Washington Western District Court
Judge:Tiffany M Cartwright
Case #: 3:23-cv-06025
Nature of Suit440 Civil Rights - Other Civil Rights
Cause28:1441 Petition for Removal- Civil Rights Act
Case Filed:Nov 09, 2023
Case in other court:Pierce County Superior Court, 23-00002-10299-7
Last checked: Tuesday May 07, 2024 2:16 AM PDT
Defendant
Brian Johnson
Represented By
Kristal M Cowger
Pierce County Prosecuting Attorney'S Office
contact info
Jonathan R Salamas
Pierce County Prosecuting Attorney'S Office
contact info
Defendant
Pierce County
Represented By
Kristal M Cowger
Pierce County Prosecuting Attorney'S Office
contact info
Jonathan R Salamas
Pierce County Prosecuting Attorney'S Office
contact info
Defendant
Ed Troyer
Represented By
Kristal M Cowger
Pierce County Prosecuting Attorney'S Office
contact info
Jonathan R Salamas
Pierce County Prosecuting Attorney'S Office
contact info
Defendant
Does 1-9
Plaintiff
Bryan Jose Galeana Mendoza
Represented By
Tiffany L Wilke
Cochran Douglas PLLC
contact info
Nicholas B. Douglas
Cochran Douglas PLLC
contact info
Loren A Cochran
Cochran Douglas PLLC
contact info


Docket last updated: 4 hours ago
Thursday, May 01, 2025
utility Terminate Deadlines/Hearings Thu 05/01 8:44 AM
All Deadlines/Hearings associated with pretrial and trial dates terminated. (MET)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, April 30, 2025
23 23 9 pgs order Order on Motion to Stay Wed 04/30 9:15 AM
ORDER granting Plaintiff's18 Motion to Stay. This case is stayed until the two parallel state criminal matters, cause numbers 21 1-03041 4 and 22 1-01487 5, are resolved. The parties shall file a joint status report no later than October 30, 2025, apprising the Court on the status of the criminal matters, and every six months thereafter, until the stay is lifted. Any party may move to lift the stay once the criminal cases are resolved, or for other good cause. Signed by District Judge Tiffany M. Cartwright.(MW)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, March 12, 2025
22 22 respm Reply to Response to Motion Wed 03/12 12:39 PM
REPLY, filed by Plaintiff Bryan Jose Galeana Mendoza, TO RESPONSE to18 MOTION to Stay (Cochran, Loren)
Related: [-]
Friday, March 07, 2025
21 21 respm Declaration Fri 03/07 3:12 PM
DECLARATION of Brad Hashimoto ISO Response to Plfts Motion to Stay filed by Defendants Pierce County, Brian Johnson, Ed Troyer re18 MOTION to Stay(Hashimoto, Bradford)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit 1,
Att: 2 Exhibit 2,
Att: 3 Exhibit 3,
Att: 4 Exhibit 4,
Att: 5 Exhibit 5,
Att: 6 Exhibit 6,
Att: 7 Exhibit 7,
Att: 8 Exhibit 8,
Att: 9 Exhibit 9,
Att: 10 Exhibit 10,
Att: 11 Exhibit 11,
Att: 12 Exhibit 12,
Att: 13 Exhibit 13
20 20 respm Response to Motion Fri 03/07 3:08 PM
RESPONSE, by Defendants Pierce County, Brian Johnson, Ed Troyer, to18 MOTION to Stay .(Hashimoto, Bradford)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proposed Order
Thursday, February 20, 2025
19 19 respm Declaration Thu 02/20 5:58 PM
DECLARATION of Loren A. Cochran filed by Plaintiff Bryan Jose Galeana Mendoza re18 MOTION to Stay (Cochran, Loren)
Related: [-]
18 18 motion Stay Thu 02/20 5:57 PM
MOTION to Stay , filed by All Plaintiffs. Noting Date 3/14/2025, (Cochran, Loren)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, January 15, 2025
