Montana District Court
Judge:Timothy J Cavan
Referred: Timothy J Cavan
Case #: 1:23-cv-00136
Nature of Suit110 Contract - Insurance
Cause28:1331 Fed. Question: Insurance Contract
Case Filed:Nov 13, 2023
Terminated:Sep 20, 2024
Last checked: Saturday May 11, 2024 3:24 AM MDT
Defendant
Allstate Fire and Casualty Insurance Company
Represented By
David Sandler
Moore, Cockrell, Goiocochea & Johnson, P.C.
contact info
Dale R. Cockrell
Moore, Cockrell, Goicoechea & Johnson, P.C
contact info
Plaintiff
Benjamin Warren
12555 Andrew Lane
Molt, MT 59057

GPO Sep 20 2024
ORDER granting 26 MOTION of Voluntary Dismissal, filed by Benjamin Warren. IT IS ORDERED that Warren's Motion for Voluntary Dismissal is GRANTED. This action is dismissed without prejudice, with each party to bear their own attorneys fees and costs. Signed by Magistrate Judge Timothy J. Cavan on 9/20/2024. (JLE)

Docket last updated: 3 hours ago
Friday, September 20, 2024
30 30 10 pgs order Order Dismissing Case ~Util - Terminate Motions Fri 09/20 3:57 PM
ORDER granting26 MOTION of Voluntary Dismissal, filed by Benjamin Warren. IT IS ORDERED that Warren's Motion for Voluntary Dismissal is GRANTED. This action is dismissed without prejudice, with each party to bear their own attorneys fees and costs. Signed by Magistrate Judge Timothy J. Cavan on 9/20/2024. (JLE)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, July 10, 2024
29 29 1 pgs order Order on Motion to Vacate Wed 07/10 11:11 AM
ORDER granting28 Unopposed MOTION to Vacate Scheduling Order . IT IS ORDERED that the March 28, 2024 Scheduling Order (Doc. 22) is VACATED. Signed by Magistrate Judge Timothy J. Cavan on 7/10/2024. (JLE)
Related: [-]
utility Terminate Deadlines and Hearings Wed 07/10 2:25 PM
Terminate Deadlines and Hearings. (JLE)
Related: [-]
Monday, July 01, 2024
28 28 motion Vacate Mon 07/01 10:50 AM
Unopposed MOTION to Vacate Scheduling Order . David Sandler appearing for Defendant Allstate Fire and Casualty Insurance Company. (Sandler, David)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Text of Proposed Order
Thursday, April 25, 2024
27 27 misc Response - MT Thu 04/25 2:44 PM
RESPONSE as to Motion for Voluntary Dismissal re:26 Pro Se Notice of Voluntary Dismissal filed by Defendant Allstate Fire and Casualty Insurance Company. (Sandler, David)
Related: [-]
Thursday, April 18, 2024
26 26 notice Pro Se Notice of Voluntary Dismissal - MT Thu 04/18 5:59 AM
Pro Se Notice of Voluntary Dismissal by Benjamin Warren (Warren, Benjamin)
Related: [-]
Thursday, April 11, 2024
25 25 misc Statement of Stipulated Facts- MT Thu 04/11 2:51 PM
STATEMENT OF STIPULATED FACTS by Allstate Fire and Casualty Insurance Company. Appraisal Award) (Sandler, David)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A
24 24 misc Pro Se Preliminary Pretrial Statement - MT Thu 04/11 11:41 AM
Pro Se Preliminary Pretrial Statement by Benjamin Warren (Warren, Benjamin)
Related: [-]
Thursday, March 28, 2024
23 23 minutes Pretrial Conference - Initial Thu 03/28 4:29 PM
MINUTE ENTRYMinute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Timothy J. Cavan: Preliminary Pretrial Conference held on 3/28/2024. Pro Se Plaintiff Benjamin Warren present in person; defendant's counsel David Sandler appearing by telephone. (Court Reporter FTR Gold.) (Law Clerk: B. McKee), (Hearing held in Billings - BHC) (JDH)
Related: [-]
22 22 order Scheduling Order - SDM Thu 03/28 3:49 PM
SCHEDULING ORDER: Amended Pleadings due by 4/30/2024. Discovery Deadline by 10/4/2024. Signed by Magistrate Judge Timothy J. Cavan on 3/28/2024. (JLE)
Related: [-]
Thursday, March 21, 2024
21 21 motion Pro Se Motion - MT Thu 03/21 4:23 PM
Pro Se Motion by Benjamin Warren (Warren, Benjamin)
Related: [-]
20 20 misc Preliminary Pretrial Statement - MT Thu 03/21 2:51 PM
PRELIMINARY PRETRIAL STATEMENT by Allstate Fire and Casualty Insurance Company. (Sandler, David)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, March 05, 2024
19 19 order Order Tue 03/05 4:11 PM
Minute Order re18 Notice (Other) filed by Allstate Fire and Casualty Insurance Company. Pursuant to the Notice of Intent filed by Defendant, Defendants counsel, Dale R. Cockrell and David Sandler may appear telephonically for the Preliminary Pretrial Conference set for March 28, 2024 at 11:00 a.m. Defense counsel shall use the Courts conference line: Dial: 1-669-254-5252; Enter Meeting ID: 161 207 26414 #; Press # again (bypass the participant ID). Signed by Magistrate Judge Timothy J. Cavan on 3/5/2024. (WDB)
Related: [-]
18 18 notice Notice (Other) Tue 03/05 3:02 PM
NOTICE by Allstate Fire and Casualty Insurance Company To Appear at Prelim Pretrial Conference Telephonically (Sandler, David)
