California Central District Court
Judge:Kenly Kiya Kato
Referred: Alka Sagar
Case #: 2:23-cv-09520
Nature of Suit850 Other Statutes - Securities/Commodities/Exchange
Cause15:78m(a) Securities Exchange Act
Case Filed:Nov 10, 2023
Terminated:Jan 26, 2024
Last checked: Saturday May 11, 2024 2:17 AM PDT
Defendant
Ping Fu
Represented By
Elizabeth Jae Cheng
Latham And Watkins LLP
contact info
Melanie M. Blunschi
Latham And Watkins LLP
contact info
Defendant
Latriece Watkins
Represented By
Elizabeth Jae Cheng
Latham And Watkins LLP
contact info
Melanie M. Blunschi
Latham And Watkins LLP
contact info
Defendant
Dana Walden
Represented By
Elizabeth Jae Cheng
Latham And Watkins LLP
contact info
Melanie M. Blunschi
Latham And Watkins LLP
contact info
Defendant
Michael Rapino
Represented By
Elizabeth Jae Cheng
Latham And Watkins LLP
contact info
Melanie M. Blunschi
Latham And Watkins LLP
contact info
Defendant
Rich Paul
Represented By
Elizabeth Jae Cheng
Latham And Watkins LLP
contact info
Melanie M. Blunschi
Latham And Watkins LLP
contact info
Defendant
Randall T. Mays
Represented By
Elizabeth Jae Cheng
Latham And Watkins LLP
contact info
Melanie M. Blunschi
Latham And Watkins LLP
contact info
Defendant
Gregory B. Maffei
Represented By
Elizabeth Jae Cheng
Latham And Watkins LLP
contact info
Melanie M. Blunschi
Latham And Watkins LLP
contact info
Defendant
Live Nation Entertainment, Inc.
Represented By
Elizabeth Jae Cheng
Latham And Watkins LLP
contact info
Melanie M. Blunschi
Latham And Watkins LLP
contact info
Defendant
James S. Kahan
Represented By
Elizabeth Jae Cheng
Latham And Watkins LLP
contact info
Melanie M. Blunschi
Latham And Watkins LLP
contact info
Defendant
Jimmy Iovine
Represented By
Elizabeth Jae Cheng
Latham And Watkins LLP
contact info
Melanie M. Blunschi
Latham And Watkins LLP
contact info
Defendant
Chad Hollingsworth
Represented By
Elizabeth Jae Cheng
Latham And Watkins LLP
contact info
Melanie M. Blunschi
Latham And Watkins LLP
contact info
Defendant
Jeffrey T. Hinson
Represented By
Elizabeth Jae Cheng
Latham And Watkins LLP
contact info
Melanie M. Blunschi
Latham And Watkins LLP
contact info
Defendant
Maverick Carter
Represented By
Elizabeth Jae Cheng
Latham And Watkins LLP
contact info
Melanie M. Blunschi
Latham And Watkins LLP
contact info
Plaintiff
Mark Steven Zwick
Represented By
Joshua H. Grabar
Grabar Law Office
contact info
Alex Joseph Tramontano
Wolf Haldenstein Adler Freeman And Herz LLP
contact info
Betsy C Manifold
Wolf Haldenstein Adler Freeman And Herz LLP
contact info
Ferdeza Zekiri
Wolf Haldenstein Adler Freeman And Herz LLP
contact info
Timothy J. MacFall
Rigrodsky Law PA
contact info
Rachele R. Byrd
Wolf Haldenstein Adler Freeman And Herz LLP
contact info
Jon A. Tostrud
Tostrud Law Group PC
contact info
Rachele R Byrd
Wolf Haldenstein Adler Freeman And Herz LLP
contact info


Docket last updated: 67 minutes ago
Friday, April 25, 2025
33 33 misc Status Report Fri 04/25 11:53 AM
STATUS REPORT filed by Plaintiff Mark Steven Zwick. (Tramontano, Alex)
Related: [-]
Friday, January 24, 2025
32 32 misc Status Report Fri 01/24 2:29 PM
STATUS REPORT filed by Plaintiff Mark Steven Zwick. (Tramontano, Alex)
Related: [-]
Monday, October 28, 2024
31 31 misc Status Report Mon 10/28 1:54 PM
STATUS REPORT - Joint filed by Plaintiff Mark Steven Zwick. (Tramontano, Alex)
Related: [-]
30 30 notice Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel (G-123) Mon 10/28 12:59 PM
Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel: for attorney Jordan Davisson Cook counsel for Defendants James S. Kahan, Randall T. Mays, Latriece Watkins, Rich Paul, Dana Walden, Live Nation Entertainment, Inc., Michael Rapino, Gregory B. Maffei, Maverick Carter, Ping Fu, Jeffrey T. Hinson, Chad Hollingsworth, Jimmy Iovine. Adding Jordan D. Cook as counsel of record for Michael Rapino, Gregory B. Maffei, Maverick Carter, Ping Fu, Jeffrey T. Hinson, Chad Hollingsworth, Jimmy Iovine, James S. Kahan, Randall T. Mays, Latriece Watkins, Rich Paul, Dana Walden and Live Nation Entertainment, Inc. for the reason indicated in the G-123 Notice. Filed by defendants Michael Rapino, Gregory B. Maffei, Maverick Carter, Ping Fu, Jeffrey T. Hinson, Chad Hollingsworth, Jimmy Iovine, James S. Kahan, Randall T. Mays, Latriece Watkins, Rich Paul, Dana Walden and Live Nation Entertainment, Inc.. (Attorney Jordan Davisson Cook added to party James S. Kahan (pty:dft), Attorney Jordan Davisson Cook added to party Randall T. Mays(pty:dft), Attorney Jordan Davisson Cook added to party Latriece Watkins(pty:dft), Attorney Jordan Davisson Cook added to party Rich Paul(pty:dft), Attorney Jordan Davisson Cook added to party Dana Walden(pty:dft), Attorney Jordan Davisson Cook added to party Live Nation Entertainment, Inc.(pty:dft), Attorney Jordan Davisson Cook added to party Michael Rapino(pty:dft), Attorney Jordan Davisson Cook added to party Gregory B. Maffei (pty:dft), Attorney Jordan Davisson Cook added to party Maverick Carter(pty:dft), Attorney Jordan Davisson Cook added to party Ping Fu(pty:dft), Attorney Jordan Davisson Cook added to party Jeffrey T. Hinson(pty:dft), Attorney Jordan Davisson Cook added to party Chad Hollingsworth (pty:dft), Attorney Jordan Davisson Cook added to party Jimmy Iovine(pty:dft))(Cook, Jordan)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, July 30, 2024
29 29 misc Status Report Tue 07/30 10:22 AM
STATUS REPORT - Joint filed by Plaintiff Mark Steven Zwick. (Tramontano, Alex)
Related: [-]
Monday, April 29, 2024
28 28 misc Status Report Mon 04/29 2:52 PM
STATUS REPORT - Joint filed by Plaintiff Mark Steven Zwick. (Byrd, Rachele)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, April 23, 2024
27 27 textonly Generic Text Only Entry Tue 04/23 10:52 AM
NOTICE AND ORDER by Judge Kenly Kiya Kato: The Court has updated its procedures in civil cases, including the recommended timelines in the Court's Schedule of Pretrial Dates form and the requirements and deadlines for filing pretrial documents. The parties are hereby directed to review the updated Civil Standing Order, Order Setting Scheduling Conference, and Civil Trial Scheduling Order, which are available on the Court's website at[LINK:https://www.cacd.uscourts.gov/honorable-kenly-kiya-kato.] THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (cbr)
Related: [-]
Thursday, March 14, 2024
26 26 order Staying Case Thu 03/14 1:41 PM
ORDER GRANTING STAY OF DERIVATIVE ACTION [NOTE CHANGES BY COURT] by Judge Kenly Kiya Kato. The Court hereby ORDERS that: 1. This Derivative Action, including all deadlines, is stayed in its entirety through the final resolution of the Securities Action (including, but not limited to, a dismissal with prejudice pursuant to a dispositive motion or final approval of a class settlement), meaning that the Securities Action is adjudicated and closed and any appeals have concluded, or the time for seeking appellate review has passed with no further action; (See document for further information). (aco)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, March 13, 2024
25 25 stip Stay Case Wed 03/13 12:32 PM
Joint STIPULATION to Stay Case pending resolution of the Securities Action filed by defendants Maverick Carter, Ping Fu, Jeffrey T. Hinson, Chad Hollingsworth, Jimmy Iovine, James S. Kahan, Live Nation Entertainment, Inc., Gregory B. Maffei, Randall T. Mays, Rich Paul, Michael Rapino, Dana Walden, Latriece Watkins.(Blunschi, Melanie)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proposed Order
Friday, January 26, 2024
24 24 order Staying Case Fri 01/26 3:55 PM
