South Carolina District Court
Judge:David C Norton
Case #: 2:23-cv-05739
Nature of Suit710 Labor - Fair Labor Standards Act
Cause29:203 Equal Pay Act
Case Filed:Nov 09, 2023
Last checked: Tuesday May 07, 2024 5:42 AM EDT
Defendant
Georgetown Corner Tavern, LLC
Represented By
Matthew Elliott Cox
Smith Currie And Hancock LLP
contact info
Defendant
Michael Rabb
Represented By
Matthew Elliott Cox
Smith Currie And Hancock LLP
contact info
Defendant
Philip Broussard
Defendant
Jacqueline Hubschman
Plaintiff
Laronda Dupuis
Represented By
Bruce E Miller
Bruce E Miller Law Office
contact info
Plaintiff
Sharon Heather Fox
Represented By
Bruce E Miller
Bruce E Miller Law Office
contact info


Docket last updated: 05/15/2025 11:59 PM EDT
Monday, May 05, 2025
42 42 notice Notice of Joinder Mon 05/05 12:50 PM
NOTICE OF JOINDER by Bruce E Miller on behalf of Laronda Dupuis(Miller, Bruce)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Supporting Documents Consent to Join Lawsuit Redacted
Monday, April 07, 2025
41 41 order Scheduling Order ~Util - Terminate Motions Mon 04/07 11:48 AM
CONSENT THIRD AMENDED SCHEDULING ORDER Discovery due by 9/8/2025, Motions in Limine must be filed at least three weeks prior to jury selection, Motions due by 10/9/2025, Jury Selection Deadline 10/30/2025, Mediation Due by 10/30/2025. (Motions terminated: 40 Joint MOTION to Amend/Correct Second Amended Scheduling Order filed by Laronda Dupuis ). Signed by Honorable David C Norton on 04/07/2025. (hcor, )
Related: [-]
Friday, April 04, 2025
40 40 motion Amend/Correct Fri 04/04 9:37 AM
Joint MOTION to Amend/Correct Second Amended Scheduling Order by Laronda Dupuis. Response to Motion due by 4/18/2025. Add an additional 3 days only if served by mail or otherwise allowed under Fed. R. Civ. P. 6 or Fed. R. Crim. P. 45.Proposed order is being emailed to chambers with copy to opposing counsel.(Miller, Bruce)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proposed Order Third Amended Scheduling Order
Tuesday, January 07, 2025
39 39 order Scheduling Order ~Util - Terminate Motions Tue 01/07 2:29 PM
CONSENT SECOND AMENDED SCHEDULING ORDER Discovery due by 5/7/2025, Motions in Limine must be filed at least three weeks prior to jury selection, Motions due by 6/9/2025, Jury Selection Deadline 6/30/2025, Mediation Due by 6/30/2025. (Motions terminated: 38 Joint MOTION to Amend/Correct Scheduling Order filed by Sharon Heather Fox, Laronda Dupuis ). Signed by Honorable David C Norton on 01/07/2025. (hcor, )
Related: [-]
Friday, January 03, 2025
38 38 motion Amend/Correct Fri 01/03 12:33 PM
Joint MOTION to Amend/Correct Scheduling Order by Laronda Dupuis, Sharon Heather Fox. Response to Motion due by 1/17/2025. Add an additional 3 days only if served by mail or otherwise allowed under Fed. R. Civ. P. 6 or Fed. R. Crim. P. 45.Proposed order is being emailed to chambers with copy to opposing counsel.(Miller, Bruce)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Supporting Documents Second Amended Scheduling Order
Wednesday, December 18, 2024
37 37 order Order Wed 12/18 1:48 PM
TEXT ORDER granting protection from court appearances to Bruce Miller for 1/2-10/2025. Signed by Honorable David C Norton on 12/18/2024. (eric, )
Related: [-]
Tuesday, December 17, 2024
36 36 notice Notice of Request for Protection from Court Appearance Tue 12/17 3:41 PM
NOTICE of Request for Protection from Court Appearance by Bruce E Miller for January 2-10, 2025 (Miller, Bruce)
Related: [-]
Thursday, October 17, 2024
