Pennsylvania Western District Court
Judge:Richard A Lanzillo
Case #: 2:23-cv-01928
Nature of Suit442 Civil Rights - Employment
Cause42:2000e Job Discrimination (Employment)
Case Filed:Nov 08, 2023
Terminated:Jun 07, 2024
Last checked: Tuesday May 07, 2024 5:08 AM EDT
Defendant
MAX AUTO SUPPLY COMPANY
Represented By
Morgan M. J. Randle
Freeman Mathis & Gary, LLP
contact info
Cynthia L. O'Donnell
Freeman Mathis & Gary, LLP
contact info
Sunshine R. Fellows
Freeman Mathis & Gary, LLP
contact info
Mediator
SALLY GRIFFITH CIMINI
Represented By
Sally G. Cimini
contact info
Mediator
Sally Griffith Cimini
108 Overdale Road
Pittsburgh, PA 15221
Represented By
Sally G. Cimini
contact info
Plaintiff
JAMES STYEN
Represented By
Erik M. Yurkovich
The Workers' Rights Law Group
contact info
TERMINATED PARTIES
Defendant
MIDAS INTERNATIONAL, LLC
Terminated: 02/26/2024
Represented By
Morgan M. J. Randle
Freeman Mathis & Gary, LLP
contact info
Cynthia L. O'Donnell
Freeman Mathis & Gary, LLP
contact info
Sunshine R. Fellows
Freeman Mathis & Gary, LLP
contact info


Docket last updated: 2 hours ago
Wednesday, July 03, 2024
34 34 misc Stipulation of Dismissal (Atty) Wed 07/03 10:57 AM
STIPULATION of Dismissal with Prejudice by JAMES STYEN. (Yurkovich, Erik)
Related: [-]
Friday, June 07, 2024
33 33 order Order for Administrative Case Closing Fri 06/07 8:10 AM
ORDER FOR ADMINISTRATIVE CLOSING. The Court having been advised that the case has been resolved (ECF 32), the only matter remaining to be completed is a submission of a stipulation for dismissal under Fed. R. Civ. P. 41(a). It appears that there is no further action required by the Court at this time. IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that the Clerk mark this case ADMINISTRATIVELY CLOSED. Nothing contained in this Order shall be considered a dismissal or disposition of this matter, and the Court will retain jurisdiction should further proceedings regarding settlement become necessary. Further, if a stipulation of dismissal has not been filed by 7/12/2024 , the parties are ORDERED to file a joint status report with the Court. Signed by Chief Magistrate Judge Richard A. Lanzillo on 6/7/2024. Text-only entry; no PDF document will issue. This text-only entry constitutes the Order of the Court or Notice on the matter. (cmc)
Related: [-]
Thursday, June 06, 2024
32 32 adr Report of Mediation Thu 06/06 8:16 PM
REPORT of Mediation: Mediation held on 6/6/2024. Case has been resolved. SALLY GRIFFITH CIMINI and Sally Griffith Cimini terminated. Attorney Sally G. Cimini terminated. The parties are reminded of their obligation to complete the ADR questionnaire and return same to the Clerk of Court within 5 days of the conclusion of the ADR process. The questionnaire can be accessed at www.pawd.uscourts.gov. Click on the ADR icon. (Cimini, Sally)
Related: [-]
Thursday, May 23, 2024
31 31 order Order 1 - Terminate Deadlines and Hearings Thu 05/23 11:55 AM
ORDER : IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that the Mid-Discovery Video Status Conference set for 6/20/2024 is CANCELED, and instead the parties shall submit a Joint Status Report by 6/20/2024 , which shall provide an update on the status of ADR, discovery and whether the parties are seeking expert discovery, including a proposed expert discovery schedule. All other deadlines set forth in the Court's Case Management Order (ECF29 ) remain in effect. Signed by Chief Magistrate Judge Richard A. Lanzillo on 5/23/2024. Text-only entry; no PDF document will issue. This text-only entry constitutes the Order of the Court or Notice on the matter. (cmc)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, April 23, 2024
utility Add and Terminate Judges Tue 04/23 4:03 PM
This case has been reassigned to Magistrate Judge Richard A. Lanzillo pursuant to Administrative Order 2024-03 filed at 2:24-mc-10001. Magistrate Judge Cynthia Reed Eddy no longer assigned to case. Text-only entry; no PDF document will issue. This text-only entry constitutes the Order of the Court or Notice on the matter. (sms)
Related: [-]
Friday, April 12, 2024
30 30 2 pgs order Order Referring Case to Mediation Fri 04/12 11:10 AM
