Florida Middle Bankruptcy Court
Chapter 11
Judge:Tiffany P Geyer
Case #: 6:23-bk-04773
Case Filed:Nov 13, 2023
Terminated:Oct 03, 2024
Plan Confirmed:Jul 09, 2024

Debtor
TopSecret Resort of Orlando, LLC
3155 S John Young Pkwy
Orlando, FL 32805-6642
Represented By
R Scott Shuker
Shuker & Dorris, P.A.
contact info
Last checked: never
U.S. Trustee
United States Trustee - ORL
Office of the United States Trustee George C Young Federal Building 400 West Washington Street, Suite 1100
Orlando, FL 32801


Docket last updated: 2 hours ago
Wednesday, February 26, 2025
124 124 court BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document Thu 02/27 12:21 AM
BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document. Related [+]. Notice Date 02/26/2025. (Admin.)
Related: [-] (Related Doc #122 )
Tuesday, February 25, 2025
123 123 misc Proof of Service (BK) Tue 02/25 8:54 AM
Proof of Service of Order Denying Motion to Reopen Chapter 11 Case and For Reconsideration [Doc. No. 117]. Filed by R Scott Shuker on behalf of Debtor TopSecret Resort of Orlando, LLC Related [+]. (Shuker, R)
Related: [-] 122
Monday, February 24, 2025
122 122 2 pgs order Order Ruling on Motion to Reopen Chapter 11 Case Mon 02/24 4:53 PM
Order Denying Motion To Reopen Chapter 11 Case Related [+]. Service Instructions: R. Scott Shuker is directed to serve a copy of this order on interested parties and file a proof of service within 3 days of entry of the order. (Megan B.)Modified on 2/24/2025 (Megan B.)
Related: [-] 117
Wednesday, February 19, 2025
121 121 court CHAP Pro Memo - Hearing Held Wed 02/19 5:32 PM
Hearing Proceeding Memo: Hearing Held - APPEARANCES: R Scott Shuker (Debtor), Sherry Lambson-Eise (Secret Enterprises, LLC), Patrick Mcgee (TSR FL LLC), Michael Paasch (Orange Co Tax Collector), Andres Robles Cruz (Michael Spielvogel / Top Secret Resorts, LLC), RULING: Oral Ruling: Plaintiff's Motion to Reopen Chapter 11 Case and for Reconsideration (Doc #117): Denied; Order by Shuker (NH) Proposed Orders, if applicable, should be submitted within three days after the date of the hearing - Local Rule 9072-1(c). This docket entry/document is not an official order of the Court . (Bill)
Related: [-]