17 17 notice Notice of Withdrawal of Counsel Wed 01/15 1:36 PM
NOTICE OF WITHDRAWAL OF COUNSEL: Attorney Kristal M Cowger for Defendants Pierce County, Brian Johnson, Ed Troyer. (Cowger, Kristal)
Related: [-]
16 16 notice Notice of Attorney Association Wed 01/15 1:33 PM
NOTICE of Association of Attorney by Miles F Russell on behalf of Defendants Pierce County, Brian Johnson, Ed Troyer. (Russell, Miles)
Related: [-]
utility Add and Terminate Attorneys Wed 01/15 4:00 PM
Attorney Bradford David Hashimoto added for Brian Johnson, Pierce County, Ed Troyer; per16 Notice of Attorney Association. (MW)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, August 14, 2024
15 15 order TMC Minute Order Setting Trial and Pretrial Dates (FORM) Wed 08/14 2:01 PM
MINUTE ORDER RESETTING TRIAL AND PRETRIAL DATES by District Judge Tiffany M. Cartwright. *12 DAY* Jury Trial is RESET for 1/12/2026 at 09:00 AM in Courtroom C before District Judge Tiffany M. Cartwright. Joinder of Parties due by 11/12/2024, Amended Pleadings due by 11/25/2024, Expert Witness Disclosure/Reports under FRCP 26(a)(2) due by 6/16/2025, Rebuttal Expert Disclosure/Reports due by 7/16/2025, Discovery Motions due by 7/16/2025, Attorney settlement conference to be held by 8/15/2025, Discovery completed by 8/15/2025, Dispositive motions due by 9/15/2025, Motions in Limine due by 12/8/2025, Pretrial Order due by 12/22/2025, Voir dire/jury instructions/trial briefs due by 12/22/2025, Agreed Neutral Statement of the Case due by 12/22/2025, Deposition Designations due by 12/22/2025, Pretrial Conference set for 12/30/2025 at 03:00 PM in Courtroom C before District Judge Tiffany M. Cartwright. (MET)
Related: [-]
14 14 5 pgs order Order on Stipulated Motion Wed 08/14 11:59 AM
ORDER granting Parties'13 Stipulated MOTION To Continue Trial Date . The trial date in this matter, currently scheduled for June 16, 2025 shall be continued to January 12, 2026, and a new case scheduling order will be issued. Signed by District Judge Tiffany M. Cartwright.(MW)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, August 13, 2024
13 13 motion Stipulated Motion Tue 08/13 3:36 PM
Stipulated MOTION To Continue Trial Date , filed by Plaintiff Bryan Jose Galeana Mendoza. Noting Date 8/13/2024, (Cochran, Loren)
Related: [-]
Thursday, February 15, 2024
12 12 order TMC Minute Order Setting Trial and Pretrial Dates (FORM) Thu 02/15 5:41 PM
MINUTE ORDER SETTING TRIAL AND PRETRIAL DATES by District Judge Tiffany M. Cartwright. *12 DAY* Jury Trial is set for 6/16/2025 at 09:00 AM in Courtroom C before District Judge Tiffany M. Cartwright. Joinder of Parties due by 5/15/2024, Amended Pleadings due by 5/28/2024, Expert Witness Disclosure/Reports under FRCP 26(a)(2) due by 11/18/2024, Rebuttal Expert Disclosure/Reports due by 12/18/2024, Discovery Motions due by 12/18/2024, Attorney settlement conference to be held by 1/17/2025, Discovery completed by 1/17/2025, Dispositive motions due by 2/18/2025, Motions in Limine due by 5/12/2025, Pretrial Order due by 5/27/2025, Voir dire/jury instructions/trial briefs due by 5/27/2025, Agreed Neutral Statement of the Case due by 5/27/2025, Deposition Designations due by 5/27/2025, Pretrial Conference set for 6/3/2025 at 03:00 PM in Courtroom C before District Judge Tiffany M. Cartwright. (MET)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, February 14, 2024
