California Central District Court
Judge:Andre Birotte Jr
Referred: Douglas F Mccormick
Case #: 8:23-cv-02101
Nature of Suit830 Property Rights - Patent
Cause35:271 Patent Infringement
Case Filed:Nov 08, 2023
Terminated:Apr 08, 2024
Last checked: Tuesday May 07, 2024 1:36 AM PDT
Counter Claimant
Spigen Inc
Represented By
Lance E. Wyatt
Fish And Richardson PC
contact info
Rodeen Talebi
Fish And Richardson PC
contact info
Neil J. McNabnay
Fish And Richardson PC
contact info
Alexander H. Martin
Fish And Richardson P.C.
contact info
Counter Defendant
Voltstar Technologies, Inc.
Represented By
Matthew Laurence Rollin
Sriplaw PA
contact info
Defendant
Spigen Inc
Represented By
Lance E. Wyatt
Fish And Richardson PC
contact info
Rodeen Talebi
Fish And Richardson PC
contact info
Neil J. McNabnay
Fish And Richardson PC
contact info
Alexander H. Martin
Fish And Richardson P.C.
contact info
Plaintiff
Voltstar Technologies, Inc.
4651 North Federal Highway
Boca Raton, FL 33431
Represented By
Matthew Laurence Rollin
Sriplaw PA
contact info


Docket last updated: 05/21/2025 11:59 PM PDT
Wednesday, May 15, 2024
30 30 stip Dismiss Case Wed 05/15 5:56 PM
STIPULATION to Dismiss Case pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 41(a)(1)(A)(ii) filed by Plaintiff Voltstar Technologies, Inc..(Rollin, Matthew)
Related: [-]
Thursday, May 09, 2024
29 29 1 pgs order Order Thu 05/09 5:15 PM
ORDER GRANTING JOINT STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME TO RE-OPEN THE ACTION28 by Judge Andre Birotte Jr. The Court, having reviewed the parties' Joint Stipulation to Extend Time for Dismissal or to Re-Open the Action, and for good cause appearing therefor, hereby GRANTS the Joint Stipulation. The deadline to re-open the action if the settlement is not consummated is extended to June 7, 2024. This Court retains full jurisdiction over this action and this Order shall not prejudice any party. (rolm)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, May 07, 2024
28 28 stip Extension of Time to File Document Tue 05/07 1:53 PM
Joint STIPULATION for Extension of Time to File Dismissal or to Re-Open the Action filed by Defendant Spigen Inc.(Talebi, Rodeen)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proposed Order
Tuesday, April 09, 2024
27 27 misc Report of Determination of Patent/Trademark Action (CLOSE) (AO 120) Tue 04/09 4:24 PM
REPORT ON THE DETERMINATION OF AN ACTION Regarding a Patent or Trademark. (Closing) (gk)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Order Dismissing Civil Action
Monday, April 08, 2024
26 26 order Dismissing Case Tue 04/09 4:21 PM
ORDER DISMISSING CIVIL ACTION by Judge Andre Birotte Jr.: The Court has been advised that this action has been settled25 . The Court therefore ORDERS that this action is hereby DISMISSED without costs and without prejudice to the right, upon good cause shown within 30 days, to reopen the action if settlement is not consummated. This Court retains full jurisdiction over this action and this Order shall not prejudice any party to this action. ( Case Terminated. Made JS-6. ) (gk)
Related: [-]
Friday, April 05, 2024
25 25 notice Settlement Fri 04/05 11:56 AM
NOTICE of Settlement (Joint) filed by Plaintiff Voltstar Technologies, Inc.. (Rollin, Matthew)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, February 06, 2024
24 24 answer Answer to Counterclaim Tue 02/06 12:06 PM
ANSWER to Answer to Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening), Counterclaim21 with JURY DEMAND filed by Plaintiff Voltstar Technologies, Inc..(Rollin, Matthew)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, January 30, 2024
23 23 order Initial Order Setting R26 Scheduling Conference - form only Tue 01/30 9:07 AM
ORDER SETTING SCHEDULING CONFERENCE by Judge Andre Birotte Jr. Scheduling Conference set for 4/19/2024 at 10:00 AM before Judge Andre Birotte Jr. (cb)
Related: [-]
Monday, January 29, 2024
22 22 notice Certificate/Notice of Interested Parties Mon 01/29 1:29 PM
CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties filed by Defendant Spigen Inc, identifying Spigen Korea Co., Ltd.. (Talebi, Rodeen)
Related: [-]
21 21 answer Answer to Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) Counterclaim Mon 01/29 1:26 PM
ANSWER to Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening),1 with JURY DEMAND Affirmative Defenses and , COUNTERCLAIM against Voltstar Technologies, Inc. filed by Defendant Spigen Inc.(Talebi, Rodeen)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, January 23, 2024
20 20 order Appear Pro Hac Vice Wed 01/24 3:11 PM
ORDER ON APPLICATION OF NON-RESIDENT ATTORNEY TO APPEAR IN A SPECIFIC CASE PRO HAC VICE17 by Judge Andre Birotte Jr. APPLICATION to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Defendant Spigen Inc, designating Rodeen Talebi as local counsel. Granting17 Non-Resident Attorney Alexander H. Martin (rolm)
Related: [-]
19 19 order Appear Pro Hac Vice Wed 01/24 3:08 PM
ORDER ON APPLICATION OF NON-RESIDENT ATTORNEY TO APPEAR IN A SPECIFIC CASE PRO HAC VICE15 by Judge Andre Birotte Jr. APPLICATION to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Defendant Spigen Inc, designating Rodeen Talebi as local counsel. Granting15 Non-Resident Attorney Neil J. McNabnay (rolm)
Related: [-]
18 18 order Appear Pro Hac Vice Wed 01/24 3:05 PM
ORDER ON APPLICATION OF NON-RESIDENT ATTORNEY TO APPEAR IN A SPECIFIC CASE PRO HAC VICE16 by Judge Andre Birotte Jr. APPLICATION to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Defendant Spigen Inc, designating Rodeen Talebi as local counsel. Granting16 Non-Resident Attorney Lance E. Wyatt (rolm)
Related: [-]
17 17 motion Appear Pro Hac Vice (G-64) Tue 01/23 12:50 PM
APPLICATION of Non-Resident Attorney Alexander H. Martin to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Defendant Spigen Inc (Pro Hac Vice Fee - $500 Fee Paid, Receipt No. ACACDC-36776214) filed by Defendant Spigen Inc. (Talebi, Rodeen)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proposed Order
16 16 motion Appear Pro Hac Vice (G-64) Tue 01/23 12:42 PM
APPLICATION of Non-Resident Attorney Lance E. Wyatt to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Defendant Spigen Inc (Pro Hac Vice Fee - $500 Fee Paid, Receipt No. ACACDC-36776113) filed by Defendant Spigen Inc. (Talebi, Rodeen)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proposed Order
15 15 motion Appear Pro Hac Vice (G-64) Tue 01/23 12:34 PM
APPLICATION of Non-Resident Attorney Neil J. McNabnay to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Defendant Spigen Inc (Pro Hac Vice Fee - $500 Fee Paid, Receipt No. ACACDC-36776029) filed by Defendant Spigen Inc. (Talebi, Rodeen)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proposed Order
Tuesday, December 26, 2023
14 14 stip Extending Time to Answer (30 days or less) Tue 12/26 11:16 AM
STIPULATION Extending Time to Answer the complaint as to Spigen Inc answer now due 1/29/2024, re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening),1 filed by Defendant Spigen Inc.(Attorney Rodeen Talebi added to party Spigen Inc(pty:dft))(Talebi, Rodeen)
Related: [-]
Monday, December 11, 2023
13 13 service Service of Summons and Complaint Returned Executed (21 days) Mon 12/11 2:41 PM
PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff Voltstar Technologies, Inc., upon Defendant Spigen Inc served on 12/7/2023, answer due 12/28/2023. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon Miho Shibata, People Operations Specialist, Person in Charge, Authorized to Accept Service in compliance with California Code of Civil Procedure by substituted service at business address and by also mailing a copy (Rollin, Matthew)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, November 22, 2023
12 12 service Service of Summons and Complaint Returned Executed (21 days) Wed 11/22 10:09 AM
PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff Voltstar Technologies, Inc., upon Defendant Spigen Inc served on 11/14/2023, answer due 12/5/2023. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon Miho Shabata, People Operations Specialist, Authorized to Accept Service in compliance with Federal Rules of Civil Procedure by personal service (Rollin, Matthew)
Related: [-]
Monday, November 13, 2023
11 11 order Initial Order upon Filing of Complaint - form only Mon 11/13 10:13 AM
STANDING ORDER upon filing of the complaint by Judge Andre Birotte Jr. (cb)
Related: [-]
Thursday, November 09, 2023
10 10 order Transfer Pursuant to Patent Program (CV-128) Thu 11/09 2:28 PM
NOTICE AND ORDER REGARDING TRANSFER AND/OR REASSIGNMENT OF PATENT CASE by Judge Fred W. Slaughter. Case transferred from Judge Fred W. Slaughter to Judge Andre Birotte Jr for all further proceedings. Case number now reads 8:23-cv-02101-AB-DFM. (dta)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, November 08, 2023
9 9 service Summons Issued (Attorney Civil Case Opening) Wed 11/08 8:07 PM
21 DAY Summons Issued re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening),1 as to Defendant Spigen Inc. (jtil)
Related: [-]
8 8 notice Notice to Counsel Re: Consent to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge - optional html form Wed 11/08 8:04 PM
Notice to Counsel Re Consent to Proceed Before a United States Magistrate Judge. (jtil)
Related: [-]
7 7 adr Notice to Parties of Court-Directed ADR Program (ADR-8) - optional html form Wed 11/08 8:04 PM
NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (jtil)
Related: [-]
6 6 notice Notice of Assignment to United States Judges (CV-18) - optional html form Wed 11/08 8:03 PM
NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge Fred W. Slaughter and Magistrate Judge Douglas F. McCormick. (jtil)
Related: [-]
5 5 notice Summons Request Wed 11/08 2:41 PM
Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening),1 filed by Plaintiff Voltstar Technologies, Inc.. (Rollin, Matthew)
Related: [-]
4 4 misc Report on Filing of Patent/Trademark Action (Initial Notification) (AO 120) Wed 11/08 2:38 PM
REPORT ON THE FILING OF AN ACTION Regarding a Patent or a Trademark (Initial Notification) filed by Voltstar Technologies, Inc.. (Rollin, Matthew)
Related: [-]
3 3 notice Certificate/Notice of Interested Parties Wed 11/08 2:38 PM
NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Plaintiff Voltstar Technologies, Inc., identifying Horizon Adventures, Inc.. (Rollin, Matthew)
Related: [-]
2 2 misc Civil Cover Sheet (CV-71) Wed 11/08 2:35 PM
CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Plaintiff Voltstar Technologies, Inc.. (Rollin, Matthew)
Related: [-]
1 1 11 pgs cmp Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) Wed 11/08 2:32 PM
COMPLAINT Receipt No: ACACDC-36374907 - Fee: $402, filed by Plaintiff Voltstar Technologies, Inc.. (Attorney Matthew Laurence Rollin added to party Voltstar Technologies, Inc.(pty:pla))(Rollin, Matthew)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit 1 - Registration,
Att: 2 Exhibit 2 - Claim Chart (91),
Att: 3 Exhibit 3 - Claim Chart (93),
Att: 4 Exhibit 4 - Claim Chart (94)