Illinois Central District Court
Judge:Sue E Myerscough
Referred: Eric I Long
Case #: 3:23-cv-03327
Nature of Suit443 Civil Rights - Housing/Accommodations
Cause28:451 Employment Discrimination
Case Filed:Nov 11, 2023
Last checked: Saturday May 11, 2024 3:50 AM CDT
Defendant
Illinois Department of Corrections
Represented By
Lisa A Cook
Illinois Attorney General
contact info
Plaintiff
Amber L. Egan
Represented By
Michael T Smith
Michael T Smith & Associates
contact info


Docket last updated: 4 hours ago
Friday, February 21, 2025
26 26 answer Answer to Amended Complaint Fri 02/21 10:24 AM
ANSWER to14 Amended Complaint AND AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES DIRECTED TO PLAINTIFFS FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT by Illinois Department of Corrections.(Slater, Bernard)
Related: [-]
Monday, January 27, 2025
order Order on Motion for Extension of Time to Answer ~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings Mon 01/27 2:54 PM
TEXT ORDER entered by US Magistrate Judge Eric I. Long on 1/24/2025: Defendant's unopposed motion for an extension of time25 to file an answer or responsive pleading to Plaintiff's Complaint is GRANTED for the reasons stated in the motion. Plaintiff must file an answer or responsive pleading by February 21, 2025. (DW)
Related: [-]
Friday, January 17, 2025
25 25 motion Extension of Time to File Answer Fri 01/17 3:49 PM
Third MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re14 Amended Complaint Agreed by Defendant Illinois Department of Corrections. Responses due by 1/31/2025 (Slater, Bernard)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, January 07, 2025
order Order Reassigning Case Tue 01/07 12:57 AM
Related: [-]
Monday, December 23, 2024
24 24 motion Extension of Time to File Answer Mon 12/23 3:58 PM
Second MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re14 Amended Complaint Unoppposed by Defendant Illinois Department of Corrections. Responses due by 1/6/2025 (Slater, Bernard)
Related: [-]
order Order on Motion for Extension of Time to Answer Mon 12/23 4:28 PM
TEXT ORDER entered by US Magistrate Judge Karen McNaught on 12/23/2024: The unopposed Motion for Extension of Time24 filed by defendant, Illinois Department of Corrections, is GRANTED. The defendant shall answer or otherwise plead by 1/20/2025. (BL)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, December 03, 2024
23 23 motion Substitute Attorney Tue 12/03 1:49 PM
MOTION to Substitute Attorney, Lisa Cook to be replaced by Bernard James Slater, Jr., by Defendant Illinois Department of Corrections. Responses due by 12/17/2024 (Slater, Bernard)
Related: [-]
order Order on Motion to Substitute Attorney Tue 12/03 3:43 PM
TEXT ORDER entered by US Magistrate Judge Karen McNaught on 12/3/2024: The motion to substitute counsel23 filed by defendant, Illinois Department of Corrections, is GRANTED. The Clerk shall terminate the appearance of Assistant Attorney General Lisa Cook. (BL)
Related: [-]
Friday, November 22, 2024
order Order on Motion for Extension of Time to Answer ~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines Fri 11/22 10:35 AM
TEXT ORDER entered by US Magistrate Judge Karen McNaught on 11/22/2024: The unopposed Motion for Extension of Time22 filed by defendant to answer or otherwise respond to the complaint is GRANTED for the reasons stated therein. Defendant shall answer or otherwise plead to the complaint by 12/23/2024. (JPL)
Related: [-]
Thursday, November 21, 2024
22 22 motion Extension of Time to File Answer Thu 11/21 12:34 PM
MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re14 Amended Complaint Unoppposed by Defendant Illinois Department of Corrections. Responses due by 12/5/2024 (Slater, Bernard)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, November 19, 2024
21 21 notice Notice of Appearance of Attorney Tue 11/19 9:51 AM
NOTICE of Appearance of Attorney by Bernard James Slater, Jr on behalf of Illinois Department of Corrections (Slater, Bernard)
Related: [-]
Friday, November 08, 2024
20 20 14 pgs order Order on Motion to Dismiss Fri 11/08 9:58 AM
ORDER entered by District Judge Sue E Myerscough on 11/8/2024 granting16 Motion to Dismiss. Defendant's Motion to Dismiss (d/e16 ) is GRANTED. Count III of Plaintiff's Amended Complaint is DISMISSED, without prejudice, for a failure to exhaust administrative remedies. Plaintiff's case will continue as to Counts I and II. See written Order. (RAH)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, June 25, 2024
order Order Tue 06/25 4:09 PM
TEXT ORDER entered by U.S. District Judge Sue E. Myerscough on 6/25/2024. Pursuant to the jointly filed Notice and Stipulation of Dismissal With Prejudice as to Count IV of the Plaintiff's First Amended Complaint (d/e19 ), Count IV of the Plaintiff's First Amended Complaint (d/e14 ) is dismissed with prejudice, with each party to bear their own fees, costs, and expenses. (BL)
Related: [-]
Monday, June 24, 2024
19 19 misc Stipulation of Dismissal Mon 06/24 5:23 PM
STIPULATION of Dismissal with Prejudice as to Count IV of Plaintiff's First Amended Complaint by Amber L. Egan. (Smith, Michael)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, May 29, 2024
order Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply Wed 05/29 4:21 PM
TEXT ORDER entered by US Magistrate Judge Karen McNaught on 5/29/2024: The motion filed by plaintiff for extension of time to respond to Count IV of defendant's motion to dismiss Doc.18 is GRANTED. Plaintiff shall respond to the motion to dismiss by 6/9/2024. (KLC)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, May 28, 2024
18 18 motion Extension of Time to File Response/Reply Tue 05/28 8:31 PM
First MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to Respond to Defendants Motion to Dismiss as to Count IV of Plaintiffs Amended Complaint by Plaintiff Amber L. Egan. Responses due by 6/11/2024 (Smith, Michael)
Related: [-]
17 17 respm Response to Motion/Petition Tue 05/28 8:29 PM
RESPONSE to Motion re16 MOTION to Dismiss Counts III and IV of Plaintiff's First Amended Complaint (AS TO COUNT III) filed by Plaintiff Amber L. Egan. (Smith, Michael)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, May 14, 2024
16 16 motion Dismiss Tue 05/14 2:48 PM
MOTION to Dismiss Counts III and IV of Plaintiff's First Amended Complaint by Defendant Illinois Department of Corrections. Responses due by 5/28/2024 (Cook, Lisa)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, May 01, 2024
order Order on Motion for Extension of Time to Answer ~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines Wed 05/01 2:58 PM
TEXT ORDER entered by Magistrate Judge Karen L. McNaught on May 1, 2024: Defendant's Motion for Extension of Time to file a response to the amended complaint15 is GRANTED for the reasons stated therein. Defendant shall respond to the amended complaint by May 14, 2024. (BL)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, April 30, 2024
15 15 motion Extension of Time to File Answer Tue 04/30 4:14 PM
MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re14 Amended Complaint or Response by Defendant Illinois Department of Corrections. Responses due by 5/14/2024 (Cook, Lisa)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, April 16, 2024
14 14 cmp Amended Complaint Tue 04/16 3:46 PM
FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT against Illinois Department of Corrections, filed by Amber L. Egan.(BL)
Related: [-]
order Order on Motion to Dismiss Order on Motion to Amend/Correct Tue 04/16 3:39 PM
TEXT ORDER entered by Judge Sue Myerscough on 4/16/2024: On February 28, Defendant Filed a Motion to Dismiss Plaintiff's Complaint. (d/e12 ). On March 20, 2024, Plaintiff filed an Unopposed Motion for Leave to File First Amended Complaint. (d/e13 ). Plaintiff's Motion indicates Defense counsel has no objection as to the filing of the Amended Complaint as it relates to timing, but reserves any other objections on other grounds. Plaintiff's Motion for Leave to File First Amended Complaint is GRANTED. The clerk is DIRECTED to file Exhibit 1 attached to the Motion for Leave as Plaintiff's First Amended Complaint. Defendant's Motion to Dismiss (d/e12 ) is DENIED as MOOT at this time. (BL)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, March 27, 2024
13 13 motion Amend/Correct Wed 03/27 2:02 PM
First MOTION to Amend/Correct1 Complaint UNOPPOSED MOTION FOR LEAVE TO FILE FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT by Plaintiff Amber L. Egan. Responses due by 4/10/2024 (Smith, Michael)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, February 28, 2024
12 12 motion Dismiss Wed 02/28 5:12 PM
MOTION to Dismiss by Defendant Illinois Department of Corrections. Responses due by 3/13/2024 (Cook, Lisa)
Related: [-]
11 11 notice Notice of Appearance of Attorney Wed 02/28 5:11 PM
NOTICE of Appearance of Attorney by Lisa A Cook on behalf of Illinois Department of Corrections (Cook, Lisa)
Related: [-]
Thursday, February 08, 2024
10 10 service Summons Returned Executed (21 days to answer) Thu 02/08 11:17 AM
SUMMONS Returned Executed by Amber L. Egan. Illinois Department of Corrections served on 1/5/2024, answer due 1/26/2024. (Smith, Michael)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, February 07, 2024
9 9 service Summons Issued Wed 02/07 8:59 AM
Alias Summons Issued as to Illinois Department of Corrections. (BL)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, February 06, 2024
8 8 notice Notice (Other) Tue 02/06 3:01 PM
NOTICE Request for Summons to issue re7 Amended Document (Smith, Michael)
Related: [-]
7 7 misc Amended Document (NOT Motion) Tue 02/06 1:47 PM
AMENDED DOCUMENT by Amber L. Egan. Amendment to6 Amended Document Second Request for Alias Summons . (Smith, Michael)
Related: [-]
Monday, January 22, 2024
6 6 misc Amended Document (NOT Motion) Mon 01/22 2:02 PM
AMENDED DOCUMENT by Amber L. Egan. Amendment to4 Notice (Other) Request Alias Summons . (Smith, Michael)
Related: [-]
Friday, January 19, 2024
5 5 service Summons Issued Fri 01/19 4:33 PM
Summons Issued as to Illinois Department of Corrections. Original summons returned to Plaintiff Counsel for service. (BL)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, January 17, 2024
4 4 notice Notice (Other) Wed 01/17 2:20 PM
NOTICE Summons Requested (Smith, Michael)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, November 22, 2023
3 3 notice Notice (Other) Wed 11/22 2:47 PM
NOTICE Civil Cover Sheet (Smith, Michael)
Related: [-]
Saturday, November 11, 2023
2 2 notice Notice of Appearance of Attorney Sat 11/11 3:10 PM
NOTICE of Appearance of Attorney by Michael T Smith on behalf of Amber L. Egan (Smith, Michael)
Related: [-]
1 1 cmp Attorney Complaint Sat 11/11 3:02 PM
COMPLAINT against Illinois Department of Corrections ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number AILCDC-4339335.), filed by Amber L. Egan.(Smith, Michael)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A,
Att: 2 Exhibit B