Michigan Eastern District Court
Judge:Stephen J Murphy, III
Referred: Anthony P Patti
Case #: 2:23-cv-12847
Nature of Suit190 Contract - Other Contract
Cause28:1330 Breach of Contract
Case Filed:Nov 08, 2023
Terminated:Sep 25, 2024
Last checked: Tuesday May 07, 2024 5:00 AM EDT
Counter Claimant
Brad Lepczyk
Represented By
Patrick B. Green
Dickinson Wright
contact info
Counter Claimant
Memore, Inc
Represented By
Patrick B. Green
Dickinson Wright
contact info
Counter Defendant
Shelby Sacco
Represented By
Daniel Grossman
Zvmlaw PLLC
contact info
Mackenzie C Burns
Zvmlaw
contact info
Zachary V. Moen
Zvmlaw PLLC
contact info
Counter Defendant
Sad to Savage, LLC
Represented By
Daniel Grossman
Zvmlaw PLLC
contact info
Mackenzie C Burns
Zvmlaw
contact info
Zachary V. Moen
Zvmlaw PLLC
contact info
Defendant
Brad Lepczyk
Represented By
Patrick B. Green
Dickinson Wright
contact info
Defendant
Memore, Inc
Represented By
Patrick B. Green
Dickinson Wright
contact info
Plaintiff
Shelby Sacco
Represented By
Daniel Grossman
Zvmlaw PLLC
contact info
Mackenzie C Burns
Zvmlaw
contact info
Zachary V. Moen
Zvmlaw PLLC
contact info
Plaintiff
Sad to Savage, LLC
Represented By
Daniel Grossman
Zvmlaw PLLC
contact info
Mackenzie C Burns
Zvmlaw
contact info
Zachary V. Moen
Zvmlaw PLLC
contact info


Docket last updated: 1 hours ago
Tuesday, October 22, 2024
18 18 2 pgs order Judgment - Consent Tue 10/22 3:28 PM
STIPULATED ORDER for Entry of Consent Judgment. Signed by District Judge Stephen J. Murphy, III. (RLou)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, September 25, 2024
17 17 2 pgs order Dismissing Case Wed 09/25 11:00 AM
ORDER Dismissing Case Without Prejudice. Closing Documents due by 10/25/2024 . Signed by District Judge Stephen J. Murphy, III. (RLou)
Related: [-]
Monday, August 05, 2024
16 16 2 pgs order Stipulation and Order ~Util - Set Scheduling Order Deadlines Mon 08/05 9:34 AM
STIPULATED ORDER to Extend Scheduling Deadlines. ( Discovery due by 10/21/2024 , Dispositive Motion Cut-off set for 11/19/2024 , Final Pretrial Conference set for 4/9/2025 at 2:00 PM before District Judge Stephen J. Murphy III , Jury Trial set for 4/22/2025 at 9:00 AM before District Judge Stephen J. Murphy III ). Signed by District Judge Stephen J. Murphy, III. (RLou)
Related: [-]
Thursday, July 25, 2024
15 15 2 pgs order Order Thu 07/25 2:18 PM
ORDER Referring Parties to Mediation. Signed by District Judge Stephen J. Murphy, III. (RLou)
Related: [-]
Friday, July 19, 2024
14 14 misc Report - Free Fri 07/19 9:52 AM
Joint Status Report REPORT by Shelby Sacco, Sad to Savage, LLC (Grossman, Daniel)
Related: [-]
Thursday, June 27, 2024
13 13 1 pgs order Order Thu 06/27 4:44 PM
ORDER Requiring Joint Status Report. Joint Status Report due by 7/19/2024 . Signed by District Judge Stephen J. Murphy, III. (RLou)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, April 10, 2024
12 12 2 pgs order Scheduling Order Wed 04/10 11:55 AM
SCHEDULING ORDER: Discovery due by 8/22/2024 , Dispositive Motion Cut-off set for 9/20/2024 , Final Pretrial Conference set for 2/5/2025 at 2:00 PM before District Judge Stephen J. Murphy III , Jury Trial set for 2/18/2025 at 9:00 AM before District Judge Stephen J. Murphy III . Signed by District Judge Stephen J. Murphy, III. Related [+] (RLou)
