Adversary Proceeding
Lead BK case is: 3:23-bk-03496

California Southern Bankruptcy Court
Chapter 7
Judge:Margaret M Mann
Case #: 3:23-ap-90077
Nature of Suit2 Bankruptcy - Other
71 Bankruptcy - Injunctive relief - imposition of stay
72 Bankruptcy - Injunctive relief - other
14 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - other
Case Filed:Nov 13, 2023
Terminated:Mar 15, 2024
Last checked: never
Defendant
Superior Court of California, County of San Diego, North County Family Division
Represented By
Superior Court of California, County of San Diego, North County Family Division
contact info
Defendant
Judge Sharon Kalemkiarian
Represented By
Judge Sharon Kalemkiarian
contact info
Defendant
Lynnetta Watts
Represented By
Lynnetta Watts
contact info
Defendant
Nora Watts
Represented By
Nora Watts
contact info
Plaintiffs
Phillip W. Simon
2862 Rancho Cortes
Carlsbad, CA 92009
Represented By
Phillip W. Simon
contact info


Docket last updated: 10 hours ago
Friday, March 15, 2024
39 39 order Closed Adversary Proceeding Fri 03/15 3:42 PM
Adversary Proceeding Closed (Slaughter, S.)
Related: [-]
Friday, February 09, 2024
38 38 notice BNC Court Certificate of Notice Sun 02/11 9:05 PM
BNC Court Certificate of Notice. Related [+] Notice Date 02/11/2024. (Admin.)
Related: [-] 37 Order Dismissing Adversary Proceeding
Thursday, February 08, 2024
37 37 order Dismissing Adversary Proceeding (Order)(CSD 3039, 3040, other) Fri 02/09 11:42 AM
Order Denying (1) Debtor Phillip W. Simon, Jr's Request for Relief for Alleged Violations of the Automatic Stay; (2) Dismissing with Prejudice the Remaining Claims Against the Superior Court and All State Court Judges Based on Eleventh Amendment Immunity, Preclusion and, Alternatively, Judicial Immunity; and (3) Discretionary Abstaining from Hearing the Claims Against Lynette Watts and Nora Watts (Dismissing Adversary Proceeding 3:2023-ap-90077-MM) . with BNC Service signed on 2/8/2024. (Schmitt, T.). Related document(s)35 Tentative Ruling (CHAP),36 Minute Order. Modified on 2/9/2024 (Schmitt, T.)
Related: [-]
36 36 vCal Minute Order - CHAP Thu 02/08 12:06 PM
Minute Order. Hearing DATE: 02/08/2024 , MATTER: 1) MOTION TO DISMISS DEFENDANTS FROM THE ADVERSARY COMPLAINT, IN THE ALTERNATIVE, MOTION TO STRIKE CAUSES OF ACTION FILED BY LYNNETTA WATTS, NORA WATTS (fr. 1/18/24); 2) MOTION TO DISMISS COMPLAINT FILED BY SUPERIOR COURT OF CALIFORNIA, THE HON. SHARON KALEMKIARIAN (fr. 1/18/24). DISPOSITION: See Attached PDF document for details. Related [+] (Cruz, L.)
Related: [-] 9 Motion to Dismiss,7 Motion to Dismiss
Tuesday, February 06, 2024
35 35 vCal Tentative Ruling - CHAP Tue 02/06 12:08 PM
Tentative Ruling. Department 1: Hearing Date and Time: 02/08/2024 10:00 AM, MATTER: 1) MOTION TO DISMISS DEFENDANTS FROM THE ADVERSARY COMPLAINT, IN THE ALTERNATIVE, MOTION TO STRIKE CAUSES OF ACTION FILED BY LYNNETTA WATTS, NORA WATTS (fr. 1/18/24); 2) MOTION TO DISMISS COMPLAINT FILED BY SUPERIOR COURT OF CALIFORNIA, THE HON. SHARON KALEMKIARIAN (fr. 1/18/24) Related [+] (Cruz, L.)
Related: [-] 7 Motion to Dismiss,9 Motion to Dismiss
Monday, January 29, 2024
34 34 misc Brief Mon 01/29 9:12 PM
Brief Regarding Abstension filed by Tanisha N. Bostick on behalf of Lynnetta Watts, Nora Watts. Related [+] (Bostick, Tanisha)
Related: [-] 26 Minute Order
Friday, January 26, 2024
33 33 ans Reply Fri 01/26 12:04 PM
Reply by the Court Defendants to Plaintiffs Statement for Decision to Not Abstain From Hearing Adversarial Proceeding [ECF 31] filed by James P. Hill of Sullivan Hill Rez & Engel, APLC on behalf of on behalf of Judge Sharon Kalemkiarian, Superior Court of California, County of San Diego, North County Family Division. Related [+] (Hill, James)
Related: [-] 31 Response
Att: 1 Proof of Service
Tuesday, January 23, 2024
31 31 ans Response Tue 01/23 10:53 AM
Statement For Decision to Not Abstain From Hearing Adversarial Proceedings filed by Phillip W. Simon Phillip W. Simon . Related [+] (Li, J.)
Related: [-] 25 Minute Order Hearing Continued (CHAP)
Monday, January 22, 2024
32 32 notice BNC Court Certificate of Notice Wed 01/24 9:08 PM
BNC Court Certificate of Notice. Related [+] Notice Date 01/24/2024. (Admin.)
Related: [-] 30 Order
Saturday, January 20, 2024
30 30 order ~Generic~ Order Mon 01/22 8:12 AM
Amended Order Clarifying the Extent of the Automatic Stay and the Effect of Abandonment; with BNC Service Related [+] signed on 1/20/2024. (Cruz, L.)
Related: [-] 26 Minute Order
Friday, January 19, 2024
29 29 notice BNC Court Certificate of Notice Sun 01/21 9:06 PM
BNC Court Certificate of Notice. Related [+] Notice Date 01/21/2024. (Admin.)
Related: [-] 27 Generic Order re: Application
28 28 notice Judicial Notice (Request) Fri 01/19 3:15 PM
State Court Defendants' Supplement to Request for Judicial Notice [ECF 10] filed by James P. Hill of Sullivan Hill Rez & Engel, APLC on behalf of Judge Sharon Kalemkiarian, Superior Court of California, County of San Diego, North County Family Division. Related [+] (Hill, James)
Related: [-] 10 Request for Judicial Notice
Att: 1 Proof of Service
27 27 order ~Generic~ Order re: Application Fri 01/19 12:55 PM
Order Clarifying the Extent of the Automatic Stay and the Effect of Abandonment with BNC Service Related [+] signed on 1/19/2024. (Schmitt, T.)
Related: [-] 16
24 24 ans Response Fri 01/19 11:07 AM
Statement in Response to Courts Tentative Rulings filed by Phillip W. Simon . Related [+] (Li, J.)
Related: [-] 22 Tentative Ruling (CHAP)
Thursday, January 18, 2024
26 26 order Minute Order - manual entry Fri 01/19 11:42 AM
Minute Order. Hearing DATE: 01/18/2024, MATTER: 1) STATUS CONFERENCE ON CHAPTER 7 TRUSTEE'S REPORT OF NO DISTRIBUTION; 2) STATUS CONFERENCE ON MOTION FOR RELIEF FROM STAY, RS # TB-1 FILED BY LYNNETTA WATTS AND NORA WATTS SIMON. DISPOSITION: See Attached PDF document for details. Related [+] (COURT NOTE: COPY of minute order entered in main case no. 23-03496 MM7 on 1/19/2024 (re ECF No. 51). (Cruz, L.)
Related: [-] 35 Chapter 7 Trustee's Report of No Distribution- No Funds, 13 Motion for Relief from Stay
25 25 vCal Minute Order Continued - CHAP Fri 01/19 11:36 AM
Minute Order. Hearing DATE: 01/18/2024 , MATTER: 1) MOTION TO DISMISS DEFENDANTS FROM THE ADVERSARY COMPLAINT, IN THE ALTERNATIVE, MOTION TO STRIKE CAUSES OF ACTION FILED BY LYNNETTA WATTS, NORA WATTS; 2) MOTION TO DISMISS COMPLAINT FILED BY SUPERIOR COURT OF CALIFORNIA, THE HON. SHARON KALEMKIARIAN. DISPOSITION: See Attached PDF document for details. HEARING Scheduled for 02/08/2024 at 10:00 AM at Courtroom 1, Room 218, Weinberger Courthouse Related [+] (Cruz, L.)
Related: [-] 9 Motion to Dismiss,7 Motion to Dismiss
Wednesday, January 17, 2024
23 23 court Certificate of Mailing (CSD 1195) Wed 01/17 10:46 AM
Certificate of Mailing Related [+] (Cruz, L.)