ORDER GRANTING STAY OF DERIVATIVE ACTION23 by Judge Kenly Kiya Kato. Plaintiff shall file a status report every 90 days providing information regarding resolution of the related matter(s). Failure to timely file status reports may result in sanctions, including dismissal for failure to prosecute and/or comply with Court orders. In addition, the Clerk of Court shall administratively close this action. (SEE DOCUMENT FOR FURTHER DETAILS.) (MD JS-6. Case Terminated) (rolm)
Related: [-]
Thursday, January 25, 2024
23 23 stip Stay Case Thu 01/25 2:45 PM
STIPULATION to Stay Case filed by Defendants Maverick Carter, Ping Fu, Jeffrey T. Hinson, Chad Hollingsworth, Jimmy Iovine, James S. Kahan, Live Nation Entertainment, Inc., Gregory B. Maffei, Randall T. Mays, Rich Paul, Michael Rapino, Dana Walden, Latriece Watkins.(Blunschi, Melanie)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proposed Order
22 22 notice Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel (G-123) Thu 01/25 2:35 PM
Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel: for attorney Elizabeth Jae Cheng counsel for Defendants Maverick Carter, Ping Fu, Jeffrey T. Hinson, Chad Hollingsworth, Jimmy Iovine, James S. Kahan, Live Nation Entertainment, Inc., Gregory B. Maffei, Randall T. Mays, Rich Paul, Michael Rapino, Dana Walden, Latriece Watkins. Adding Elizabeth J. Cheng as counsel of record for Michael Rapino, Gregory B. Maffei, Maverick Carter, Ping Fu, Jeffrey T. Hinson, Chad Hollingsworth, Jimmy Iovine, James S. Kahan, Randall T. Mays, Latriece Watkins, Rich Paul, Dana Walden and Live Nation Entertainment, Inc. for the reason indicated in the G-123 Notice. Filed by Defendants Michael Rapino, Gregory B. Maffei, Maverick Carter, Ping Fu, Jeffrey T. Hinson, Chad Hollingsworth, Jimmy Iovine, James S. Kahan, Randall T. Mays, Latriece Watkins, Rich Paul, Dana Walden and Live Nation Entertainment, Inc.. (Attorney Elizabeth Jae Cheng added to party Maverick Carter(pty:dft), Attorney Elizabeth Jae Cheng added to party Ping Fu(pty:dft), Attorney Elizabeth Jae Cheng added to party Jeffrey T. Hinson(pty:dft), Attorney Elizabeth Jae Cheng added to party Chad Hollingsworth (pty:dft), Attorney Elizabeth Jae Cheng added to party Jimmy Iovine(pty:dft), Attorney Elizabeth Jae Cheng added to party James S. Kahan (pty:dft), Attorney Elizabeth Jae Cheng added to party Live Nation Entertainment, Inc.(pty:dft), Attorney Elizabeth Jae Cheng added to party Gregory B. Maffei (pty:dft), Attorney Elizabeth Jae Cheng added to party Randall T. Mays(pty:dft), Attorney Elizabeth Jae Cheng added to party Rich Paul(pty:dft), Attorney Elizabeth Jae Cheng added to party Michael Rapino(pty:dft), Attorney Elizabeth Jae Cheng added to party Dana Walden(pty:dft), Attorney Elizabeth Jae Cheng added to party Latriece Watkins(pty:dft))(Cheng, Elizabeth)
Related: [-]
21 21 notice Certificate/Notice of Interested Parties Thu 01/25 2:28 PM
CERTIFICATION AND NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Defendants Maverick Carter, Ping Fu, Jeffrey T. Hinson, Chad Hollingsworth, Jimmy Iovine, James S. Kahan, Live Nation Entertainment, Inc., Gregory B. Maffei, Randall T. Mays, Rich Paul, Michael Rapino, Dana Walden, Latriece Watkins,(Blunschi, Melanie)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Attachment A
20 20 notice Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel (G-123) Thu 01/25 2:22 PM
Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel: for attorney Melanie M. Blunschi counsel for Defendants Maverick Carter, Ping Fu, Jeffrey T. Hinson, Chad Hollingsworth, Jimmy Iovine, James S. Kahan, Live Nation Entertainment, Inc., Gregory B. Maffei, Randall T. Mays, Rich Paul, Michael Rapino, Dana Walden, Latriece Watkins. Adding Melanie M. Blunschi as counsel of record for Michael Rapino, Gregory B. Maffei, Maverick Carter, Ping Fu, Jeffrey T. Hinson, Chad Hollingsworth, Jimmy Iovine, James S. Kahan, Randall T. Mays, Latriece Watkins, Rich Paul, Dana Walden and Live Nation Entertainment, Inc. for the reason indicated in the G-123 Notice. Filed by Defendants Michael Rapino, Gregory B. Maffei, Maverick Carter, Ping Fu, Jeffrey T. Hinson, Chad Hollingsworth, Jimmy Iovine, James S. Kahan, Randall T. Mays, Latriece Watkins, Rich Paul, Dana Walden and Live Nation Entertainment, Inc.. (Attorney Melanie M. Blunschi added to party Maverick Carter(pty:dft), Attorney Melanie M. Blunschi added to party Ping Fu(pty:dft), Attorney Melanie M. Blunschi added to party Jeffrey T. Hinson(pty:dft), Attorney Melanie M. Blunschi added to party Chad Hollingsworth (pty:dft), Attorney Melanie M. Blunschi added to party Jimmy Iovine(pty:dft), Attorney Melanie M. Blunschi added to party James S. Kahan (pty:dft), Attorney Melanie M. Blunschi added to party Live Nation Entertainment, Inc.(pty:dft), Attorney Melanie M. Blunschi added to party Gregory B. Maffei (pty:dft), Attorney Melanie M. Blunschi added to party Randall T. Mays(pty:dft), Attorney Melanie M. Blunschi added to party Rich Paul(pty:dft), Attorney Melanie M. Blunschi added to party Michael Rapino(pty:dft), Attorney Melanie M. Blunschi added to party Dana Walden(pty:dft), Attorney Melanie M. Blunschi added to party Latriece Watkins(pty:dft))(Blunschi, Melanie)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, December 05, 2023
19 19 order Appear Pro Hac Vice Tue 12/05 1:40 PM
ORDER ON APPLICATION OF NON-RESIDENT ATTORNEY TO APPEAR IN A SPECIFIC CASE PRO HAC VICE by Judge Kenly Kiya Kato. APPLICATION of Attorney Joshua H. Grabar to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Plaintiff Mark Steven Zwick, designating Jon A. Tostrud as local counsel GRANTED.; granting18 Non-Resident Attorney Joshua H. Grabar. (aco)
Related: [-]
Monday, December 04, 2023
18 18 motion Appear Pro Hac Vice (G-64) Mon 12/04 6:22 PM
APPLICATION of Non-Resident Attorney Joshua H. Grabar to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Plaintiff Mark Steven Zwick (Pro Hac Vice Fee - $500 Fee Paid, Receipt No. ACACDC-36513211) filed by Plaintiff Mark Steven Zwick. (Tostrud, Jon)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proposed Order
Friday, December 01, 2023
17 17 order Transferring Case (Related Case)(CV-34) Fri 12/01 2:09 PM
ORDER RE TRANSFER PURSUANT to this Court's General Order in the Matter of Assignment of Cases and Duties to the District Judges. Related Case- filed. Related Case No: 2:23-cv-06343 KK(ASx). Case transferred from Magistrate Judge Jean P. Rosenbluth and Judge Stephen V. Wilson to Judge Kenly Kiya Kato and Magistrate Judge Alka Sagar for all further proceedings. The case number will now reflect the initials of the transferee Judge 2:23-cv-09520 KK(ASx). Signed by Judge Kenly Kiya Kato (rn)
Related: [-]
Monday, November 27, 2023
16 16 order Appear Pro Hac Vice Tue 11/28 8:44 AM
ORDER ON APPLICATION OF NON-RESIDENT ATTORNEY TO APPEAR IN A SPECIFIC CASE PRO HAC VICE by Judge Stephen V. Wilson. APPLICATION of Attorney Timothy J. MacFall to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Plaintiff Mark Steven Zwick, designating Jon A. Tostrud as local counsel GRANTED.; granting15 Non-Resident Attorney Timothy J. MacFall. (aco)
Related: [-]
15 15 motion Appear Pro Hac Vice (G-64) Mon 11/27 11:51 AM
APPLICATION of Non-Resident Attorney Timothy J. MacFall to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Plaintiff Mark Steven Zwick (Pro Hac Vice Fee - $500 Fee Paid, Receipt No. ACACDC-36466901) filed by Plaintiff Mark Steven Zwick. (Attorney Jon A Tostrud added to party Mark Steven Zwick(pty:pla)) (Tostrud, Jon)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proposed Order
