Washington Western District Court
Judge:Benjamin H Settle
Case #: 3:23-cv-06026
Nature of Suit360 Torts - Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury
Cause28:1331 Fed. Question: Personal Injury
Case Filed:Nov 09, 2023
Last checked: Tuesday May 07, 2024 2:16 AM PDT
Defendant
Adna School District
Represented By
Sean E Harkins
Evans Craven & Lackie (spokane)
contact info
Michael E McFarland, Jr
Evans Craven & Lackie (spokane)
contact info
Defendant
Cristina Parks
Represented By
Sean E Harkins
Evans Craven & Lackie (spokane)
contact info
Michael E McFarland, Jr
Evans Craven & Lackie (spokane)
contact info
Defendant
Shanda Veatch
Represented By
Francis S Floyd
Floyd Pflueger Kearns Nedderman & Gress Ps
contact info
Danielle P Smith
Floyd Pflueger & Ringer Ps
contact info
Defendant
William Veatch
Represented By
Francis S Floyd
Floyd Pflueger Kearns Nedderman & Gress Ps
contact info
Danielle P Smith
Floyd Pflueger & Ringer Ps
contact info
Defendant
John/Jane Does 1-7
Plaintiff
P.S.
Represented By
Marta Lynn O'Brien
Connelly Law Offices PLLC
contact info
Evan Thomas Fuller
Connelly Law Offices PLLC
contact info


Docket last updated: 2 hours ago
Thursday, April 03, 2025
53 53 order BHS Minute Order Setting Trial and Pretrial Dates (FORM) Thu 04/03 9:56 AM
MINUTE ORDER SETTING TRIAL AND PRETRIAL DATES by Judge Benjamin H. Settle. *8 DAY* Jury Trial is set for 12/9/2025 at 09:00 AM in Courtroom E before Judge Benjamin H. Settle. Motions in Limine due by 11/3/2025, Pretrial Order due by 11/17/2025, Voir dire/jury instructions/trial briefs due by 11/18/2025, Agreed Neutral Statement of the Case due by 11/18/2025, Deposition Designations due by 11/18/2025, Pretrial Conference set for 11/24/2025 at 03:00 PM in Courtroom E before Judge Benjamin H. Settle. The court will not provide remote public access for this hearing. (MET)
Related: [-]