BK & AP) Fri 02/23 2:46 PM
Hearing Held; Appearances: Debtor, Office of the United States Trustee. Related [+] No opposition - Granted - Submit order on consent as to form of UST. (sej)
Related: [-] 40 Motion to Dismiss Case Filed by Debtor 962 972 Bushwick Ave LLC
Monday, January 22, 2024
43 43 misc Affidavit/Certificate of Service Mon 01/22 9:20 PM
Amended Affidavit/Certificate of Service Filed by Isaac Nutovic on behalf of 962 972 Bushwick Ave LLC Related [+] (Nutovic, Isaac)
Related: [-] 42 Motion to Dismiss Case filed by Debtor 962 972 Bushwick Ave LLC
42 42 motion Dismiss Case Mon 01/22 9:16 PM
Amended Motion to Dismiss Case Filed by Isaac Nutovic on behalf of 962 972 Bushwick Ave LLC Related [+]. (Nutovic, Isaac)
Related: [-] 40 Motion to Dismiss Case filed by Debtor 962 972 Bushwick Ave LLC
Att: 1 Affidavit Greenfeld Declaration
Att: 2 Proposed Order
41 41 misc Affidavit/Certificate of Service Mon 01/22 9:03 PM
Affidavit/Certificate of Service Filed by Isaac Nutovic on behalf of 962 972 Bushwick Ave LLC Related [+] (Nutovic, Isaac)
Related: [-] 39 Application for Compensation filed by Debtor 962 972 Bushwick Ave LLC,40 Motion to Dismiss Case filed by Debtor 962 972 Bushwick Ave LLC
40 40 motion Dismiss Case Mon 01/22 6:32 PM
Motion to Dismiss Case Filed by Isaac Nutovic on behalf of 962 972 Bushwick Ave LLC. Hearing scheduled for 2/23/2024 at 10:30 AM at Courtroom 3585 (Judge Stong), Brooklyn, NY. (Nutovic, Isaac)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Affidavit David Greenfeld
Att: 2 Proposed Order
39 39 motion Compensation (Application) Mon 01/22 11:30 AM
Application for Compensation. for Law Offices of Isaac Nutovic as Attorney; Fees: $ 33312.50 Expenses: $ 0 Filed by Isaac Nutovic on behalf of 962 972 Bushwick Ave LLC. Hearing scheduled for 2/23/2024 at 10:30 AM at Courtroom 3585 (Judge Stong), Brooklyn, NY. (Nutovic, Isaac)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit Order January 8, 2023
Att: 2 Exhibit Time Records
Att: 3 Exhibit Certification
Att: 4 Proposed Order
Wednesday, January 10, 2024
court zMinute Entry - Hearing Settled/Withdrawn/Marked Off Without Hearing (Document BK & AP) Thu 01/11 11:28 AM
Withdrawn without hearin Related [+] (sej)
Related: [-] 14 Motion to Assume/Reject Lease or Executory Contract Filed by Creditor Artemesia SPE LLC,37 Letter Filed by Creditor Artemesia SPE LLC
court zMinute Entry - Hearing Settled/Withdrawn/Marked Off Without Hearing (Document BK & AP) Thu 01/11 11:29 AM
Withdrawn without hearin Related [+] (sej)
Related: [-] 37 Letter Filed by Creditor Artemesia SPE LLC,15 Motion to Dismiss Case Filed by Creditor Artemesia SPE LLC
court zMinute Entry - Hearing Settled/Withdrawn/Marked Off Without Hearing (Document BK & AP) Thu 01/11 11:30 AM
Withdrawn without hearin Related [+] (sej)
Related: [-] 16 Motion for Relief From Stay Filed by Creditor Artemesia SPE LLC
Monday, January 08, 2024
38 38 order Authorizing Retention of Attorney (Ch11) Tue 01/09 9:13 AM
Order Authorizing the Retention of the Law Offices of Isaac Nutovic as Bankruptcy Counsel effective as of November 6, 2023 Related [+]. Signed on 1/8/2024. (jag)
Related: [-] 7 Application to Employ filed by Debtor 962 972 Bushwick Ave LLC
Sunday, January 07, 2024
37 37 misc Letter Sun 01/07 6:36 PM
Letter to Judge Stong Filed by Sally Siconolfi on behalf of Artemesia SPE LLC Related [+] (Siconolfi, Sally)
