Pennsylvania Eastern District Court
Judge:Jeffrey L Schmehl
Referred: Craig M Straw
Case #: 5:23-cv-04381
Nature of Suit880 Civil Rights - Defend Trade Secrets Act of 2016 (DTSA)
Cause18:1836(b) Civil Action to Protect Trade Secrets
Case Filed:Nov 08, 2023
Terminated:Jul 12, 2024
Last checked: Tuesday May 07, 2024 4:59 AM EDT
Counter Claimant
EQUES, INC.
Represented By
CATHERINE E. ROWE
Strokoff & Cowden PC
contact info
Counter Claimant
BROOKE HALL
Represented By
CATHERINE E. ROWE
Strokoff & Cowden PC
contact info
Counter Defendant
QUARRY VIEW CONSTRUCTION, LLC
Represented By
RYAN S. MACDONALD
Brubaker Connaughton Goss & Lucarelli
contact info
RORY O. CONNAUGHTON
Brubaker Connaughton Goss & Lucarelli LLC
contact info
Defendant
EQUES, INC.
Represented By
CATHERINE E. ROWE
Strokoff & Cowden PC
contact info
Defendant
BROOKE HALL
Represented By
CATHERINE E. ROWE
Strokoff & Cowden PC
contact info
Plaintiff
QUARRY VIEW CONSTRUCTION, LLC
Represented By
RYAN S. MACDONALD
Brubaker Connaughton Goss & Lucarelli
contact info
RORY O. CONNAUGHTON
Brubaker Connaughton Goss & Lucarelli LLC
contact info
Unrepresented Party
EQUES, INC.
1120 VALLEY ROAD
COATESVILLE, PA 19320
TERMINATED PARTIES
Defendant
ANDREW STOLTZFUS
Terminated: 04/18/2024
Represented By
Caleb P Setlock
Barley Snyder
contact info
KEVIN A. MOORE
Barley Snyder
contact info
Unrepresented Party
BROOKE HALL
Terminated: 12/22/2023
300 ROCK HILL ROAD
MILLERSVILLE, PA 17551
Unrepresented Party
ANDREW STOLTZFUS
Terminated: 12/22/2023
552 BEECHDALE ROAD
BIRD IN HAND, PA 17505


Docket last updated: 05/02/2025 11:59 PM EDT
Friday, July 12, 2024
60 60 4 pgs order Order Fri 07/12 9:04 AM
PERMANENT CONSENT INJUNCTION AND ORDER THAT THE PARTIES' CLAIMS IN THIS ACTION ARE DISMISSED, THE CLERK OF COURT SHALL CLOSE THIS CASE, ETC. SIGNED BY DISTRICT JUDGE JEFFREY L. SCHMEHL ON 7/12/24. 7/12/24 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED.(er)
Related: [-]