Texas Eastern District Court
Judge:Michael J Truncale
Referred: Christine L Stetson
Case #: 1:23-cv-00398
Nature of Suit530 Prisoner Petitions - Habeas Corpus - General
Cause28:2241 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus (federal)
Case Filed:Nov 07, 2023
Terminated:Mar 04, 2025

Create an account to get the full party report for this case.



Docket last updated: 4 hours ago
Tuesday, March 18, 2025
30 30 misc Mail Returned Undeliverable Tue 03/18 11:55 AM
Mail sent to Jase Gautreaux returned as undeliverable re28 Order Adopting Report and Recommendation, and29 Final Judgment. Envelope marked "RTS - No Longer at this Address." (kcv)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, March 04, 2025
29 29 order Judgment Tue 03/04 4:52 PM
FINAL JUDGMENT. It is ordered that this petition for writ of habeas corpus is dismissed without prejudice. All motions not previously ruled on are denied. Signed by District Judge Michael J. Truncale on 3/4/25. (kcv)
Related: [-]
28 28 2 pgs order Order Adopting Report and Recommendations Tue 03/04 4:49 PM
ORDER adopting the26 Report and Recommendation. Signed by District Judge Michael J. Truncale on 3/4/25. (kcv)
Related: [-]
Friday, February 21, 2025
27 27 misc Mail Returned Undeliverable Mon 02/24 8:40 AM
Mail sent to Jase Gautreaux returned as undeliverable re26 Report and Recommendation. Envelope marked "RTS - Incomplete Name/Register Number/No Longer at this Address." (kcv)
Related: [-]
Monday, February 03, 2025
26 26 motion Report and Recommendations Mon 02/03 3:22 PM
REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION recommending that the9 Motion for Summary Judgment should be granted, and this Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus should be dismissed without prejudice. Signed by Magistrate Judge Christine L. Stetson on 2/3/25. (kcv)
Related: [-]
Friday, September 20, 2024
25 25 motion Miscellaneous Relief Fri 09/20 2:27 PM
MOTION to Add Supplemental Statement by Jase DePaul Gautreaux. (tkd)
Related: [-]
Monday, September 16, 2024
24 24 motion Leave to File Document Mon 09/16 3:07 PM
MOTION to Submit FBOP First Step Calculator & Calculations by Jase DePaul Gautreaux. (kcv)
Related: [-]
Monday, August 19, 2024
23 23 respm Reply to Response to Motion Mon 08/19 1:42 PM
Supplemental(construed) REPLY to Response re18 MOTION for Expedited Hearing on pending 2241 for FSA RRC placement filed by Jase DePaul Gautreaux . (kcv)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, August 13, 2024
22 22 respm Reply to Response to Motion Tue 08/13 2:50 PM
REPLY to Response re18 MOTION for Expedited Hearing on pending 2241 for FSA RRC placement filed by Jase DePaul Gautreaux . (kcv)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, July 30, 2024
21 21 service Certificate of Service Wed 07/31 12:29 PM
CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Jase DePaul Gautreaux regarding a Reply to the20 Response to Motion. (Clerk notes that a Reply to document #20 has not been received as of 7/30/24). (kcv)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, July 24, 2024
20 20 respm Response in Opposition to Motion Wed 07/24 11:30 AM
RESPONSE in Opposition re18 MOTION for Hearing A EXPEDITED HEARING ON PENDING 2241 FOR FSA RRC PLACEMENT filed by Warden, FPC Beaumont .(Cooper, Aimee)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A - Moore Declaration,
Att: 2 Additional Attachment(s) Attachment 1 - FSA Time Credit Assessment,
Att: 3 Additional Attachment(s) Attachment 2 - Inmate Data
Monday, July 22, 2024
19 19 motion Miscellaneous Relief Tue 07/23 1:11 PM
Emergency MOTION to Submit Chevron Deference Case by Jase DePaul Gautreaux. (kcv)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, July 16, 2024
18 18 motion Hearing Wed 07/17 1:44 PM
MOTION for Expedited Hearing on pending 2241 for FSA RRC placement by Jase DePaul Gautreaux. (kcv)
Related: [-]
17 17 motion Miscellaneous Relief Tue 07/16 3:10 PM
MOTION to Submit New Federal Court Ruling about BOP RRC Placement 7/1/2024 by Jase DePaul Gautreaux. (kcv)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, June 25, 2024
16 16 motion Miscellaneous Relief Tue 06/25 4:26 PM