ORDER REFERRING CASE to Mediation. Sally Griffith Cimini is appointed as mediator. Party SALLY GRIFFITH CIMINI added. Signed by Magistrate Judge Cynthia Reed Eddy on 4/12/2024. (cmc)
Related: [-]
29 29 order Case Management Order ~Util - Set Deadlines/Hearings Fri 04/12 11:06 AM
CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER: Amended Pleadings due by 4/24/2024; Fact Discovery due by 9/10/2024; ADR due by 6/6/2024; Mid-Discovery Status Conference set for 6/20/2024 at 11:30 AM by Video Conference; Post-Discovery Status Conference set for 9/18/2024 at 10:00 AM by Video Conference, as more fully set forth in the attached Order. Signed by Magistrate Judge Cynthia Reed Eddy on 4/12/2024. (cmc)
Related: [-]
28 28 2 pgs order Order Implementing Fed Rule of Evidence 502(d) Fri 04/12 11:01 AM
ORDER Implementing Federal Rule of Evidence 502(d) Pursuant to LCvR 16.1.D. Signed by Magistrate Judge Cynthia Reed Eddy on 4/12/2024. (cmc)
Related: [-]
27 27 minutes Initial Case Management Conference Fri 04/12 11:00 AM
Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Cynthia Reed Eddy: Initial Case Management Conference held on 4/12/2024. (Court Reporter: none) (cmc)
Related: [-]
Friday, April 05, 2024
26 26 misc Consent to Trial by Mag. Judge OR District Judge Option Fri 04/05 2:43 PM
CONSENT to Trial/Jurisdiction by US Magistrate Judge OR District Judge Option, by JAMES STYEN. (Yurkovich, Erik)
Related: [-]
25 25 order Order ~Util - Set Deadlines/Hearings Fri 04/05 12:24 PM
ORDER: Initial Case Management Conference set for 4/12/2024 at 10:30 AM by Video Conference before Magistrate Judge Cynthia Reed Eddy. Signed by Magistrate Judge Cynthia Reed Eddy on 4/5/2024. Text-only entry; no PDF document will issue. This text-only entry constitutes the Order of the Court or Notice on the matter. (cmc)
Related: [-]
24 24 misc Consent to Trial by Mag. Judge OR District Judge Option Fri 04/05 8:53 AM
CONSENT to Trial/Jurisdiction by US Magistrate Judge OR District Judge Option, by MAX AUTO SUPPLY COMPANY. (Randle, Morgan)
Related: [-]
23 23 adr Stipulation Selecting ADR process Fri 04/05 8:51 AM
STIPULATION selecting ADR process by MAX AUTO SUPPLY COMPANY. (O'Donnell, Cynthia)
Related: [-]
22 22 misc Report of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting Fri 04/05 8:50 AM
REPORT of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting. (O'Donnell, Cynthia)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, March 12, 2024
21 21 adr Notice of Mediation Tue 03/12 11:08 PM
Notice of Mediation by Sally Griffith Cimini. Mediation Date June 6, 2024 at 10:00 a.m. (Cimini, Sally)
Related: [-]
Thursday, February 29, 2024
20 20 order Initial Local Rule 16.1 Scheduling Order Thu 02/29 12:00 PM
INITIAL LOCAL RULE 16.1 SCHEDULING ORDER: Initial Case Management Conference set for 4/10/2024 at 10:00 AM by Video Conference before Magistrate Judge Cynthia Reed Eddy. Rule 26 Meeting to be conducted on or before 3/20/2024. Rule 26 Meeting Report, Proposed Case Management Order, ADR Stipulation, Confidential Position Letters, and Willingness to Proceed before Magistrate Judge due by 4/5/2024, as more fully set forth in the attached Order. Signed by Magistrate Judge Cynthia Reed Eddy on 2/29/2024. (cmc)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, February 28, 2024
19 19 answer Answer to Complaint Wed 02/28 8:56 AM
ANSWER to1 Complaint, and Affirmative Defenses by MAX AUTO SUPPLY COMPANY. (O'Donnell, Cynthia)
Related: [-]
Monday, February 26, 2024
18 18 order Order Mon 02/26 12:53 PM
ORDER approving17 STIPULATION for Dismissal of Defendant Midas International, LLC by MAX AUTO SUPPLY COMPANY, MIDAS INTERNATIONAL, LLC. Upon agreement of the parties, IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that Defendant MIDAS INTERNATIONAL, LLC is DISMISSED with prejudice from this action. Signed by Magistrate Judge Cynthia Reed Eddy on 2/26/2024. Text-only entry; no PDF document will issue. This text-only entry constitutes the Order of the Court or Notice on the matter. (cmc)
Related: [-]
Friday, February 23, 2024
17 17 misc Stipulation Fri 02/23 3:45 PM
STIPULATION for Dismissal of Defendant Midas International, LLC by MAX AUTO SUPPLY COMPANY, MIDAS INTERNATIONAL, LLC. (O'Donnell, Cynthia)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, January 23, 2024