Related: [-] fer to image for additional dates
minutes Scheduling Conference Wed 04/10 11:36 AM
Minute Entry for remote proceedings before District Judge Stephen J. Murphy, III: Scheduling Conference held on 4/10/2024. (Court Reporter: None Present, Not on the Record) (RLou)
Related: [-]
Monday, April 08, 2024
11 11 6 pgs misc Discovery Plan - Rule 26f Mon 04/08 2:00 PM
DISCOVERY plan jointly filed pursuant to Federal Rules of Civil Procedure 26(f) (Grossman, Daniel)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, March 26, 2024
10 10 8 pgs order Order ~Util - Set Deadlines/Hearings Tue 03/26 4:37 PM
ORDER Requiring Joint Discovery Plan and Setting Rule 16 Scheduling Conference. ( Scheduling Conference set for 4/10/2024 at 11:30 AM before District Judge Stephen J. Murphy III ). Signed by District Judge Stephen J. Murphy, III. (RLou)
Related: [-]
Monday, March 25, 2024
9 9 32 pgs answer Answer to Counterclaim Mon 03/25 4:12 PM
ANSWER to Counterclaim with Affirmative Defenses by Shelby Sacco, Sad to Savage, LLC. (Grossman, Daniel)
Related: [-]
Monday, March 04, 2024
8 8 37 pgs answer Answer to Complaint Civil Case - Counterclaim Mon 03/04 2:57 PM
ANSWER to Complaint with Affirmative Defenses with Jury Demand , COUNTERCLAIM filed by All Defendants against All Plaintiffs by All Defendants. (Green, Patrick)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, January 16, 2024
7 7 11 pgs order Protective Order Tue 01/16 12:27 PM
STIPULATED PROTECTIVE ORDER. Signed by District Judge Stephen J. Murphy, III. (RLou)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, January 09, 2024
6 6 1 pgs service Waiver of Service Executed - 60 Day Tue 01/09 9:46 AM
WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed. Brad Lepczyk waiver sent on 1/2/2024, answer due 3/4/2024. (Burns, Mackenzie)
Related: [-]
5 5 1 pgs service Waiver of Service Executed - 60 Day Tue 01/09 9:41 AM
WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed. Memore, Inc waiver sent on 1/2/2024, answer due 3/4/2024. (Burns, Mackenzie)
Related: [-]
Thursday, November 09, 2023
4 4 3 pgs notice Appearance Thu 11/09 1:33 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by Daniel Grossman on behalf of Shelby Sacco, Sad to Savage, LLC. (Grossman, Daniel)
Related: [-]
3 3 3 pgs notice Appearance Thu 11/09 12:51 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by Zachary V. Moen on behalf of All Plaintiffs. (Moen, Zachary)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, November 08, 2023
2 2 1 pgs misc Statement of Disclosure of Corporate Affiliations Wed 11/08 8:24 PM
STATEMENT of DISCLOSURE of CORPORATE AFFILIATIONS and FINANCIAL INTEREST by All Plaintiffs (Burns, Mackenzie)
Related: [-]
1 1 17 pgs cmp Civil Case - Complaint Wed 11/08 8:15 PM
COMPLAINT filed by All Plaintiffs against All Defendants with Jury Demand. No summons requested. Receipt No: AMIEDC-9556268 - Fee: $ 402. County of 1st Plaintiff: Oakland - County Where Action Arose: Oakland - County of 1st Defendant: Out of State. [ Previously dismissed case: No] [ Possible companion case(s): None ] (Burns, Mackenzie)
Related: [-]