Related: [-] 14 Motion to Assume/Reject Lease or Executory Contract filed by Creditor Artemesia SPE LLC,15 Motion to Dismiss Case filed by Creditor Artemesia SPE LLC,16 Motion for Relief From Stay filed by Creditor Artemesia SPE LLC
Thursday, January 04, 2024
36 36 order Assume/Reject Lease or Executory Contract Thu 01/04 3:45 PM
Order Authorizing the Debtor (a) Assume the Purchase Agreement (b) Schedule Closing for no later than 5:00 PM on January 5, 2024 (c) Assign the Purchase Agreement with Respect to the Properties. Related [+] Signed on 1/4/2024. (jag)
Related: [-] 21
court zMinute Entry - Hearing Held and Adjourned (Case Owned BK) Thu 01/04 5:38 PM
Hearing Held and Adjourned; Appearances: Debtor, Artemesia SPE LLC, Office of the United States Trustee. Status hearing to be held on 03/15/2024 at 10:30 AM at Courtroom 3585 (Judge Stong), Brooklyn, NY. Related [+] Debtor to provide proposed retention order in word format to UST as reflected in the record. (sej)
Related: [-] 11 Order Scheduling Initial Case Management Conference
court zMinute Entry - Hearing Held (Document BK & AP) Thu 01/04 5:38 PM
Hearing Held; Appearances: Debtor, Artemesia SPE LLC, Office of the United States Trustee. Related [+] No opposition - Granted - Court to issue order. (sej)
Related: [-] 21 Motion to Assume/Reject Lease or Executory Contract Filed by Debtor 962 972 Bushwick Ave LLC
court zMinute Entry - Hearing Held and Adjourned (Case Owned BK) Thu 01/04 5:39 PM
Hearing Held and Adjourned; Appearances: Debtor, Artemesia SPE LLC, Office of the United States Trustee. Status hearing to be held on 01/10/2024 at 03:30 PM at Courtroom 3585 (Judge Stong), Brooklyn, NY. Related [+] Artemesia SPE LLC to file status letter by 1/8/2024 as reflected in the record. (sej)
Related: [-] 14 Motion to Assume/Reject Lease or Executory Contract Filed by Creditor Artemesia SPE LLC
court zMinute Entry - Hearing Held and Adjourned (Document BK & AP) Thu 01/04 5:41 PM
Hearing Held and Adjourned; 'Hearing scheduled for 01/10/2024 at 03:30 PM at Courtroom 3585 (Judge Stong), Brooklyn, NY Related [+] Appearances: Debtor, Artemesia SPE LLC, Office of the United States Trustee. Artemisia SPE LLC to file status letter by 1/8/2024 as reflected in the record. (sej)
Related: [-] 15 Motion to Dismiss Case Filed by Creditor Artemesia SPE LLC
court zMinute Entry - Hearing Held and Adjourned (Document BK & AP) Thu 01/04 5:42 PM
Hearing Held and Adjourned; 'Hearing scheduled for 01/10/2024 at 10:30 AM at Courtroom 3585 (Judge Stong), Brooklyn, NY Related [+] Appearances: Debtor, Artemesia SPE LLC, Office of the United States Trustee. Artemisia SPE LLC to file status letter by 1/8/2024 as reflected in the record. (sej)
Related: [-] 16 Motion for Relief From Stay Filed by Creditor Artemesia SPE LLC
Tuesday, January 02, 2024
35 35 misc Statement Tue 01/02 2:22 PM
Statement Consenting to Transaction Filed by Isaac Nutovic on behalf of 962 972 Bushwick Ave LLC Related [+] (Nutovic, Isaac)
Related: [-] 21 Motion to Assume/Reject Lease or Executory Contract filed by Debtor 962 972 Bushwick Ave LLC
Monday, January 01, 2024
34 34 misc Chapter 11 Monthly Operating Report UST Form 11-MOR Mon 01/01 7:46 PM
Chapter 11 Monthly Operating Report for the Month Ending: 12/31/2023 Filed by Isaac Nutovic on behalf of 962 972 Bushwick Ave LLC (Nutovic, Isaac)