16 16 misc Stipulation for Extension of Time to Answer Tue 01/23 10:32 AM
Stipulation for Extension of Time to Answer by MIDAS INTERNATIONAL, LLC, MAX AUTO SUPPLY COMPANY Answer due from MIDAS INTERNATIONAL, LLC on 2/28/2024; MAX AUTO SUPPLY COMPANY on 2/28/2024. (O'Donnell, Cynthia)
Related: [-]
Monday, December 18, 2023
15 15 notice Notice of Appearance Mon 12/18 9:57 AM
NOTICE of Appearance by Morgan M. J. Randle on behalf of MIDAS INTERNATIONAL, LLC. (Randle, Morgan)
Related: [-]
14 14 notice Notice of Appearance Mon 12/18 9:55 AM
NOTICE of Appearance by Sunshine R. Fellows on behalf of MIDAS INTERNATIONAL, LLC. (Fellows, Sunshine)
Related: [-]
13 13 misc Disclosure Statement (LR 7.1.A and/or FRCvP 7.1(a)(2)) Mon 12/18 9:51 AM
Disclosure Statement identifying Sumitomo Corporation and Compagnie Generale des Etablissements Michelin SCA as corporate parent or other affiliate by MIDAS INTERNATIONAL, LLC. (O'Donnell, Cynthia)
Related: [-]
12 12 notice Notice of Appearance Mon 12/18 9:44 AM
NOTICE of Appearance by Cynthia L. O'Donnell on behalf of MIDAS INTERNATIONAL, LLC. (O'Donnell, Cynthia)
Related: [-]
Thursday, December 14, 2023
11 11 service Waiver of Service Executed Thu 12/14 1:58 PM
WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by JAMES STYEN. MIDAS INTERNATIONAL, LLC waiver sent on 12/6/2023, answer due 2/5/2024. (Carothers, Patrick)
Related: [-]
Friday, December 01, 2023
10 10 service Waiver of Service Executed Fri 12/01 8:04 AM
WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by JAMES STYEN. MAX AUTO SUPPLY COMPANY waiver sent on 11/30/2023, answer due 1/29/2024. (Yurkovich, Erik)
Related: [-]
Thursday, November 30, 2023
9 9 misc Disclosure Statement (LR 7.1.A and/or FRCvP 7.1(a)(2)) Thu 11/30 4:08 PM
Disclosure Statement identifying NONE as corporate parent or other affiliate by MAX AUTO SUPPLY COMPANY. (Randle, Morgan)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, November 29, 2023
8 8 notice Notice of Appearance Wed 11/29 2:59 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by Sunshine R. Fellows on behalf of MAX AUTO SUPPLY COMPANY. (Fellows, Sunshine)
Related: [-]
misc QC - Party did not file Disclosure Statement pursuant to LR 7.1.A Wed 11/29 1:38 PM
CLERK'S OFFICE QUALITY CONTROL MESSAGE re7 Notice of Appearance,6 Notice of Appearance. ERROR: Party did not file disclosure statement identifying all parent companies, subsidiaries, and affiliates that have issued shares or debt securities to the public as required pursuant to LR 7.1.A. CORRECTION: Attorney advised to file statement within 7 days under Civil > Other Filings > Other Documents > Disclosure Statement (LR 7.1.A and/or FRCvP 7.1(a)(2)). Disclosure Statement due by 12/6/2023. (cel)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, November 28, 2023
7 7 notice Notice of Appearance Tue 11/28 4:20 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by Morgan M. J. Randle on behalf of MAX AUTO SUPPLY COMPANY. (Randle, Morgan)
Related: [-]
6 6 notice Notice of Appearance Tue 11/28 4:17 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by Cynthia L. O'Donnell on behalf of MAX AUTO SUPPLY COMPANY. (O'Donnell, Cynthia)
Related: [-]
Monday, November 13, 2023
5 5 service Summons Issued Mon 11/13 10:25 AM
Summons Issued as to MAX AUTO SUPPLY COMPANY, MIDAS INTERNATIONAL, LLC (cel)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Summons
Thursday, November 09, 2023
4 4 service Praecipe to Issue Summons Thu 11/09 4:08 PM
PRAECIPE to Issue Summons by JAMES STYEN (Yurkovich, Erik)
Related: [-]
3 3 service Praecipe to Issue Summons Thu 11/09 4:07 PM
PRAECIPE to Issue Summons by JAMES STYEN (Yurkovich, Erik)
Related: [-]
2 2 2 pgs order Order Thu 11/09 9:12 AM
STANDING ORDER ON RULE 12(b) MOTIONS. Signed by Magistrate Judge Cynthia Reed Eddy on 11/9/2023. (cmc)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, November 08, 2023
1 1 cmp Complaint (for Clerk of Court personnel only) Wed 11/08 10:42 AM
COMPLAINT against MAX AUTO SUPPLY COMPANY, MIDAS INTERNATIONAL, LLC (Filing fee, including Administrative fee, $402, receipt number APAWDC-7970521), filed by JAMES STYEN. (cel)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit,
Att: 2 Civil Cover Sheet