Tennessee Eastern District Court
Judge:Travis R Mcdonough
Referred: Jill E Mccook
Case #: 3:23-cv-00402
Nature of Suit440 Civil Rights - Other Civil Rights
Cause42:1983 Civil Rights Act
Case Filed:Nov 08, 2023
Terminated:Apr 15, 2024
Last checked: Tuesday May 07, 2024 5:45 AM EDT
Defendant
Biddle Farms Residential LLC
Represented By
Garrett P Swartwood
Long, Ragsdale & Waters, PC
contact info
Defendant
Farragut Business Alliance Inc
Represented By
Fred C Statum, III
Manier & Herod
contact info
Jeffrey S Price
Manier & Herod
contact info
Defendant
Joe Fielden
Represented By
J Ford Little
Woolf, Mcclane, Bright, Allen & Carpenter, PLLC
contact info
Samuel Cole Wheeler
Woolf Mcclane Bright Allen & Carpenter, PLLC
contact info
Defendant
JA Fielden Inc
Represented By
J Ford Little
Woolf, Mcclane, Bright, Allen & Carpenter, PLLC
contact info
Samuel Cole Wheeler
Woolf Mcclane Bright Allen & Carpenter, PLLC
contact info
Defendant
Republic Newspapers Inc.
Represented By
Richard Hollow
Hollow & Hollow, LLC
contact info
Defendant
Kirk Swor
Represented By
Ellis Sharp
Stokes, Williams, Sharp & Davies
contact info
Annie Scott Duncan
Stokes, Williams, Sharp, Cope & Mann PC
contact info
Defendant
Town of Farragut
P O Box 22190
Farragut, TN 37933
Represented By
Benjamin K Lauderback
Watson Roach Batson & Lauderback PLC
contact info
Thomas M Hale
Kramer, Rayson Llp (knox)
contact info
Brian Robert Bibb
Watson, Roach, Batson, Rowell & Lauderback PLC
contact info
Defendant
Mayor Ron Williams
Represented By
Benjamin K Lauderback
Watson Roach Batson & Lauderback PLC
contact info
Thomas M Hale
Kramer, Rayson Llp (knox)
contact info
Defendant
Vice-Mayor Louise Povlin
Represented By
Benjamin K Lauderback
Watson Roach Batson & Lauderback PLC
contact info
Thomas M Hale
Kramer, Rayson Llp (knox)
contact info
Plaintiff
Sean Murphy
Represented By
Russell L Egli
Law Office Of Russell L. Egli
contact info
Plaintiff
Denise Pagels
Represented By
Russell L Egli
Law Office Of Russell L. Egli
contact info
TERMINATED PARTIES
Defendant
Knox County, Tennessee, Inc.
Terminated: 03/18/2024

GPO Dec 17 2024
REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION re 83 MOTION for Attorney Fees, 84 MOTION to Take Deposition from Atty Little, Ewell, Wheeler and Bustamante, 94 MOTION to Strike, 102 First MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to 94 MOTION to Strike, 110 Second MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to 94 MOTION to Strike, 121 MOTION for Leave to File SurReply. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jill E McCook on 12/17/2024. (DCB)
GPO Jan 10 2025
ORDER accepting and adopting Report and Recommendations re 136 Report and Recommendations; denying 83 Motion for Attorney Fees; denying as moot 84 Motion to Take Deposition; denying as moot 94 Motion to Strike; denying as moot 102 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply; denying as moot 110 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply; denying as moot 121 Motion for Leave to File Document. Signed by District Judge Travis R McDonough on 1/10/2025. (DCB)

Docket last updated: 5 hours ago
Wednesday, January 29, 2025
141 141 1 pgs order Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief Wed 01/29 4:07 PM
ORDER denying as moot 132 Motion Correct Trial Court Record. Signed by District Judge Travis R McDonough on 1/29/2025. (DCB)
Related: [-]