Vermont Bankruptcy Court
Chapter 7
Judge:Heather Z Cooper
Case #: 2:23-bk-10186
Case Filed:Nov 07, 2023

Debtor
Greater Falls Pharmacy, Inc.
PO Box 693
Bellows Falls, VT 05101-0693
Represented By
Todd Taylor
Law Offices Of Todd Taylor, P.C.
contact info
Last checked: never
Trustee
Raymond J Obuchowski, Chapter 7 Trustee
PO Box 60
Bethel, VT 05032
U.S. Trustee
U S Trustee
Office of the United States Trustee Leo O'Brien Federal Building 11A Clinton Ave., Room 620
Albany, NY 12207


Docket last updated: 11/08/2023 8:02 AM EST
Tuesday, November 07, 2023
crditcrd none Tue 11/07 2:07 PM
Receipt of Chapter 7 Voluntary Petition([LINK 23-10186 ) [misc,volp7] ( 338.00) Filing Fee Related [+]. Receipt number A2552112, Fee amount $ 338.00. (U.S. Treasury)
Related: [-] 1
misc Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice (Paperless) Tue 11/07 2:25 PM
Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice by Ryan M. Long Filed by Ryan M. Long of Primmer Piper Eggleston & Cramer PC on behalf of GMC Family Partnership, LLC. (Long, Ryan)
Related: [-]
1 1 misc Voluntary Petition (Chapter 7) Tue 11/07 2:03 PM
Chapter 7 Voluntary Petition Non-Individual. Fee Amount $338. Filed by Todd Taylor of Law Offices Of Todd Taylor, P.C. on behalf of Greater Falls Pharmacy, Inc.. Appointment of health care ombudsman due by 12/7/2023 (Taylor, Todd)
Related: [-]
2 2 trustee Appointment Rejection Tue 11/07 3:19 PM
Trustee's Rejection of Appointment. Filed by Raymond J Obuchowski, Chapter 7 Trustee. (Obuchowski, Chapter 7 Trustee, Raymond)
Related: [-]
3 3 order Show Cause Tue 11/07 5:01 PM
Order to Show Cause Why the Court Should Not Direct the Appointment of an Ombudsman in the Case, Pursuant to 11 U.S.C. Section 333. Hearing scheduled for 11/14/2023 at 11:00 AM at Location 2: U.S. Bankruptcy Court, Fed Bldg, Burlington. (kp)
Related: [-]