MOTION to Submit Additional BOP Information by Jase DePaul Gautreaux. (kcv)
Related: [-]
Monday, June 10, 2024
15 15 motion Miscellaneous Relief Tue 06/11 11:34 AM
MOTION to Submit Additional Supporting Documents by Jase DePaul Gautreaux. (ljw)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, May 22, 2024
14 14 respoth Affidavit in Support Thu 05/23 12:42 PM
Additional Information in Support re1 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus by Jase DePaul Gautreaux. (kcv)
Related: [-]
Friday, April 26, 2024
13 13 motion Leave to File Document Fri 04/26 4:32 PM
MOTION for Leave to Submit Additional Support Information by Jase DePaul Gautreaux. (kcv)
Related: [-]
Monday, April 15, 2024
12 12 respoth Affidavit in Support Tue 04/16 2:13 PM
Additional Support Information to11 Response to Motion by Jase DePaul Gautreaux. (kcv)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, April 10, 2024
11 11 respm Response to Motion Thu 04/11 12:47 PM
RESPONSE to Motion re9 MOTION to Dismiss or in the Alternative MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by Jase DePaul Gautreaux . (kcv) (Mailed docket sheet on 4/11/2024 (kcv))
Related: [-]
Thursday, April 04, 2024
10 10 motion Leave to File Document Fri 04/05 2:02 PM
MOTION to Submit Additional Support Information by Jase DePaul Gautreaux. (kcv)
Related: [-]
Monday, April 01, 2024
9 9 motion Dismiss Summary Judgment Mon 04/01 9:37 AM
MOTION to Dismiss or in the Alternative , MOTION for Summary Judgment by Warden, FPC Beaumont.(Cooper, Aimee)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A,
Att: 2 Exhibit B,
Att: 3 Proposed Order
Tuesday, February 27, 2024
8 8 misc Letter Wed 02/28 1:52 PM
Letter to the Court from Jase Gautreaux. (Address changed from FPC Beaumont to SPC Hazelton per this filing). (kcv, )
Related: [-]
Tuesday, February 20, 2024
7 7 misc Mail Returned Tue 02/20 1:08 PM
Mail Returned as Undeliverable to Jase DePaul Gautreaux as to4 ORder to Show Cause. Envelope inidicates "RTS - Not Here - Refused." (kcv, )
Related: [-]
Wednesday, February 14, 2024
6 6 service Acknowledgment of Receipt Thu 02/15 11:42 AM
ACKNOWLEDGMENT OF RECEIPT by AUSA on 1/30/24 as to4 Order to Show Cause. (kcv, )
Related: [-]
Thursday, February 08, 2024
5 5 misc Mail Returned Thu 02/08 1:20 PM
Mail Returned as Undeliverable to Jase DePaul Gautreaux as to2 Order. Envelope indicates "RTS - Refused/Not here." (kcv, )
Related: [-]
Friday, January 26, 2024
4 4 1 pgs order Order to Show Cause - Federal Habeas Petition Fri 01/26 11:30 AM
ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE - FEDERAL HABEAS PETITION. Respondent to file response to Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus. Clerk sent order to USAO with copy of petition via regular mail with confirmation receipt and to Petitioner via regular mail with ack card on 1/26/24. Signed by Magistrate Judge Christine L. Stetson on 1/26/24. (kcv, )
Related: [-]
Tuesday, January 16, 2024
3 3 respoth Response to Non-Motion Wed 01/17 2:31 PM
RESPONSE to2 Order (construed)- Additional Information re1 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus by Jase DePaul Gautreaux. (kcv, )
Related: [-]
Monday, January 08, 2024
2 2 2 pgs order Order Mon 01/08 2:10 PM
ORDER. It is ordered that Petitioner shall have twenty days from the date of this order to file more details in relation to his Petition. Failure by Petitioner to file an amended petition which complies with this order may lead to a recommendation that the Petition be dismissed, without prejudice, for want of prosecution pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 41(b). Signed by Magistrate Judge Christine L. Stetson on 1/8/24. (Via regular mail with ack card on 1/8/24).(kcv, )
Related: [-]
Tuesday, November 07, 2023
1 1 cmp Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus Wed 11/08 2:01 PM
28:2241 PETITION for Writ of Habeas Corpus, filed by Jase DePaul Gautreaux.(kcv, )
Related: [-]
misc Filing Fee Received Wed 11/08 2:03 PM
Filing fee paid: $ 5, receipt number 100021841 (kcv, )
Related: [-]
utility Case Referred to Magistrate Judge Wed 11/08 2:04 PM
CASE REFERRED to Magistrate Judge Christine L. Stetson pursuant to Standing Order. (kcv, )
Related: [-]