Related: [-]
33 33 misc Chapter 11 Monthly Operating Report UST Form 11-MOR Mon 01/01 7:45 PM
Chapter 11 Monthly Operating Report for the Month Ending: 11/30/2023 Filed by Isaac Nutovic on behalf of 962 972 Bushwick Ave LLC (Nutovic, Isaac)
Related: [-]
32 32 misc Statement Mon 01/01 7:41 PM
Statement of Consent to Assumption and Assignment of Contractt and As Filed by Isaac Nutovic on behalf of 962 972 Bushwick Ave LLC Related [+] (Nutovic, Isaac)
Related: [-] 21 Motion to Assume/Reject Lease or Executory Contract filed by Debtor 962 972 Bushwick Ave LLC
Friday, December 29, 2023
31 31 answer Reply Fri 12/29 4:04 PM
Reply Filed by Isaac Nutovic on behalf of 962 972 Bushwick Ave LLC Related [+] (Nutovic, Isaac)
Related: [-] 21 Motion to Assume/Reject Lease or Executory Contract filed by Debtor 962 972 Bushwick Ave LLC
Att: 1 Affidavit
Thursday, December 28, 2023
30 30 misc Affidavit/Certificate of Service Thu 12/28 12:45 PM
Affidavit/Certificate of Service of Limited Objection and Reservation of Rights to the Debtors Motion for an Order Authorizing the Debtor to Assume and Assign Executory Contract Filed by Sally Siconolfi on behalf of Artemesia SPE LLC Related [+] (Siconolfi, Sally)
Related: [-] 29 Objection filed by Creditor Artemesia SPE LLC
29 29 answer Objection Thu 12/28 10:50 AM
Limited Objection and Reservation of Rights to the Debtors Motion for an Order Authorizing the Debtor to Assume and Assign Executory Contract Filed by Sally Siconolfi on behalf of Artemesia SPE LLC Related [+] (Siconolfi, Sally)
Related: [-] 21 Motion to Assume/Reject Lease or Executory Contract filed by Debtor 962 972 Bushwick Ave LLC
Att: 1 Exhibit A
Thursday, December 21, 2023
court zMinute Entry - Hearing Adjourned Without Hearing (Case Owned BK) Thu 12/21 2:19 PM
Adjourned Without Hearing; Status hearing to be held on 01/04/2024 at 10:30 AM at Courtroom 3585 (Judge Stong), Brooklyn, NY. Related [+] (sej)
Related: [-] 11 Order Scheduling Initial Case Management Conference
court zMinute Entry - Hearing Adjourned Without Hearing (Document BK & AP) Thu 12/21 2:19 PM
Adjourned Without Hearing 'Hearing scheduled for 01/04/2024 at 10:30 AM at Courtroom 3585 (Judge Stong), Brooklyn, NY Related [+] (sej)
Related: [-] 14 Motion to Assume/Reject Lease or Executory Contract Filed by Creditor Artemesia SPE LLC
court zMinute Entry - Hearing Adjourned Without Hearing (Document BK & AP) Thu 12/21 2:20 PM
Adjourned Without Hearing 'Hearing scheduled for 01/04/2024 at 10:30 AM at Courtroom 3585 (Judge Stong), Brooklyn, NY Related [+] (sej)
Related: [-] 15 Motion to Dismiss Case Filed by Creditor Artemesia SPE LLC
court zMinute Entry - Hearing Adjourned Without Hearing (Document BK & AP) Thu 12/21 2:21 PM
Adjourned Without Hearing 'Hearing scheduled for 01/04/2024 at 10:30 AM at Courtroom 3585 (Judge Stong), Brooklyn, NY Related [+] (sej)
Related: [-] 16 Motion for Relief From Stay Filed by Creditor Artemesia SPE LLC
Tuesday, December 19, 2023
28 28 misc Letter of Adjournment - (Do not use to adjourn 341 meetings) Tue 12/19 10:35 AM
Letter of Adjournment: Hearing rescheduled from 12/21/2023 to 01/04/2024 Filed by Sally Siconolfi on behalf of Artemesia SPE LLC Related [+] (Siconolfi, Sally)
