Alabama Middle Bankruptcy Court
Chapter 7
Judge:Christopher L Hawkins
Case #: 1:23-bk-11238
Case Filed:Nov 07, 2023
Creditor Meeting:Dec 21, 2023
Terminated:Nov 19, 2024

Debtor
BHB Groundwork's, LLC
10245 E Colonial Dr
Orlando, FL 32817-4331
Represented By
Rafael Gil, III
Ludlum & Gil, L.L.C.
contact info
Last checked: never
Bankruptcy Admin.
Bankruptcy Administrator
U. S. Bankruptcy Administrator One Church Street
Montgomery, AL 36104
Trustee
William C. Carn, III
William C. Carn, III Trustee P.O. Box 727
Scottsboro, AL 35768


Docket last updated: 11/08/2023 7:09 AM CST
Tuesday, November 07, 2023
1 1 misc Voluntary Petition (Chapter 7) Tue 11/07 12:40 PM
Chapter 7 Voluntary Petition for Non-Individuals . Fee Amount $338. filed by Rafael Gil III on behalf of BHB Groundwork's, LLC. (Gil, Rafael)
Related: [-]
2 2 crditcrd none Tue 11/07 12:41 PM
Receipt of filing fee for Voluntary Petition (Chapter 7)([LINK 23-11238 ) [misc,volp7a] ( 338.00). Receipt number A14844794, amount $ 338.00. Related [+] (U.S. Treasury)
Related: [-] Doc#1