Adversary Proceeding
Lead BK case is: 1:23-bk-13522

Colorado Bankruptcy Court
Chapter 7
Judge:Michael E Romero
Case #: 1:23-ap-01248
Nature of Suit62 Bankruptcy - Dischargeability - §523(a)(2), false pretenses, false representation, actual fraud
Case Filed:Nov 08, 2023
Terminated:Jan 29, 2024
Last checked: never
Defendant
Morgan Renee Irreza, Defendant
11801 York St. Apt 612
Thornton, CO 80233
Represented By
Morgan Renee Irreza
contact info
Defendant
Obed Alonso Irreza, Defendant
11801 York St. Apt 612
Thornton, CO 80233
Represented By
Obed Alonso Irreza
contact info
Plaintiff
Elevations Credit Union
PO Box 9004
Boulder, CO 80301
Represented By
Iman Tehrani
Holst & Tehrani, LLP
contact info


Docket last updated: 05/09/2025 1:05 PM MDT
Monday, March 04, 2024
19 19 court Writ Mon 03/04 8:16 AM
Writ of Continuing Garnishment To Be Served Upon DaVita Inc. Issued On March 4, 2024 Related [+]. (rp)
Related: [-] 18 Request for Writ of Garnishment
Friday, March 01, 2024
18 18 misc Request for Writ of Garnishment Fri 03/01 3:13 PM
Request for Writ of Garnishment Filed by Iman Tehrani on behalf of Elevations Credit Union Related [+]. (Tehrani, Iman)
Related: [-] 11 Judgment for AP Case
17 17 court Writ Fri 03/01 2:58 PM
Writ of Continuing Garnishment To Be Served Upon B&B Trucking c/o Humberto Rodriguez. Issued On March 1, 2024 Related [+]. (rp)
Related: [-] 16 Request for Writ of Garnishment
16 16 misc Request for Writ of Garnishment Fri 03/01 2:07 PM
Request for Writ of Garnishment Filed by Iman Tehrani on behalf of Elevations Credit Union Related [+]. (Tehrani, Iman)
Related: [-] 11 Judgment for AP Case
Monday, January 29, 2024
court Close Adversary Case Mon 01/29 8:36 AM
Adversary Case Number 23-1248 MER Closed. (rp)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, January 17, 2024
15 15 crditcrd Auto-Docket of Credit Card Wed 01/17 9:38 AM
Receipt of Request for Certification of Document (fee)([LINK 23-01248 MER] ) [misc,certcopa] ( 12.00) Filing Fee. Receipt number A32508284. Fee amount 12.00 (U.S. Treasury)
Related: [-]
14 14 misc Request for Certification of Document (fee) Wed 01/17 9:37 AM
Certification Request for Entry of Judgment at Docket Number 11. Send Certified Document(s) to iman@shlaw.biz Filed by Iman Tehrani on behalf of Elevations Credit Union Related [+]. (Tehrani, Iman)
Related: [-] 11 Judgment for AP Case
Sunday, January 14, 2024
13 13 court BNC Certificate of Mailing Sun 01/14 10:13 PM
Courts Notice or Order and BNC Certificate of Mailing Related [+]. No. of Notices: 2. Notice Date 01/14/2024. (Admin.)
Related: [-] 11 Judgment for AP Case
12 12 court BNC Certificate of Mailing Sun 01/14 10:13 PM
Courts Notice or Order and BNC Certificate of Mailing Related [+]. No. of Notices: 2. Notice Date 01/14/2024. (Admin.)
Related: [-] 10 Order on Motion for Default Judgment
Friday, January 12, 2024
11 11 order Judgment for AP Case Fri 01/12 8:53 AM
Entry of Judgment Related [+]. (rp)
Related: [-] 10 Order on Motion for Default Judgment
10 10 order Default Judgment Fri 01/12 8:51 AM
Order Granting Motion for Default Judgment in favor of Plaintiff, Elevations Credit Union, and against, Morgan Renee Irreza and Obed Alonso Irreza Related [+]. (rp)
Related: [-] 8 Motion for Default Judgment
utility Disposition of Adversary Fri 01/12 8:54 AM
Disposition of Adversary Proceeding Number 23-1248 MER. Final Order or Judgment Has Entered. Tickle Due Date 1/29/2024. (rp)
Related: [-]
Thursday, December 14, 2023
9 9 court BNC Certificate of Mailing Thu 12/14 10:16 PM
Courts Notice or Order and BNC Certificate of Mailing Related [+]. No. of Notices: 2. Notice Date 12/14/2023. (Admin.)
Related: [-] 7 Clerks Entry of Default
Wednesday, December 13, 2023
8 8 motion Default Judgment Wed 12/13 12:32 PM
Motion for Default Judgment Against Morgan Renee Irreza and Obed Alonso Irreza Filed by Iman Tehrani on behalf of Elevations Credit Union. (Tehrani, Iman)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proposed Order Granting Motion for Default Judgment
Att: 2 Proposed Entry of Judgment
Att: 3 Affidavit of Attorney in Support of the Motion
Att: 4 Affidavit of Plaintiff in Support of Motion
Tuesday, December 12, 2023
7 7 order Virtual Clerks Entry of Default Tue 12/12 2:17 PM
Clerk's Entry of Default As To Morgan Renee Irreza and Obed Alonso Irreza Related [+]. (rp)
Related: [-] 6 Motion for Clerk's Entry of Default
Monday, December 11, 2023
6 6 motion Clerk's Entry of Default Mon 12/11 8:14 AM
Motion For Clerk's Entry of Default Filed by Iman Tehrani on behalf of Elevations Credit Union Related [+]. (Tehrani, Iman)
Related: [-] 1 Complaint,5 Complaint
Wednesday, November 08, 2023
5 5 cmp Complaint Wed 11/08 1:37 PM
Complaint by Elevations Credit Union filed by Iman Tehrani on behalf of Elevations Credit Union Adversary Status Deadline 02/6/2024 (Tehrani, Iman) Modified text on 11/9/2023 (rp)
Related: [-]
4 4 misc Certificate of Service Wed 11/08 1:32 PM
Certificate of Service Filed by Iman Tehrani on behalf of Elevations Credit Union Related [+]. (Tehrani, Iman)
Related: [-] 1 Complaint
3 3 court Summons Issued (auto) Wed 11/08 12:56 PM
Summons Issued on Morgan Renee Irreza Answer Due 12/8/2023; Obed Alonso Irreza Answer Due 12/8/2023. Government Agencies Are Allowed 35 Days From Service Of The Summons To Answer This Complaint.[LINK:Notice To Litigants] required to be served with Summons per General Procedure Order. (Tehrani, Iman)
Related: [-]
2 2 crditcrd Auto-Docket of Credit Card Wed 11/08 12:53 PM
Receipt of Complaint([LINK 23-01248 MER] ) [cmp,cmpt] ( 350.00) Filing Fee. Receipt number A32377989. Fee amount 350.00 (U.S. Treasury)
Related: [-]
1 1 cmp Complaint Wed 11/08 12:52 PM
Adversary case 23-01248 Complaint by Elevations Credit Union against Morgan Renee Irreza, Obed Alonso Irreza. Fee Paid. Adversary Status Deadline 02/6/2024 (62 (Dischargeability - 523(a)(2), false pretenses, false representation, actual fraud)) (Tehrani, Iman)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Ex. A
Att: 2 Ex. B
Att: 3 Ex. C
Att: 4 Ex. D
Att: 5 Ex. E