Tuesday, November 14, 2023
14 14 attorney Pro Hac Vice Application Due (G-109) - optional html form Tue 11/14 11:31 AM
NOTICE OF PRO HAC VICE APPLICATION DUE for Non-Resident Attorney Joshua H. Grabar. A document recently filed in this case lists you as an out-of-state attorney of record. However, the Court has not been able to locate any record that you are admitted to the Bar of this Court, and you have not filed an application to appear Pro Hac Vice in this case. Accordingly, within 5 business days of the date of this notice, you must either (1) have your local counsel file an application to appear Pro Hac Vice (Form G-64) and pay the applicable fee, or (2) complete the next section of this form and return it to the court at cacd_attyadm@cacd.uscourts.gov. You have been removed as counsel of record from the docket in this case, and you will not be added back to the docket until your Pro Hac Vice status has been resolved. (lh)
Related: [-]
13 13 attorney Pro Hac Vice Application Due (G-109) - optional html form Tue 11/14 11:27 AM
NOTICE OF PRO HAC VICE APPLICATION DUE for Non-Resident Attorney Samir Aougab. A document recently filed in this case lists you as an out-of-state attorney of record. However, the Court has not been able to locate any record that you are admitted to the Bar of this Court, and you have not filed an application to appear Pro Hac Vice in this case. Accordingly, within 5 business days of the date of this notice, you must either (1) have your local counsel file an application to appear Pro Hac Vice (Form G-64) and pay the applicable fee, or (2) complete the next section of this form and return it to the court at cacd_attyadm@cacd.uscourts.gov. You have been removed as counsel of record from the docket in this case, and you will not be added back to the docket until your Pro Hac Vice status has been resolved. (lh)
Related: [-]
12 12 attorney Pro Hac Vice Application Due (G-109) - optional html form Tue 11/14 11:25 AM
NOTICE OF PRO HAC VICE APPLICATION DUE for Non-Resident Attorney Vincent A. Licata. A document recently filed in this case lists you as an out-of-state attorney of record. However, the Court has not been able to locate any record that you are admitted to the Bar of this Court, and you have not filed an application to appear Pro Hac Vice in this case. Accordingly, within 5 business days of the date of this notice, you must either (1) have your local counsel file an application to appear Pro Hac Vice (Form G-64) and pay the applicable fee, or (2) complete the next section of this form and return it to the court at cacd_attyadm@cacd.uscourts.gov. You have been removed as counsel of record from the docket in this case, and you will not be added back to the docket until your Pro Hac Vice status has been resolved. (lh)
Related: [-]
11 11 attorney Pro Hac Vice Application Due (G-109) - optional html form Tue 11/14 11:23 AM
NOTICE OF PRO HAC VICE APPLICATION DUE for Non-Resident Attorney Gina M. Serra. A document recently filed in this case lists you as an out-of-state attorney of record. However, the Court has not been able to locate any record that you are admitted to the Bar of this Court, and you have not filed an application to appear Pro Hac Vice in this case. Accordingly, within 5 business days of the date of this notice, you must either (1) have your local counsel file an application to appear Pro Hac Vice (Form G-64) and pay the applicable fee, or (2) complete the next section of this form and return it to the court at cacd_attyadm@cacd.uscourts.gov. You have been removed as counsel of record from the docket in this case, and you will not be added back to the docket until your Pro Hac Vice status has been resolved. (lh)
Related: [-]
10 10 attorney Pro Hac Vice Application Due (G-109) - optional html form Tue 11/14 11:03 AM
NOTICE OF PRO HAC VICE APPLICATION DUE for Non-Resident Attorney Timothy J. MacFall. A document recently filed in this case lists you as an out-of-state attorney of record. However, the Court has not been able to locate any record that you are admitted to the Bar of this Court, and you have not filed an application to appear Pro Hac Vice in this case. Accordingly, within 5 business days of the date of this notice, you must either (1) have your local counsel file an application to appear Pro Hac Vice (Form G-64) and pay the applicable fee, or (2) complete the next section of this form and return it to the court at cacd_attyadm@cacd.uscourts.gov. You have been removed as counsel of record from the docket in this case, and you will not be added back to the docket until your Pro Hac Vice status has been resolved. (lh)
Related: [-]
9 9 attorney Pro Hac Vice Application Due (G-109) - optional html form Tue 11/14 11:02 AM
NOTICE OF PRO HAC VICE APPLICATION DUE for Non-Resident Attorney Seth D. Rigrodsky. A document recently filed in this case lists you as an out-of-state attorney of record. However, the Court has not been able to locate any record that you are admitted to the Bar of this Court, and you have not filed an application to appear Pro Hac Vice in this case. Accordingly, within 5 business days of the date of this notice, you must either (1) have your local counsel file an application to appear Pro Hac Vice (Form G-64) and pay the applicable fee, or (2) complete the next section of this form and return it to the court at cacd_attyadm@cacd.uscourts.gov. You have been removed as counsel of record from the docket in this case, and you will not be added back to the docket until your Pro Hac Vice status has been resolved. (lh)
Related: [-]
8 8 service Summons Issued (Attorney Civil Case Opening) Tue 11/14 10:59 AM
21 DAY Summons Issued re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening)1 as to Defendants Maverick Carter, Ping Fu, Jeffrey T. Hinson, Chad Hollingsworth, Jimmy Iovine, James S. Kahan, Live Nation Entertainment, Inc., Gregory B. Maffei, Randall T. Mays, Rich Paul, Michael Rapino, Dana Walden, Latriece Watkins. (lh)
Related: [-]
7 7 notice Notice to Counsel Re: Consent to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge - optional html form Tue 11/14 10:57 AM
Notice to Counsel Re Consent to Proceed Before a United States Magistrate Judge. (lh)
Related: [-]
6 6 adr Notice to Parties of Court-Directed ADR Program (ADR-8) - optional html form Tue 11/14 10:57 AM
NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (lh)
Related: [-]
5 5 notice Notice of Assignment to United States Judges (CV-18) - optional html form Tue 11/14 10:56 AM
NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge Stephen V. Wilson and Magistrate Judge Jean P. Rosenbluth. (lh)
Related: [-]
Friday, November 10, 2023
4 4 notice Certificate/Notice of Interested Parties Fri 11/10 12:05 PM
Certification and NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Plaintiff Mark Steven Zwick, (Byrd, Rachele)
Related: [-]
3 3 notice Summons Request Fri 11/10 12:02 PM
Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening)1 , Civil Cover Sheet (CV-71)2 filed by Plaintiff Mark Steven Zwick. (Byrd, Rachele)
Related: [-]
2 2 misc Civil Cover Sheet (CV-71) Fri 11/10 11:55 AM
CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Plaintiff Mark Steven Zwick. (Byrd, Rachele)
Related: [-]
1 1 41 pgs cmp Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) Fri 11/10 11:53 AM
COMPLAINT Receipt No: BCACDC-36387594 - Fee: $402, filed by Plaintiff Mark Steven Zwick. (Attorney Rachele R Byrd added to party Mark Steven Zwick(pty:pla))(Byrd, Rachele)
Related: [-]