North Carolina Middle District Court
Case #: 1:23-mj-00474
Case Filed:Nov 09, 2023
Last checked: Sunday Nov 12, 2023 2:47 AM EST
Defendant
CODY ALLEN CASHATT (1)
Represented By
COREY D. BUGGS
The Law Offices Of Corey D. Buggs, PLLC
contact info
Plaintiff
USA
Represented By
LINDSEY ANN FREEMAN
United States Attorney'S Office
contact info


Docket last updated: 11/12/2023 4:18 AM EST
Thursday, November 09, 2023
Arrest (Rule 5) of CODY ALLEN CASHATT (Garrett, Kim)
Related: [-]
Minute Entry for proceedings held before MAG/JUDGE L. PATRICK AULD: INITIAL APPEARANCE IN RULE 5 PROCEEDINGS as to CODY ALLEN CASHATT held on 11/9/2023. AUSA Lindsey Freeman. Attorney Corey D. Buggs appointed and present with Defendant. Defendant advised of rights and charges. Defendant waived identity hearing. The Court ordered Defendant transported in custody to the Western District of Virginia for further proceedings. Proceedings recorded. (O'Doherty, Sinead)
Related: [-]
Oral Motion Re: Detention by USA as to CODY ALLEN CASHATT. (O'Doherty, Sinead)
Related: [-]