Minnesota District Court
Judge:Patrick J Schiltz
Referred: Shannon G Elkins
Case #: 0:23-cv-03426
Nature of Suit791 Labor - Employee Retirement Income Security Act
Cause29:1132 E.R.I.S.A.-Employee Benefits
Case Filed:Nov 07, 2023
Last checked: Sunday May 05, 2024 5:55 AM CDT
Defendant
Kristi Berge
Defendant
J&K Connect LLC
Defendant
Keep Safe Investments, LLC
Plaintiff
United Airlines Pilot Retirement Account Plan
Represented By
Ronald J. Kramer
Seyfarth Shaw LLP
contact info
Amanda M Cialkowski
Nilan Johnson Lewis PA
contact info
Thomas M. Horan
Seyfarth Shaw LLP
contact info
Plaintiff
United Airlines Retirement Plans Administrative Committee
Represented By
Ronald J. Kramer
Seyfarth Shaw LLP
contact info
Amanda M Cialkowski
Nilan Johnson Lewis PA
contact info
Thomas M. Horan
Seyfarth Shaw LLP
contact info
Plaintiff
United Airlines, Inc.
Represented By
Ronald J. Kramer
Seyfarth Shaw LLP
contact info
Amanda M Cialkowski
Nilan Johnson Lewis PA
contact info
Thomas M. Horan
Seyfarth Shaw LLP
contact info


Docket last updated: 03/18/2025 11:59 PM CDT
Wednesday, January 22, 2025
26 26 2 pgs order Order on Motion for Default Judgment Wed 01/22 4:08 PM
ORDER. IT IS HEREBY ORDERED THAT: 1. Plaintiffs' motion [Docket No. 19] is DENIED WITHOUT PREJUDICE. 2. The entry of default [Docket No. 17] is VACATED. 3. The case is STAYED until defendant Kristi Berge is released from the custody of the Bureau of Prisons. 4. Defendant Kristi Berge is ordered to notify the Court immediately after she has been released from BOP custody. Signed by Chief Judge Patrick J. Schiltz on 1/22/2025. (KAD)
Related: [-]
25 25 minutes Motion Hearing Wed 01/22 3:34 PM
(Text-Only) MINUTE ENTRY for proceedings held before Chief Judge Patrick J. Schiltz on 1/22/2025: Motion Hearing. Court Reporter: Maria Weinbeck Minneapolis Courthouse, Courtroom 15E Time: 1:34 PM/2:02 PM Total Time: 28 Minutes APPEARANCES: For Plaintiffs: Thomas Horan For Defendants: Kristi Berge, Pro Se Other Appearances: Calvin Jones, Anna Berge PROCEEDINGS: Hearing on: 19 MOTION for Default Judgment as to Defendants filed by United Airlines Retirement Plans Administrative Committee, United Airlines Pilot Retirement Account Plan, United Airlines, Inc. Written order to be issued. (CLG)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, December 11, 2024
24 24 service Certificate of Service Wed 12/11 2:05 PM
CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by United Airlines, Inc., United Airlines Retirement Plans Administrative Committee, United Airlines Pilot Retirement Account Plan re20 Notice of Hearing on Motion,21 Memorandum in Support of Motion,22 Declaration in Support,23 Proposed Order to Judge,19 MOTION for Default Judgment as to Defendants (Cialkowski, Amanda)
Related: [-]
23 23 respm Proposed Order to Judge re Motion Wed 12/11 2:02 PM
PROPOSED ORDER TO JUDGE re19 MOTION for Default Judgment as to Defendants filed by United Airlines, Inc., United Airlines Retirement Plans Administrative Committee, United Airlines Pilot Retirement Account Plan.(Cialkowski, Amanda)
Related: [-]
22 22 respm Declaration in Support of Motion Wed 12/11 2:01 PM
Declaration of Kelvin Jones in Support of19 MOTION for Default Judgment as to Defendants filed by United Airlines, Inc., United Airlines Retirement Plans Administrative Committee, United Airlines Pilot Retirement Account Plan.(Cialkowski, Amanda)
Related: [-]
21 21 29 pgs respm Memorandum in Support of Motion Wed 12/11 2:00 PM
MEMORANDUM in Support re19 MOTION for Default Judgment as to Defendants filed by United Airlines, Inc., United Airlines Retirement Plans Administrative Committee, United Airlines Pilot Retirement Account Plan.(Cialkowski, Amanda)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 LR7.1/LR72.2 Word Count Compliance Certificate
20 20 notice Notice of Hearing on Motion Wed 12/11 1:58 PM
