California Southern Bankruptcy Court
Chapter 7
Judge:J Barrett Marum
Case #: 3:23-bk-03499
Case Filed:Nov 07, 2023
Creditor Meeting:Dec 13, 2023

Debtor
Krazy Kevin's, Inc.
1223 3rd Ave Ste D
Chula Vista, CA 91911-3236
Represented By
Thomas B. Gorrill
Thomas B. Gorrill
contact info
Last checked: never
Trustee
Leslie T. Gladstone
5656 La Jolla Blvd.,
La Jolla, CA 92037
United States Trustee
United States Trustee
Office of the U.S. Trustee 880 Front Street Suite 3230
San Diego, CA 92101


Docket last updated: 11/08/2023 5:03 AM PST
Tuesday, November 07, 2023
crditcrd Auto-docket of credit card Tue 11/07 11:23 AM
Receipt of Chapter 7 Voluntary Petition([LINK 23-03499 7] ) [misc,1027] ( 338.00) Filing Fee. Fee Amount 338.00 Receipt number A17871872 Related [+]; (U.S. Treasury)
Related: [-] Doc#1
1 1 misc Voluntary Petition (Chapter 7) (fee) external Tue 11/07 11:17 AM
Voluntary Petition for Non-Individuals Schedules & Statements Fee Amount $ 338.00. Declaration re: Electronic Filing due by 11/21/2023, Filed by Thomas B. Gorrill of Thomas B. Gorrill on behalf of Krazy Kevin's, Inc.. (Gorrill, Thomas)
Related: [-]
2 2 misc Rights and Responsibilities of Debtors and their Attorney Tue 11/07 11:18 AM
Rights and Responsibilities of Chapter 7 Debtors and their Attorney filed by Thomas B. Gorrill on behalf of Krazy Kevin's, Inc.. (Gorrill, Thomas)
Related: [-]
3 3 misc Declaration Re: Electronic Filing (CSD 1801) Tue 11/07 11:18 AM
Declaration Re: Electronic Filing filed by Thomas B. Gorrill on behalf of Krazy Kevin's, Inc.. Related [+] (Gorrill, Thomas)
Related: [-] 1 Chapter 7 Voluntary Petition
4 4 CASBApi CASB Meeting of Creditors Chapter 7 (BUS) Tue 11/07 11:20 AM
Notice of Chapter 7 Bankruptcy Case, Meeting of Creditors & Notice of Appointment of InterimTrustee Gladstone, Leslie T. 341(a) meeting to be held on 12/13/2023 at 08:30 AM at via Zoom - Gladstone Meeting ID 260 657 8691, and Passcode 7074482752, Phone (619) 367-1820. (Gorrill, Thomas)
Related: [-]