California Southern District Court
Judge:Thomas J Whelan
Referred: Valerie E Torres
Case #: 3:23-cv-02079
Nature of Suit450 Other Statutes - Commerce
Cause49:14706 Carmack Amendment Interstate Commerce Act / Liab. of Carriers - Receipts & Bills of Landing
Case Filed:Nov 09, 2023
Terminated:Feb 25, 2025
Last checked: Tuesday May 07, 2024 1:35 AM PDT
Defendant
AIT Worldwide Logistics, Inc.
Represented By
Frank C Brucculeri
Kaye Rose & Partners LLP
contact info
Defendant
Does 1 through 10
Plaintiff
Ingram Micro, Inc.
Represented By
Benjamin Gerald Reynolds
Godes & Preis LLP
contact info
Joseph M. Preis
Godes & Preis, LLP
contact info

GPO Oct 31 2024
r due by 8/25/2025. Final Pretrial Conference set for 9/8/2025 at 10:30 AM before Judge Thomas J. Whelan. Signed by Magistrate Judge Valerie E. Torres on 10/31/2024. (mef)Order Granting Joint Stipulation To Extend Deadlines For Discovery And Issuing Amended Scheduling Order re (Doc. No.16). Mandatory Settlement Conference set for 1/8/2025 at 02:00 PM before Magistrate Judge Valerie E. Torres. Proposed Pretrial Orde
GPO Feb 25 2025
ORDER Dismissing Case with Prejudice 25. Signed by Judge Thomas J. Whelan on 2/25/2025. (exs)

Docket last updated: 05/21/2025 11:59 PM PDT
Tuesday, February 25, 2025
27 27 1 pgs order Order on Motion to Dismiss Tue 02/25 11:22 AM
ORDER Dismissing Case with Prejudice25 . Signed by Judge Thomas J. Whelan on 2/25/2025. (exs)
Related: [-]
26 26 misc Notice Consent and Reference of a Civil Action to a Magistrate Judge Tue 02/25 11:08 AM
Consent to Exercise of Jurisdiction by a United States Magistrate Judge and Order of Reference. Signed by Judge Thomas J. Whelan on 2/25/2025.(exs)
Related: [-]
Monday, February 24, 2025
25 25 motion Dismiss Mon 02/24 4:20 PM
Joint MOTION to Dismiss by Ingram Micro, Inc.. Related [+]
Related: [-] ynolds, Benjamin
Friday, February 21, 2025
24 24 minutes Settlement Disposition Conference ~Util - Set Deadlines/Hearings ~Util - Terminate Deadlines and Hearings Fri 02/21 11:35 AM
Minute Entry for Proceedings Held Before Magistrate Judge Valerie E. Torres and Minute Order Setting Settlement Disposition Conference ("SDC"). The Court held an SDC on February 21, 2025. Parties will refile the Joint Motion to Dismiss. Therefore, the Court SETS a telephonic SDC for April 14, 2025 at 11:00 a.m. . Only counsel are required to appear. Teleconference information will be provided two days prior to the SDC. The Court will automatically vacate the SDC if the parties file a joint motion to dismiss prior to the SDC. Signed by Magistrate Judge Valerie E. Torres on February 21, 2025. (no document attached) (jam)
Related: [-]
Friday, February 07, 2025
23 23 order Order Scheduling Settlement Disposition Conference ~Util - Set Deadlines/Hearings Fri 02/07 3:10 PM
Minute Order Setting Settlement Disposition Conference ("SDC"). The Court hereby SETS a telephonic SDC for February 21, 2025 at 11:00 a.m. to discuss the status of refiling a joint motion to dismiss. Only counsel are required to appear. Teleconference information will be provided two days prior to the SDC. The Court will automatically vacate the SDC if the parties refile a joint motion to dismiss prior to the SDC. Signed by Magistrate Judge Valerie E. Torres on February 7, 2025.(no document attached) (jam)
Related: [-]
Monday, January 13, 2025
22 22 order Notice and Order of Document Discrepancies Mon 01/13 10:45 AM
