Pennsylvania Western District Court
Judge:Joy Flowers Conti
Case #: 2:23-cv-01907
Nature of Suit830 Property Rights - Patent
Cause15:1114 Trademark Infringement
Case Filed:Nov 03, 2023
Last checked: Friday May 03, 2024 6:37 AM EDT
Defendant
GUANGDONG BIXING TRADING CO., LTD.
Plaintiff
D SQUARED PLANT TRAPS LLC
Represented By
Rebeca Himena Miller
contact info

GPO Feb 09 2024
MEMORANDUM OPINION re 5 Ex Parte MOTION Alternative Service Plant Traps' Ex Parte Motion for Alternative Service on Naturanook filed by D SQUARED PLANT TRAPS LLC. Signed by Judge Joy Flowers Conti on 2/8/2024. (lyk)

Docket last updated: 3 hours ago
Tuesday, May 06, 2025
34 34 misc Affidavit Tue 05/06 7:47 PM
AFFIDAVIT re28 Brief in Support of Motion, Affidavit of Rebeca Himena Miller in Support of Memorandum of Law in Support of Motion for Entry of Default Judgment and Permanent Injunction by D SQUARED PLANT TRAPS LLC Affiant: Rebeca Himena Miller. (Miller, Rebeca)
Related: [-]
33 33 misc Affidavit Tue 05/06 7:44 PM
AFFIDAVIT re28 Brief in Support of Motion, Affidavit of Esther J. Choe in Support of Memorandum of Law in Support of Motion for Entry of Default Judgment and Permanent Injunction by D SQUARED PLANT TRAPS LLC Affiant: Esther J. Choe. (Miller, Rebeca)
Related: [-]
32 32 misc Affidavit Tue 05/06 7:42 PM
AFFIDAVIT re28 Brief in Support of Motion, Affidavit of Douglas H. Morseburg in Support of Memorandum of Law in Support of Motion for Entry of Default Judgment and Permanent Injunction by D SQUARED PLANT TRAPS LLC Affiant: Douglas H. Morseburg. (Miller, Rebeca)
Related: [-]
31 31 misc Affidavit Tue 05/06 7:39 PM
AFFIDAVIT re28 Brief in Support of Motion, Affidavit of Christopher S. Channel in Support of Memorandum of Law in Support of Motion for Entry of Default Judgment and Permanent Injunction by D SQUARED PLANT TRAPS LLC Affiant: Christopher S. Channel. (Miller, Rebeca)
Related: [-]
30 30 misc Affidavit Tue 05/06 7:36 PM
AFFIDAVIT re28 Brief in Support of Motion, Affidavit of Alan G. Towner in Support of Memorandum of Law in Support of Motion for Entry of Default Judgment and Permanent Injunction by D SQUARED PLANT TRAPS LLC Affiant: Alan G. Towner. (Miller, Rebeca)
Related: [-]
29 29 misc Affidavit Tue 05/06 7:33 PM
AFFIDAVIT re27 MOTION for Default Judgment against GUANGDONG BIXING TRADING CO., LTD. Plant Traps' Motion for Entry of Default Judgment and Permanent Injunction against Naturanook by D SQUARED PLANT TRAPS LLC Affiant: Rebeca Himena Miller. (Miller, Rebeca)
Related: [-]
28 28 respm Brief / Memorandum of Law in Support of Motion Tue 05/06 7:26 PM
BRIEF in Support re27 Motion for Default Judgment, Plant Traps' Memorandum of Law in Support of Motion for Entry of Default Judgment and Permanent Injunction against Naturanook filed by D SQUARED PLANT TRAPS LLC. (Miller, Rebeca)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit 1,
Att: 2 Exhibit 2
27 27 motion Default Judgment Tue 05/06 7:14 PM
MOTION for Default Judgment against GUANGDONG BIXING TRADING CO., LTD. Plant Traps' Motion for Entry of Default Judgment and Permanent Injunction against Naturanook by D SQUARED PLANT TRAPS LLC. (Miller, Rebeca)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit 1,
Att: 2 Proposed Order
Monday, August 19, 2024
26 26 order Clerk's Entry of Default Mon 08/19 9:47 AM
CLERK'S ENTRY OF DEFAULT as to GUANGDONG BIXING TRADING CO., LTD. (rtm)
Related: [-]
Friday, August 16, 2024
25 25 misc Request for Default Fri 08/16 3:56 PM
REQUEST by D SQUARED PLANT TRAPS LLC for entry of DEFAULT against GUANGDONG BIXING TRADING CO., LTD. . (Miller, Rebeca)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit 1,
Att: 2 Proposed Order,
Att: 3 Certificate of Service
Tuesday, May 28, 2024
24 24 misc Affidavit Tue 05/28 11:36 AM
AFFIDAVIT re23 Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief,,, Order on Motion to Extend Time,,4 Amended Complaint,, Affidavit of Rebeca Himena Miller in Support of Service of First Amended Complaint on Naturanook by D SQUARED PLANT TRAPS LLC Affiant: Rebeca Himena Miller. (Miller, Rebeca)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A,
Att: 2 Exhibit B,
Att: 3 Exhibit C
Wednesday, May 15, 2024
23 23 2 pgs order Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief Order on Motion to Extend Time Wed 05/15 4:38 PM
ORDER granting14 Renewed MOTION Renewed Motion for Alternative Service of the First Amended Complaint re10 Ex Parte MOTION Alternative Service of the First Amended Complaint; D Squared is authorized to serve the First Amended Complaint on Naturanook via electronic submission ("e-mail") at naturanook@outlook.com and authorized to send all future filings via e-mail at naturanook@outlook.com; denying as moot17 Ex Parte MOTION to Extend Time to Plant Traps for Extension of Time to Serve Naturanook with First Amended Complaint. Signed by Judge Joy Flowers Conti on 5/15/2024. (lyk)
Related: [-]
22 22 9 pgs order Memorandum Opinion Wed 05/15 4:36 PM
MEMORANDUM OPINION re14 Renewed MOTION Renewed Motion for Alternative Service of the First Amended Complaint re10 Ex Parte MOTION Alternative Service of the First Amended Complaint,17 Ex Parte MOTION to Extend Time to Plant Traps for Extension of Time to Serve Naturanook with First Amended Complaint filed by D SQUARED PLANT TRAPS LLC. An appropriate order will follow. Signed by Judge Joy Flowers Conti on 5/15/2024. (lyk)
Related: [-]
Friday, May 10, 2024
21 21 misc Declaration Fri 05/10 11:57 AM
DECLARATION re19 Supplement Declaration of Esther J. Choe in Support of Renewed Ex Parte Motion for Alternative Service on Naturanook by D SQUARED PLANT TRAPS LLC Affiant: Esther J. Choe. (Miller, Rebeca)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A,
Att: 2 Exhibit B,
Att: 3 Exhibit C,
Att: 4 Exhibit D,
Att: 5 Exhibit E,
Att: 6 Exhibit F,
Att: 7 Exhibit G,
Att: 8 Exhibit H,
Att: 9 Exhibit I,
Att: 10 Exhibit J
20 20 misc Affidavit Fri 05/10 11:49 AM
AFFIDAVIT re19 Supplement Affidavit of Deborah Holtschlag in Support of Renewed Ex Parte Motion for Alternative Service on Naturanook by D SQUARED PLANT TRAPS LLC Affiant: Deborah Holtschlag. (Miller, Rebeca)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit 1,
Att: 2 Exhibit 2,
Att: 3 Exhibit 3,
Att: 4 Exhibit 4,
Att: 5 Exhibit 5,
Att: 6 Exhibit 6,
Att: 7 Exhibit 7,
Att: 8 Exhibit 8,
Att: 9 Exhibit 9,
Att: 10 Exhibit 10
19 19 misc Supplement Fri 05/10 11:45 AM
SUPPLEMENT by D SQUARED PLANT TRAPS LLC to 18 Motion Hearing,,14 Motion for Miscellaneous Relief,. (Miller, Rebeca)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A,
Att: 2 Exhibit B
Tuesday, May 07, 2024
18 18 minutes Motion Hearing Tue 05/07 4:17 PM
Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Joy Flowers Conti: Motion Hearing held on 5/7/2024 re14 Renewed MOTION Renewed Motion for Alternative Service of the First Amended Complaint re10 Ex Parte MOTION Alternative Service of the First Amended Complaint (ECF 4) re4 Amended Complaint,, filed by D SQUARED PLANT TRAPS LLC Plant T filed by D SQUARED PLANT TRAPS LLC.Court heard argument on the pending motion for alternative service. Plaintiff to submit supplemental material. The motion remains under advisement. All as stated on the record. (Court Reporter: Karen Earley) Text-only entry; no PDF document will issue. This text-only entry constitutes a Minute of the Court or Notice on the matter. (drs)
Related: [-]
Thursday, May 02, 2024
order ~Util - Set Hearings Thu 05/02 2:33 PM
Motion Hearing set for 5/7/2024 11:00 AM in Video Conference before Judge Joy Flowers Conti. The court will send a zoom invite to counsel via email. Counsel shall be prepared to discuss Pinkfong v Avensy, 2023 WL 8531602, and Luxottica, 391 F. Supp.3d 816, regarding unknown addresses. Counsel shall also be prepared to discuss whether there is ongoing use of plaintiff's mark in defendant's metadata. Signed by Judge Joy Flowers Conti on 5/2/24. Text-only entry; no PDF document will issue. This text-only entry constitutes the Order of the Court or Notice on the matter. (mh)
