Washington Western District Court
Judge:Tiffany M Cartwright
Case #: 3:23-cv-06038
Nature of Suit890 Other Statutes - Other Statutory Actions
Cause18:1595 Civil Remedies: Sex trafficking of children or TVPRA
Case Filed:Nov 13, 2023
Last checked: Saturday May 11, 2024 5:27 AM PDT
Defendant
ESA P Portfolio LLC
Represented By
Nicole M Rhoades
Davis Rothwell Earle & Xochihua (or)
contact info
Shubhra R Mashelkar
Weinberg Wheeler Hudgins Gunn & Dial (ga)
contact info
Christopher T Byrd
Weinberg Wheeler Hudgins Gunn & Dial (ga)
contact info
Patrick B Moore
Weinberg Wheeler Hudgins Gunn & Dial (ga)
contact info
Christopher J Drotzmann
Davis Rothwell Earle & Xochihua (or)
contact info
Defendant
HLT Operate DTWC LLC
Represented By
Aaron Brecher
Orrick Herrington & Sutcliffe (wa)
contact info
Daniel J Dunne, Jr.
Orrick Herrington & Sutcliffe Llp (sea)
contact info
Defendant
Hilton Domestic Operating Company Inc
Represented By
Bethany Biesenthal
Jones Day (il)
contact info
Aaron Brecher
Orrick Herrington & Sutcliffe (wa)
contact info
Daniel J Dunne, Jr.
Orrick Herrington & Sutcliffe Llp (sea)
contact info
Allison McQueen
Jones Day (il)
contact info
Andrew Clopton
Jones Day (detroit)
contact info
Nicole Perry
Jones Day (houston)
contact info
Defendant
Doubletree Management LLC
Represented By
Bethany Biesenthal
Jones Day (il)
contact info
Aaron Brecher
Orrick Herrington & Sutcliffe (wa)
contact info
Daniel J Dunne, Jr.
Orrick Herrington & Sutcliffe Llp (sea)
contact info
Allison McQueen
Jones Day (il)
contact info
Andrew Clopton
Jones Day (detroit)
contact info
Nicole Perry
Jones Day (houston)
contact info
Defendant
ESA Management Inc
Represented By
Christopher J Drotzmann
Davis Rothwell Earle & Xochihua (or)
contact info
Defendant
ESA P Portfolio Operating Lessee LLC
Represented By
Christopher J Drotzmann
Davis Rothwell Earle & Xochihua (or)
contact info
Defendant
Extended Stay America Inc
Represented By
Christopher J Drotzmann
Davis Rothwell Earle & Xochihua (or)
contact info
Plaintiff
Jane Doe
Represented By
Edward D Fisher
Provost Umphrey Law Firm
contact info
Patricia E Anderson
Luvera Law Firm (sea)
contact info
Bryan O Blevins, Jr
Provost Umphrey Law Firm
contact info
Patrick M Barrett
Provost Umphrey Law Firm (tn)
contact info
Annie McAdams
Annie Mcadams PC
contact info
TERMINATED PARTIES
Defendant
Hilton Franchise Holding LLC
Terminated: 03/08/2024
Defendant
Hilton Management LLC
Terminated: 03/08/2024
Defendant
Hilton Resorts Corporation
Terminated: 03/08/2024
Defendant
Hilton Worldwide Holdings Inc
Terminated: 03/08/2024
Defendant
Park Hotels & Resorts Inc
Terminated: 03/08/2024
Defendant
RLH Partnership LP
Terminated: 01/12/2024
Defendant
Red Lion Hotels Corporation
Terminated: 01/12/2024


Docket last updated: 05/01/2025 11:59 PM PDT
Thursday, May 01, 2025
139 139 notice Notice of Hearing Thu 05/01 10:53 AM
NOTICE of Hearing: Status Conference set for 5/5/2025 at 01:30 PM via ZOOM before District Judge Tiffany M. Cartwright. The court will provide remote audio public access for this hearing. Access information can be found on the court's[LINK:Calendar] page at least 24 hours prior to the hearing. (MET)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, April 30, 2025
138 138 misc Statement Wed 04/30 12:14 PM
STATEMENT of ESA Defendants' Motion to Stay Pending Ruling on Motion for Summary Judgment by Defendants ESA P Portfolio Operating Lessee LLC, ESA Management Inc, Extended Stay America Inc, ESA P Portfolio LLC (Byrd, Christopher)
Related: [-]
Thursday, April 24, 2025
137 137 3 pgs order Order on Stipulated Motion to Seal Thu 04/24 4:07 PM
ORDER granting Defendants'135 Stipulated Motion to Seal. Signed by District Judge Tiffany M. Cartwright.(CJS)
Related: [-]
utility Set/Reset Motion Noting Date (Public) Thu 04/24 11:42 AM
DISREGARD due to Clerk Error Noting Date Reset re 135 Stipulated MOTION to Seal: Noting Date 5/21/2025. Rest per LCR 7(d)(4). (CJS) Modified on 4/24/2025 (CJS)
Related: [-]
utility Set/Reset Motion Noting Date (Public) Thu 04/24 11:44 AM
Noting Date Reset re135 Stipulated MOTION to Seal: Noting Date 4/23/2025. Correctly set when filed. (CJS)
Related: [-]
utility Set/Reset Motion Noting Date (Public) Thu 04/24 11:46 AM
Noting Date Reset re133 MOTION for Summary Judgment and Brief in Support : Noting Date 5/21/2025. Reset per LCR 7(d)(4). (CJS)
Related: [-]