Notice of Document Discrepancies and Order Thereon by Judge Thomas J. Whelan Rejecting re20 Joint MOTION to Dismiss , from Plaintiff Ingram Micro, Inc., Defendant AIT Worldwide Logistics, Inc.. Non-compliance with local rule(s), The document violates Rule 12.a. of Judge Whelans Chambers Rules. The rule states that [a]ny joint motion for dismissal that includes a provision that the court will retain jurisdiction will be rejected unless it is accompanied by a consent to United States Magistrate Judge jurisdiction over all disputes arising out of the settlement agreement, including interpretation and enforcement of the settlement agreement, signed by all parties and their counsel. Attached to these Chambers Rules for the parties convenience is a Consent to Exercise of Jurisdiction by a United States Magistrate Judge and Order of Reference. IT IS HEREBY ORDERED: The document is rejected. It is ordered that the Clerk STRIKE the document from the record, and serve a copy of this order on all parties. Signed by Judge Thomas J. Whelan on 01/13/2025.(mef)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 rejected document
Friday, January 10, 2025
21 21 order ~Util - Terminate Deadlines and Hearings Fri 01/10 1:58 PM
Minute Order Vacating Settlement Disposition Conference ("SDC"). The parties have filed a Joint Motion to Dismiss. Doc. No.20 . Accordingly, the Court hereby VACATES the SDC set for January 27, 2025. Signed by Magistrate Judge Valerie E. Torres on January 10, 2025. (no document attached) (jam)
Related: [-]
20 20 motion Dismiss Fri 01/10 1:35 PM
Joint MOTION to Dismiss by Ingram Micro, Inc.. Related [+]
Related: [-] ynolds, Benjamin
Att: 1 Consent to Jurisdiction by a United States Magistrate Judge
Tuesday, December 03, 2024
19 19 order ~Util - Set Deadlines/Hearings ~Util - Terminate Deadlines and Hearings Order Tue 12/03 12:18 PM
Minute Order Setting Settlement Disposition Conference ("SDC"). In light of the parties Notice of Settlement (Doc. No.18 ), the Court hereby VACATES the Mandatory Settlement Conference set for January 8, 2025 and SETS a telephonic SDC for January 27, 2025 at 10:00 a.m. Only counsel are required to appear. Teleconference information will be provided two days prior to the SDC. The Court will automatically vacate the SDC if the parties file a joint motion to dismiss prior to the SDC. Signed by Magistrate Judge Valerie E. Torres on December 3, 2024.(no document attached) (jam)
Related: [-]
Monday, December 02, 2024
18 18 notice Notice of Settlement Mon 12/02 3:41 PM
NOTICE of Settlement by Ingram Micro, Inc. Related [+]
Related: [-] ynolds, Benjamin
Thursday, October 31, 2024
17 17 9 pgs order Order on Motion for Extension of Time to Complete Discovery Thu 10/31 11:44 AM
Order Granting Joint Stipulation To Extend Deadlines For Discovery And Issuing Amended Scheduling Order re (Doc. No.16 ). Mandatory Settlement Conference set for 1/8/2025 at 02:00 PM before Magistrate Judge Valerie E. Torres. Proposed Pretrial Order due by 8/25/2025. Final Pretrial Conference set for 9/8/2025 at 10:30 AM before Judge Thomas J. Whelan. Signed by Magistrate Judge Valerie E. Torres on 10/31/2024. (mef)
Related: [-]
Friday, October 25, 2024
16 16 motion Extension of Time to Complete Discovery Fri 10/25 10:22 AM
Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to Complete Discovery by Ingram Micro, Inc.. Related [+]
Related: [-] ynolds, Benjamin
Wednesday, July 03, 2024
15 15 1 pgs order Order on Motion to Substitute Attorney Wed 07/03 9:15 AM
ORDER Approving13 Substitution of Counsel. Signed by Judge Thomas J. Whelan on 7/3/2024. (exs)
Related: [-]
Friday, June 28, 2024
14 14 minutes Status Conference ~Util - Terminate Deadlines and Hearings Fri 06/28 3:58 PM
Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Valerie E. Torres: The Court held a Status Conference on June 28, 2024 regarding the status of the case, including discovery. (Plaintiff Attorney Benjamin G. Reynolds). (Defendant Attorneys Cameron W. Roberts and Ted Adkinson). (no document attached) (cxy)
Related: [-]
Friday, June 14, 2024
13 13 motion Substitute Attorney Fri 06/14 12:28 PM
MOTION to Substitute Attorney by AIT Worldwide Logistics, Inc..(Roberts, Cameron)Attorney Cameron William Roberts added to party AIT Worldwide Logistics, Inc.(pty:dft)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A
Thursday, March 28, 2024
12 12 order Scheduling Order Thu 03/28 12:06 PM
SCHEDULING ORDER Regulating Discovery and Other Pre-Trial Proceedings: Status Conference set for 6/28/2024 10:00 AM before Magistrate Judge Valerie E. Torres. Mandatory Settlement Conference set for 11/13/2024 02:00 PM before Magistrate Judge Valerie E. Torres. Proposed Pretrial Order due by 7/14/2025. Final Pretrial Conference set for 7/28/2025 10:30 AM before Judge Thomas J. Whelan.Signed by Magistrate Judge Valerie E. Torres on 3/28/24.(exs)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, March 27, 2024
11 11 minutes Early Neutral Evaluation Conference Case Management Conference ~Util - Terminate Deadlines and Hearings Wed 03/27 5:02 PM
Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Valerie E. Torres: The Court held an Early Neutral Evaluation Conference and Case Management Conference on March 27, 2024. Scheduling Order to follow. (Plaintiff Attorney Benjamin Gerald Reynolds). (Defendant Attorney Frank C Brucculeri). (no document attached) (cxy)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, March 20, 2024
10 10 notice Joint Discovery Plan Wed 03/20 4:18 PM
Joint Rule 26(f) Report Related [+] (exs)
Related: [-] ynolds, Benjamin
Wednesday, December 27, 2023
9 9 9 pgs order Order for Early Neutral Evaluation Wed 12/27 2:58 PM
NOTICE AND ORDER Setting Early Neutral Evaluation Conference and Case Management Conference. Early Neutral Evaluation and Case Management Conference set for 3/27/2024 at 02:00 PM before Magistrate Judge Valerie E. Torres. Joint Discovery Plan due 3/20/2024. Signed by Magistrate Judge Valerie E. Torres on 12/27/2023.(mjw)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, December 20, 2023
8 8 answer Answer to Complaint Wed 12/20 3:42 PM
ANSWER to1 Complaint, by AIT Worldwide Logistics, Inc..(Brucculeri, Frank)
Related: [-]
Monday, December 11, 2023
6 6 1 pgs order Order on Motion for Extension of Time to Answer Mon 12/11 8:34 AM
ORDER Granting5 Joint Motion for an Extension of Time to Respond to Complaint: Answer by Respondent due 12/20/2023. Signed by Judge Thomas J. Whelan on 12/11/2023. (exs)
Related: [-]
Friday, December 08, 2023
7 7 order Order of Judge Transfer Tue 12/12 12:34 PM
MINUTE ORDER OF TRANSFER. Magistrate Judge Michelle M. Pettit is no longer assigned. Case reassigned to Magistrate Judge Valerie E. Torres for all further proceedings. The new case number is 23-cv-02079-W-VET.(no document attached) (exs)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, December 06, 2023
5 5 motion Extension of Time to File Answer Wed 12/06 2:49 PM
Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re1 Complaint, by AIT Worldwide Logistics, Inc..(Brucculeri, Frank)Attorney Frank C Brucculeri added to party AIT Worldwide Logistics, Inc.(pty:dft)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 ProposedOrder
Thursday, November 16, 2023
4 4 service Summons Returned Executed Thu 11/16 3:17 PM
SUMMONS Returned Executed by Ingram Micro, Inc.. AIT Worldwide Logistics, Inc. served. Related [+]
Related: [-] ynolds, Benjamin
Thursday, November 09, 2023
3 3 service Summons Issued Thu 11/09 5:13 PM
Summons Issued. Counsel receiving this notice electronically should print this summons and serve it in accordance with Rule 4, Fed.R.Civ.P and LR 4.1. (rxc)
Related: [-]
2 2 notice Notice of Party With Financial Interest Thu 11/09 5:11 PM
NOTICE of Party With Financial Interest by Ingram Micro, Inc.. Identifying Corporate Parent Imola Acquisition Corporation, Other Affiliate Platinum Equity for Ingram Micro, Inc.. (rxc)
Related: [-]
1 1 cmp Complaint Thu 11/09 5:06 PM
COMPLAINT with Jury Demand against AIT Worldwide Logistics, Inc., Does 1 through 10 ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number ACASDC-18340600.), filed by Ingram Micro, Inc.. The new case number is 3:23-cv-2079-W-MMP. Judge Thomas J. Whelan and Magistrate Judge Michelle M. Pettit are assigned to the case. (Benjamin G. Reynolds)(rxc)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet