New Jersey District Court
Judge:Claire C Cecchi
Referred: Cathy L Waldor
Case #: 2:23-cv-22272
Nature of Suit190 Contract - Other Contract
Cause28:1330 Breach of Contract
Case Filed:Nov 10, 2023
Terminated:Feb 23, 2024
Last checked: Saturday May 11, 2024 7:48 AM EDT
Defendant
ABC CORP #1-10 (fictitious)
Defendant
VICTOR CIRILO
Represented By
BRENDAN JUDGE
Connell Foley, LLP
contact info
Defendant
JOHN DOE 1-10 (fictitious)
Defendant
NEWARK HOUSING AUTHORITY
Represented By
BRENDAN JUDGE
Connell Foley, LLP
contact info
Plaintiff
RP NEWARK VENTURES LLC
Represented By
JONATHAN DAVID SINGER
Singer Law LLC
contact info
TERMINATED PARTIES
Defendant
UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF HOUSING AND URBAN DEVELOPMENT
Terminated: 02/01/2024
Represented By
ALEX D. SILAGI
Doj-Usao
contact info


Docket last updated: 05/16/2025 11:59 PM EDT
Wednesday, April 09, 2025
30 30 notice Notice (Other) Thu 04/10 4:49 PM
DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE by RP NEWARK VENTURES LLC Related [+] (sm)
Related: [-] ceived via ADS
Monday, March 24, 2025
29 29 misc Certification Wed 04/02 4:05 PM
CERTIFICATION OF COMMUNICATION by RP NEWARK VENTURES LLC. (mxw, ) Related [+]
Related: [-] ceived via ADS
Wednesday, May 29, 2024
28 28 misc Substitution of Attorney Wed 05/29 5:03 PM
Substitution of Attorney - Attorney BRENDAN JUDGE terminated. Attorney RICHARD D. TRENK for VICTOR CIRILO added.. (TRENK, RICHARD)
Related: [-]
Monday, May 20, 2024
27 27 respoth Amended Answer to Complaint Mon 05/20 4:04 PM
AMENDED ANSWER to RP Newark Ventures LLC's 1 Complaint by VICTOR CIRILO, NEWARK HOUSING AUTHORITY. (JUDGE, BRENDAN)
Related: [-]
26 26 notice Notice (Other) Mon 05/20 4:01 PM
NOTICE by VICTOR CIRILO, NEWARK HOUSING AUTHORITY NHA Defendants' Amended Answer to RP Newark Ventures LLC's Complaint (JUDGE, BRENDAN)
Related: [-]
Friday, February 23, 2024
25 25 3 pgs order Order on Motion to Consolidate Cases Fri 02/23 2:35 PM
ORDER Consolidating Cases. Civil Action No. 2:21-cv-12136-JXN-CLW and Civil Action No. 2:23-cv-22272-CCC-CLW shall be consolidated for all purposes, with the older matter, Civil Action No. 2:21-cv-12136-JXN-CLW, serving as the lead case. Signed by Magistrate Judge Cathy L. Waldor on 2/23/2024. (qa, )
Related: [-]
utility Terminate Civil Case Fri 02/23 2:39 PM
***Civil Case Terminated. (qa, )
Related: [-]
Tuesday, February 20, 2024
24 24 discov Joint Discovery Plan Tue 02/20 4:57 PM
Joint Discovery Plan by NEWARK HOUSING AUTHORITY.(JUDGE, BRENDAN)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, February 14, 2024
23 23 misc Status Report Wed 02/14 10:24 AM
STATUS REPORT Joint Letter to Magistrate Judge Waldor re Status of Mediation by NEWARK HOUSING AUTHORITY. (JUDGE, BRENDAN)
Related: [-]
Thursday, February 01, 2024
22 22 1 pgs order Order ~Util - Add and Terminate Parties Thu 02/01 10:07 AM
ORDER of Voluntary Dismissal without prejudice as to Defendant UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF HOUSING AND URBAN DEVELOPMENT. Defendant UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF HOUSING AND URBAN DEVELOPMENT terminated. Signed by Judge Claire C. Cecchi on 2/1/2024. (dam)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, January 31, 2024
21 21 misc Stipulation of Dismissal (aty) Wed 01/31 2:00 PM
STIPULATION of Dismissal against US Dept of Housing and Urban Development only by RP NEWARK VENTURES LLC. (SINGER, JONATHAN)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, January 30, 2024
20 20 misc Status Report Tue 01/30 12:14 PM
STATUS REPORT - Joint Letter to (J) Waldor re Status of Mediation by NEWARK HOUSING AUTHORITY. (JUDGE, BRENDAN)
Related: [-]
Thursday, January 25, 2024
utility Set/Reset Motion and R&R Deadlines/Hearings Thu 01/25 9:08 AM
Set Deadlines as to19 MOTION to Consolidate Cases or in the alternative, intervene . Motion set for 2/20/2024 before Judge Claire C. Cecchi. Unless otherwise directed by the Court, this motion will be decided on the papers and no appearances are required. Note that this is an automatically generated message from the Clerk`s Office and does not supersede any previous or subsequent orders from the Court. (lag, )
Related: [-]
Wednesday, January 24, 2024
19 19 motion Consolidate Cases Wed 01/24 9:56 PM
MOTION to Consolidate Cases or in the alternative, intervene by RP NEWARK VENTURES LLC.(SINGER, JONATHAN)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Brief Motion to Consolidate or in the alternative Intervene,
Att: 2 Text of Proposed Order,
Att: 3 RUle 7.1 Disclosure Statement,
Att: 4 Exhibit Greenwald Complaint,
Att: 5 Exhibit RFP,
Att: 6 Exhibit RP Newark Complaint,
Att: 7 2 pgs Exhibit email from def,
Att: 8 Exhibit unanswered communications
Thursday, January 11, 2024
18 18 order Order Thu 01/11 1:31 PM
TEXT ORDER: Docket 21-12136 and 23-22272 with return to mediation together as discussed. Mediator Judge Dickson will continue the mediation. HUD need not attend but will participate in discovery as needed. Parties will report on the docket the date of the mediation. The Court will hold a telephone conference, on 3/4/24 at 1:30pm. Parties are to use the Courts teleconference dial-in: 888-808-6929 and Access Code is 9464201... So Ordered by Magistrate Judge Cathy L. Waldor on 1/11/24. (tjg, )
Related: [-]
minutes Status Conference Thu 01/11 1:30 PM
Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Cathy L. Waldor: Status Conference held on 1/11/2024. (tjg, )
Related: [-]
Tuesday, January 09, 2024
17 17 answer Answer to Complaint Tue 01/09 2:31 PM
ANSWER to Complaint by VICTOR CIRILO, NEWARK HOUSING AUTHORITY.(JUDGE, BRENDAN)
Related: [-]
Monday, January 08, 2024
16 16 order Order Mon 01/08 11:03 AM
TEXT ORDER: The undersigned will conduct a Zoom status conference on 1/11/24 at 1:00 p.m. regarding RP Newark Ventures LLC's 12/20/23 letter. The Court will distribute connection information on the day of the conference. So Ordered by Magistrate Judge Cathy L. Waldor on 1/8/24. (tjd)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, December 27, 2023
15 15 notice Notice of Appearance Wed 12/27 5:36 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by ALEX D. SILAGI on behalf of UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF HOUSING AND URBAN DEVELOPMENT (SILAGI, ALEX)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, December 20, 2023
14 14 misc Letter Wed 12/20 6:48 PM
Letter from Jonathan D. SInger, Esq. of Singer Law LLC. (SINGER, JONATHAN)
Related: [-]
13 13 misc Letter Wed 12/20 6:45 PM
Letter. (SINGER, JONATHAN)
Related: [-]
12 12 3 pgs misc Letter Wed 12/20 6:41 PM
Letter. (SINGER, JONATHAN)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, December 19, 2023
utility Update Answer Due Deadline Tue 12/19 5:12 PM
Clerk`s Text Order - The document11 Application for Clerk's Order to Ext Answer/Proposed Order submitted by VICTOR CIRILO, NEWARK HOUSING AUTHORITY has been GRANTED. The answer due date has been set for 1/2/2024. (lag, )
Related: [-]
Monday, December 18, 2023
11 11 misc Application for Clerk Order to Ext Answer/Proposed Order Mon 12/18 3:59 PM
Application and Proposed Order for Clerk's Order to extend time to answer as to Newark Housing Authority and Victor Cirilo. Attorney BRENDAN JUDGE for VICTOR CIRILO,BRENDAN JUDGE for NEWARK HOUSING AUTHORITY added. (JUDGE, BRENDAN)
Related: [-]
Friday, December 08, 2023
10 10 service Affidavit of Service Acknowledgment of Service Fri 12/08 12:33 PM
AFFIDAVIT of Service for Summons and Complaint served on Brendan Judge, Esq. of Connell Foley LLP on 12/8/23, filed by RP NEWARK VENTURES LLC., ACKNOWLEDGMENT OF SERVICE Executed by RP NEWARK VENTURES LLC. VICTOR CIRILO served on 12/8/2023, answer due 12/29/2023. (SINGER, JONATHAN)
Related: [-]
Monday, December 04, 2023
9 9 service Affidavit of Service Mon 12/04 10:29 AM
AFFIDAVIT of Service for Summons and Complaint served on US Department of Housing & Urban Development on 12/1/2023, filed by RP NEWARK VENTURES LLC. (SINGER, JONATHAN)
Related: [-]
8 8 service Affidavit of Service Mon 12/04 9:32 AM
AFFIDAVIT of Service for Summons and Complaint served on US Attorney - NJ District on 11/28/2023, filed by RP NEWARK VENTURES LLC. (SINGER, JONATHAN)
Related: [-]
7 7 service Affidavit of Service Mon 12/04 9:29 AM
AFFIDAVIT of Service for Summons and Complaint served on Newark Housing Authority on 11/28/2023, filed by RP NEWARK VENTURES LLC. (SINGER, JONATHAN)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, November 21, 2023
6 6 service Summons Issued Tue 11/21 12:38 PM
SUMMONS ISSUED as to VICTOR CIRILO, NEWARK HOUSING AUTHORITY, UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF HOUSING AND URBAN DEVELOPMENT. Attached is the official court Summons, please fill out Defendant and Plaintiffs attorney information and serve. (lag, )
Related: [-]
Monday, November 13, 2023
utility Add and Terminate Judges Mon 11/13 8:47 AM
Judge Claire C. Cecchi and Magistrate Judge Cathy L. Waldor added. (ps)
Related: [-]
Friday, November 10, 2023
5 5 service Summons - Request for Issue Fri 11/10 2:37 PM
Request for Summons to be Issued by RP NEWARK VENTURES LLC as to VICTOR CIRILO. (SINGER, JONATHAN)
Related: [-]
4 4 service Summons - Request for Issue Fri 11/10 2:36 PM
Request for Summons to be Issued by RP NEWARK VENTURES LLC as to UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF HOUSING AND URBAN DEVELOPMENT. (SINGER, JONATHAN)
Related: [-]
3 3 service Summons - Request for Issue Fri 11/10 2:34 PM
Request for Summons to be Issued by RP NEWARK VENTURES LLC as to NEWARK HOUSING AUTHORITY. (SINGER, JONATHAN)
Related: [-]
2 2 service Summons - Request for Issue Fri 11/10 2:27 PM
Request for Summons to be Issued by RP NEWARK VENTURES LLC as to NEWARK HOUSING AUTHORITY. (SINGER, JONATHAN)
Related: [-]
1 1 10 pgs cmp Complaint Fri 11/10 1:21 PM
COMPLAINT against All Defendants ( Filing and Admin fee $ 402 receipt number ANJDC-14863324), filed by RP NEWARK VENTURES LLC.(SINGER, JONATHAN)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet