Arizona District Court
Judge:Dominic W Lanza
Case #: 2:23-cv-02371
Nature of Suit830 Property Rights - Patent
Cause35:271 Patent Infringement
Case Filed:Nov 10, 2023
Last checked: Saturday May 11, 2024 4:42 AM MST
Counter Claimant
Firman Power Equipment Incorporated
Represented By
Jennifer K Chung
Davis Wright Tremaine Llp - Seattle, Wa
contact info
Phillip Winston Londen
Osborn Maledon PA
contact info
Benjamin Byer
Davis Wright Tremaine Llp - Seattle, Wa
contact info
Eric Michael Fraser
Osborn Maledon PA
contact info
Xiang Li
Davis Wright Tremaine Llp - Seattle, Wa
contact info
Counter Defendant
Champion Power Equipment Incorporated
Represented By
Timothy J Ziolkowski
Ziolkowski Patent Solutions Group Sc
contact info
David Gary Barker
Snell & Wilmer Llp - Phoenix, Az
contact info
Zachary Gerald Schroeder
Snell & Wilmer Llp - Phoenix, Az
contact info
Jacob Fritz
Ziolkowski Patent Solutions Group Sc
contact info
Joseph G Adams
Snell & Wilmer LLP
contact info
Defendant
Firman Power Equipment Incorporated
Represented By
Jennifer K Chung
Davis Wright Tremaine Llp - Seattle, Wa
contact info
Phillip Winston Londen
Osborn Maledon PA
contact info
Benjamin Byer
Davis Wright Tremaine Llp - Seattle, Wa
contact info
Eric Michael Fraser
Osborn Maledon PA
contact info
Xiang Li
Davis Wright Tremaine Llp - Seattle, Wa
contact info
Plaintiff
Champion Power Equipment Incorporated
Represented By
Timothy J Ziolkowski
Ziolkowski Patent Solutions Group Sc
contact info
David Gary Barker
Snell & Wilmer Llp - Phoenix, Az
contact info
Zachary Gerald Schroeder
Snell & Wilmer Llp - Phoenix, Az
contact info
Jacob Fritz
Ziolkowski Patent Solutions Group Sc
contact info
Joseph G Adams
Snell & Wilmer LLP
contact info

GPO Jul 19 2024
ORDER - IT IS ORDERED that the parties' joint motion for discovery dispute resolution re: protective order (Doc. 65) is denied without prejudice. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that Firman may file a motion requesting the relief sought in the parties' joint filing. Once the motion is fully briefed, the Court will rule in due course. (See document for complete details). Signed by Judge Dominic W Lanza on 7/19/24. (SLQ)
GPO Aug 19 2024
ORDER - IT IS ORDERED that the parties' joint motion for discovery dispute resolution (Doc. 74), which the Court construes as a motion to compel filed by Firman, is granted insofar as Champions numerosity objection is overruled. (See document for complete details). Signed by Judge Dominic W Lanza on 8/19/24. (SLQ)
GPO Oct 18 2024
ORDER: Defendant's motion for a protective order (Doc. 75) is granted in part and denied in part. FURTHER ORDERED that the parties, after meeting and conferring, submit a revised proposed protective order that reflects the rulings set forth in this order. Signed by Judge Dominic W Lanza on 10/18/24. (EJA)
GPO Dec 05 2024
ORDER that the parties' joint motion for discovery dispute resolution (Doc. 102), which the Court construes as a motion to compel filed by Champion, is denied. Signed by Judge Dominic W Lanza on 12/4/24. (EJA)
GPO Jan 14 2025
ORDER: The parties' joint motion for discovery dispute resolution (Doc. 109), which the Court construes as a motion to compel filed by Firman, is denied. Signed by Judge Dominic W Lanza on 1/13/2025. (KJ)
GPO Feb 28 2025
ORDER - IT IS ORDERED that Firman's motion to amend invalidity contentions (Doc. 115) is granted. (See document for complete details). Signed by Judge Dominic W Lanza on 2/28/25. (SLQ)
GPO Mar 31 2025
ORDER - IT IS ORDERED that Champion's motion for reconsideration (Doc. 133) is denied. (See document for complete details). Signed by Judge Dominic W Lanza on 3/31/25. (SLQ)
GPO Apr 02 2025