35 35 notice Notice of Joinder Thu 10/17 4:54 PM
NOTICE OF JOINDER by Bruce E Miller on behalf of Laronda Dupuis, Sharon Heather Fox(Miller, Bruce)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 1 pgs Supporting Documents Consent to Join Lawsuit Redacted,
Att: 2 1 pgs Supporting Documents Consent to Join Lawsuit Redacted
Wednesday, October 02, 2024
34 34 misc Letter Wed 10/02 4:54 PM
Letter.(Miller, Bruce)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Supporting Documents Consent to Opt Out of Lawsuit Redacted
Thursday, September 26, 2024
33 33 notice Notice of Joinder Thu 09/26 4:30 PM
NOTICE OF JOINDER by Bruce E Miller on behalf of Laronda Dupuis, Sharon Heather Fox(Miller, Bruce)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 1 pgs Supporting Documents Consent to Join Lawsuit Redacted,
Att: 2 1 pgs Supporting Documents Consent to Join Lawsuit Redacted
Wednesday, September 25, 2024
32 32 notice Notice of Joinder Wed 09/25 4:30 PM
NOTICE OF JOINDER by Bruce E Miller on behalf of Laronda Dupuis, Sharon Heather Fox(Miller, Bruce)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 1 pgs Supporting Documents Consent to Join Lawsuit Redacted
Thursday, August 29, 2024
31 31 4 pgs order Order on Motion to Certify Class Thu 08/29 9:37 AM
ORDER granting 28 Motion to Certify Class. Signed by Honorable David C Norton on 08/29/2024.(hcor, )
Related: [-]
Friday, August 02, 2024
30 30 order Order Fri 08/02 11:01 AM
TEXT ORDER granting protection from court appearances to Bruce E. Miller for 10/14-22/2024. Signed by Honorable David C Norton on 8/2/2024. (eric, )
Related: [-]
Thursday, August 01, 2024
29 29 notice Notice of Request for Protection from Court Appearance Thu 08/01 2:34 PM
NOTICE of Request for Protection from Court Appearance by Bruce E Miller for October 14 - 22, 2024 (Miller, Bruce)
Related: [-]
Monday, July 22, 2024
28 28 17 pgs motion Certify Class Mon 07/22 4:49 PM
Consent MOTION to Certify Class by Laronda Dupuis, Sharon Heather Fox. Response to Motion due by 8/5/2024. Add an additional 3 days only if served by mail or otherwise allowed under Fed. R. Civ. P. 6 or Fed. R. Crim. P. 45.Proposed order is being emailed to chambers with copy to opposing counsel.(Miller, Bruce)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit Exhibit List,
Att: 2 Exhibit Declaration of LaRonda Dupuis,
Att: 3 Exhibit Wage and Hour Collective and Class Litigation,
Att: 4 Exhibit Declaration of Bruce Miller,
Att: 5 Exhibit Notice of Class Action Hybrid,
Att: 6 Exhibit Return Envelope,
Att: 7 Exhibit Email Notice,
Att: 8 Exhibit Text Message Notice
Wednesday, July 03, 2024
27 27 notice Notice of Request for Protection from Court Appearance Wed 07/03 12:01 PM
NOTICE of Request for Protection from Court Appearance by Bruce E Miller for 8/1/24-8/12/24 (Miller, Bruce)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, May 08, 2024
26 26 answer Answer to Amended Complaint Wed 05/08 9:49 PM
ANSWER to21 Amended Complaint, by Georgetown Corner Tavern, LLC, Jacqueline Hubschman, Michael Rabb.(Cox, Matthew)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, May 07, 2024
25 25 notice Notice of Joinder Tue 05/07 4:41 PM
NOTICE OF JOINDER by Bruce E Miller on behalf of Laronda Dupuis, Sharon Heather Fox(Miller, Bruce)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 1 pgs Supporting Documents Consent to Join Lawsuit Redacted
Wednesday, May 01, 2024
24 24 service Summons Returned Executed - Complaint Served Wed 05/01 1:56 PM
