District Of Columbia District Court
Judge:Tanya S Chutkan
Case #: 1:23-cv-03371
Nature of Suit442 Civil Rights - Employment
Cause28:1331 Fed. Question
Case Filed:Nov 09, 2023
Case in other court:Superior Court of the District of Columbia, 2023-CAB-006389
Last checked: Tuesday May 07, 2024 4:36 AM EDT
Defendant
KIRKLAND & ELLIS, LLP
Represented By
Lynne Hermle
Orrick, Herrington & Sutcliffe LLP
contact info
Esther Gwen Lander
Orrick, Herrington & Sutcliffe LLP
contact info
Jill Lisa Rosenberg
contact info
Francesca Morency
Orrick, Herrington & Sutcliffe LLP
contact info
Plaintiff
TYRONE GIBSON
Represented By
Katherine Lease
Alan Lescht & Associates
contact info
Alan Lescht
Alan Lescht & Associates, P.C.
contact info
Tamara Leora Slater
Alan Lescht & Associates, P.C.
contact info

GPO Mar 31 2025
MEMORANDUM OPINION re: Defendant's 18 Limited Motion to Dismiss. Signed by Judge Tanya S. Chutkan on 3/31/2025. (lcdh)

Docket last updated: 4 hours ago
Monday, April 28, 2025
order .Order ~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines Mon 04/28 3:42 PM
MINUTE ORDER: Before the court in this case are a16 Amended Complaint and an28 Answer. On or before May 30, 2025, the parties shall meet and confer and file a joint status report, pursuant to Rule 26(f) of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure and Local Civil Rule 16.3. The report shall include a proposed Scheduling Order in a format similar to the sample Scheduling Order found on Judge Chutkan's court webpage, along with any proposed changes which shall be highlighted. When proposing deadlines, the parties shall avoid proposing a schedule that contains submission of simultaneous dispositive cross-motions. In addition to the requirements under the Federal and Local Rules, the parties' report shall contain a succinct summary of the case and the statutory basis for all remaining causes of action and defenses. Signed by Judge Tanya S. Chutkan on 4/28/25. (lcdh)
Related: [-]
Monday, April 21, 2025
28 28 16 pgs answer Answer to Amended Complaint Mon 04/21 4:34 PM
ANSWER to16 Amended Complaint by KIRKLAND & ELLIS, LLP.(Lander, Esther)
Related: [-]
Monday, March 31, 2025
27 27 1 pgs order Order on Motion to Dismiss Mon 03/31 11:25 AM
ORDER GRANTING IN PART and DENYING IN PART Defendant's18 Limited Motion to Dismiss. See Order for details. Signed by Judge Tanya S. Chutkan on 3/31/2025. (lcdh)
Related: [-]
26 26 12 pgs order Memorandum & Opinion Mon 03/31 11:19 AM
MEMORANDUM OPINION re: Defendant's18 Limited Motion to Dismiss. Signed by Judge Tanya S. Chutkan on 3/31/2025. (lcdh)
Related: [-]
Monday, October 21, 2024
25 25 notice Notice of Appearance Mon 10/21 3:28 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by Erica Bilkis on behalf of TYRONE GIBSON (Bilkis, Erica)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, September 25, 2024
order Order on Motion for Leave to File Wed 09/25 5:16 PM
MINUTE ORDER: GRANTING Defendant's unopposed19 Motion for Leave to File. Defendant moved for leave to file its answer to Plaintiff's16 Amended Complaint following the court's ruling on Defendant's18 Limited Motion to Dismiss. A partial motion to dismiss suspends the time by which a party must respond to a complaint. See Betz v. First Credit Servs., Inc. , 139 F. Supp. 3d 451, 456 n.4 (D.D.C. 2015). The motion is therefore GRANTED and Defendant shall file its answer within twenty-one (21) days of the court's ruling on the motion to dismiss. Signed by Judge Tanya S. Chutkan on 9/25/2024. (lca)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, March 26, 2024
24 24 notice Notice of Appearance Tue 03/26 3:27 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by Esther Gwen Lander on behalf of KIRKLAND & ELLIS, LLP (Lander, Esther)
Related: [-]
Monday, February 26, 2024
23 23 notice Notice of Change of Address Mon 02/26 10:37 AM
NOTICE of Change of Address by Francesca Morency (Morency, Francesca)
Related: [-]
Thursday, February 15, 2024
22 22 respm Reply to opposition to motion Thu 02/15 10:55 PM
REPLY to opposition to motion re18 MOTION to Dismiss [Limited Motion to Dismiss Plaintiff's Amended Complaint] filed by KIRKLAND & ELLIS, LLP. (Morency, Francesca)
Related: [-]
Thursday, February 08, 2024
21 21 22 pgs respm Memorandum in opposition to motion Thu 02/08 2:29 PM
Memorandum in opposition to re18 Motion to Dismiss, filed by TYRONE GIBSON. (Lease, Katherine)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, February 07, 2024
20 20 1 pgs notice Notice of Substitution of Counsel Wed 02/07 2:57 PM
NOTICE OF SUBSTITUTION OF COUNSEL by Tamara Leora Slater on behalf of TYRONE GIBSON Substituting for attorney Alan Lescht (Slater, Tamara)
Related: [-]
Thursday, January 25, 2024
19 19 3 pgs motion Leave to File Document Thu 01/25 6:23 PM
MOTION for Leave to File Answer to Plaintiff's Amended Complaint Following Ruling on Limited Motion to Dismiss by KIRKLAND & ELLIS, LLP.(Morency, Francesca)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 2 pgs Text of Proposed Order
18 18 3 pgs motion Dismiss Thu 01/25 6:08 PM
MOTION to Dismiss [Limited Motion to Dismiss Plaintiff's Amended Complaint] by KIRKLAND & ELLIS, LLP.(Morency, Francesca)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 18 pgs Memorandum in Support of Defendant Kirkland & Ellis LLP's Limited Motion to Dismiss Plaintiff's Amended Complaint,
Att: 2 4 pgs Exhibit A,
Att: 3 3 pgs Text of Proposed Order
Tuesday, December 26, 2023
utility Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings Tue 12/26 3:11 PM
Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings: Response to amended complaint due by 1/23/2024. (zcdw)
Related: [-]
Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings: Response to amended complaint due by 1/25/2024. (zcdw) Modified on 1/2/2024 (zcdw).
Related: [-]
Saturday, December 23, 2023
order Order on Motion to Dismiss Order on Motion for Leave to File Sat 12/23 3:25 PM
MINUTE ORDER: Denying as Moot Defendant's11 Partial Motion to Dismiss and12 Motion for Leave to File Answer to Plaintiff's Complaint Following Ruling on Partial Motion to Dismiss, in light of the16 Amended Complaint filed by the Plaintiff. See Barnes v. District of Columbia, 42 F. Supp. 3d 111, 117 (D.D.C. 2014) ("When a plaintiff files an amended complaint as of right within 21 days after the filing of the motion to dismiss under Rule 12(b), (e), or (f), the amended complaint becomes the operative pleading... and any pending motion to dismiss becomes moot.") (citations omitted); 6 Charles Allen Wright & Arthur R. Miller, Federal Practice and Procedure § 1476 (3d ed. 2010) (an amended pleading "under Rule 15(a) supersedes the pleading it modifies and remains in effect throughout the action unless it subsequently is modified"). Defendant's response to the Amended Complaint is due January 25, 2024. Signed by Judge Tanya S. Chutkan on 12/23/2023. (lca)
Related: [-]
Thursday, December 21, 2023
17 17 2 pgs respm Memorandum in opposition to motion Thu 12/21 4:05 PM
Memorandum in opposition to re11 Motion to Dismiss,12 Motion for Leave to File, filed by TYRONE GIBSON. (Lease, Katherine)
Related: [-]
16 16 16 pgs cmp Amended Complaint Thu 12/21 3:52 PM
AMENDED COMPLAINT against KIRKLAND & ELLIS, LLP with Jury Demand filed by TYRONE GIBSON.(Lease, Katherine)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, December 13, 2023
order Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply Wed 12/13 11:41 AM
MINUTE ORDER: GRANTING Plaintiff's15 Consent Motion for Extension of Time. Plaintiff's opposition to the11 motion to dismiss and12 motion for leave is due 12/21/2023. Defendant's reply is due 1/4/2024. Signed by Judge Tanya S. Chutkan on 12/13/2023. (lca)
Related: [-]
utility Set/Reset Deadlines Thu 12/28 9:08 AM
Set/Reset Deadlines: Defendant's reply is due 1/4/2024. (ztl)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, December 12, 2023
15 15 motion Extension of Time to File Response/Reply Tue 12/12 3:47 PM
Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to11 MOTION to Dismiss Counts 2, 5, 8, and 12 of the Complaint ,12 MOTION for Leave to File Answer to Plaintiff's Complaint following ruling on Limited Motion to Dismiss Counts 2, 5, 8, and 12 of the Complaint and Supporting Memorandum by TYRONE GIBSON.(Lease, Katherine)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 1 pgs Text of Proposed Order
Friday, December 01, 2023
14 14 notice Notice of Appearance Fri 12/01 9:21 AM
NOTICE of Appearance by Jill Lisa Rosenberg on behalf of KIRKLAND & ELLIS, LLP (Rosenberg, Jill)
Related: [-]
13 13 notice Notice of Appearance Fri 12/01 8:50 AM
NOTICE of Appearance by Lynne Hermle on behalf of KIRKLAND & ELLIS, LLP (Hermle, Lynne)
Related: [-]
Thursday, November 30, 2023
12 12 motion Leave to File Document Thu 11/30 11:25 PM
MOTION for Leave to File Answer to Plaintiff's Complaint following ruling on Limited Motion to Dismiss Counts 2, 5, 8, and 12 of the Complaint and Supporting Memorandum by KIRKLAND & ELLIS, LLP.(Morency, Francesca)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 1 pgs Text of Proposed Order
11 11 3 pgs motion Dismiss Thu 11/30 11:12 PM
MOTION to Dismiss Counts 2, 5, 8, and 12 of the Complaint by KIRKLAND & ELLIS, LLP.(Morency, Francesca)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 23 pgs Memorandum in Support of Motion,
Att: 2 1 pgs Text of Proposed Order
Wednesday, November 29, 2023
order Order on Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Wed 11/29 9:48 AM
MINUTE ORDER: GRANTING10 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Jill L. Rosenberg is hereby admitted pro hac vice to appear in this matter on behalf of Defendant. Counsel should register for e-filing via PACER and file a notice of appearance pursuant to LCvR 83.6(a) [LINK:Click for instructions] . Signed by Judge Tanya S. Chutkan on 11/29/2023. (lca)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, November 28, 2023
