California Central District Court
Judge:Maame Ewusi-Mensah Frimpong
Referred: Alicia G Rosenberg
Case #: 2:23-cv-09531
Nature of Suit110 Contract - Insurance
Cause28:1332 Diversity-Insurance Contract
Case Filed:Nov 10, 2023
Terminated:Apr 19, 2024
Last checked: Saturday May 11, 2024 2:19 AM PDT
Defendant
Catlin Specialty Insurance Company
Represented By
Alexander Eugene Potente
Clyde And Co LLP
contact info
Plaintiff
1800 Rosecrans Partners, LLC
Represented By
Jeffrey A Kiburtz
Covington And Burling LLP
contact info
Paulina Rafizadeh
Covington And Burling LLP
contact info


Docket last updated: 2 hours ago
Friday, April 19, 2024
18 18 stip Dismiss Case Fri 04/19 1:08 PM
STIPULATION to Dismiss Case pursuant to Rule 41(a)(1)(A)(ii) of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure filed by Plaintiff 1800 Rosecrans Partners, LLC.(Kiburtz, Jeffrey)
Related: [-]
Friday, March 22, 2024
17 17 textonly Text Only Scheduling Notice Fri 03/22 10:04 AM
(IN CHAMBERS) ORDER TEXT ONLY ENTRY by Judge Maame Ewusi-Mensah Frimpong: The Court is in receipt of the Joint Statement re: Status of Settlement filed by the parties. ECF No.16 . The Court ORDERS the parties to file a joint statement advising the Court of the status of the settlement no later than 45 days from the date of this Order. The failure to timely or adequately respond to this Order may, without further warning, result in the Court dismissing this action. IT IS SO ORDERED. THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (dbe)
Related: [-]
Friday, March 15, 2024
16 16 misc Statement Fri 03/15 4:37 PM
STATEMENT Joint Statement re: Status of Settlement filed by Plaintiff 1800 Rosecrans Partners, LLC (Kiburtz, Jeffrey)
Related: [-]
Thursday, February 15, 2024
15 15 order Minutes of In Chambers Order/Directive - no proceeding held ~Util - Terminate Deadlines and Hearings Fri 02/16 4:46 PM
(IN CHAMBERS) ORDER by Judge Maame Ewusi-Mensah Frimpong. On February 14, 2024, the parties filed a Notice of Settlement14 . The Court, having considered the Notice of Settlement and finding good cause therefore, ORDERS as follows: (1) All discovery and pretrial dates are vacated. (2) The parties shall file a notice of dismissal or, in the alternative, a joint statement advising the Court of the status of the settlement no later than 30 days from the date of this Order. The failure to timely or adequately respond to this Order may, without further warning, result in the Court dismissing this action. (yl)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, February 14, 2024
14 14 notice Settlement Wed 02/14 4:32 PM
NOTICE of Settlement filed by Defendant Catlin Specialty Insurance Company. (Potente, Alexander)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, December 26, 2023
13 13 order Initial Order Setting R26 Scheduling Conference - form only Tue 12/26 5:29 PM
ORDER SETTING SCHEDULING CONFERENCE by Judge Maame Ewusi-Mensah Frimpong. Scheduling Conference set for 2/29/2024 at 10:00 AM before Judge Maame Ewusi-Mensah Frimpong. (dbe)
Related: [-]
Friday, December 22, 2023
12 12 notice Certificate/Notice of Interested Parties Fri 12/22 12:07 PM
NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Defendant Catlin Specialty Insurance Company, identifying Indian Harbor Insurance Company, as Successor-In-Interest to Catlin Specialty Insurance Company, XL Specialty Insurance Company, Greenwich Insurance Company, X.L. America, Inc., XL Financial Holdings (Ireland) Limited, XL Bermuda Ltd, XL Group Ltd, AXA SA. (Potente, Alexander)
Related: [-]
11 11 answer Answer to Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) Fri 12/22 11:47 AM
ANSWER to Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening),1 with JURY DEMAND by Defendant Indian Harbor Insurance Company as Successor-in-Interest to Catlin Specialty Insurance Company filed by Defendant Catlin Specialty Insurance Company.(Potente, Alexander)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, December 12, 2023
10 10 textonly Text Only Scheduling Notice Tue 12/12 1:04 PM
TEXT ONLY ENTRY by Judge Maame Ewusi-Mensah Frimpong: This matter has been assigned to District Judge Maame Ewusi-Mensah Frimpong. The Court refers counsel to the Court's Initial Standing Order found on the Court's website under Judge Frimpong's Procedures and Schedules. Please read the Standing Order carefully. It is the responsibilities of the parties to maintain familiarly with the Standing Order and any future amendments that the Court may issue by periodically checking the Court's website for the operative version of the Standing Order. IT IS SO ORDERED. THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (dbe)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, December 06, 2023
9 9 stip Extending Time to Answer (30 days or less) Wed 12/06 12:39 PM
STIPULATION Extending Time to Answer the complaint as to Catlin Specialty Insurance Company answer now due 12/22/2023, re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening),1 filed by Defendant Catlin Specialty Insurance Company.(Attorney Alexander Eugene Potente added to party Catlin Specialty Insurance Company(pty:dft))(Potente, Alexander)
Related: [-]
Thursday, November 16, 2023
8 8 service Summons Issued (Attorney Civil Case Opening) Thu 11/16 1:56 PM
21 DAY Summons Issued re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening),1 as to Defendant Catlin Specialty Insurance Company. (jtil)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, November 15, 2023
7 7 notice Notice to Counsel Re: Consent to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge - optional html form Wed 11/15 6:08 PM
Notice to Counsel Re Consent to Proceed Before a United States Magistrate Judge. (jtil)
Related: [-]
6 6 adr Notice to Parties of Court-Directed ADR Program (ADR-8) - optional html form Wed 11/15 6:07 PM
NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (jtil)
Related: [-]
5 5 notice Notice of Assignment to United States Judges (CV-18) - optional html form Wed 11/15 6:07 PM
NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge Maame Ewusi-Mensah Frimpong and Magistrate Judge Alicia G. Rosenberg. (jtil)
Related: [-]
Friday, November 10, 2023
4 4 notice Summons Request Fri 11/10 4:59 PM
Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening),1 filed by Plaintiff 1800 Rosecrans Partners, LLC. (Kiburtz, Jeffrey)
Related: [-]
3 3 notice Certificate/Notice of Interested Parties Fri 11/10 3:57 PM
NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Plaintiff 1800 Rosecrans Partners, LLC, (Kiburtz, Jeffrey)
Related: [-]
2 2 misc Civil Cover Sheet (CV-71) Fri 11/10 3:54 PM
CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Plaintiff 1800 Rosecrans Partners, LLC. (Kiburtz, Jeffrey)
Related: [-]
1 1 31 pgs cmp Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) Fri 11/10 3:50 PM
COMPLAINT Receipt No: ACACDC-36388167 - Fee: $402, filed by Plaintiff 1800 Rosecrans Partners, LLC. (Attorney Jeffrey A Kiburtz added to party 1800 Rosecrans Partners, LLC(pty:pla))(Kiburtz, Jeffrey)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit Exhibit 1,
Att: 2 Exhibit Exhibit 2,
Att: 3 Exhibit Exhibit 3