New Jersey District Court
Case #: 2:23-cr-00806
Case Filed:Oct 11, 2023
Terminated:Jun 26, 2024
Last checked: Friday Nov 10, 2023 2:48 AM EST
Defendant
JUAN CARLOS HERNANDEZ (1)
Represented By
PATRICK N. MCMAHON
Federal Public Defender
contact info
Plaintiff
USA
Represented By
HYUNGJOO HAN
Doj-Crm
contact info


Docket last updated: 04/08/2025 10:45 AM EDT
Tuesday, July 25, 2023
1 1 COMPLAINT as to JUAN CARLOS HERNANDEZ (1). (spc) [2:23-mj-11102-AME]
Related: [-]
Thursday, July 27, 2023
Arrest of JUAN CARLOS HERNANDEZ (spc) [2:23-mj-11102-AME]
Related: [-]
3 3 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Andre M. Espinosa: Attorney Appointment Hearing as to JUAN CARLOS HERNANDEZ held on 7/27/2023, CJA 23 affidavit submitted, reviewed and approved; AFPD appointed; Bond Hearing as to JUAN CARLOS HERNANDEZ held on 7/27/2023, Deft. consents to detention; Initial Appearance as to JUAN CARLOS HERNANDEZ held on 7/27/2023, penalties placed on record, Braady Order read into record and filed. Deft. remanded to custody of US Marshal pending further proceedings. (Court Reporter/Recorder ECR.) (spc) [2:23-mj-11102-AME]
Related: [-]
5 5 ORDER APPOINTING FEDERAL PUBLIC DEFENDER as to JUAN CARLOS HERNANDEZ. Signed by Magistrate Judge Andre M. Espinosa on 7/27/2023. (spc) [2:23-mj-11102-AME]
Related: [-]
6 6 ORDER OF DETENTION as to JUAN CARLOS HERNANDEZ. Signed by Magistrate Judge Andre M. Espinosa on 7/27/2023. (spc) [2:23-mj-11102-AME]
Related: [-]
7 7 WAIVER of Preliminary Hearing by JUAN CARLOS HERNANDEZ (spc) [2:23-mj-11102-AME]
Related: [-]
8 8 ORDER TO CONTINUE - Ends of Justice as to JUAN CARLOS HERNANDEZ Time excluded from 7/27/2023 until 9/27/2023. Signed by Magistrate Judge Andre M. Espinosa on 7/27/2023. (spc) [2:23-mj-11102-AME]
Related: [-]
9 9 ORDER advising of the United States' continuing obligation to produce all exculpatory evidence to the defendant pursuant to Brady v. Maryland . Signed by Magistrate Judge Andre M. Espinosa on 7/27/2023. (spc) [2:23-mj-11102-AME]
Related: [-]
Tuesday, September 12, 2023
10 10 ORDER TO CONTINUE - Ends of Justice as to JUAN CARLOS HERNANDEZ Time excluded from 9/12/2023 until 11/27/2023. Signed by Magistrate Judge Andre M. Espinosa on 9/12/2023. (spc) [2:23-mj-11102-AME]
Related: [-]
Wednesday, October 11, 2023
Notice of Allocation and Assignment [Newark - Judge Michael E. Farbiarz] as to JUAN CARLOS HERNANDEZ (msd)
Related: [-]
11 11 INDICTMENT as to JUAN CARLOS HERNANDEZ (1) count 1. (msd)
Related: [-]