Doe v. Boles
Massachusetts District Court | |
Judge: | Nathaniel M Gorton |
Case #: | 1:23-cv-12700 |
Nature of Suit | 360 Torts - Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury |
Cause | Civil Miscellaneous Case |
Case Filed: | Nov 08, 2023 |
Last checked: Saturday Dec 23, 2023 5:16 AM EST |
Defendant
Mark Boles
69 Water Street
Hingham, MA 02043 |
|
Plaintiff
Megan Doe
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 04/28/2024 11:59 PM EDT |
Thursday, April 25, 2024 | ||
19 | 19
notice
Notice - Other
Thu 04/25 1:23 PM
NOTICE by Megan Doe (Harriman, Michael) |
|
Friday, December 15, 2023 | ||
18 | 18
1
pgs
order
Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief
Mon 12/18 11:01 AM
Judge Nathaniel M. Gorton: ENDORSED ORDER entered re4 MOTION to Proceed Under a Pseudonym Motion allowed during pre-trial discovery but if this case proceeds to trial, the issue will be re-visited. (Currie, Haley) |
|
17 | 17
2
pgs
misc
Mail Returned
Fri 12/15 3:56 PM
Mail Returned as Undeliverable. Mail sent to Michael Harriman and Wesley Stoker (Currie, Haley) |
|
Thursday, December 07, 2023 | ||
16 | 16
1
pgs
order
Preliminary Injunction
Thu 12/07 12:00 PM
Judge Nathaniel M. Gorton: ORDER entered. PRELIMINARY INJUNCTION(Dore, Samantha) |
|
15 | 15
2
pgs
order
Order on Motion for Preliminary Injunction
Thu 12/07 12:00 PM
Judge Nathaniel M. Gorton: ORDER entered. ORDER ON PLAINTIFF'S MOTION FOR PRELIMINARY INJUNCTION. "Plaintiff's motion for Preliminary injunction (Docket No.14 ) is ALLOWED and a Preliminary I junction in the form attached as Exhibit A shall be entered." (Dore, Samantha) |
|
Monday, December 04, 2023 | ||
14 | 14
4
pgs
motion
Preliminary Injunction
Mon 12/04 2:42 PM
Assented to MOTION for Preliminary Injunction by Megan Doe.(Stoker, Wesley) |
|
Monday, November 27, 2023 | ||
13 | 13
1
pgs
order
Order
Mon 11/27 3:56 PM
Judge Nathaniel M. Gorton: ORDER entered. re2 MOTION for Attachment and Further Preliminary Relief filed by Megan Doe (Lima, Christine) |
|
12 | 12
misc
Copy Mailed
Mon 11/27 3:42 PM
Original Writ of Attachment attached as Exhibit A to11 Memorandum & ORDER, mailed to Plaintiff's counsel on 11/27/23. (Lima, Christine) |
|
11 | 11
2
pgs
order
Memorandum & Order
Mon 11/27 3:39 PM
Judge Nathaniel M. Gorton: ORDER entered. MEMORANDUM AND ORDER. "Plaintiff's motion for attachment (Docket No. 2) is, therefore, allowed. The resulting writ of attachment is attached as Exhibit A hereto."(Lima, Christine) |
|
Att: 1 1 pgs Writ of Attachment | ||
10 | 10
minutes
Motion Hearing
Mon 11/27 3:37 PM
Electronic Clerk's Notes for proceedings held before Judge Nathaniel M. Gorton: Motion Hearing held on 11/27/2023 re2 MOTION for Attachment and Further Preliminary Relief filed by Megan Doe. Plaintiff's counsel states that a settlement agreement has been breached. Court has drafted a Memorandum and Order as well as a writ of attachment. Parties approve the writ. Counsel have submitted a proposed order on their Motion for Attachment that the Court will amend to go along with its Memorandum and Order. (Court Reporter: Kristin Kelley at kmob929@gmail.com.)(Attorneys present: Harriman, Stoker) (Lima, Christine) |
|
Sunday, November 26, 2023 | ||
9 | 9
2
pgs
service
Summons Returned Executed
Sun 11/26 2:37 PM
SUMMONS Returned Executed Mark Boles served on 11/21/2023, answer due 12/12/2023. (Harper, Michelle) |
|
Wednesday, November 22, 2023 | ||
8 | 8
notice
Notice Setting or Resetting Hearing on Motion
Wed 11/22 8:12 AM
ELECTRONIC NOTICE Setting Hearing on Motion2 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction : Motion Hearing set for 11/27/2023 02:30 PM in Courtroom 4 (In person only) before Judge Nathaniel M. Gorton. (Lima, Christine) |
|
Thursday, November 16, 2023 | ||
7 | 7
2
pgs
notice
Notice of Appearance
Thu 11/16 5:07 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by Wesley B. Stoker on behalf of Megan Doe (Stoker, Wesley) |
|
Thursday, November 09, 2023 | ||
6 | 6
2
pgs
service
Summons Issued
Thu 11/09 10:32 AM
Summons Issued as to Mark Boles. Counsel receiving this notice electronically should download this summons, complete one for each defendant and serve it in accordance with Fed.R.Civ.P. 4 and LR 4.1. Summons will be mailed to plaintiff(s) not receiving notice electronically for completion of service. (Pacho, Arnold) |
|
5 | 5
notice
Notice of Case Assignment
Thu 11/09 10:31 AM
ELECTRONIC NOTICE of Case Assignment. Judge Nathaniel M. Gorton assigned to case. If the trial Judge issues an Order of Reference of any matter in this case to a Magistrate Judge, the matter will be transmitted to Magistrate Judge M. Page Kelley. (Phillips, Sophie) |
|
Wednesday, November 08, 2023 | ||
4 | 4
2
pgs
motion
Miscellaneous Relief
Wed 11/08 5:50 PM
MOTION to Proceed Under a Pseudonym by Megan Doe.(Harriman, Michael) |
|
3 | 3
6
pgs
respm
Memorandum in Support of Motion
Wed 11/08 5:44 PM
MEMORANDUM in Support re2 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction filed by Megan Doe. (Harriman, Michael) |
|
2 | 2
3
pgs
motion
Preliminary Injunction
Wed 11/08 5:34 PM
MOTION for Preliminary Injunction by Megan Doe.(Harriman, Michael) |
|
Att: 1 4 pgs Affidavit of Counsel, | ||
Att: 2 1 pgs Text of Proposed Order | ||
1 | 1
11
pgs
cmp
Complaint
Wed 11/08 5:15 PM
COMPLAINT against Megan Doe Filing fee: $ 402, receipt number AMADC-10125890 (Fee Status: Filing Fee paid), filed by Megan Doe.(Harriman, Michael) |
|
Att: 1 8 pgs Exhibit Exhibit 1- Settlement Agreement, | ||
Att: 2 1 pgs Category Form, | ||
Att: 3 1 pgs Civil Cover Sheet |