SUMMONS Returned Executed by Laronda Dupuis, Sharon Heather Fox. Philip Broussard served on 4/25/2024, answer due 5/16/2024.(Miller, Bruce)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 1 pgs Affidavit Affidavit of Service for Philip Broussard
Monday, April 29, 2024
23 23 service Acceptance of Service - Complaint Served Mon 04/29 2:52 PM
ACCEPTANCE OF SERVICE OF COMPLAINT by Laronda Dupuis, Sharon Heather Fox. Jacqueline Hubschman served on 4/24/2024, answer due 5/15/2024.(Miller, Bruce)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 1 pgs Supporting Documents Acceptance of Service for Hubschman
Thursday, April 25, 2024
22 22 service Summons Issued Thu 04/25 11:51 AM
Summons Issued as to Philip Broussard, Jacqueline Hubschman. (hcor, )
Related: [-]
Wednesday, April 24, 2024
21 21 cmp Amended Complaint Wed 04/24 11:15 AM
AMENDED COMPLAINT against Georgetown Corner Tavern, LLC, Michael Rabb, Philip Broussard, Jacqueline Hubschman, filed by Laronda Dupuis, Sharon Heather Fox. Service due by 7/23/2024 (Miller, Bruce)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Summons Summons of Philip Broussard,
Att: 2 Summons Summons of Jacqueline Hubschman
Tuesday, April 23, 2024
20 20 1 pgs order Order on Motion to Amend/Correct Tue 04/23 1:50 PM
ORDER granting 19 Motion to Amend/Correct Complaint. Signed by Honorable David C Norton on 4/23/2024.(eric, )
Related: [-]
Friday, April 19, 2024
19 19 motion Amend/Correct Fri 04/19 9:54 AM
Consent MOTION to Amend/Correct1 Complaint, by Laronda Dupuis, Sharon Heather Fox. Response to Motion due by 5/3/2024. Add an additional 3 days only if served by mail or otherwise allowed under Fed. R. Civ. P. 6 or Fed. R. Crim. P. 45.No proposed order.(Miller, Bruce)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit First Amended Complaint
Thursday, March 14, 2024
18 18 order Scheduling Order Thu 03/14 10:50 AM
AMENDED SCHEDULING ORDER Motions to Amend Pleadings due by 7/18/2024, Plaintiffs ID of Expert Witness due by 9/12/2024, Defendants ID of Expert Witnesses Due by 10/15/2024, Discovery due by 2/6/2025, Motions in Limine must be filed at least three weeks prior to jury selection, Motions due by 3/10/2025, Jury Selection Deadline 3/31/2025, Mediation Due by 3/31/2025. Signed by Honorable David C Norton on 03/14/2024. (hcor, )
Related: [-]
Tuesday, March 12, 2024
17 17 5 pgs discov Local Rule 26.03 Answers to Interrogatories Tue 03/12 5:35 PM
Defendants' Local Rule 26.03 Answers to Interrogatories by Georgetown Corner Tavern, LLC, Michael Rabb.(Cox, Matthew)
Related: [-]
16 16 5 pgs discov Local Rule 26.03 Answers to Interrogatories Tue 03/12 3:28 PM
Local Rule 26.03 Answers to Interrogatories by Laronda Dupuis, Sharon Heather Fox.(Miller, Bruce)
Related: [-]
15 15 discov Rule 26(f) Report Tue 03/12 3:25 PM
Rule 26(f) Report by Laronda Dupuis, Sharon Heather Fox.(Miller, Bruce)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proposed Order Amended Scheduling Order
Wednesday, February 07, 2024
14 14 notice Notice of Joinder Wed 02/07 2:59 PM
NOTICE OF JOINDER by Bruce E Miller on behalf of Laronda Dupuis, Sharon Heather Fox(Miller, Bruce)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 1 pgs Supporting Documents Consent to Join Lawsuit Redacted
Tuesday, January 30, 2024
13 13 notice Notice of Joinder Tue 01/30 4:02 PM
NOTICE OF JOINDER by Bruce E Miller on behalf of Laronda Dupuis, Sharon Heather Fox(Miller, Bruce)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 1 pgs Supporting Documents Consent to Join Lawsuit Redacted