Related: [-]
17 17 misc Joint Discovery Plan - SDM Tue 03/05 2:54 PM
JOINT DISCOVERY PLAN by Allstate Fire and Casualty Insurance Company. (DiLorenzo, Christopher)
Related: [-]
Friday, February 02, 2024
16 16 order Preliminary Pretrial Conference Order - MT ~Util - Terminate Motions Fri 02/02 9:22 AM
ORDER CONTINUING PRELIMINARY PRETRIAL CONFERENCE: Preliminary Pretrial Statement due by 3/21/2024. Joint Discovery Plan due by 3/21/2024. Statement of Stipulated Facts due by 3/21/2024. Pretrial Conference reset for 3/28/2024 at 11:00 AM in Billings, MT before Magistrate Judge Timothy J. Cavan. Signed by Magistrate Judge Timothy J. Cavan on 2/2/2024. (JLE)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, January 31, 2024
15 15 motion Pro Se Motion for Extension - MT Wed 01/31 9:41 AM
Pro Se Motion for Extension by Benjamin Warren. (Warren, Benjamin)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, January 24, 2024
14 14 misc Clerk's Notice Upon Consent to USMJ - MT Wed 01/24 9:07 AM
Clerk's Notice Upon Consent to USMJ Pursuant to L.R. 73.1 and consent of the parties having been made, this case is assigned to the United States magistrate judge to conduct all further proceedings, enter judgment and conduct all post-trial proceedings. (JLE)
Related: [-]
utility Add and Terminate Judges Wed 01/24 9:16 AM
Magistrate Judge Timothy J. Cavan added. Magistrate Judge Timothy J. Cavan no longer assigned to case. (JLE)
Related: [-]
Thursday, January 18, 2024
13 13 limited Consent to Jurisdiction by Magistrate Judge - by Party Thu 01/18 12:16 PM
Related: [-]
12 12 notice Pro Se Registration Form Thu 01/18 12:10 PM
PRO SE REGISTRATION FORM by Plaintiff Benjamin Warren. (SGN)
Related: [-]
utility Pro Se PACER Approval Thu 01/18 12:13 PM
REMARK: E-filing request approved and sent to PACER for Plaintiff Benjamin Warren. (SGN)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, January 17, 2024
11 11 limited Consent to Jurisdiction by Magistrate Judge - by Party Wed 01/17 9:22 AM
Related: [-]
Monday, January 08, 2024
10 10 order Preliminary Pretrial Conference Order - MT Mon 01/08 11:42 AM
ORDER SETTING PRELIMINARY PRETRIAL CONFERENCE AND ASSOCIATED DEADLINES: Preliminary Pretrial Statement due by 2/20/2024. Joint Discovery Plan due by 2/20/2024. Statement of Stipulated Facts due by 2/20/2024. Pretrial Conference set for 2/27/2024 at 11:00 AM in Billings, MT before Magistrate Judge Timothy J. Cavan. Signed by Magistrate Judge Timothy J. Cavan on 1/8/2024. (Copy of Order sent by USPS to pro se plaintiff.) (JLE)
Related: [-]
9 9 2 pgs order Order on Motion to Appoint Counsel Mon 01/08 11:39 AM
ORDER denying4 Motion to Appoint Counsel. Signed by Magistrate Judge Timothy J. Cavan on 1/8/2024. (Copy of order mailed by USPS to pro se plaintiff.) (JLE)
Related: [-]
Thursday, January 04, 2024
8 8 notice Mailing of Consent - MT Thu 01/04 8:44 AM
Service of Consent to Magistrate Judge as Presiding Judge form. Consent/Objection to USMJ Form due by 1/22/2024. (Copy mailed by USPS to pro se plaintiff at address provided.) (JLE)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, January 02, 2024
7 7 misc Corporate Disclosure Statement Tue 01/02 11:11 AM
Corporate Disclosure Statement by Allstate Fire and Casualty Insurance Company. (Sandler, David)
Related: [-]
6 6 answer Answer to Complaint Tue 01/02 11:08 AM
ANSWER to Complaint with Jury Demand by Allstate Fire and Casualty Insurance Company. (Sandler, David)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A MT Bad Faith Verdicts,
Att: 2 Exhibit B Cavin Order
Wednesday, December 13, 2023
5 5 service Summons Returned Executed Wed 12/13 10:19 AM
SUMMONS Returned Executed by Benjamin Warren. Allstate Fire and Casualty Insurance Company served on 12/12/2023, answer due 1/2/2024. (JLE)
Related: [-]
Monday, November 27, 2023
4 4 motion Appoint Counsel Mon 11/27 12:22 PM
MOTION to Appoint Counsel by Plaintiff Benjamin Warren. Motions referred to Timothy J. Cavan. (JLE)
Related: [-]
3 3 service Summons Issued Mon 11/27 12:21 PM
Summons Issued as to Allstate Fire and Casualty Insurance Company. (Summons issued over the counter at Clerk's Office) (JLE)
Related: [-]
2 2 notice Notice of Filing Exhibits - MT Mon 11/27 12:16 PM
NOTICE of Filing Exhibits re:1 Complaint IFP/Prisoner. (JLE)
Related: [-]
Monday, November 13, 2023
1 1 cmp Complaint IFP/Prisoner - MT Mon 11/13 4:00 PM
COMPLAINT IFP/PRISONER against Allstate Fire and Casualty Insurance Company (Filing fee $ 402 not paid), filed by Benjamin Warren. (TAG)
Related: [-]
misc Filing Fee Received Mon 11/13 4:29 PM
Filing fee: $ 402, receipt number MTX9-18281 (TAG)
Related: [-]