District Of Columbia District Court
Judge:Trevor N Mcfadden
Case #: 1:23-cv-03374
Nature of Suit791 Labor - Employee Retirement Income Security Act
Cause29:1132 E.R.I.S.A.-Employee Benefits
Case Filed:Nov 13, 2023
Terminated:Nov 06, 2024
Last checked: Saturday May 11, 2024 5:12 AM EDT
Defendant
WHITEWATER MANUFACTURING COMPANY
1108 E. Bluff Road
Whitewater, WI 53190
Represented By
Michael J. Schrier
Husch Blackwell LLP
contact info
Plaintiff
TRUSTEES OF THE I.A.M. NATIONAL PENSION FUND
Represented By
Richard S. Siegel
Slevin & Hart, P.C.
contact info
Kristina Salamoun
Slevin & Hart P.C.
contact info


Docket last updated: 05/15/2025 11:59 PM EDT
Wednesday, November 06, 2024
15 15 order .Order Wed 11/06 11:03 AM
ORDER: Upon consideration of the parties'14 Joint Stipulation of Dismissal, this matter is DISMISSED without prejudice pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 41(a)(2). Each party shall bear its own attorney's costs and fees, except as otherwise provided in the Settlement Agreement, as stipulated. The Court will retain jurisdiction to enforce the terms of the Settlement Agreement, as discussed in Kokkonen v. Guardian Life Ins., 511 U.S. 375, 381-82 (1994). See attached order for details. The Clerk of Court is directed to close the case. SO ORDERED. Signed by Judge Trevor N. McFadden on 11/6/2024. (lctnm2)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, November 05, 2024
14 14 misc Stipulation of Dismissal Tue 11/05 3:05 PM
STIPULATION of Dismissal by TRUSTEES OF THE I.A.M. NATIONAL PENSION FUND.(Siegel, Richard)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Text of Proposed Order
Friday, September 27, 2024
order .Order ~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings Fri 09/27 3:51 PM
MINUTE ORDER: Considering the parties'13 Joint Status Report, the Court ORDERS that the parties abide by the following discovery schedule. Discovery shall commence on November 4, 2024. Discovery shall be completed by March 4, 2025. The Court FURTHER ORDERS the parties to appear for a telephonic post-discovery status conference on March 14, 2025, at 10:00 am. SO ORDERED. Signed by Judge Trevor N. McFadden on 9/27/2024. (lctnm2)
Related: [-]
Thursday, September 26, 2024
13 13 misc Status Report Thu 09/26 8:16 AM
Joint STATUS REPORT by TRUSTEES OF THE I.A.M. NATIONAL PENSION FUND. (Siegel, Richard)
Related: [-]
12 12 notice Notice of Change of Address Thu 09/26 8:15 AM
NOTICE of Change of Address by Richard S. Siegel (Siegel, Richard)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, September 04, 2024
minutes Status Conference ~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines Wed 09/04 3:27 PM
Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Trevor N. McFadden: Telephonic Status Conference held on 9/4/2024. Joint Status Report due by 9/26/2024, proposing a scheduling order with November 4, 2024, as the start of discovery. (Court Reporter: Lisa Edwards.) (hmc)
Related: [-]
Friday, August 02, 2024
minutes Status Conference ~Util - Set/Reset Hearings Fri 08/02 11:35 AM
Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Trevor N. McFadden: Telephonic Status Conference held on 8/2/2024. Telephonic Status Conference set for 9/4/2024 at 2:00 PM before Judge Trevor N. McFadden. (Court Reporter: Lisa Edwards.) (hmc)
Related: [-]
Thursday, May 23, 2024
minutes Status Conference ~Util - Set/Reset Hearings Thu 05/23 10:27 AM
Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Trevor N. McFadden: Telephonic Status Conference held on 5/23/2024. Telephonic Status Conference set for 8/2/2024 at 10:00 AM before Judge Trevor N. McFadden. (Court Reporter: Lisa Edwards.) (hmc)
Related: [-]
Friday, March 15, 2024
11 11 notice Notice of Withdrawal of Appearance Fri 03/15 1:58 PM