NOTICE OF HEARING ON MOTION19 MOTION for Default Judgment as to Defendants : Motion Hearing set for 1/22/2025 at 01:30 PM in Courtroom 15 (MPLS) before Chief Judge Patrick J. Schiltz. (Cialkowski, Amanda)
Related: [-]
19 19 motion Default Judgment Wed 12/11 1:55 PM
MOTION for Default Judgment as to Defendants filed by United Airlines, Inc., United Airlines Retirement Plans Administrative Committee, United Airlines Pilot Retirement Account Plan. (Cialkowski, Amanda)
Related: [-]
Monday, October 21, 2024
18 18 notice Notice to Attorney - Case Reassigned to SGE Mon 10/21 10:22 AM
(Text-Only) CLERK'S NOTICE OF REASSIGNMENT OF MAGISTRATE JUDGE. Due to the appointment of Magistrate Judge Shannon G. Elkins, this case is reassigned to her. Magistrate Judge Tony N. Leung is no longer assigned to the case. NOTE: the new case number is 23-cv-3426 PJS/SGE . Please use this case number for all subsequent filings. Scheduling orders entered before this case was reassigned will remain in effect unless otherwise ordered by the Court. If a previously scheduled proceeding conflicts with an event already on Magistrate Judge Elkins' schedule, the parties will be contacted, and a new date will be scheduled. Magistrate Judge Elkins' [LINK:practice pointers] are available on the Court's website. Please contact Magistrate Judge Elkins' chambers, at 651-848-1210, for scheduling or other matters. (CLK)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, February 27, 2024
17 17 order Clerks Entry of Default Tue 02/27 12:01 PM
Clerk's ENTRY OF DEFAULT as to Keep Safe Investments, LLC, J&K Connect LLC, Kristi Berge. (LTT)
Related: [-]
Monday, February 26, 2024
16 16 misc Declaration Mon 02/26 2:11 PM
DECLARATION of Thomas Horan re15 Application for Entry of Default by United Airlines Pilot Retirement Account Plan, United Airlines Retirement Plans Administrative Committee, United Airlines, Inc. AGAINST DEFENDANTS . (Cialkowski, Amanda)
Related: [-]
15 15 misc Application for Entry of Default Mon 02/26 2:10 PM
APPLICATION FOR ENTRY OF DEFAULT AGAINST DEFENDANTS . (Cialkowski, Amanda)
Related: [-]
Friday, February 23, 2024
14 14 misc Declaration Fri 02/23 2:19 PM
DECLARATION of Thomas Horan re13 Affidavit of Default Identification and Request for Entry of Default Judgment by Clerk by United Airlines Pilot Retirement Account Plan, United Airlines Retirement Plans Administrative Committee, United Airlines, Inc. . (Cialkowski, Amanda)
Related: [-]
13 13 misc Affidavit of Default Identification wi. Request for Entry of Default Judgment-Clerk Fri 02/23 2:17 PM
AFFIDAVIT OF DEFAULT IDENTIFICATION AND REQUEST FOR ENTRY OF DEFAULT JUDGMENT BY CLERK . (Cialkowski, Amanda)
Related: [-]
Friday, February 02, 2024
12 12 misc Request Fri 02/02 2:33 PM
REQUEST FOR CLERK'S ENTRY OF DEFAULT JUDGMENT AGAINST DEFENDANTS by United Airlines Pilot Retirement Account Plan, United Airlines Retirement Plans Administrative Committee, United Airlines, Inc.. (Cialkowski, Amanda)
Related: [-]
Friday, December 01, 2023
11 11 service Summons Returned Executed Fri 12/01 11:09 AM
SUMMONS Returned Executed by United Airlines, Inc., United Airlines Pilot Retirement Account Plan, United Airlines Retirement Plans Administrative Committee. Keep Safe Investments, LLC served on 11/27/2023, answer due 12/18/2023.(Cialkowski, Amanda)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Affidavit of Service
Wednesday, November 29, 2023
10 10 service Summons Returned Executed Wed 11/29 12:46 PM
SUMMONS Returned Executed by United Airlines, Inc., United Airlines Pilot Retirement Account Plan, United Airlines Retirement Plans Administrative Committee. Kristi Berge served on 11/27/2023, answer due 12/18/2023.(Cialkowski, Amanda)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Affidavit of Service
9 9 service Summons Returned Executed Wed 11/29 12:30 PM
