Florida Southern District Court
Judge:Aileen M Cannon
Case #: 2:23-cv-14358
Nature of Suit485 Other Statutes - Telephone Consumer Protection Act
Cause47:227 Restrictions of Use of Telephone Equipment
Case Filed:Nov 13, 2023
Terminated:Mar 26, 2024
Last checked: Saturday May 11, 2024 7:54 AM EDT
Defendant
Providence Health Advisors LLC
1500 N.W. 62nd Street 206
Fort Lauderdale, FL 33309
Plaintiff
Carlton Harrison
Represented By
Geoffrey Jonathan Moul
Murray Murphy Moul + Basil LLP
contact info
Plaintiff
Michael Pathman
Represented By
Geoffrey Jonathan Moul
Murray Murphy Moul + Basil LLP
contact info


Docket last updated: 56 minutes ago
Tuesday, March 26, 2024
11 11 1 pgs order Order Dismissing/Closing Case or Party Wed 03/27 9:36 AM
ORDER Closing Case (Without Prejudice) . Signed by Judge Aileen M. Cannon on 3/26/2024. See attached document for full details. (nwn)
Related: [-]
Monday, March 25, 2024
10 10 notice Notice of Voluntary Dismissal - aty Mon 03/25 10:35 AM
NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal Without Prejudice by Carlton Harrison, Michael Pathman (Moul, Geoffrey)
Related: [-]
Monday, March 11, 2024
9 9 notice Notice of Compliance Mon 03/11 10:38 AM
CLERK'S NOTICE of Compliance. Copy of DE8 ORDER DIRECTING PLAINTIFF TO FILE MOTION FOR CLERK'S DEFAULT mailed to PROVIDENCE HEALTH ADVISORS LLC. (nwn)
Related: [-]
8 8 order - Order (PAPERLESS or pdf attached) Mon 03/11 10:36 AM
ORDER DIRECTING PLAINTIFF TO FILE MOTION FOR CLERK'S DEFAULT. Plaintiffs shall file a Motion for Entry of Clerk's Default that includes a certificate of service indicating that notice of this Order was sent to Defendant, including the address to which it was sent, on or before March 25, 2024. Signed by Judge Aileen M. Cannon on 3/11/2024. See attached document for full details. (nwn)
Related: [-]
Monday, February 26, 2024
7 7 notice Notice of Compliance Tue 02/27 8:19 AM
CLERK'S NOTICE of Compliance. Copy of DE6 ORDER REQUIRING RESPONSE TO COMPLAINT mailed to Providence Health Advisors LLC. (nwn)
Related: [-]
6 6 order - Order (PAPERLESS or pdf attached) ~Util - Set Response/Answer Due Deadline Tue 02/27 8:18 AM
ORDER REQUIRING RESPONSE TO COMPLAINT. Providence Health Advisors LLC response/answer due 3/7/2024. Signed by Judge Aileen M. Cannon on 2/26/2024. See attached document for full details. (nwn)
Related: [-]
Friday, February 02, 2024
5 5 service Summons (Affidavit) Returned Executed Fri 02/02 9:50 AM
SUMMONS (Affidavit) Returned Executed on1 Complaint, with a 21 day response/answer filing deadline pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 12 by Michael Pathman, Carlton Harrison. Providence Health Advisors LLC served on 2/1/2024, response/answer due 2/22/2024. (Moul, Geoffrey)
Related: [-]
Friday, January 19, 2024
4 4 2 pgs order Order to Show Cause Mon 01/22 11:40 AM
ORDER TO SERVE. Plaintiffs shall perfect service upon Defendant Providence Health Advisors LLC or Show Cause Response due by 2/11/2024. Signed by Judge Aileen M. Cannon on 1/19/2024. See attached document for full details. (nwn)
Related: [-]
Monday, November 13, 2023
3 3 service Summons Issued Mon 11/13 3:03 PM
Summons Issued as to Providence Health Advisors LLC. (nwn)
Related: [-]
2 2 order Clerk's Notice of Judge Assignment and Optional Consent Mon 11/13 3:00 PM
Clerks Notice of Judge Assignment to Judge Aileen M. Cannon. Pursuant to 28 USC 636(c), the parties are hereby notified that the U.S. Magistrate Judge Shaniek M. Maynard is available to handle any or all proceedings in this case. If agreed, parties should complete and file the Consent form found on our website. It is not necessary to file a document indicating lack of consent. (nwn)
Related: [-]
1 1 15 pgs cmp Complaint Mon 11/13 12:37 PM
COMPLAINT Class Action against Providence Health Advisors LLC. Filing fees $ 402.00 receipt number AFLSDC-17066966, filed by Michael Pathman, Carlton Harrison.(Moul, Geoffrey)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet,
Att: 2 Summon(s) Providence Health Advisors LLC