11 11 misc Joint Status Report Wed 02/14 3:00 PM
JOINT STATUS REPORT signed by all parties. Estimated Trial Days: 12. Filed by Plaintiff Bryan Jose Galeana Mendoza.(Cochran, Loren)
Related: [-]
Thursday, November 16, 2023
10 10 order TMC - Discovery, Depositions, and JSR Order (FORM) Thu 11/16 12:48 PM
ORDER REGARDING INITIAL DISCLOSURES, JOINT STATUS REPORT, DISCOVERY, DEPOSITIONS AND EARLY SETTLEMENT by District Judge Tiffany M. Cartwright. FRCP 26(f) Conference Deadline is 1/31/2024, Initial Disclosure Deadline is 2/7/2024, Joint Status Report due by 2/14/2024. (MET)
Related: [-]
9 9 answer Answer to Complaint Thu 11/16 9:07 AM
ANSWER to Complaint; (Dkt. No. 1-2); with JURY DEMAND by Brian Johnson, Pierce County, Ed Troyer.(Cowger, Kristal)
Related: [-]
Monday, November 13, 2023
8 8 1 pgs order Order Reassigning Case Mon 11/13 3:15 PM
MINUTE ORDER REASSIGNING CASE by Clerk Ravi Subramanian. Case reassigned to District Judge Tiffany M. Cartwright for all further proceedings. Hon. Michelle L. Peterson no longer assigned to case. (TF)
Related: [-]
7 7 misc Consent Letter & Form Mon 11/13 12:05 PM
NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT TO A US MAGISTRATE JUDGE AND DECLINATION OF CONSENT FORM. Each party will be deemed to have knowingly and voluntarily consented to proceed before a Magistrate Judge if this form is not returned by 11/20/2023. Please Note: Forms must not be electronically filed with the Court. (TF)
Related: [-]
6 6 utility Judge Assignment Letter (Removal & Transfer cases only) Mon 11/13 12:02 PM
LETTER from Clerk re receipt of case from Pierce County Superior Court and advising of WAWD case number and judge assignment. JURY DEMAND - properly submitted federal court jury demand on file (AMD)
Related: [-]
utility Add and Terminate Judges Mon 11/13 12:01 PM
Hon. Michelle L. Peterson added. (AMD)
Related: [-]
Thursday, November 09, 2023
5 5 service Certificate of Service Thu 11/09 1:01 PM
CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Defendants Brian Johnson, Pierce County, Ed Troyer re2 Notice of Appearance,3 Jury Demand,1 Notice of Removal,4 Verification of State Court Records (Cowger, Kristal)
Related: [-]
4 4 misc Verification of State Court Records Thu 11/09 12:53 PM
VERIFICATION OF STATE COURT RECORDS by Defendants Brian Johnson, Pierce County, Ed Troyer(Cowger, Kristal)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A
3 3 misc Jury Demand Thu 11/09 12:47 PM
DEMAND for JURY TRIAL by Defendants Brian Johnson, Pierce County, Ed Troyer (Cowger, Kristal)
Related: [-]
2 2 notice Notice of Appearance Thu 11/09 12:43 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by attorney Jonathan R Salamas on behalf of Defendants Brian Johnson, Pierce County, Ed Troyer. (Salamas, Jonathan)
Related: [-]
1 1 cmp Notice of Removal Thu 11/09 12:39 PM
NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Pierce County Superior Court, case number 23 2-10299 7; Related [+] Attorney Kristal M Cowger added to party Brian Johnson(pty:dft), Attorney Kristal M Cowger added to party Pierce County(pty:dft), Attorney Kristal M Cowger added to party Ed Troyer(pty:dft) filed by Brian Johnson, Ed Troyer, Pierce County.(Cowger, Kristal)
Related: [-] ceipt # AWAWDC-8235479
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet,
Att: 2 Complaint Exhibit A,
Att: 3 Summons Exhibit B