Georgia Northern Bankruptcy Court
Chapter 11
Judge:Sage M Sigler
Case #: 1:23-bk-61266
Case Filed:Nov 13, 2023

TypeCorporation
Tax IDsubscribers only
# of Creditors1-49
Est. Assets$0 to $50,000
Est. Liabilities $1,000,001 to $10 million
Nature of Business Other
Nature of Debts Primarily Business

Debtor
My Georgia Plumber, Inc.
2080 Marietta Hwy
Canton, GA 30114-4022
Represented By
Cameron M. McCord
Jones & Walden, LLC
contact info

Create an account to get the full party report for this case.



Docket last updated: 3 minutes ago
Thursday, March 20, 2025
119 119 misc Certificate of Mailing by BNC of Order on Motion to Dismiss Case (403) Fri 03/21 12:53 AM
Certificate of Mailing by BNC of Order on Motion to Dismiss Case Notice Date 03/20/2025. (Admin.)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, March 19, 2025
118 118 misc Certificate of Mailing by BNC of Order on Application to Employ (408) Thu 03/20 12:57 AM
Certificate of Mailing by BNC of Order on Application to Employ Notice Date 03/19/2025. (Admin.)
Related: [-]
117 117 misc 0-Certificate of Service Wed 03/19 11:29 AM
Certificate of Service of Order Authorizing Debtor to Employ Olga Bashkatova and Pay as Ordinary Course Professional filed by Cameron M. McCord on behalf of My Georgia Plumber, Inc.. Related [+] (McCord, Cameron)
Related: [-] 115
Tuesday, March 18, 2025
116 116 order Dismiss Case, Motion to Tue 03/18 7:31 AM
Consent Order on the Motion of the Internal Revenue Service to Dismiss or Convert Case. Related [+] Service by BNC. Entered on 3/18/2025. (mrw)
Related: [-] 102
Monday, March 17, 2025
115 115 order Application to Employ Mon 03/17 7:11 AM
Order Authorizing Debtor to Employ Olga Bashkatova and Pay as Ordinary Course Professional. Related [+]. To be served by Debtor's counsel. Entered on 3/17/2025. (mrw)
Related: [-] 113
Thursday, March 13, 2025
misc Hearing Held Thu 03/13 9:44 AM
Court Notes: Consent order to be submitted re: Related [+] (njm)
Related: [-] 101