SUMMONS Returned Executed by United Airlines, Inc., United Airlines Pilot Retirement Account Plan, United Airlines Retirement Plans Administrative Committee. J&K Connect LLC served on 11/27/2023, answer due 12/18/2023.(Cialkowski, Amanda)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Affidavit of Service
Thursday, November 16, 2023
8 8 order Order on Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice Thu 11/16 8:33 AM
(Text-Only) ORDER granting6 Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Attorney Thomas M. Horan for United Airlines Pilot Retirement Account Plan, United Airlines Retirement Plans Administrative Committee, and United Airlines, Inc.; granting7 Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Attorney Ronald J. Kramer for United Airlines Pilot Retirement Account Plan, United Airlines Retirement Plans Administrative Committee, and United Airlines, Inc. Approved by Magistrate Judge Tony N. Leung on 11/16/2023. (jam)
Related: [-]
Monday, November 13, 2023
7 7 motion Pro Hac Vice Mon 11/13 10:44 AM
MOTION for Admission Pro Hac Vice for Attorney Ronald Kramer. Filing fee $ 100, receipt number AMNDC-10654380 filed by United Airlines Pilot Retirement Account Plan, United Airlines Retirement Plans Administrative Committee, United Airlines, Inc.. (Cialkowski, Amanda)
Related: [-]
6 6 motion Pro Hac Vice Mon 11/13 10:40 AM
MOTION for Admission Pro Hac Vice for Attorney Thomas Horan. Filing fee $ 100, receipt number AMNDC-10654357 filed by United Airlines Pilot Retirement Account Plan, United Airlines Retirement Plans Administrative Committee, United Airlines, Inc.. (Cialkowski, Amanda)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, November 08, 2023
5 5 notice Notice re: Non-Admitted Attorney Wed 11/08 11:37 AM
(Text-Only): Notice re: Non-Admitted Attorney We have received documents listing Ronald Kramer and Thomas Horan as counsel of record. If he or she wishes to be listed as an attorney of record in this case, he or she must be admitted to the bar of the U.S. District Court of Minnesota in accordance with [LINK:Local Rule 83.5 (a), (b) and (c)] or temporarily admitted pro hac vice in accordance with [LINK:Local Rule 83.5 (d) or (e)] . For more admissions information and forms, please see the Attorney Forms Section of the courts website at [LINK:www.mnd.uscourts.gov/forms/all-forms] [LINK:. (LTT)
Related: [-]
4 4 service Summons Issued Wed 11/08 11:34 AM
Summons Issued as to Kristi Berge, J&K Connect LLC, Keep Safe Investments, LLC. (LTT)
Related: [-]
3 3 notice Notice of Initial Case Assignment Wed 11/08 11:30 AM
(Text-Only) CLERK'S NOTICE OF INITIAL CASE ASSIGNMENT. Case assigned to Chief Judge Patrick J. Schiltz per 3rd/4th Master list, referred to Magistrate Judge Tony N. Leung. Please use case number 23-cv-3426 PJS/TNL. Notice: All Nongovernmental Corporate Parties must file a Rule 7.1 Corporate Disclosure Statement. (LTT)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, November 07, 2023
2 2 discov Rule 7.1 - Disclosure Statement Tue 11/07 4:29 PM
RULE 7.1 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. Parent corporation, publicly held corporation owning 10 percent or more of its stock, or subsidiary reported for United Airlines Pilot Retirement Account Plan, United Airlines Retirement Plans Administrative Committee, United Airlines, Inc.. (Cialkowski, Amanda)
Related: [-]
1 1 20 pgs cmp Complaint Tue 11/07 4:25 PM
COMPLAINT against Kristi Berge, J&K Connect LLC, Keep Safe Investments, LLC (filing fee $ 402, receipt number BMNDC-10646457) filed by United Airlines, Inc., United Airlines Pilot Retirement Account Plan, United Airlines Retirement Plans Administrative Committee. Filer requests summons issued. (Cialkowski, Amanda) Modified text on 11/7/2023 (ABR)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A,
Att: 2 Civil Cover Sheet