California Central District Court
Judge:Jesus G Bernal
Referred: Shashi H Kewalramani
Case #: 5:23-cv-02324
Nature of Suit790 Labor - Other Labor Litigation
Cause28:1441 Notice of Removal - Labor/Mgmnt. Relations
Case Filed:Nov 13, 2023
Terminated:Jan 24, 2024
Case in other court:Riverside County Superior Court, CVRI2305219
Last checked: Saturday May 11, 2024 2:30 AM PDT
Defendant
Mary Brackett
Defendant
Does
Defendant
Traditions Health LLC
Represented By
Romtin Parvaresh
Seyfarth Shaw LLP
contact info
Michael Afar
Seyfarth Shaw LLP
contact info
Jonathan Lawrence Brophy
Seyfarth Shaw LLP
contact info
Plaintiff
Rebecca Arnett
Represented By
Henry Aaron Elyashar
Elyashar Law Firm
contact info
Jeffrey D Klein
Bibiyan Law Group PC
contact info
Brian Zaghi
Bibiyan Law Group PC
contact info
Zachary Chrzan
Bibiyan Law Group
contact info
David D Bibiyan
Bibiyan Law Group Apc
contact info


Docket last updated: 05/18/2025 11:59 PM PDT
Friday, February 02, 2024
19 19 misc Receipt Fri 02/02 4:54 PM
Receipt of Acknowledgment of the documents received by Riverside County Superior Court, case no. CVRI2305219. (lom)
Related: [-]
Thursday, January 25, 2024
18 18 misc Letter of Transmittal - Remand to Superior Court (G-17) - optional html form Thu 01/25 9:47 AM
TRANSMITTAL of documents to Riverside County Superior Court - Riverside Historic Courthouse. A certified copy of the order of remand and a copy of the docket sheet from this court was sent to Riverside County Superior Court - Riverside Historic Courthouse. (lom)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, January 24, 2024
17 17 order Remand Case to State Court Thu 01/25 9:43 AM
MINUTE Order (1) GRANTING Plaintiff's Motion to Remand (Dkt. No.11 ); and (2) REMANDING Case to Riverside County Superior Court; and (3) VACATING the January 29, 2024 Hearing (IN CHAMBERS) by Judge Jesus G. Bernal. For the reasons above, the Court GRANTS the Motion. The January 29, 2024 hearing is VACATED. The case is REMANDED to the Superior Court of California for the County of Riverside. MD JS-6. Case Terminated. (lom)
Related: [-]
Monday, January 22, 2024
16 16 stip Hearing Mon 01/22 6:06 PM
Joint STIPULATION for Hearing re NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Remand Case to Riverside Superior Court11 filed by Plaintiff Rebecca Arnett.(Zaghi, Brian)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proposed Order [PROPOSED] ORDER GRANTING JOINT STIPULATION TO ALLOW THE PARTIES TO APPEAR REMOTELY AT THE HEARING ON JANUARY 29, 2024
Friday, January 12, 2024
15 15 respm Reply (Motion related) Fri 01/12 3:17 PM
REPLY in support NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Remand Case to Riverside Superior Court11 filed by Plaintiff Rebecca Arnett. (Zaghi, Brian)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, January 09, 2024
14 14 order Initial Order Setting R26 Scheduling Conference - form only Tue 01/09 4:48 PM
ORDER SETTING SCHEDULING CONFERENCE by Judge Jesus G. Bernal. Scheduling Conference set for 3/25/2024 at 11:00 AM before Judge Jesus G. Bernal. (mga)
Related: [-]
Monday, January 08, 2024
13 13 respm Response in Opposition to Motion Mon 01/08 3:03 PM
OPPOSITION to NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Remand Case to Riverside Superior Court11 filed by Defendant Traditions Health LLC. (Parvaresh, Romtin)
Related: [-]
Thursday, December 14, 2023
12 12 notice Certificate/Notice of Interested Parties Thu 12/14 5:10 PM
NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Plaintiff Rebecca Arnett, (Zaghi, Brian)
Related: [-]
11 11 motion Remand Case to State Court Thu 12/14 5:06 PM
NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Remand Case to Riverside Superior Court filed by Plaintiff Rebecca Arnett. Motion set for hearing on 1/29/2024 at 09:00 AM before Judge Jesus G. Bernal. (Zaghi, Brian)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Supplement PLAINTIFFS OBJECTIONS TO EVIDENCE PROFFERED IN SUPPORT OF DEFENDANTS NOTICE OF REMOVAL,
