California Southern District Court
Judge:Robert S Huie
Referred: Allison H Goddard
Case #: 3:23-cv-02066
Nature of Suit790 Labor - Other Labor Litigation
Cause28:1332 Diversity Action
Case Filed:Nov 08, 2023
Terminated:Dec 01, 2023
Case in other court:Superior Court of California, County of San Diego, 37-02023-00043320-CU-WT-CTL
Last checked: Tuesday May 07, 2024 1:33 AM PDT
Defendant
1835 Columbia Street LP
Represented By
Daniel W Watkins
The Watkins Firm, Apc
contact info
Beatrice Skye Resendes
contact info
Plaintiff
Mark Christopher Tracy
1130 Wall St., #561
La Jolla, CA 92037

GPO Dec 01 2023
ORDER Remanding Case. Signed by District Judge Robert S. Huie on 12/01/2023.(Certified copy sent to San Diego Superior Court) (All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service)(mjw)
GPO Dec 01 2023
AMENDED Order Remanding Case. Signed by District Judge Robert S. Huie on 12/01/2023.(Certified copy sent to San Diego Superior Court)(All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service)(mjw)

Docket last updated: 59 minutes ago
Friday, December 01, 2023
7 7 3 pgs order Order Fri 12/01 3:42 PM
AMENDED Order Remanding Case. Signed by District Judge Robert S. Huie on 12/01/2023.(Certified copy sent to San Diego Superior Court)(All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service)(mjw)
Related: [-]
5 5 2 pgs order Order Remanding Case Fri 12/01 11:08 AM
ORDER Remanding Case. Signed by District Judge Robert S. Huie on 12/01/2023.(Certified copy sent to San Diego Superior Court) (All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service)(mjw)
Related: [-]
Thursday, November 30, 2023
6 6 respm Response - Other Fri 12/01 11:41 AM
Plaintiff's Response re3 Order to Show Cause filed by Mark Christopher Tracy.(mjw)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A,
Att: 2 Exhibit B,
Att: 3 Exhibit C
4 4 respm Reply - Other Thu 11/30 2:21 PM
REPLY - Other re3 Order to Show Cause filed by 1835 Columbia Street LP. Related [+]
Related: [-] sendes, Beatrice
Att: 1 Declaration of Skye Resendes in response to order to show cause,
Att: 2 Declaration of Moe Siry in response to order to show cause,
Att: 3 Declaration of Arnold Ming in response to order to show cause,
Att: 4 Proof of Service
Thursday, November 09, 2023
3 3 4 pgs order Order to Show Cause Thu 11/09 4:57 PM
ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE Order to Show Cause Response due by 11/30/2023.. Signed by District Judge Robert S. Huie on 11/9/2023.(All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service)(bdc)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, November 08, 2023
2 2 notice Notice of Judge Assignment Wed 11/08 3:41 PM
NOTICE of Judge Assignment. District Judge Robert S. Huie assigned to the case. The new case number is 23cv2066 RSH-AHG. (no document attached) (ggv)
Related: [-]
1 1 cmp Notice of Removal Wed 11/08 4:04 PM
NOTICE OF REMOVAL with Jury Demand ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number ACASDC-18335846.), filed by 1835 Columbia Street LP. The new case number is 3:23-cv-2066-RSH-AHG. Judge Robert S. Huie and Magistrate Judge Allison H. Goddard are assigned to the case.(ggv)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet,
Att: 2 Exhibit A to Notice of Removal,
Att: 3 Declaration of Skye Resendes in Support of Notice of Removal of Action to Federal Court,
Att: 4 Exhibit 1 to Resendes Declaration,
Att: 5 Exhibit 2 to Resendes Declaration,
Att: 6 Exhibit 3 to Resendes Declaration,
Att: 7 Exhibit 4 to Resendes Declaration,
Att: 8 Proof of Service