California Northern District Court
Judge:Charles R Breyer
Case #: 3:23-cv-05802
Nature of Suit485 Other Statutes - Telephone Consumer Protection Act
Cause47:227 Restrictions of Use of Telephone Equipment
Case Filed:Nov 09, 2023
Last checked: Tuesday May 07, 2024 1:36 AM PDT
Defendant
Money Map Press, LLC
Represented By
Joel Allen Dewey
Baker Donelson
contact info
Plaintiff
Warren Ingram
Represented By
Ryan Lee McBride
Kazerouni Law Group, Apc
contact info
Aryanna Young
contact info

GPO Jul 24 2024
ORDER by Judge Charles R. Breyer granting 21 Motion to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction. (crblc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/24/2024)

Docket last updated: 05/07/2025 11:59 PM PDT
Wednesday, July 24, 2024
32 32 order Judgment Wed 07/24 3:52 PM
JUDGMENT. Signed by Judge Charles R. Breyer on 7/24/2024. (crblc2, COURT STAFF)
Related: [-]
31 31 11 pgs order Order on Motion to Dismiss/Lack of Jurisdiction Wed 07/24 3:45 PM
ORDER by Judge Charles R. Breyer granting 21 Motion to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction. (crblc2, COURT STAFF)
Related: [-]
Monday, June 10, 2024
30 30 oth_evt Clerk's Notice ~Util - Teleconference Zoom Mon 06/10 6:52 AM
CLERK'S NOTICE VACATING Motion to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction hearing set for July 26, 2024 before the Honorable Charles R. Breyer. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) . Motion Hearing set for 8/9/2024 at 10:00 AM in San Francisco - Videoconference Only before Judge Charles R. Breyer. This proceeding will be held via a Zoom webinar. Webinar Access: All counsel, members of the public, and media may access the webinar information at [LINK:https://www.cand.uscourts.gov/crb] Court Appearances: Advanced notice is required of counsel or parties who wish to be identified by the court as making an appearance or will be participating in the argument at the hearing. A list of names and emails must be sent to the CRD at crbcrd@cand.uscourts.gov no later than August 6, 2024 at 3:00 PM PST. General Order 58. Persons granted access to court proceedings held by telephone or videoconference are reminded that photographing, recording, and rebroadcasting of court proceedings, including screenshots or other visual copying of a hearing, is absolutely prohibited. Zoom Guidance and Setup: [LINK:https://www.cand.uscourts.gov/zoom/] . Motion Hearing set for 8/9/2024 10:00 AM in San Francisco, - Videoconference Only before Judge Charles R. Breyer. (ls, COURT STAFF)
Related: [-]
Friday, June 07, 2024
29 29 notice Notice (Other) Fri 06/07 8:13 AM
NOTICE of Hearing on Motion to Dismiss (with Consent) by Money Map Press, LLC(Dewey, Joel) Modified on 6/7/2024 (anj, COURT STAFF)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit One
Tuesday, June 04, 2024
28 28 oth_evt Clerk's Notice ~Util - Teleconference Zoom Tue 06/04 5:57 AM
CLERK'S NOTICE VACATING MOTION TO Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction hearing set for June 7, 2021 before the Honorable Charles R. Breyer. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) . Motion Hearing set for 6/21/2024 at 10:00 AM in San Francisco - Videoconference Only before Judge Charles R. Breyer. This proceeding will be held via a Zoom webinar. Webinar Access: All counsel, members of the public, and media may access the webinar information at [LINK:https://www.cand.uscourts.gov/crb] Court Appearances: Advanced notice is required of counsel or parties who wish to be identified by the court as making an appearance or will be participating in the argument at the hearing. A list of names and emails must be sent to the CRD at crbcrd@cand.uscourts.gov no later than June 18, 2024 at 3:00 PM PST. General Order 58. Persons granted access to court proceedings held by telephone or videoconference are reminded that photographing, recording, and rebroadcasting of court proceedings, including screenshots or other visual copying of a hearing, is absolutely prohibited. Zoom Guidance and Setup: [LINK:https://www.cand.uscourts.gov/zoom/] . Motion Hearing set for 6/21/2024 10:00 AM in San Francisco, - Videoconference Only before Judge Charles R. Breyer. (ls, COURT STAFF)
Related: [-]
Thursday, April 04, 2024
27 27 respm Reply to Opposition/Response Thu 04/04 10:30 AM
REPLY Related [+] filed byMoney Map Press, LLC. (Dewey, Joel)
Related: [-] 21 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction
Thursday, March 28, 2024
26 26 respm Opposition/Response to Motion Thu 03/28 2:06 PM
OPPOSITION/RESPONSE Related [+] filed byWarren Ingram.(McBride, Ryan)
Related: [-] 21 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction
Att: 1 Declaration in Support of Plaintiff's Opposition,
Att: 2 Exhibit 1,
Att: 3 Exhibit 2,
Att: 4 Exhibit 3
Monday, March 25, 2024
25 25 oth_evt Clerk's Notice Mon 03/25 6:48 AM
CLERK'S NOTICE VACATING CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE set for May 3, 2024 before the Honorable Charles R. Breyer. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (ls, COURT STAFF)
Related: [-]
24 24 oth_evt Clerk's Notice ~Util - Teleconference Zoom Mon 03/25 6:47 AM