Related: [-]
Friday, March 22, 2024
17 17 motion Extend Time Fri 03/22 4:33 PM
Ex Parte MOTION to Extend Time to Plant Traps for Extension of Time to Serve Naturanook with First Amended Complaint by D SQUARED PLANT TRAPS LLC. (Miller, Rebeca)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proposed Order
16 16 misc Declaration Fri 03/22 4:22 PM
DECLARATION re14 Renewed MOTION Renewed Motion for Alternative Service of the First Amended Complaint re10 Ex Parte MOTION Alternative Service of the First Amended Complaint (ECF 4) re4 Amended Complaint,, filed by D SQUARED PLANT TRAPS LLC Plant T Declaration of Deborah G. Holtschlag in Support of Renewed Motion for Alternative Service on Naturanook by D SQUARED PLANT TRAPS LLC Affiant: Deborah G. Holtschlag. (Miller, Rebeca)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A,
Att: 2 Exhibit B,
Att: 3 Exhibit C,
Att: 4 Exhibit D,
Att: 5 Exhibit E,
Att: 6 Exhibit F,
Att: 7 Exhibit G,
Att: 8 Exhibit H,
Att: 9 Exhibit I,
Att: 10 Exhibit J,
Att: 11 Exhibit K,
Att: 12 Exhibit L,
Att: 13 Exhibit M,
Att: 14 Exhibit N,
Att: 15 Exhibit O,
Att: 16 Exhibit P,
Att: 17 Exhibit Q,
Att: 18 Exhibit R,
Att: 19 Exhibit S,
Att: 20 Exhibit T,
Att: 21 Exhibit U,
Att: 22 Exhibit V,
Att: 23 Exhibit W,
Att: 24 Exhibit X,
Att: 25 Exhibit Y,
Att: 26 Exhibit Z,
Att: 27 Exhibit AA,
Att: 28 Exhibit BB,
Att: 29 Exhibit CC,
Att: 30 Exhibit DD,
Att: 31 Exhibit EE,
Att: 32 Exhibit FF,
Att: 33 Exhibit GG,
Att: 34 Exhibit HH
15 15 respm Brief / Memorandum of Law in Support of Motion Fri 03/22 4:13 PM
BRIEF in Support re14 Motion for Miscellaneous Relief, Memorandum of Law in Support of Renewed Ex Parte Motion for Alternative Service on Naturanook filed by D SQUARED PLANT TRAPS LLC. (Miller, Rebeca)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit 1,
Att: 2 Exhibit 2,
Att: 3 Exhibit 3
14 14 motion Miscellaneous Relief (Use ONLY if no other relief applies) Fri 03/22 4:09 PM
Renewed MOTION Renewed Motion for Alternative Service of the First Amended Complaint re10 Ex Parte MOTION Alternative Service of the First Amended Complaint (ECF 4) re4 Amended Complaint,, filed by D SQUARED PLANT TRAPS LLC Plant Traps' Ex Parte Motion for Alternative Service of First Amended Complaint Against Naturanook< filed by D SQUARED PLANT TRAPS LLC by D SQUARED PLANT TRAPS LLC. (Miller, Rebeca)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proposed Order
Friday, February 09, 2024
13 13 1 pgs order Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief Fri 02/09 10:57 AM
ORDER denying without prejudice10 MOTION Alternative Service of the First Amended Complaint (ECF 4) re 4 Amended Complaint,, filed by D SQUARED PLANT TRAPS LLC Plant Traps' Ex Parte Motion for Alternative Service of First Amended Complaint Against Naturanook. Signed by Judge Joy Flowers Conti on 2/9/2024. (lyk)
Related: [-]
12 12 1 pgs order Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief Fri 02/09 8:10 AM
ORDER denying without prejudice5 MOTION for Alternative Service. Signed by Judge Joy Flowers Conti on 2/8/2024. (lyk)
Related: [-]
11 11 8 pgs order Memorandum Opinion Fri 02/09 8:05 AM
MEMORANDUM OPINION re5 Ex Parte MOTION Alternative Service Plant Traps' Ex Parte Motion for Alternative Service on Naturanook filed by D SQUARED PLANT TRAPS LLC. Signed by Judge Joy Flowers Conti on 2/8/2024. (lyk)
Related: [-]
Thursday, January 18, 2024
10 10 motion Miscellaneous Relief (Use ONLY if no other relief applies) Thu 01/18 11:41 AM
Ex Parte MOTION Alternative Service of the First Amended Complaint (ECF 4) re4 Amended Complaint,, filed by D SQUARED PLANT TRAPS LLC Plant Traps' Ex Parte Motion for Alternative Service of First Amended Complaint Against Naturanook by D SQUARED PLANT TRAPS LLC. (Miller, Rebeca)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proposed Order