Related: [-] 22 Tentative Ruling (CHAP)
Friday, January 12, 2024
22 22 vCal Tentative Ruling - CHAP Fri 01/12 9:13 AM
Tentative Ruling. Department 1: Hearing Date and Time: 01/18/2024 10:00 AM, MATTER: 1) MOTION TO DISMISS DEFENDANTS FROM THE ADVERSARY COMPLAINT, IN THE ALTERNATIVE, MOTION TO STRIKE CAUSES OF ACTION FILED BY LYNNETTA WATTS, NORA WATTS; 2) MOTION TO DISMISS COMPLAINT FILED BY SUPERIOR COURT OF CALIFORNIA, THE HON. SHARON KALEMKIARIAN Related [+] (Cruz, L.)
Related: [-] 7 Motion to Dismiss,9 Motion to Dismiss
Monday, January 08, 2024
21 21 misc Proof of Service (CSD 3010) Mon 01/08 3:34 PM
Proof of Service filed by Phillip W. Simon . Related [+] (Lewis, L.)
Related: [-] 19 Opposition
Friday, December 22, 2023
20 20 misc Proof of Service (CSD 3010) Fri 12/22 4:17 PM
Proof of Service filed by James P. Hill on behalf of Judge Sharon Kalemkiarian, Superior Court of California, County of San Diego, North County Family Division. Related [+] (Hill, James)
Related: [-] 17 Notice (miscellaneous),18 Reply,19 Opposition
19 19 ans Opposition Fri 12/22 4:13 PM
Opposition to Plaintiffs Motion to Strike [ECF 16] Court Defendants Request for Judicial Notice [ECF 10] filed by James P. Hill of Sullivan Hill Rez & Engel, APLC on behalf of Judge Sharon Kalemkiarian, Superior Court of California, County of San Diego, North County Family Division. Related [+] (Hill, James)
Related: [-] 16 Generic Application or Motion
18 18 ans Reply Fri 12/22 4:10 PM
Reply by the Court Defendants to Plaintiffs Opposition [ECFs 13, 14] to the Court Defendants Motion to Dismiss Adversary Proceeding [ECF 9] filed by James P. Hill of Sullivan Hill Rez & Engel, APLC on behalf of Judge Sharon Kalemkiarian, Superior Court of California, County of San Diego, North County Family Division. Related [+] (Hill, James)
Related: [-] 13 Opposition,14 Generic Document
17 17 notice Miscellaneous (Document/Notice) Fri 12/22 4:07 PM
Notice by the Court Defendants That Plaintiffs Opposition [ECFs 13, 14] to the Court Defendants Motion to Dismiss Adversary Proceeding [ECF 9] Violates Local Rules and Request for Appropriate Remedy filed by James P. Hill of Sullivan Hill Rez & Engel, APLC on behalf of Judge Sharon Kalemkiarian, Superior Court of California, County of San Diego, North County Family Division. Related [+] (Hill, James)
Related: [-] 13 Opposition,14 Generic Document
Tuesday, December 19, 2023
16 16 motion ~Generic~ Application or Motion Tue 12/19 10:02 AM
Motion to Strike a Request for Judicial Notice By the Courts Defendant filed by Phillip W. Simon . Related [+] (Slaughter, S.)
Related: [-] 10 Request for Judicial Notice
15 15 ans Opposition Tue 12/19 10:00 AM
Plaintiff's Opposition to Defendant's Motion to Dismiss His Complaint filed by Phillip W. Simon Phillip W. Simon . Related [+] (Slaughter, S.)
Related: [-] 9 Motion to Dismiss
14 14 notice ~Generic~ Document Tue 12/19 9:56 AM
Attachment to Objections to Motions to Dismiss Complaint Declaration of Phillip W. Simon in Support of His Objections to Motion to Dismis Related [+] filed by Phillip W. Simon . (Slaughter, S.)
Related: [-] 9 Motion to Dismiss
13 13 ans Opposition Tue 12/19 9:52 AM
Plaintiff's Opposition to Defendant's Motion to Dismiss His Complaint filed by Phillip W. Simon Phillip W. Simon . Related [+] (Slaughter, S.)
Related: [-] 9 Motion to Dismiss
Wednesday, December 13, 2023
12 12 motion Hearing & Motion (Notice) (CSD 1181, 1183 & 3015) [14 day opp] Wed 12/13 6:33 PM
Supplemental Notice of Hearing and Motion with Certificate of Service. filed by James P. Hill of Sullivan Hill Rez & Engel, APLC on behalf of Judge Sharon Kalemkiarian, Superior Court of California, County of San Diego, North County Family Division. HEARING Scheduled for 1/18/2024 at 10:00 AM at Courtroom 1, Room 218, Weinberger Courthouse . Notice Served On: 12/13/2023. Opposition due on 12/27/2023 unless an objector is entitled to additional time under FRBP 9006. Related [+] (Hill, James)
Related: [-] 9 Motion to Dismiss,11 Notice of Hearing and Motion
11 11 motion Hearing & Motion (Notice) (CSD 1181, 1183 & 3015) [14 day opp] Wed 12/13 6:14 PM
Notice of Hearing and Motion with Certificate of Service. filed by James P. Hill of Sullivan Hill Rez & Engel, APLC on behalf of Judge Sharon Kalemkiarian, Superior Court of California, County of San Diego, North County Family Division. HEARING Scheduled for 1/18/2024 at 10:00 AM at Courtroom 1, Room 218, Weinberger Courthouse . Notice Served On: 12/13/2023. Opposition due on 12/27/2023 unless an objector is entitled to additional time under FRBP 9006. Related [+] (Hill, James)
Related: [-] 9 Motion to Dismiss
10 10 notice Judicial Notice (Request) Wed 12/13 6:09 PM
Request for Judicial Notice in Support of the Motion by the Court Defendants to Dismiss Complaint filed by James P. Hill of Sullivan Hill Rez & Engel, APLC on behalf of Judge Sharon Kalemkiarian, Superior Court of California, County of San Diego, North County Family Division. Related [+] (Hill, James)
Related: [-] 9 Motion to Dismiss
9 9 motion Dismiss (Motion) Wed 12/13 6:05 PM
Motion to Dismiss Adversary Proceeding filed by James P. Hill on behalf of Judge Sharon Kalemkiarian, Superior Court of California, County of San Diego, North County Family Division. Related [+] (Hill, James)
Related: [-] 1 Complaint
8 8 notice Hearing (Notice) Wed 12/13 5:33 PM
Notice of Hearing filed by Tanisha N. Bostick of Bostick Legal, APC on behalf of Lynnetta Watts, Nora Watts. HEARING Scheduled for 1/18/2024 at 10:00 AM at Courtroom 1, Room 218, Weinberger Courthouse . Related [+] (Bostick, Tanisha)
Related: [-] 7 Motion to Dismiss
7 7 motion Dismiss (Motion) Wed 12/13 5:20 PM
Motion to Dismiss filed by Tanisha N. Bostick on behalf of Lynnetta Watts, Nora Watts. Related [+] (Bostick, Tanisha)
Related: [-] 1 Complaint
Monday, November 20, 2023
6 6 cmp Return of Summons Served Mon 11/20 11:34 AM
Return on Summons Served on: Judge Sharon Kalemkiarian , Superior Court of California, County of San Diego, North County Family Division . Served On 11/16/2023 filed by Phillip W. Simon . (Slaughter, S.) Modified on 11/20/2023 (Slaughter, S.)
Related: [-]
5 5 cmp Return of Summons Served Mon 11/20 11:31 AM
Return on Summons Served on: Lynnetta Watts , Nora Watts . Served On 11/15/2023 filed by Phillip W. Simon . (Slaughter, S.) Modified on 11/20/2023 (Slaughter, S.)
Related: [-]
Monday, November 13, 2023
3 3 court Receipt of Filing Fee (OTC auto) Mon 11/13 6:00 PM
Receipt of Adversary Filing Fee - $350.00 by KF. Receipt Number 301302. (Admin.)
Related: [-]
2 2 court Summons Issued (CSD 2500A) Mon 11/13 4:30 PM
Summons Issued on Phillip W. Simon Answer Due 12/13/2023; Certificate of Service (Fearce, K.)
Related: [-]
1 1 cmp Complaint (fee) Mon 11/13 12:49 PM
Adversary case 23-90077 Complaint by Phillip W. Simon against Superior Court of California, County of San Diego, North County Family Division, Judge Sharon Kalemkiarian, Lynnetta Watts, Nora Watts. Nature of Suit: 14 Related [+] 71 (Injunctive relief - reinstatement of stay) 72 (Injunctive relief - other) 02 (Other (e.g. other actions that would have been brought in state court if unrelated to bankruptcy)) , Fee Amount $ 0.00 Filed by Phillip W. Simon. (Fearce, K.)
Related: [-] covery of money/property - other