Michigan Eastern District Court
Judge:Linda V Parker
Referred: Elizabeth A Stafford
Case #: 2:23-cv-12854
Nature of Suit830 Property Rights - Patent
Cause35:271 Patent Infringement
Case Filed:Nov 09, 2023
Terminated:Mar 27, 2024
Last checked: Tuesday May 07, 2024 5:01 AM EDT
Defendant
Vitrica S.A. de C.V.
Plaintiff
Federal-Mogul Powertrain LLC
Represented By
Megan Piper McKnight
Tealstone Law, PLC
contact info


Docket last updated: 3 hours ago
Tuesday, May 28, 2024
8 8 misc Patent/Copyright/Trademark Report Tue 05/28 1:55 PM
Patent Report Sent To Washington (SSch)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, March 27, 2024
7 7 order Dismissing Case Wed 03/27 2:43 PM
ORDER DISMISSING CASE Signed by District Judge Linda V. Parker. (AFla)
Related: [-]
6 6 notice Voluntary Dismissal Wed 03/27 2:05 PM
NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by Federal-Mogul Powertrain LLC (McKnight, Megan)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, February 06, 2024
5 5 service Waiver of Service Executed - 90 Day Tue 02/06 10:35 AM
WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed. Vitrica S.A. de C.V. waiver sent on 2/2/2024, answer due 5/2/2024. (McKnight, Megan)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, November 22, 2023
4 4 misc Statement of Disclosure of Corporate Affiliations Wed 11/22 5:47 PM
STATEMENT of DISCLOSURE of CORPORATE AFFILIATIONS and FINANCIAL INTEREST by Federal-Mogul Powertrain LLC identifying Other Affiliate Apollo Global Managment, Inc. for Federal-Mogul Powertrain LLC. (McKnight, Megan)
Related: [-]
3 3 misc Patent/Copyright/Trademark Report Wed 11/22 5:44 PM
Patent Report Sent To Washington (McKnight, Megan)
Related: [-]
Monday, November 13, 2023
2 2 service Summons Issued* Mon 11/13 10:23 AM
SUMMONS Issued for *Vitrica S.A. de C.V.* (SSch)
Related: [-]
notice Notice to Parties of Consent of a Civil Action before a Magistrate Judge Option Mon 11/13 10:24 AM
A United States Magistrate Judge of this Court is available to conduct all proceedings in this civil action in accordance with 28 U.S.C. 636c and FRCP 73. The Notice, Consent, and Reference of a Civil Action to a Magistrate Judge form is available for download at[LINK:http://www.mied.uscourts.gov] (SSch)
Related: [-]
Thursday, November 09, 2023
1 1 19 pgs cmp Civil Case - Complaint Thu 11/09 5:59 PM
COMPLAINT filed by Federal-Mogul Powertrain LLC against Vitrica S.A. de C.V. with Jury Demand. Plaintiff requests summons issued. Receipt No: AMIEDC-9557724 - Fee: $ 402. County of 1st Plaintiff: Wayne - County Where Action Arose: Wayne - County of 1st Defendant: Out of Country. [ Previously dismissed case: No] [ Possible companion case(s): None ] (McKnight, Megan)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit