Louisiana Middle District Court
Judge:Brian A Jackson
Referred: Erin Wilder-Doomes
Case #: 3:23-cv-01576
Nature of Suit360 Torts - Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury
Cause28:1332 Diversity-Personal Injury
Case Filed:Nov 08, 2023
Case in other court:19th Judicial District, Parish of East Baton Rouge, 733760
Last checked: Tuesday May 07, 2024 3:34 AM CDT
Defendant
Winn-Dixie Montgomery, LLC
Represented By
Elizabeth Ferrier
Erlingson Banks
contact info
Judson G. Banks
Erlingson Banks PLLC
contact info
Mary G. Erlingson
Erlingson Banks, PLLC
contact info
Plaintiff
Kevin Jenkins
Represented By
Daniel J. McGlynn
Mcglynn, Glisson And Mouton
contact info
Christopher D. Glisson
Mcglynn, Glisson And Mouton
contact info
TERMINATED PARTIES
Defendant
Jerry Schexnayder
Terminated: 03/21/2024


Docket last updated: 05/04/2025 11:59 PM CDT
Tuesday, January 21, 2025
18 18 2 pgs order Order on Motion to Continue Tue 01/21 4:08 PM
ORDER : The17 Motion to Continue Trial Date and Scheduling Order Deadlines is GRANTED. Jury Trial set for 1/5/2026 Through 1/9/2026 at 08:30 AM in Courtroom 2 before Judge Brian A. Jackson. Motions shall be filed by 6/18/2025. Motions In Limine shall be filed by 11/8/2025. Proposed Pretrial Order due by 10/10/2025. Joint jury instructions, voir dire, verdict forms, and trial briefs due by 12/22/2025. Affidavit of Settlement Efforts due by 11/22/2025. Signed by Magistrate Judge Erin Wilder-Doomes on 1/21/2025. (ELW)
Related: [-]
utility Motion(s) Referred Tue 01/21 11:00 AM
MOTION(S) REFERRED:17 Joint MOTION to Continue Trial Date and Scheduling Order Deadlines . This motion is now pending before the USMJ. (ELW)
Related: [-]
Friday, January 17, 2025
17 17 motion Continue Fri 01/17 1:49 PM
Joint MOTION to Continue Trial Date and Scheduling Order Deadlines by Winn-Dixie Montgomery, LLC (Banks, Judson)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, January 15, 2025
16 16 order Order on Motion to Continue Wed 01/15 9:48 AM
ORDER: The15 Joint Motion to Continue Deadlines is DENIED. While good cause may exist for the relief requested, the proposed deadline of April 1, 2025 to file dispositive/Daubert motions does not comply with the Courts scheduled requirements for a June 26, 2025 pretrial conference. The denial is without prejudice to returning a motion that either: 1) seeks to continue the August 25, 2025 trial; or 2) does not seek to continue the current dispositive/DaUbert motion deadline of February 18, 2025. Signed by Magistrate Judge Erin Wilder-Doomes on 1/15/2025. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no hyperlink or PDF document associated with this entry.) (BLR)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, January 14, 2025
15 15 motion Continue Tue 01/14 3:33 PM
Joint MOTION to Continue Deadlines by Winn-Dixie Montgomery, LLC (Banks, Judson)
Related: [-]
Thursday, October 24, 2024
14 14 notice Notice to Counsel Thu 10/24 10:25 AM
Notice to Counsel: Due to an unforeseen conflict with the court, the Settlement Conference set for 12/10/2024 is CANCELED. The parties shall contact chambers to reschedule. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no hyperlink or PDF document associated with this entry.) (BLR)
Related: [-]
Friday, July 26, 2024
12 12 motion Withdraw as Attorney Fri 07/26 11:01 AM
MOTION for Elizabeth H. Ferrier to Withdraw as Attorney by Winn-Dixie Montgomery, LLC(Banks, Judson)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proposed Pleading; Order
utility Motion(s) Referred Fri 07/26 1:19 PM
MOTION(S) REFERRED:12 MOTION for Elizabeth H. Ferrier to Withdraw as Attorney. This motion is now pending before the USMJ. (CIS)
Related: [-]
order Order on Motion to Withdraw as Attorney Fri 07/26 3:55 PM
ORDER granting12 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Attorney Elizabeth Ferrier terminated. Signed by Magistrate Judge Erin Wilder-Doomes on 7/26/2024. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no hyperlink or PDF document associated with this entry.) (BLR)
Related: [-]
Thursday, March 21, 2024
11 11 1 pgs order Order on Motion to Dismiss Thu 03/21 8:26 AM
PARTIAL JUDGMENT re5 STIPULATION of Dismissal. Plaintiff's claims against Defendant Jerry Schexnayder be and is hereby dismissed with prejudice. Defendant Jerry Schexnayder is terminated as a party in this action. Signed by Judge Brian A. Jackson on 3/20/2024. (JEG)
Related: [-]
Thursday, January 25, 2024
10 10 order Scheduling Order Thu 01/25 1:52 PM
