EBET, Inc. v. Aspire Global International Limited et al
Nevada District Court | |
Judge: | Gloria M Navarro |
Referred: | Daniel J Albregts |
Case #: | 2:23-cv-01830 |
Nature of Suit | 190 Contract - Other Contract |
Cause | 28:1441 Petition for Removal |
Case Filed: | Nov 07, 2023 |
Case in other court: | 8th Judicial District Court, A-23-878606-C |
Last checked: Saturday Dec 23, 2023 2:55 AM PST |
Defendant
AG Communications Limited
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Aspire Global 7 Limited
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Aspire Global International Limited
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Aspire Global PLC
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
EBET, Inc.
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 04/26/2024 11:59 PM PDT |
Thursday, April 11, 2024 | ||
59 | 59 MINUTE ORDER IN CHAMBERS of the Honorable Magistrate Judge Daniel J. Albregts on 4/11/2024. Re: 56 Motion to Seal. Having reviewed Plaintiff's motion to seal and the document Plaintiff seeks to seal, the Court finds that Plaintiff has demonstrated good cause to seal the confidential release agreement it attaches to its reply. Plaintiff explains that the release contains confidential business and financial information of the parties which cannot otherwise be redacted. See Kamakana v. City and County of Honolulu, 447 F.3d 1172 (9th Cir. 2006) and see Ctr. for Auto Safety v. Chrysler Group, LLC, 809 F.3d 1092 (9th Cir. 2016). Plaintiff explains that it refers to the release to show that the parties did not include an arbitration provision. And no party has responded to the motion to seal. See LR 7-2(d). The Court thus GRANTS the motion to seal (ECF No. 56 ). The document filed at ECF No. 58 shall remain under seal. The parties are informed that the Court's decision to seal this release agreement is confined to this instance. This is because Plaintiff states that its complaint references the release and that the release "discusses the very issues for which EBET now brings its claims..." (ECF No. 57 at 9). As a result, in another context, the release may be more than tangentially related to the merits of the action. In that event, a party seeking to seal the release would need to address the compelling reasons standard. However, in the instant context, used only to show the absence of an arbitration agreement, the Court finds that the good cause standard applies. (no image attached) (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - KL) | |
minord
Minute Order Order on Motion to Seal
Thu 04/11 2:08 PM
MINUTE ORDER IN CHAMBERS of the Honorable Magistrate Judge Daniel J. Albregts on 4/11/2024. Re: 56 Motion to Seal. Having reviewed Plaintiff's motion to seal and the document Plaintiff seeks to seal, the Court finds that Plaintiff has demonstrated good cause to seal the confidential release agreement it attaches to its reply. Plaintiff explains that the release contains confidential business and financial information of the parties which cannot otherwise be redacted. See Kamakana v. City and County of Honolulu, 447 F.3d 1172 (9th Cir. 2006) and see Ctr. for Auto Safety v. Chrysler Group, LLC, 809 F.3d 1092 (9th Cir. 2016). Plaintiff explains that it refers to the release to show that the parties did not include an arbitration provision. And no party has responded to the motion to seal. See LR 7-2(d). The Court thus GRANTS the motion to seal (ECF No. 56 ). The document filed at ECF No. 58 shall remain under seal. The parties are informed that the Court's decision to seal this release agreement is confined to this instance. This is because Plaintiff states that its complaint references the release and that the release "discusses the very issues for which EBET now brings its claims..." (ECF No. 57 at 9). As a result, in another context, the release may be more than tangentially related to the merits of the action. In that event, a party seeking to seal the release would need to address the compelling reasons standard. However, in the instant context, used only to show the absence of an arbitration agreement, the Court finds that the good cause standard applies. (no image attached) (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - KL) |