SteelFusion Clinical Toxicology Laboratory, LLC
Pennsylvania Western Bankruptcy Court | |
Chapter 7 | |
Judge: | Gregory L Taddonio |
Case #: | 2:23-bk-22405 |
Case Filed: | Nov 08, 2023 |
Terminated: | Oct 02, 2024 |
Type | Corporation |
Tax ID | subscribers only |
# of Creditors | 1-49 |
Est. Assets | $50,001 to $100,000 |
Est. Liabilities | $1,000,001 to $10 million |
Nature of Business | Other |
Nature of Debts | Primarily Business |
Small Business | Yes |
Debtor
SteelFusion Clinical Toxicology Laboratory, LLC
1103 Donner Ave
Monessen, PA 15062-1058 |
Represented By
|
Last checked: never |
U.S. Trustee
Office of the United States Trustee
Liberty Center. 1001 Liberty Avenue, Suite 970
Pittsburgh, PA 15222 |
Docket last updated: 11/07/2023 7:00 PM EST |
Wednesday, November 08, 2023 | ||
1 | 1
![]() Chapter 11 Voluntary Petition . Subchapter V Fee Amount $1738 Filed by SteelFusion Clinical Toxicology Laboratory, LLC Government Proof of Claim due by 05/05/2024. Declaration Re: Electronic Filing due 11/22/2023. Chapter 11 Plan due by 03/7/2024. Disclosure Statement due by 03/7/2024. Chapter 11 Small Business Plan due by 05/6/2024. Balance Sheet due by 11/15/2023. Cash Flow Statement due by 11/15/2023. Statement of Operations due by 11/15/2023. Tax Information due by 11/15/2023. Atty Disclosure Statement due 11/22/2023. Declaration of Schedules due 11/22/2023. Employee Income Record or a statement that there is no record due by 11/22/2023. Schedule A/B due 11/22/2023. Schedule E/F due 11/22/2023. Statement of Financial Affairs due 11/22/2023. Summary of schedules due 11/22/2023. Incomplete Filings due by 11/22/2023. (Calaiaro, Donald) |
|
2 | 2
![]() Notice Regarding Filing of Mailing Matrix Filed by Debtor SteelFusion Clinical Toxicology Laboratory, LLC (Calaiaro, Donald) |
|
3 | 3
![]() Statement of Corporate Ownership filed. ; Filed by Debtor SteelFusion Clinical Toxicology Laboratory, LLC (Calaiaro, Donald) |
|
4 | 4
crditcrd
none
Wed 11/08 12:03 PM
Receipt of Voluntary Petition Chapter 11([LINK 23-22405 ) [misc,volp11] (1738.00) filing fee. Receipt number A16519535, amount $1738.00. (U.S. Treasury) |
|
5 | 5
![]() Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice by Jodi Hause Filed by U.S. Trustee Office of the United States Trustee (Hause, Jodi) |