Hawaii District Court
Judge:Leslie E Kobayashi
Referred: Kenneth J Mansfield
Case #: 1:23-cv-00457
Nature of Suit360 Torts - Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury
Cause28:2671 Federal Tort Claims Act
Case Filed:Nov 09, 2023
Last checked: Monday May 06, 2024 10:47 PM HST
Defendant
United States of America
Represented By
Alanna Horan
United States Department Of Justice
contact info
Kenneth Alexander Haywood
Doj-Civ
contact info
Marianne F. Kies
Doj-Civil Division
contact info
Anna Ellison
Doj-Civ
contact info
Caroline Stanton
Doj-Civ
contact info
Eric A. Rey
Doj-Civ
contact info
Rosemary C. Yogiaveetil
Doj-Civ
contact info
Lucas R. White
Doj-Civ
contact info
Plaintiff
Amanda Feindt
Represented By
Spencer Jeki Lau
Hosoda & Bonner Lllc
contact info
Kristen Hermiz
Motley Rice LLC
contact info
Lyle S. Hosoda
Hosoda Law Group
contact info
Kristina Baehr
Just Well Law, PLLC
contact info
James Baehr
Just Well Law, PLLC
contact info
James W. Ledlie
Motley Rice LLC
contact info
Cynthia A. Solomon
Motley Rice LLC
contact info
Kourtney H. L. M Wong
Hosoda Law Group
contact info
Mary M. Neusel
Just Well Law, PLLC
contact info
Frederick C. Baker
Motley Rice LLC
contact info
Plaintiff
Brian Jessup
Represented By
Spencer Jeki Lau
Hosoda & Bonner Lllc
contact info
Kristen Hermiz
Motley Rice LLC
contact info
Lyle S. Hosoda
Hosoda Law Group
contact info
Kristina Baehr
Just Well Law, PLLC
contact info
James Baehr
Just Well Law, PLLC
contact info
James W. Ledlie
Motley Rice LLC
contact info
Cynthia A. Solomon
Motley Rice LLC
contact info
Kourtney H. L. M Wong
Hosoda Law Group
contact info
Mary M. Neusel
Just Well Law, PLLC
contact info
Frederick C. Baker
Motley Rice LLC
contact info
Plaintiff
Elizabeth Thompson-Watson
Represented By
Spencer Jeki Lau
Hosoda & Bonner Lllc
contact info
Kristen Hermiz
Motley Rice LLC
contact info
Lyle S. Hosoda
Hosoda Law Group
contact info
Kristina Baehr
Just Well Law, PLLC
contact info
James Baehr
Just Well Law, PLLC
contact info
James W. Ledlie
Motley Rice LLC
contact info
Cynthia A. Solomon
Motley Rice LLC
contact info
Kourtney H. L. M Wong
Hosoda Law Group
contact info
Mary M. Neusel
Just Well Law, PLLC
contact info
Frederick C. Baker
Motley Rice LLC
contact info
Plaintiff
Dustin Wallace
Represented By
Spencer Jeki Lau
Hosoda & Bonner Lllc
contact info
Kristen Hermiz
Motley Rice LLC
contact info
Lyle S. Hosoda
Hosoda Law Group
contact info
Kristina Baehr
Just Well Law, PLLC
contact info
James Baehr
Just Well Law, PLLC
contact info
James W. Ledlie
Motley Rice LLC
contact info
Cynthia A. Solomon
Motley Rice LLC
contact info
Kourtney H. L. M Wong
Hosoda Law Group
contact info
Mary M. Neusel
Just Well Law, PLLC
contact info
Frederick C. Baker
Motley Rice LLC
contact info
Plaintiff
Jessica Whaley
Represented By
Spencer Jeki Lau
Hosoda & Bonner Lllc
contact info
Kristen Hermiz
Motley Rice LLC
contact info
Lyle S. Hosoda
Hosoda Law Group
contact info
Kristina Baehr
Just Well Law, PLLC
contact info
James Baehr
Just Well Law, PLLC
contact info
James W. Ledlie
Motley Rice LLC
contact info
Cynthia A. Solomon
Motley Rice LLC
contact info
Kourtney H. L. M Wong
Hosoda Law Group
contact info
Mary M. Neusel
Just Well Law, PLLC
contact info
Frederick C. Baker
Motley Rice LLC
contact info

GPO Mar 28 2024
d the portion of Count II alleging failure to remediate affected homes, and the portions of Counts I and II alleging failure to test are DISMISSED. The Motion is DENIED insofar as the dismissal of the portion of Count II alleging failure to remediORDER GRANTING IN PART AND DENYING IN PART DEFENDANT'S PARTIAL MOTION TO DISMISS COMPLAINT [ECF NO. 1] re 21 - Signed by JUDGE LESLIE E. KOBAYASHI on 3/28/2024. For the foregoing reasons, Defendant's Partial Motion to Dismiss Complaint [ECF No. 1], filed January 16, 2024, is HEREBY GRANTED IN PART IN PART AND DENIED IN PART. The Motion is GRANTED insofar as: the portions of Counts I and II alleging failure to warn are DISMISSED WITH PREJUDICE; anate affected homes, and the portions of Counts I and II alleging failure to test is WITHOUT PREJUDICE. Plaintiffs are GRANTED leave to file their amended complaint by April 29, 2024. Plaintiffs' leave to amend is limited to addressing the defects identified in this Order. Plaintiffs are not permitted to add other parties, claims, or theories of liability. (eta)
