California Eastern District Court
Judge:Troy L Nunley
Referred: Chi Soo Kim
Case #: 2:23-cv-02611
Nature of Suit690 Forfeiture/Penalty - Other
Cause16:1538 Endangered Species Act
Case Filed:Nov 09, 2023
Last checked: Tuesday May 07, 2024 1:31 AM PDT
Defendant
U.S. Fish and Wildlife Service
Represented By
Frances Bishop Morris, GOVT
Doj-Enrd
contact info
Erika Furlong, GOVT
U.S. Department Of Justice
contact info
Intervenor Defendant
Sierra Pacific Industries
Represented By
Lucas V. Grunbaum
Paul Hastings LLP
contact info
Christopher J. Carr
Paul Hastings, LLP
contact info
Navtej Singh Dhillon
Paul Hastings, LLP
contact info
Plaintiff
Environmental Protection Information Center
Represented By
Peter M.K. Frost, PHV
Western Environmental Law Center
contact info
Thomas E. Wheeler
Environmental Protection Information Center
contact info
Sangye Ince-Johannsen, PHV
Western Environmental Law Center
contact info

GPO Nov 27 2023
PRO HAC VICE ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Kendall J. Newman on 11/27/2023 GRANTING 4 Application for Pro Hac Vice. Added Attorney Sangye Ince-Johannsen, PHV for Environmental Protection Information Center. The Pro Hac Vice Attorney is directed to request electronic filing access through PACER. (Lopez, K)
GPO Nov 27 2023
to request electronic filing access through PACER. (Lopez, K)PRO HAC VICE ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Kendall J. Newman on 11/27/2023 GRANTING 5 Application for Pro Hac Vice. Added Attorney Peter M.K. Frost, PHV for Environmental Protection Information Center. The Pro Hac Vice Attorney is directed
GPO Jan 22 2024
ithin 5 court days; any party who has yet to file a consent/decline form shall do so within 14 days. (Benson, A.)ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Kendall J. Newman on 01/19/24 GRANTING SPI's 6 Motion to Intervene; SPI shall file an Answer to the complaint in substantially the same form as attached as Exhibit A to the declaration of Navi Singh Dhillon w
GPO Jul 26 2024
ORDER signed by District Judge Troy L. Nunley on 07/25/2024 EXTENDING the Deadlines as follows: Motion to Complete or Challenge: 10/15/24; Plaintiff's MSJ: 12/02/24; Federal Defendant's Cross MSJ: 02/06/25; Defendant-Intervenor's Cross MSJ: 02/13/25; Plaintiff's Reply: 03/27/25; Federal Defendant Reply: 05/01/25; Defendant-Intervenor Reply: 05/29/25; and VACATING the Briefing Deadlines. (Lopez, K)

Docket last updated: 04/30/2025 11:59 PM PDT
Wednesday, April 30, 2025
50 50 notice Notice (Other) Wed 04/30 11:37 AM
NOTICE of Substitution of Attorney by U.S. Fish and Wildlife Service. (Morris, Frances)
Related: [-]