Related: [-] 14 Motion to Assume/Reject Lease or Executory Contract filed by Creditor Artemesia SPE LLC,15 Motion to Dismiss Case filed by Creditor Artemesia SPE LLC,16 Motion for Relief From Stay filed by Creditor Artemesia SPE LLC
27 27 misc Letter of Adjournment - (Do not use to adjourn 341 meetings) Tue 12/19 10:04 AM
Letter of Adjournment: Hearing rescheduled from 12/21/2023 @ 10:30 a.m. to 01/04/2024 @ 10:30 a.m. Filed by Isaac Nutovic on behalf of 962 972 Bushwick Ave LLC (Nutovic, Isaac)
Related: [-]
Monday, December 18, 2023
26 26 misc Affidavit/Certificate of Service Mon 12/18 4:27 PM
Affidavit/Certificate of Service Filed by Sally Siconolfi on behalf of Artemesia SPE LLC Related [+] (Siconolfi, Sally)
Related: [-] 23 Declaration filed by Creditor Artemesia SPE LLC,24 Reply filed by Creditor Artemesia SPE LLC,25 Reply filed by Creditor Artemesia SPE LLC
25 25 answer Reply Mon 12/18 3:50 PM
Omnibus Reply in Support of Motions of Artemesia SPE LLC to (A) Grant Relief from the Automatic Stay to (I) Release the Down Payment from Escrow and (II) Terminate the Purchase Agreement and (B) Dismiss Debtors Chapter 11 Bankruptcy Case Filed by Sally Siconolfi on behalf of Artemesia SPE LLC Related [+] (Siconolfi, Sally)
Related: [-] 15 Motion to Dismiss Case filed by Creditor Artemesia SPE LLC,16 Motion for Relief From Stay filed by Creditor Artemesia SPE LLC
Att: 1 Exhibit A
24 24 answer Reply Mon 12/18 3:47 PM
Reply in Support of Motion of Artemesia SPE LLC to Compel Assumption or Rejection of Agreement of Purchase and Sale by January 5, 2024 Filed by Sally Siconolfi on behalf of Artemesia SPE LLC Related [+] (Siconolfi, Sally)
Related: [-] 14 Motion to Assume/Reject Lease or Executory Contract filed by Creditor Artemesia SPE LLC
Att: 1 Exhibit A
23 23 misc Declaration Mon 12/18 3:43 PM
Declaration Filed by Sally Siconolfi on behalf of Artemesia SPE LLC Related [+] (Siconolfi, Sally)
Related: [-] 14 Motion to Assume/Reject Lease or Executory Contract filed by Creditor Artemesia SPE LLC,15 Motion to Dismiss Case filed by Creditor Artemesia SPE LLC,16 Motion for Relief From Stay filed by Creditor Artemesia SPE LLC
22 22 misc Affidavit/Certificate of Service Mon 12/18 2:04 PM
Affidavit/Certificate of Service Filed by Isaac Nutovic on behalf of 962 972 Bushwick Ave LLC Related [+] (Nutovic, Isaac)
Related: [-] 21 Motion to Assume/Reject Lease or Executory Contract filed by Debtor 962 972 Bushwick Ave LLC
21 21 motion Assume/Reject Lease or Executory Contract Mon 12/18 1:15 PM
Motion to Assume Lease or Executory Contract Filed by Isaac Nutovic on behalf of 962 972 Bushwick Ave LLC. Hearing scheduled for 1/4/2024 at 10:30 AM at Courtroom 3585 (Judge Stong), Brooklyn, NY. (Nutovic, Isaac)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A-Agreement
Att: 2 Proposed Order
Att: 3 Affidavit Greenfeld Declaration
Thursday, December 14, 2023
20 20 misc Declaration Thu 12/14 11:07 PM
Declaration Filed by Isaac Nutovic on behalf of 962 972 Bushwick Ave LLC Related [+] (Nutovic, Isaac)
Related: [-] 15 Motion to Dismiss Case filed by Creditor Artemesia SPE LLC,16 Motion for Relief From Stay filed by Creditor Artemesia SPE LLC
19 19 answer Response Thu 12/14 10:50 PM
Response Filed by Isaac Nutovic on behalf of 962 972 Bushwick Ave LLC Related [+] (Nutovic, Isaac)
Related: [-] 14 Motion to Assume/Reject Lease or Executory Contract filed by Creditor Artemesia SPE LLC
18 18 answer Memorandum of Law in Opposition Thu 12/14 10:48 PM