10 10 motion Appear Pro Hac Vice Tue 11/28 11:38 AM
MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice :Attorney Name- Jill L. Rosenberg, Filing fee $ 100, receipt number ADCDC-10520539. Fee Status: Fee Paid. by KIRKLAND & ELLIS, LLP.(Morency, Francesca)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Declaration of Jill Rosenberg,
Att: 2 Certificate of Good Standing,
Att: 3 Text of Proposed Order
Tuesday, November 21, 2023
order Order on Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Tue 11/21 5:19 PM
MINUTE ORDER: GRANTING8 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Lynne C. Hermle is hereby admitted pro hac vice to appear in this matter on behalf of Defendant. Counsel should register for e-filing via PACER and file a notice of appearance pursuant to LCvR 83.6(a) [LINK:Click for instructions] . Signed by Judge Tanya S. Chutkan on 11/21/2023. (lca)
Related: [-]
Monday, November 20, 2023
9 9 misc Receipt of Superior Court Transfer Documents Tue 11/21 9:48 AM
Receipt on 11/20/2023 of ORIGINAL FILE, certified copy of transfer order and docket sheet from Superior Court. Superior Court Number 2023-CAB-006389. (zjm)
Related: [-]
8 8 motion Appear Pro Hac Vice Mon 11/20 5:28 PM
MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice :Attorney Name- Lynne Hermle, Filing fee $ 100, receipt number ADCDC-10509364. Fee Status: Fee Paid. by KIRKLAND & ELLIS, LLP.(Morency, Francesca)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 2 pgs Declaration of Lynne Hermle,
Att: 2 Exhibit A to Declaration of Lynne Hermle,
Att: 3 Exhibit B to Declaration of Lynne Hermle,
Att: 4 Exhibit Certificate of Good Standing,
Att: 5 Text of Proposed Order
Tuesday, November 14, 2023
7 7 3 pgs motion Extension of Time to File Answer Tue 11/14 4:27 PM
Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer by KIRKLAND & ELLIS, LLP.(Morency, Francesca)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 1 pgs Text of Proposed Order
6 6 2 pgs notice Notice of Appearance Tue 11/14 11:19 AM
NOTICE of Appearance by Katherine Lease on behalf of TYRONE GIBSON (Lease, Katherine)
Related: [-]
order Order on Motion for Extension of Time to Answer Tue 11/14 4:37 PM
MINUTE ORDER: GRANTING Defendant's7 Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time. Defendant's response to Plaintiff's Complaint is due 11/30/2023. Prior to 11/30/23, Plaintiff is directed to file a copy of the Complaint as a separate ECF entry. Signed by Judge Tanya S. Chutkan on 11/14/2023. (lca)
Related: [-]
Monday, November 13, 2023
5 5 1 pgs notice Notice to Counsel/Party Mon 11/13 10:49 AM
NOTICE to Counsel/Party (zdp)
Related: [-]
utility Case Assigned/Reassigned Mon 11/13 10:47 AM
Case Assigned to Judge Tanya S. Chutkan. (zdp)
Related: [-]
Thursday, November 09, 2023
4 4 2 pgs notice LCvR 26.1 Certificate of Disclosure - Corporate Affiliations/Financial Interests Thu 11/09 3:42 PM
LCvR 26.1 CERTIFICATE OF DISCLOSURE of Corporate Affiliations and Financial Interests by KIRKLAND & ELLIS, LLP (Morency, Francesca)
Related: [-]
3 3 notice Notice (Other) Thu 11/09 3:38 PM
NOTICE of Service by KIRKLAND & ELLIS, LLP re2 Notice of Appearance (Morency, Francesca)
Related: [-]
2 2 1 pgs notice Notice of Appearance Thu 11/09 3:35 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by Francesca Morency on behalf of KIRKLAND & ELLIS, LLP (Morency, Francesca)
Related: [-]
1 1 4 pgs cmp Notice of Removal Thu 11/09 3:32 PM
NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Superior Court of the District of Columbia, case number 2023-CAB-006389 Filing fee $ 402, receipt number ADCDC-10485921 filed by KIRKLAND & ELLIS, LLP.(Morency, Francesca)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 3 pgs Civil Cover Sheet Exhibit A,
Att: 2 32 pgs Exhibit B - Copies of State Court File,
Att: 3 2 pgs Exhibit C - List of Counsel,
Att: 4 3 pgs Exhibit D - Register of State Court Action,
Att: 5 3 pgs Exhibit E - Notice of Filing of Notice of Removal