Thursday, January 11, 2024
9 9 misc Errata (to be used by filers) Thu 01/11 10:25 AM
Errata re6 Brief in Support of Motion,5 Motion for Miscellaneous Relief Exhibit A by D SQUARED PLANT TRAPS LLC. Reason for Correction: Exhibit A corresponds to Doc. No. 5 and 6. (Miller, Rebeca)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, January 10, 2024
8 8 misc Errata (to be used by filers) Wed 01/10 2:20 PM
Errata re7 Declaration, Declaration of Alan G. Towner in Support of Plant Traps' Ex Parte Motion for Alternative Service by D SQUARED PLANT TRAPS LLC. Reason for Correction: Attaching Exhibits to Declaration. (Miller, Rebeca)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit 1,
Att: 2 Exhibit 2,
Att: 3 Exhibit 3,
Att: 4 Exhibit 4
misc QC - Generic (only use if no other QC events apply) Wed 01/10 1:37 PM
CLERK'S OFFICE QUALITY CONTROL MESSAGE re7 Declaration. ERROR: Missing exhibits 1-3. CORRECTION: Counsel is directed to file an Errata with Exhibits as attachments. This message is for informational purposes only. (lyk)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, January 09, 2024
7 7 misc Declaration Tue 01/09 10:13 PM
DECLARATION re5 Ex Parte MOTION Alternative Service Plant Traps' Ex Parte Motion for Alternative Service on Naturanook Declaration of Alan G. Towner in Support of Plant Traps' Ex Parte Motion for Alternative Service by D SQUARED PLANT TRAPS LLC Affiant: Alan G. Towner. (Miller, Rebeca)
Related: [-]
6 6 respm Brief / Memorandum of Law in Support of Motion Tue 01/09 10:08 PM
BRIEF in Support re5 Motion for Miscellaneous Relief Plant Traps' Memorandum of Law in Support of Ex Parte Motion for Alternative Service on Naturanook filed by D SQUARED PLANT TRAPS LLC. (Miller, Rebeca)
Related: [-]
5 5 motion Miscellaneous Relief (Use ONLY if no other relief applies) Tue 01/09 10:01 PM
Ex Parte MOTION Alternative Service Plant Traps' Ex Parte Motion for Alternative Service on Naturanook by D SQUARED PLANT TRAPS LLC. (Miller, Rebeca)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proposed Order
4 4 cmp Amended Complaint Tue 01/09 9:43 PM
First AMENDED COMPLAINT D SQUARED PLANT TRAPS LLC against GUANGDONG BIXING TRADING CO., LTD., filed by D SQUARED PLANT TRAPS LLC. (Miller, Rebeca)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit 1,
Att: 2 Exhibit 2,
Att: 3 Exhibit 3,
Att: 4 Exhibit 4,
Att: 5 Exhibit 5,
Att: 6 Exhibit 6,
Att: 7 Exhibit 7,
Att: 8 Exhibit 8,
Att: 9 Exhibit 9,
Att: 10 Exhibit 10,
Att: 11 Exhibit 11,
Att: 12 Exhibit 12,
Att: 13 Exhibit 13,
Att: 14 Exhibit 14,
Att: 15 Exhibit 15,
Att: 16 Exhibit 16,
Att: 17 Exhibit 17,
Att: 18 Exhibit 18,
Att: 19 Exhibit 19,
Att: 20 Exhibit 20,
Att: 21 Exhibit 21,
Att: 22 Exhibit 22,
Att: 23 Exhibit 23
utility Update Answer Deadline Tue 01/16 10:48 AM
Update Answer Deadline: Answer due from GUANGDONG BIXING TRADING CO., LTD. on 1/23/2024 (rtm)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, November 07, 2023
3 3 misc Patent/Trademark Documents - Complaint Tue 11/07 10:29 AM
PATENT/TRADEMARK DOCUMENTS ISSUED. (rtm)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Complaint,
Att: 2 Docket Sheet
Friday, November 03, 2023
2 2 misc Disclosure Statement (LR 7.1.A and/or FRCvP 7.1(a)(2)) Tue 11/07 10:22 AM
Disclosure Statement identifying NONE as corporate parent or other affiliate by D SQUARED PLANT TRAPS LLC. (rtm)
Related: [-]
1 1 cmp Complaint (for Clerk of Court personnel only) Tue 11/07 10:18 AM
COMPLAINT against GUANGDONG BIXING TRADING CO., LTD. (Filing fee, including Administrative fee, $402, receipt number APAWDC-7966152), filed by D SQUARED PLANT TRAPS LLC. (rtm)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet,
Att: 2 Exhibit 1,
Att: 3 Exhibit 2,
Att: 4 Exhibit 3,
Att: 5 Exhibit 4,
Att: 6 Exhibit 5,
Att: 7 Exhibit 6,
Att: 8 Exhibit 7,
Att: 9 Exhibit 8