Memorandum of Law in Opposition Filed by Isaac Nutovic on behalf of 962 972 Bushwick Ave LLC Related [+] (Nutovic, Isaac)
Related: [-] 15 Motion to Dismiss Case filed by Creditor Artemesia SPE LLC,16 Motion for Relief From Stay filed by Creditor Artemesia SPE LLC
Att: 1 Affidavit David Greenfeld
Monday, December 04, 2023
17 17 misc Affidavit/Certificate of Service Mon 12/04 2:17 PM
Affidavit/Certificate of Service Filed by Sally Siconolfi on behalf of Artemesia SPE LLC Related [+] (Siconolfi, Sally)
Related: [-] 14 Motion to Assume/Reject Lease or Executory Contract filed by Creditor Artemesia SPE LLC,15 Motion to Dismiss Case filed by Creditor Artemesia SPE LLC,16 Motion for Relief From Stay filed by Creditor Artemesia SPE LLC
16 16 motion Relief from Stay (Fee Due) Mon 12/04 1:39 PM
Motion for Relief from Stay / Motion Of Artemesia SPE LLC For An Order Granting Relief From The Automatic Stay On January 6, 2024 To (I) Release The Down Payment From Escrow And (Ii) Terminate The Purchase Agreement . Objections to be filed on 10/14/2023. Fee Amount $199. Filed by Sally Siconolfi on behalf of Artemesia SPE LLC. Hearing scheduled for 12/21/2023 at 10:30 AM (check with court for location). (Siconolfi, Sally)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A
Att: 2 Exhibit B
Att: 3 Exhibit C
Att: 4 Exhibit D
Att: 5 Exhibit E
Att: 6 Exhibit F
15 15 motion Dismiss Case Mon 12/04 1:34 PM
Motion to Dismiss Case / Motion Of Artemesia SPE LLC To Dismiss Debtors Chapter 11 Bankruptcy Case . Objections to be filed on 12/14/2023. Filed by Sally Siconolfi on behalf of Artemesia SPE LLC. Hearing scheduled for 12/21/2023 at 10:30 AM at Courtroom 3585 (Judge Stong), Brooklyn, NY. (Siconolfi, Sally)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A
Att: 2 Exhibit B
Att: 3 Exhibit C
Att: 4 Exhibit D
Att: 5 Exhibit E
Att: 6 Exhibit F
14 14 motion Assume/Reject Lease or Executory Contract Mon 12/04 1:27 PM
Motion to Assume Lease or Executory Contract / Motion Of Artemesia SPE LLC To Compel Assumption Or Rejection Of Agreement Of Purchase And Sale By January 5, 2024 Filed by Sally Siconolfi on behalf of Artemesia SPE LLC. Hearing scheduled for 12/21/2023 at 10:30 AM (check with court for location). (Siconolfi, Sally)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A
Att: 2 Exhibit B
Att: 3 Exhibit C
Att: 4 Exhibit D
Att: 5 Exhibit E
Att: 6 Exhibit F
13 13 notice Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice Mon 12/04 1:05 PM
Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice Filed by Sally Siconolfi on behalf of Artemesia SPE LLC (Siconolfi, Sally)
Related: [-]
crditcrd Automatic docket of credit card/debit card Mon 12/04 1:40 PM
Receipt of Motion for Relief From Stay([LINK:1 23-44074 ess] ) [motion,mrlfsty] ( 199.00) Filing Fee. Receipt number A22185067. Fee amount 199.00. Related [+] (U.S. Treasury)
Related: [-] Doc#16
crditcrd Automatic docket of credit card/debit card Mon 12/04 1:40 PM
Receipt of Motion for Relief From Stay([LINK:1 23-44074 ess] ) [motion,mrlfsty] ( 199.00) Filing Fee. Receipt number A22185067. Fee amount 199.00. Related [+] (U.S. Treasury)
Related: [-] Doc#16
Sunday, November 19, 2023
12 12 court BNC Certificate of Mailing with Notice/Order Mon 11/20 12:10 AM
BNC Certificate of Mailing with Notice/Order Notice Date 11/19/2023. (Admin.)
Related: [-]
Friday, November 17, 2023
11 11 order Scheduling Initial Case Management Conference (Ch 11) All Judges Fri 11/17 2:33 PM
Order Scheduling Initial Case Management Conference. Signed on 11/17/2023. Status hearing to be held via video on 12/21/2023 at 10:30 AM before the Honorable Judge Stong (jag)
Related: [-]
Saturday, November 11, 2023
10 10 court BNC Certificate of Mailing with Notice of Reset of Section 341 Meeting of Creditors Sun 11/12 10:52 AM
BNC Certificate of Mailing with Notice of Reset of Section 341 Meeting of Creditors Notice Date 11/11/2023. (Admin.)
Related: [-]
Thursday, November 09, 2023
9 9 court BNC Certificate of Mailing with Notice of Deficient Filing Fri 11/10 12:09 AM
BNC Certificate of Mailing with Notice of Deficient Filing Notice Date 11/09/2023. (Admin.)
Related: [-]
8 8 court BNC Certificate of Mailing - Meeting of Creditors Fri 11/10 12:09 AM
BNC Certificate of Mailing - Meeting of Creditors Notice Date 11/09/2023. (Admin.)
Related: [-]
7 7 24 pgs motion Employ (Application) Thu 11/09 8:16 PM
Application to Employ Law Offices of Isaac Nutovic as Counsel to Debtor . Objections to be filed on 11/27/2023. Filed by Isaac Nutovic on behalf of 962 972 Bushwick Ave LLC. Order to be presented for signature on 12/4/2023. (Nutovic, Isaac)
Related: [-]
crditcrd Automatic docket of credit card/debit card Thu 11/09 11:52 AM
Receipt of Schedule(s), Statement(s) and Affidavit Pursuant to E.D.N.Y. LBR 1007-1(b) (Fee Due)([LINK:1 23-44074 ess] ) [misc,schsfa] ( 32.00) Filing Fee. Receipt number A22118580. Fee amount 32.00. Related [+] (U.S. Treasury)
Related: [-] Doc#5
Wednesday, November 08, 2023
6 6 trustee Notice of Rescheduled Telephonic 341 Meeting with Instructions Wed 11/08 2:04 PM
Notice of Rescheduled Telephonic 341 Meeting with Instructions. Meeting scheduled for December 11, 2023, at 11:00 a.m. Filed by Office of the United States Trustee Related [+]. (Sussman, Jeremy)
Related: [-] 4 Meeting of Creditors Chapter 11
Tuesday, November 07, 2023
5 5 misc Schedule(s), Statement(s) and Affidavit Pursuant to E.D.N.Y. LBR 1007-1(b) (Fee Due) Tue 11/07 10:22 PM
Schedule(s), Statement(s) and Affidavit Pursuant to E.D.N.Y. LBR 1007-1(b) Schedule A/B, Schedule C, Schedule E/F, Schedule G, Schedule H, Fee Amount $32 Filed by Isaac Nutovic on behalf of 962 972 Bushwick Ave LLC (Nutovic, Isaac)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit Statement of Financial Affairs
Att: 2 Exhibit List of 20 Largest Creditors
Att: 3 Exhibit LBR 1073-2B Statement
Att: 4 Exhibit LBR 1007-4 Declaration
Att: 5 Exhibit Corporate Ownership Statement
Att: 6 Exhibit List of Equity Security Holders
Att: 7 Exhibit Creditor List Verification
4 4 court Meeting of Creditors Chapter 11 Tue 11/07 2:30 PM
Meeting of Creditors 341(a) meeting to be held on 12/11/2023 at 11:00 AM at Teleconference - Brooklyn. (nwh)
Related: [-]
Monday, November 06, 2023
3 3 court Deficient Filing Chapter 11 Tue 11/07 2:25 PM
Deficient Filing Chapter 11Mailing Matrix / List of Creditors Pursuant to E.D.N.Y. LBR 1007-3 due by 11/6/2023. Statement Pursuant to E.D.N.Y. LBR 1073-2b due by 11/6/2023.Affidavit Pursuant to E.D.N.Y. LBR 1007-4 due 11/6/2023. 20 Largest Unsecured Creditors due 11/6/2023. Corporate Ownership Statement Pursuant to FBR 1007(a)(1) due 11/6/2023. Corporate Disclosure Statement Pursuant to FBR 1073-3 due 11/6/2023. Disclosure of Compensation of Attorney for Debtor. 11 U.S.C. § 329 and Fed. R. Bankr. P. 2016(b) (Official Form 2030) due 11/20/2023. Summary of Assets and Liabilities for Non-Individuals Official Form 206Sum due by 11/20/2023. Schedule A/B due 11/20/2023. Schedule D due 11/20/2023. Schedule G due 11/20/2023. Schedule H due 11/20/2023. Declaration Under Penalty of Perjury for Non Individual Debtors Official Form 202 due 11/20/2023. List of Equity Security Holders due 11/20/2023. Statement of Financial Affairs Non-Ind Form 207 due 11/20/2023. Incomplete Filings due by 11/20/2023. (nwh)
Related: [-]
2 2 misc Schedule(s), Statement(s) and Affidavit Pursuant to E.D.N.Y. LBR 1007-1(b) (Fee Due) Mon 11/06 7:28 PM
Schedule(s), Statement(s) and Affidavit Pursuant to E.D.N.Y. LBR 1007-1(b) Schedule E/F, : Schedule EF Fee Amount $32 Filed by Isaac Nutovic on behalf of 962 972 Bushwick Ave LLC (Nutovic, Isaac)
Related: [-]
1 1 4 pgs misc Voluntary Petition (Chapter 11) Mon 11/06 2:42 PM
Chapter 11 Voluntary Petition for Non-Individuals. Fee Amount $ 1738. Filed by Isaac Nutovic on behalf of Isaac Nutovic Chapter 11 Plan due by 03/5/2024. Disclosure Statement due by 03/5/2024. (Nutovic, Isaac)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 1 pgs Exhibit Resolution
Att: 2 Exhibit Schedule EF
crditcrd Automatic docket of credit card/debit card Mon 11/06 2:43 PM
Receipt of Voluntary Petition (Chapter 11)([LINK:1 23-44074 ) [misc,volp11a] (1738.00) Filing Fee. Receipt number A22108298. Fee amount 1738.00. Related [+] (U.S. Treasury)
Related: [-] Doc#1
crditcrd Automatic docket of credit card/debit card Mon 11/06 7:29 PM
Receipt of Schedule(s), Statement(s) and Affidavit Pursuant to E.D.N.Y. LBR 1007-1(b) (Fee Due)([LINK:1 23-44074 ess] ) [misc,schsfa] ( 32.00) Filing Fee. Receipt number A22109522. Fee amount 32.00. Related [+] (U.S. Treasury)
Related: [-] Doc#2