Wednesday, January 10, 2024
12 12 order Scheduling Order Wed 01/10 2:33 PM
CONFERENCE AND SCHEDULING ORDER Rule 26(f) Conference Deadline 2/9/2024, 26(a) Initial Disclosures due by 3/12/2024, Rule 26 Report due by 3/12/2024, Motions to Amend Pleadings due by 3/20/2024, Plaintiffs ID of Expert Witness due by 5/15/2024, Defendants ID of Expert Witnesses Due by 6/17/2024, Discovery due by 10/9/2024, Motions in Limine must be filed at least three weeks prior to jury selection, Motions due by 11/8/2024, Jury Selection Deadline 12/1/2024, Mediation Due by 11/30/2024. Signed by Honorable David C Norton on 01/10/2024. (hcor, )
Related: [-]
Friday, December 29, 2023
11 11 discov Local Rule 26.01 Answers to Interrogatories Fri 12/29 5:54 PM
Local Rule 26.01 Answers to Interrogatories by Georgetown Corner Tavern, LLC, Michael Rabb.(Cox, Matthew)
Related: [-]
10 10 answer Answer to Complaint Fri 12/29 5:51 PM
ANSWER to1 Complaint, by Georgetown Corner Tavern, LLC, Michael Rabb.(Cox, Matthew)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A ESC Hearing Order,
Att: 2 Exhibit B Release of Foxx
Thursday, November 30, 2023
9 9 service Summons Returned Executed - Complaint Served Thu 11/30 11:41 AM
SUMMONS Returned Executed by Laronda Dupuis, Sharon Heather Fox. Michael Rabb served on 11/17/2023, answer due 12/8/2023.(Miller, Bruce)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Supporting Documents Proof of Service Signed
Monday, November 20, 2023
8 8 service Summons Returned Executed - Complaint Served Mon 11/20 5:00 PM
SUMMONS Returned Executed by Laronda Dupuis, Sharon Heather Fox. Georgetown Corner Tavern, LLC served on 11/16/2023, answer due 12/7/2023.(Miller, Bruce)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Affidavit Affidavit of Service,
Att: 2 Exhibit Exhibit A - FedEx Confirmation of Delivery
Friday, November 17, 2023
7 7 notice Notice of Joinder Fri 11/17 12:44 PM
NOTICE OF JOINDER by Bruce E Miller on behalf of Laronda Dupuis, Sharon Heather Fox(Miller, Bruce)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 1 pgs Supporting Documents Consent to Join Lawsuit Redacted
Thursday, November 16, 2023
6 6 notice Notice of Joinder Thu 11/16 4:42 PM
NOTICE OF JOINDER by Bruce E Miller on behalf of Laronda Dupuis, Sharon Heather Fox(Miller, Bruce)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 1 pgs Supporting Documents Consent to Join Lawsuit Redacted
Wednesday, November 15, 2023
5 5 notice Notice of Joinder Wed 11/15 4:55 PM
NOTICE OF JOINDER by Bruce E Miller on behalf of Laronda Dupuis, Sharon Heather Fox(Miller, Bruce)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 1 pgs Supporting Documents Consent to Join Lawsuit Redacted
Thursday, November 09, 2023
4 4 service Summons Issued Mon 11/13 10:45 AM
Summons Issued as to Georgetown Corner Tavern, LLC, Michael Rabb. (hcor, )
Related: [-]
3 3 discov Local Rule 26.01 Answers to Interrogatories Mon 11/13 10:44 AM
Local Rule 26.01 Answers to Interrogatories by Laronda Dupuis, Sharon Heather Fox.(hcor, )
Related: [-]
1 1 cmp Complaint Mon 11/13 10:41 AM
COMPLAINT against Georgetown Corner Tavern, LLC, Michael Rabb ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number ASCDC-11421420.), filed by Laronda Dupuis, Sharon Heather Fox. Service due by 2/7/2024(hcor, )
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Dupuis Consent to Join Lawsuit Redacted,
Att: 2 Fox Consent to Join Lawsuit Redacted,
Att: 3 Hartley Consent to Join Lawsuit Redacted