NOTICE OF WITHDRAWAL OF APPEARANCE as to TRUSTEES OF THE I.A.M. NATIONAL PENSION FUND. Attorney Kristina Salamoun terminated. (Salamoun, Kristina)
Related: [-]
Friday, February 23, 2024
minutes Status Conference ~Util - Set/Reset Hearings Fri 02/23 10:44 AM
Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Trevor N. McFadden: Case called for Initial Scheduling Conference, but not held. Telephonic Status Conference held on 2/23/2024. A further telephonic Status Conference is set for 5/23/2024 at 10:00 AM before Judge Trevor N. McFadden. (Court Reporter: Christine Asif.) (hmc)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, February 13, 2024
10 10 misc Meet and Confer Statement Tue 02/13 5:51 PM
MEET AND CONFER STATEMENT.(Siegel, Richard)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Text of Proposed Order
Tuesday, February 06, 2024
9 9 notice Notice of Appearance Tue 02/06 4:41 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by Kristina Salamoun on behalf of TRUSTEES OF THE I.A.M. NATIONAL PENSION FUND (Salamoun, Kristina)
Related: [-]
Friday, January 19, 2024
8 8 order .Order ~Util - Set/Reset Hearings Fri 01/19 9:57 AM
ORDER setting initial telephonic status conference. See attached Order for details. Signed by Judge Trevor N. McFadden on 1/19/2024. (lctnm2)
Related: [-]
Thursday, January 18, 2024
7 7 notice LCvR 26.1 Certificate of Disclosure - Corporate Affiliations/Financial Interests Thu 01/18 11:28 AM
LCvR 26.1 CERTIFICATE OF DISCLOSURE of Corporate Affiliations and Financial Interests of Defendant by WHITEWATER MANUFACTURING COMPANY (Schrier, Michael)
Related: [-]
6 6 answer Answer to Complaint Thu 01/18 11:27 AM
ANSWER to Complaint by WHITEWATER MANUFACTURING COMPANY.(Schrier, Michael)
Related: [-]
Friday, December 15, 2023
order Order on Motion for Extension of Time to Fri 12/15 10:12 AM
MINUTE ORDER: Defendant's5 Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to Respond to Complaint is GRANTED. Defendant shall now file its response to Plaintiff's Complaint by or on January 18, 2024. The parties are admonished to strictly abide by the Court's Standing Order3 in the future. SO ORDERED. Signed by Judge Trevor N. McFadden on 12/15/2023. (lctnm2)
Related: [-]
utility Set/Reset Deadlines Fri 12/15 11:05 AM
Set/Reset Deadlines: Answer due by 1/18/2024. (hmc)
Related: [-]
Thursday, December 14, 2023
5 5 motion Extension of Time to Thu 12/14 6:29 PM
Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to Respond to Complaint by WHITEWATER MANUFACTURING COMPANY.(Schrier, Michael)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Text of Proposed Order
4 4 notice Notice of Appearance Thu 12/14 6:24 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by Michael J. Schrier on behalf of WHITEWATER MANUFACTURING COMPANY (Schrier, Michael)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, November 14, 2023
3 3 order .Order Tue 11/14 5:41 PM
STANDING ORDER Establishing Procedures for Cases Before Judge Trevor N. McFadden. The parties are hereby ORDERED to read and comply with the directives in the attached standing order. Signed by Judge Trevor N. McFadden on 11/14/2023. (lctnm2)
Related: [-]
2 2 service Electronic Summons Issued Tue 11/14 12:47 PM
SUMMONS (1) Issued Electronically as to WHITEWATER MANUFACTURING COMPANY.(zrtw)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Notice and Consent
utility Case Assigned/Reassigned Tue 11/14 11:58 AM
Case Assigned to Judge Trevor N. McFadden. (zrtw)
Related: [-]
Monday, November 13, 2023
1 1 cmp Complaint Mon 11/13 10:49 AM
COMPLAINT against IAM NATIONAL PENSION FUND ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number ADCDC-10488451) filed by IAM NATIONAL PENSION FUND.(Siegel, Richard)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Summons,
Att: 2 Civil Cover Sheet