Att: 2 Declaration DECLARATION OF BRIAN ZAGHI IN SUPPORT OF PLAINTIFFS MOTION FOR ORDER REMANDING ACTION TO STATE COURT,
Att: 3 Proposed Order [PROPOSED] ORDER GRANTING PLAINTIFFS MOTION FOR ORDER REMANDING ACTION TO STATE COURT
Monday, November 20, 2023
10 10 order Initial Order upon Filing of Complaint - form only Mon 11/20 3:35 PM
STANDING ORDER upon filing of the complaint by Judge Jesus G. Bernal. (ima)
Related: [-]
Friday, November 17, 2023
9 9 notice Appearance Fri 11/17 4:48 PM
NOTICE of Appearance filed by attorney Zachary Chrzan on behalf of Plaintiff Rebecca Arnett (Attorney Zachary Chrzan added to party Rebecca Arnett(pty:pla))(Chrzan, Zachary)
Related: [-]
Thursday, November 16, 2023
8 8 service Proof of Service (subsequent documents) Thu 11/16 11:39 AM
CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE filed by defendant Traditions Health LLC, re Certificate/Notice of Interested Parties,3 , Notice of Assignment to United States Judges(CV-18) - optional html form5 , Notice of Removal (Attorney Civil Case Opening),1 , Corporate Disclosure Statement4 , Civil Cover Sheet (CV-71)2 , Notice to Parties of Court-Directed ADR Program (ADR-8) - optional html form6 , Notice to Counsel Re: Consent to Proceed before a US Magistrate Judge - optional html form7 served on November 16, 2023. (Parvaresh, Romtin)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, November 15, 2023
7 7 notice Notice to Counsel Re: Consent to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge - optional html form Wed 11/15 3:06 PM
Notice to Counsel Re Consent to Proceed Before a United States Magistrate Judge. (ghap)
Related: [-]
6 6 adr Notice to Parties of Court-Directed ADR Program (ADR-8) - optional html form Wed 11/15 3:05 PM
NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (ghap)
Related: [-]
5 5 notice Notice of Assignment to United States Judges (CV-18) - optional html form Wed 11/15 3:05 PM
NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge Jesus G. Bernal and Magistrate Judge Shashi H. Kewalramani. (ghap)
Related: [-]
Monday, November 13, 2023
4 4 misc Corporate Disclosure Statement Mon 11/13 5:16 PM
CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Defendant TRADITIONS HEALTH LLC identifying GBHHC Holding Corporation as Corporate Parent. (Parvaresh, Romtin)
Related: [-]
3 3 notice Certificate/Notice of Interested Parties Mon 11/13 5:13 PM
Certificate and Notice of Interested Parties filed by Defendant TRADITIONS HEALTH LLC, identifying Rebecca Arnett; Traditions Health LLC; GBHHC Holding Corporation, the parent company of Defendant Traditions Health LLC; and Mary Brackett. (Parvaresh, Romtin)
Related: [-]
2 2 misc Civil Cover Sheet (CV-71) Mon 11/13 5:06 PM
CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Defendant TRADITIONS HEALTH LLC. (Parvaresh, Romtin)
Related: [-]
1 1 notice Notice of Removal (Attorney Civil Case Opening) Mon 11/13 5:05 PM
NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Riverside County Superior Court, case number CVRI2305219 Receipt No: CCACDC-36396720 - Fee: $402, filed by Defendant TRADITIONS HEALTH LLC. (Attorney Romtin Parvaresh added to party TRADITIONS HEALTH LLC(pty:dft))(Parvaresh, Romtin)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Declaration,
Att: 2 Declaration
cmp Complaint - (Discovery) Wed 11/15 3:16 PM
CONFORMED FILED COPY OF COMPLAINT against Defendants Mary Brackett, Does 1 through 100, inclusve, Traditions Health LLC. Jury Demanded., filed by plaintiff Rebecca Arnett. (FILED IN STATE COURT ON 10/2/2023 SUBMITTED ATTACHED EXHIBIT A) (ghap)
Related: [-]
answer Answer to Complaint (Discovery) Wed 11/15 3:19 PM
NON CONFORM COPY OF ANSWER to Complaint - (Discovery) filed by Defendant Traditions Health LLC. (SUBMITTED ATTACHED EXHIBIT C)(ghap)
Related: [-]