New Mexico District Court
Case #: 2:23-mj-01520
Case Filed:Oct 13, 2023
Last checked: Sunday Nov 12, 2023 1:18 AM MST
Defendant
Ivan Bustamante (2)
Represented By
Damian Rasmussen
Law Offices Of Damian Rasmussen
contact info
Defendant
Aaron Dacosta (1)
Represented By
Donald Jeffrey Morrison
Federal Public Defender
contact info
Interested Party
US Probation and Pretrial Services
Represented By
Rubisela Sedillo
contact info
Diana Lopez
contact info
Plaintiff
USA
Represented By
Renee L Camacho
United States Attorney'S Office
contact info


Docket last updated: 11/12/2023 3:14 AM MST
Tuesday, September 26, 2023
Arrest of Aaron Dacosta, Ivan Bustamante (rh)
Related: [-]
Friday, October 13, 2023
Set/Reset Hearings as to Aaron Dacosta, Ivan Bustamante: Initial Appearance set for 10/13/2023 at 09:09 AM in Las Cruces - 340 Sierra Blanca Courtroom (North Tower) before Magistrate Judge Jerry H. Ritter. (rh)
Related: [-]
Attorney update in case as to Aaron Dacosta, Ivan Bustamante. Attorney Renee L Camacho for USA added. (nr)
Related: [-]
1 1 COMPLAINT as to Aaron Dacosta, Ivan Bustamante. (nr)
Related: [-]
2 2 ORDER APPOINTING FEDERAL PUBLIC DEFENDER Donald Jeffrey Morrison for Aaron Dacosta by Magistrate Judge Jerry H. Ritter (nr) [THIS IS A TEXT-ONLY ENTRY. THERE ARE NO DOCUMENTS ATTACHED.]
Related: [-]
3 3 CJA 20: Appointment of Attorney Damian Rasmussen for Ivan Bustamante by Magistrate Judge Jerry H. Ritter (vrr) [THIS IS A TEXT-ONLY ENTRY. THERE ARE NO DOCUMENTS ATTACHED.]
Related: [-]
4 4 Clerk's Minutes for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Jerry H. Ritter: Initial Appearance as to Aaron Dacosta, Ivan Bustamante held on 10/13/2023. Related [+] (nr)
Related: [-] cording Info: LCR: Sierra Blanca
5 5 Pursuant to the Due Process Protections Act, the Court confirms the United States' obligation to produce all exculpatory evidence to the defendant pursuant to Brady v. Maryland, 373 U.S. 83 (1963) and its progeny, and orders it to do so. Failing to do so in a timely manner may result in consequences, including but not limited to, exclusion of evidence, adverse jury instructions, dismissal of charges, contempt proceedings, or sanctions by Magistrate Judge Jerry H. Ritter (nr) [THIS IS A TEXT-ONLY ENTRY. THERE ARE NO DOCUMENTS ATTACHED.]
Related: [-]
6 6 NOTICE OF HEARING as to Aaron Dacosta, Ivan Bustamante: Preliminary/Detention Hearing set for 10/18/2023 at 09:00 AM in Las Cruces - 340 Sierra Blanca Courtroom (North Tower) before Magistrate Judge Damian L. Martinez. (rh) [THIS IS A TEXT-ONLY ENTRY. THERE ARE NO DOCUMENTS ATTACHED.]
Related: [-]