Texas Eastern District Court
Judge:Rodney Gilstrap
Referred: Roy S Payne
Case #: 2:23-cv-00511
Nature of Suit820 Property Rights - Copyrights
Cause17:501 Copyright Infringement
Case Filed:Nov 07, 2023
Terminated:Feb 06, 2024
Last checked: Sunday May 05, 2024 5:57 AM CDT
Defendant
Blackbelt Smartphone Defence LTD.
Plaintiff
Phone Check Solutions, LLC
Represented By
Nathan Meyer
Russ August & Kabat - Los Angeles
contact info
Christian W Conkle
Russ August & Kabat - Los Angeles
contact info


Docket last updated: 05/07/2025 11:59 PM CDT
Wednesday, February 07, 2024
11 11 notice Notice of Filing of Copyright Form (AO 121) Wed 02/07 9:25 AM
Notice of Filing of Copyright Form (AO 121). AO 121 mailed to the Register of Copyrights. (ch, )
Related: [-]
Tuesday, February 06, 2024
10 10 1 pgs order Order ~Util - Terminate Motions Order Dismissing Case Wed 02/07 9:23 AM
ORDER granting9 AGREED MOTION to Dismiss with Prejudice. Accordingly, all claims and causes of action asserted between Plaintiff and Defendant in the abovecaptioned case are DISMISSED WITH PREJUDICE. Signed by District Judge Rodney Gilstrap on 2/6/2024. (ch, )
Related: [-]
Tuesday, January 30, 2024
9 9 motion Dismiss Tue 01/30 2:35 PM
AGREED MOTION to Dismiss with Prejudice by Phone Check Solutions, LLC.(Conkle, Christian)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proposed Order
Friday, January 19, 2024
8 8 1 pgs order Order on Motion to Stay Fri 01/19 2:33 PM
ORDER granting7 JOINT MOTION to Stay ALL DEADLINES AND NOTICE OF SETTLEMENT OF ENTIRE CASE. Signed by Magistrate Judge Roy S. Payne on 1/19/2024. (ch, )
Related: [-]
Friday, January 12, 2024
7 7 motion Stay Fri 01/12 5:52 PM
JOINT MOTION to Stay ALL DEADLINES AND NOTICE OF SETTLEMENT OF ENTIRE CASE by Phone Check Solutions, LLC.(Conkle, Christian)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proposed Order
Wednesday, January 10, 2024
6 6 service Summons Returned Executed Wed 01/10 2:42 PM
SUMMONS Returned Executed by Phone Check Solutions, LLC. Blackbelt Smartphone Defence LTD. served on 12/27/2023. (Meyer, Nathan)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, November 08, 2023
5 5 notice Notice of Attorney Appearance - Pro Hac Vice Wed 11/08 4:32 PM
NOTICE of Attorney Appearance - Pro Hac Vice by Nathan Meyer on behalf of Phone Check Solutions, LLC. Filing fee $ 100, receipt number ATXEDC-9806839. (Meyer, Nathan)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, November 07, 2023
4 4 service Summons Issued Tue 11/07 11:57 AM
SUMMONS Issued as to Blackbelt Smartphone Defence LTD.. (ch, )
Related: [-]
3 3 notice Disclosure Statement/Certificate of Interested Persons Tue 11/07 11:36 AM
Fed. R. Civ. P. 7.1(a)(1) Disclosure Statement filed by Phone Check Solutions, LLC (Conkle, Christian)
Related: [-]
2 2 notice Notice of Filing of Copyright Form (AO 121) Tue 11/07 11:33 AM
Notice of Filing of Copyright Form (AO 121). AO 121 mailed to the Register of Copyrights. (Conkle, Christian)
Related: [-]
1 1 6 pgs cmp Complaint Tue 11/07 11:31 AM
COMPLAINT for Damages and Injunctive Relief for Federal Copyright Infringement Under 17 U.S.C. §501 against Blackbelt Smartphone Defence LTD. ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number ATXEDC-9800329.), filed by Phone Check Solutions, LLC.(Conkle, Christian)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A,
Att: 2 Civil Cover Sheet
utility Case Assigned/Reassigned Tue 11/07 11:54 AM
Case assigned to District Judge Rodney Gilstrap and Magistrate Judge Roy S. Payne. (ch, )
Related: [-]
notice Notice of Magistrate Availability Tue 11/07 11:55 AM
In accordance with the provisions of 28 USC Section 636(c), you are hereby notified that a U.S. Magistrate Judge of this district court is available to conduct any or all proceedings in this case including a jury or non-jury trial and to order the entry of a final judgment. The form[LINK:Consent to Proceed Before Magistrate Judge] is available on our website. All signed consent forms, excluding pro se parties, should be filed electronically using the event Notice Regarding Consent to Proceed Before Magistrate Judge . (ch, )
Related: [-]