GPO Apr 11 2024
ORDER DENYING PLAINTIFFS' MOTION TO EXCLUDE THE OPINIONS AND TESTIMONY OF DR. WALTER GRAYMAN PURSUANT TO DAUBERT AND FEDERAL RULE OF EVIDENCE 702; AND DENYING PLAINTIFFS' MOTION TO EXCLUDE THE OPINIONS AND TESTIMONY OF DRS. MICHAEL KOSNETT, TIMUR DURRANI, LYLE BURGOOD AND ROBYN PRUEITT PURSUANT TO DAUBERT AND FEDERAL RULES OF EVIDENCE 702 denying (235) Motion in Limine; denying (240) Motion in Limine in case 1:22-cv-00397-LEK-KJM - Signed by JUDGE LESLIE E. KOBAYASHI on 4/11/2024. Associated Cases: 1:22-cv-00397-LEK-KJM, 1:23-cv-00457-LEK-KJM, 1:24-cv-00059-LEK-KJM(eta)
GPO Apr 22 2024
ORDER GRANTING IN PART AND DENYING IN PART DEFENDANT'S MOTION IN LIMINE NO. 1, [FILED 2/26/24 (DKT. NO. 278)] in case 1:22-cv-00397-LEK-KJM - Signed by JUDGE LESLIE E. KOBAYASHI on 4/22/2024. On the basis of the foregoing, Defendant's Motion in Limine No. 1: Exclude Improper Treating-Provider Evidence, filed on February 26, 2024 is HEREBY GRANTED IN PART AND DENIED IN PART. Defendant's MIL No. 1 is GRANTED IN PART insofar as Dr. Keifer cannot opine as to causation and future treatment if those opinions are not supported by his medical records of his treatment and care of Dietz. Defendant's MIL No. 1 is DENIED IN PART insofar as Dr. Keifer can testify to opinions formed during Dietz's treatment regarding causation and future treatment so long as records of his care of Dietz support such opinions. Defendant's MIL No. 1 is GRANTED IN PART in that Dr. Bird is not permitted to testify about Plaintiffs' diagnoses and prognoses. It is DENIED IN PART as to Dr. Bird's opinions on causation to the extent previously ruled upon by this Court. Defendant's MIL No. 1 is GRANTED IN PART insofar as Ms. Burns and Ms. Fricke are not permitted to deliver conclusions from other expert witnesses' reports as their trial testimony. Defendant's MIL No. 1 is DENIED IN PART insofar as Ms. Burns and Ms. Fricke are permitted to testify about the diagnoses and prognoses that they considered and used as assumptions in rendering their opinions as to life care planning. Associated Cases: 1:22-cv-00397-LEK-KJM, 1:23-cv-00457-LEK-KJM, 1:24-cv-00059-LEK-KJM (eta)
GPO Apr 23 2024
ORDER GRANTING DEFENDANT'S MOTION IN LIMINE NO. 2: EXCLUDE EVIDENCE RELATED TO NEGLIGENT OPERATION OF THE RED HILL BULK FUEL STORAGE FACILITY, [FILED 2/26/24 (DKT. NO. 280)] in case 1:22-cv-00397-LEK-KJM - Signed by JUDGE LESLIE E. KOBAYASHI on 4/23/2024. For the reasons stated above, Defendant's Motion in Limine No. 2: Exclude Evidence Related to Negligent Operation of the Red Hill Bulk Fuel Storage Facility, filed 2/26/24 (dkt. no. 280) is GRANTED, and evidence of Defendant's operation of the Red Hill Bulk Fuel Storage Facility prior to November 20, 2021 is EXCLUDED, unless the proponent of the evidence can first establish the evidence is relevant to the remaining issues of causation and compensatory damages. Associated Cases: 1:22-cv-00397-LEK-KJM, 1:23-cv-00457-LEK-KJM, 1:24-cv-00059-LEK-KJM (eta)
GPO May 07 2025
PRELIMINARY FINDINGS OF FACT AND CONCLUSIONS OF LAW - Signed by SENIOR JUDGE LESLIE E. KOBAYASHI on 5/7/2025. Associated Cases: 1:22-cv-00397-LEK-KJM, 1:23-cv-00457-LEK-KJM, 1:24-cv-00059-LEK-KJM (eta)

Docket last updated: 05/18/2025 11:59 PM HST
Wednesday, May 07, 2025
223 223 order Findings of Fact & Conclusions of Law Wed 05/07 2:08 PM
PRELIMINARY FINDINGS OF FACT AND CONCLUSIONS OF LAW - Signed by SENIOR JUDGE LESLIE E. KOBAYASHI on 5/7/2025. Associated Cases: 1:22-cv-00397-LEK-KJM, 1:23-cv-00457-LEK-KJM, 1:24-cv-00059-LEK-KJM (eta)
Related: [-]