SCHEDULING ORDER: In accordance with FRCP 16(b), the following discovery deadlines are established. Amended Pleadings due by 4/16/2024. Discovery due by 11/4/2024. Plaintiff`s Expert Witness List due by 6/28/2024. Defendant`s Expert Witness List due by 8/9/2024. Plaintiff`s Expert Reports due by 7/30/2024. Defendant`s Expert Reports due by 9/9/2024. Discovery from Experts due by 12/13/2024. Motions shall be filed by 2/18/2025. Proposed Pretrial Order due by 6/10/2025. Pretrial Conference set for 6/26/2025 at 03:00 PM in chambers before Judge Brian A. Jackson. Motions In Limine shall be filed by 7/8/2025. Affidavit of Settlement Efforts due by 7/22/2025. Joint jury instructions, voir dire, verdict forms, and trial briefs due by 8/12/2025. Jury Trial set for 8/25/2025 through 8/29/2025 at 08:30 AM in Courtroom 2 before Judge Brian A. Jackson. Signed by Magistrate Judge Erin Wilder-Doomes on 01/24/2024. (ELW)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, January 24, 2024
9 9 order Settlement Conference Order Wed 01/24 4:27 PM
VIDEO SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE ORDER: Settlement Conference set for 12/10/2024 at 01:30 PM in by video before Magistrate Judge Erin Wilder-Doomes. Signed by Magistrate Judge Erin Wilder-Doomes on 01/24/2024.(ELW)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit Zoom instructions
Tuesday, January 16, 2024
notice Notice to Counsel Tue 01/16 5:41 PM
Notice to Counsel: The Scheduling Conference set for 1/25/2024 is CANCELED. The court will issue a separate scheduling order in this matter. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no hyperlink or PDF document associated with this entry.) (BLR)
Related: [-]
Thursday, January 11, 2024
7 7 misc Status Report Thu 01/11 3:44 PM
Joint STATUS REPORT by All Plaintiffs. (Glisson, Christopher)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, November 29, 2023
6 6 order 90 Day Conference Order Wed 11/29 2:52 PM
SCHEDULING CONFERENCE ORDER: Scheduling Conference set for 1/25/2024 at 04:30 PM in chambers before Magistrate Judge Erin Wilder-Doomes. Status Report due by 1/11/2024. Signed by Magistrate Judge Erin Wilder-Doomes on 11/29/2023. (BLR)
Related: [-]
5 5 misc Stipulation of Dismissal Wed 11/29 8:59 AM
STIPULATION of Dismissal by Kevin Jenkins. (Glisson, Christopher)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, November 15, 2023
4 4 minutes Telephone Conference Wed 11/15 4:39 PM
Telephone Conference Report and Order/Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Erin Wilder-Doomes: Telephone Conference held on 11/15/2023. The conference was set by the Court to discuss subject matter jurisdiction, specifically, the citizenship and status of Defendant Jerry Schexnayder. IT IS ORDERED that, by no later than December 6, 2023, Plaintiff Kevin Jenkins shall file either a Motion to Remand, if Plaintiff believes that the non-diverse Defendant Jerry Schexnayder is properly joined, or a stipulation of dismissal of Plaintiffs claims against Schexnayder signed by all parties who have appeared, if Plaintiff agrees that he cannot state a claim against Schexnayder. (BLR)
Related: [-]
Thursday, November 09, 2023
order ~Util - Set Hearings Order Thu 11/09 12:56 PM
NOTICE OF TELEPHONE CONFERENCE: IT IS ORDERED that a telephone conference is set for November 15, 2023 at 1:00 PM before Magistrate Judge Erin Wilder-Doomes to discuss subject matter jurisdiction. Counsel participating in the Conference shall call 225-372-6199 using phone conference ID 194727947 five minutes prior to the conference. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no hyperlink or PDF document associated with this entry.)(BLR)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, November 08, 2023
2 2 notice Certificate of Interested Persons Wed 11/08 3:41 PM
Certificate of Interested Persons by Winn-Dixie Montgomery, LLC identifying Affiliate/Interested Person Winn-Dixie Montgomery, LLC, Affiliate/Interested Person Southeastern Grocers, LLC, Affiliate/Interested Person Winn-Dixie Stores, Inc. for Winn-Dixie Montgomery, LLC.. (Ferrier, Elizabeth)
Related: [-]
1 1 cmp Notice of Removal (Complete Case Opening First) Wed 11/08 3:35 PM
NOTICE OF REMOVAL from 19th Judicial District, East Baton Rouge Parish, Case Number 733760. (Filing fee $ 402 receipt number ALAMDC-2666965), filed by Winn-Dixie Montgomery, LLC.(Ferrier, Elizabeth)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet,
Att: 2 Exhibit A - Plaintiff's Discovery Responses,
Att: 3 Exhibit B - State Court Record,
Att: 4 Exhibit C - Letter filing Notice of Filing Notice of Removal