CLERK'S NOTICE VACATING to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction hearing set for May 3, 2024 before the Honorable Charles R. Breyer. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) . Motion Hearing set for 6/7/2024 at 11:30 AM in San Francisco - Videoconference Only before Judge Charles R. Breyer. This proceeding will be held via a Zoom webinar. Webinar Access: All counsel, members of the public, and media may access the webinar information at [LINK:https://www.cand.uscourts.gov/crb] Court Appearances: Advanced notice is required of counsel or parties who wish to be identified by the court as making an appearance or will be participating in the argument at the hearing. A list of names and emails must be sent to the CRD at crbcrd@cand.uscourts.gov no later than June 4, 2024 at 3:00 P.M. PST. General Order 58. Persons granted access to court proceedings held by telephone or videoconference are reminded that photographing, recording, and rebroadcasting of court proceedings, including screenshots or other visual copying of a hearing, is absolutely prohibited. Zoom Guidance and Setup: [LINK:https://www.cand.uscourts.gov/zoom/] . Motion Hearing set for 6/7/2024 11:30 AM in San Francisco, - Videoconference Only before Judge Charles R. Breyer. (ls, COURT STAFF)
Related: [-]
Monday, March 18, 2024
23 23 oth_evt Clerk's Notice ~Util - Teleconference Zoom Mon 03/18 9:56 AM
CLERK'S NOTICE: (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) . Motion to Dismiss Hearing set for 5/3/2024 at 11:30 AM in San Francisco - Videoconference Only before Judge Charles R. Breyer. This proceeding will be held via a Zoom webinar. Webinar Access: All counsel, members of the public, and media may access the webinar information at [LINK:https://www.cand.uscourts.gov/crb] Court Appearances: Advanced notice is required of counsel or parties who wish to be identified by the court as making an appearance or will be participating in the argument at the hearing. A list of names and emails must be sent to the CRD at crbcrd@cand.uscourts.gov no later than April 30, 2024 at 3:00 PM PST. General Order 58. Persons granted access to court proceedings held by telephone or videoconference are reminded that photographing, recording, and rebroadcasting of court proceedings, including screenshots or other visual copying of a hearing, is absolutely prohibited. Zoom Guidance and Setup: [LINK:https://www.cand.uscourts.gov/zoom/] . Motion Hearing set for 5/3/2024 11:30 AM in San Francisco, - Videoconference Only before Judge Charles R. Breyer. (ls, COURT STAFF)
Related: [-]
Friday, March 15, 2024
22 22 oth_sup Re-notice motion Fri 03/15 11:38 AM
Renotice motion hearing re21 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction filed byMoney Map Press, LLC. Related [+] (Dewey, Joel)
Related: [-] 21
Thursday, March 14, 2024
21 21 motion Dismiss/Lack of Jurisdiction Thu 03/14 1:09 PM
MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction filed by Money Map Press, LLC. Responses due by 3/28/2024. Replies due by 4/4/2024.(Dewey, Joel)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proposed Order,
Att: 2 Exhibit One,
Att: 3 Exhibit Two
Thursday, February 08, 2024
20 20 4 pgs order Order on Stipulation Thu 02/08 9:18 AM
STIPULATION AND ORDER TO EXTEND TIME TO RESPOND TO COMPLAINT by Judge Charles R. Breyer: Granting 18 Stipulation. (ls, COURT STAFF)
Related: [-]
19 19 oth_evt Clerk's Notice Thu 02/08 7:25 AM
CLERK'S NOTICE: A Joint Case Management Statement due by 4/26/2024. Initial Case Management Conference set for 5/3/2024 at 8:30 AM in San Francisco - Videoconference Only. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (ls, COURT STAFF)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, February 07, 2024
18 18 motion Stipulation and Proposed Order Wed 02/07 2:21 PM
STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER , Joint, to Extend Time To Respond to Complaint Pursuant to L.R. 6.1(A) filed by Money Map Press, LLC. (Dewey, Joel)
Related: [-]
17 17 1 pgs order Order Reassigning Case ~Util - Case Assigned/Reassigned Wed 02/07 12:16 PM
ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned using a proportionate, random, and blind system pursuant to General Order No. 44 to Judge Charles R. Breyer for all further proceedings. Magistrate Judge Susan van Keulen no longer assigned to case. Notice: The assigned judge participates in the Cameras in the Courtroom Pilot Project. See General Order No. 65 and http://cand.uscourts.gov/cameras.(sfb, COURT STAFF)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Notice of Eligibility for Video Recording
16 16 utility ~Util - Notice Assigning/ Reassigning Case (CRJ) Wed 02/07 12:09 PM
This case will be randomly reassigned to a District Judge outside the San Jose Division pursuant to the Caseload Rebalancing Pilot Program approved by the Court effective March 1, 2018. For information, visit our web page at[LINK:https://cand.uscourts.gov/notices/northern-district-extends-caseload-rebalancing-pilot-program/] . (sfb, COURT STAFF)
Related: [-]
utility Electronic Filing Error Wed 02/07 11:44 AM
[LINK:Electronic filing error] . Incorrect Event Used. The Stipulation Includes a Proposed Order. Please Refile with the Stipulation and Proposed Order Event [err101] This filing will not be processed by the clerks office.Re:12 Stipulation filed by Money Map Press, LLC (kmm2, COURT STAFF)
Related: [-]
Monday, November 13, 2023
utility Electronic Filing Error Mon 11/13 8:35 AM
[LINK:Electronic filing error] . Civil Cover Sheet missing Section IX Divisional Assignment. No judge assignment will be made until the document is e-filed. Submit your document using Civil Events > Other Filings > Other Documents > Civil Cover SheetThis filing will not be processed by the clerks office. Re:1 Complaint filed by Warren Ingram (bar, COURT STAFF)
Related: [-]
Thursday, November 09, 2023
1 1 cmp Complaint Thu 11/09 4:00 PM
COMPLAINT against Money Map Press, LLC ( Filing fee $ 402, receipt number ACANDC-18825497.). Filed by Warren Ingram.(McBride, Ryan)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet,
Att: 2 Summons