ORDER - IT IS ORDERED that: 1. Generac's motions to seal (Docs. 127, 140) are granted. 2. The Clerk shall file, under seal, the documents (and attachments thereto) lodged at Docs. 121 and 135. (See document for complete details). Signed by Judge Dominic W Lanza on 4/2/25. (SLQ)

Docket last updated: 05/12/2025 11:59 PM MST
Thursday, May 08, 2025
167 167 misc Transcript Fri 05/09 3:59 PM
NOTICE OF FILING OF OFFICIAL TRANSCRIPT of DISCOVERY DISPUTE HEARING proceedings held on 05/07/2025 before Judge DOMINIC W. LANZA. [Court Reporter: Jennifer A. Pancratz, RMR, CRR, FCRR, CRC, Telephone number (602) 322-7198]. The ordering party receives the transcript directly from the Court Reporter. Therefore, transcripts should not be viewed through Pacer. A non-ordering party may view a transcript at the court's public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber by filing a Transcript Order Form on the docket before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through Pacer. Redaction Request due 5/29/2025. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 6/9/2025. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 8/6/2025. (RAP)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, May 07, 2025
165 165 misc Transcript Request Wed 05/07 3:34 PM
TRANSCRIPT REQUEST by Champion Power Equipment Incorporated for proceedings held on May 7, 2025, Judge Dominic W Lanza hearing judge(s). (Barker, David)
Related: [-]
minutes Motion Hearing 1 - Common Prompts (Text Only) Order on Motion for Discovery Wed 05/07 3:41 PM
MINUTE ENTRY for proceedings held before Judge Dominic W Lanza: Discovery Dispute Hearing held 5/7/2025. Discussion held regarding the Joint Motion for Discovery Dispute Resolution Re Champion's Disclosure of Prior Sale (Doc.163 ). For the reasons stated on the record, the motion is granted in part and denied in part. The Cabela claim charts and the RD9000E claim charts shall be disclosed at the same time. The Court does not award attorneys' fees. APPEARANCES: Timothy Ziolkowski and David Barker (in person) and Jacob Fritz (via Zoom) for Plaintiff. Benjamin Byer and Eric Fraser (in person) and Samantha Hunt and Xiang Li (via Zoom) for Defendant. (Court Reporter Jennifer Pancratz.) Hearing held 2:34 PM to 2:51 PM. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (SLQ)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, May 06, 2025
163 163 motion Discovery Tue 05/06 9:53 AM
Joint MOTION for Discovery Dispute Resolution re Champion's Disclosure of Prior Sale by Firman Power Equipment Incorporated. (Byer, Benjamin)
Related: [-]
162 162 notice Notice (Other) Tue 05/06 9:52 AM
*WITHDRAWAL OF DOCUMENT re:161 MOTION for Discovery Dispute Resolution re Champion's Disclosure of Prior Sale by Firman Power Equipment Incorporated. (Byer, Benjamin) *Modified from notice to withdrawal on 5/6/2025 (DXD)
Related: [-]
minutes ~Util - Set Motion Hearing Order Tue 05/06 3:31 PM
ORDER - IT IS ORDERED setting a Discovery Dispute Hearing re:163 the parties' Joint Motion for Discovery Dispute Resolution Re Champion's Disclosure of Prior Sale for 5/7/2025 at 02:30 PM in Courtroom 601, 401 West Washington Street, Phoenix, AZ 85003 before Judge Dominic W Lanza. Counsel shall advise the Court via e-mail (lanza_chambers@azd.uscourts.gov) no later than 5/7/2025 at 11:00 AM as to whether they will appear via Zoom or in person. The Court's staff will provide counsel with the Zoom link for the hearing. Ordered by Judge Dominic W Lanza on 5/6/25. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (SLQ)
Related: [-]
Monday, May 05, 2025
161 161 motion Discovery Mon 05/05 5:51 PM
MOTION for Discovery Dispute Resolution re Champion's Disclosure of Prior Sale by Firman Power Equipment Incorporated.(Byer, Benjamin)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proposed Order