Pennsylvania Western District Court
Judge:Marilyn J Horan
Case #: 2:23-cv-01966
Nature of Suit480 Other Statutes - Consumer Credit
Cause28:1441 Notice of Removal
Case Filed:Nov 14, 2023
Terminated:Apr 26, 2024
Case in other court:Westmoreland County, 23CI03080
Last checked: Sunday May 12, 2024 4:50 AM EDT
Defendant
NAVIENT CORPORATION
Represented By
Christopher A. Reese
Stradley Ronon Stevens & Young, LLP
contact info
Plaintiff
GLENN MASSUNG
Represented By
James L. Welsh, III
Wk Law, LLC
contact info

GPO Apr 26 2024
MEMORANDUM OPINION For the reasons stated, Navient's Motion to Dismiss, as regards the Count I FDCPA claim, will be granted. Any amendment to said claim will be deemed futile. As regards the remaining state law claims, Counts II and III, the Court will decline supplemental jurisdiction and remand those claims to the Westmoreland County Court of Common Pleas.A separate order will follow. Signed by Judge Marilyn J. Horan on 4/26/2024. (bjl)

Docket last updated: 6 hours ago
Friday, April 26, 2024
14 14 1 pgs order Order on Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim Fri 04/26 11:07 AM
ORDER For the reasons stated in this Court's Opinion (ECF No.13 ), Navients Motion to Dismiss11 , as regards the Count I FDCPA claim, is granted. Any amendment to said claim will be deemed futile. As regards the remaining state law claims, Counts II and III, the Court declines supplemental jurisdiction and remands those claims to state court.The Clerk shall transmit the record to the Westmoreland County Court of Common Pleas forthwith. Signed by Judge Marilyn J. Horan on 4/26/2024. (bjl)
Related: [-]
13 13 7 pgs order Memorandum Opinion Fri 04/26 11:03 AM
MEMORANDUM OPINION For the reasons stated, Navient's Motion to Dismiss, as regards the Count I FDCPA claim, will be granted. Any amendment to said claim will be deemed futile. As regards the remaining state law claims, Counts II and III, the Court will decline supplemental jurisdiction and remand those claims to the Westmoreland County Court of Common Pleas.A separate order will follow. Signed by Judge Marilyn J. Horan on 4/26/2024. (bjl)
Related: [-]
Monday, January 29, 2024
12 12 respm Brief / Memorandum of Law in Support of Motion Mon 01/29 10:41 AM
BRIEF in Support re11 Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim filed by NAVIENT CORPORATION. Related [+]
Related: [-] ese, Christopher
11 11 motion Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim Mon 01/29 10:40 AM
MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM re9 Amended Complaint by NAVIENT CORPORATION. Related [+]
Related: [-] ese, Christopher
Att: 1 Declaration,
Att: 2 Proposed Order,
Att: 3 Certificate of Service
Monday, January 15, 2024
10 10 order Order on Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim Mon 01/15 9:31 PM
TEXT ORDER Based upon the filing of an Amended Complaint 8 , Defendant's Motion to Dismiss4 is denied as moot. Defendant shall file its answer or response on or before January 30, 2024. Signed by Judge Marilyn J. Horan on 1/15/2024. Text-only entry; no PDF document will issue. This text-only entry constitutes the Order of the Court or Notice on the matter. (bjl)
Related: [-]
9 9 cmp Amended Complaint Mon 01/15 1:31 PM
AMENDED COMPLAINT against NAVIENT CORPORATION, filed by GLENN MASSUNG. (Welsh, James)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit,
Att: 2 Exhibit,
Att: 3 Exhibit
Thursday, December 28, 2023
8 8 order Order Thu 12/28 10:30 AM
STANDING ORDER AND PROCEDURES ON CIVIL MOTION PRACTICE available[LINK:Here] . Signed by Judge Marilyn J. Horan on 12/28/2023. Text-only entry; no PDF document will issue. This text-only entry constitutes the Order of the Court or Notice on the matter. (bjl)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, December 19, 2023
7 7 motion Extension of Time to File Response/Reply Tue 12/19 2:55 PM
Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply to Motion to Dismiss by GLENN MASSUNG. (Welsh, James)
Related: [-]
6 6 motion Extension of Time to File Response/Reply Tue 12/19 1:14 PM
Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply to Motion to Dismiss by GLENN MASSUNG. (Welsh, James)
Related: [-]
misc QC - Caption/case number of doc. does not match case Tue 12/19 2:42 PM
CLERK'S OFFICE QUALITY CONTROL MESSAGE re6 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply. ERROR: Case number of document does not match case number of case. CORRECTION: Attorney is directed to file an Errata with corrected caption/and or case number. (jkn)
Related: [-]
Monday, December 18, 2023
5 5 respm Brief / Memorandum of Law in Support of Motion Mon 12/18 10:34 AM
BRIEF in Support re4 Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim filed by NAVIENT CORPORATION. (jkn)
Related: [-]
misc QC - Document should have been filed as 2 separate documents Mon 12/18 10:39 AM
CLERK'S OFFICE QUALITY CONTROL MESSAGE re4 Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim. ERROR: Brief in support should have been filed as two separate documents. CORRECTION: Attorney advised in future that documents of that nature are to be filed as separate documents. Clerk of Court docketed Brief in Support of Motion. This message is for informational purposes only. (jkn)
Related: [-]
Monday, November 20, 2023
4 4 motion Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim Mon 11/20 3:46 PM
MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM by NAVIENT CORPORATION. Related [+]
Related: [-] ese, Christopher
Att: 1 Declaration,
Att: 2 Memorandum of Law,
Att: 3 Proposed Order,
Att: 4 Certificate of Service
Wednesday, November 15, 2023
3 3 misc Errata Wed 11/15 10:09 AM
Errata re1 Notice of Removal. Reason for Correction: Missing civil cover sheet. (jkn) Modified text on 11/15/2023. (cww)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, November 14, 2023
2 2 misc Disclosure Statement (LR 7.1.A and/or FRCvP 7.1(a)(2)) Tue 11/14 10:44 AM
Disclosure Statement identifying None as corporate parent or other affiliate by NAVIENT CORPORATION. (jkn)
Related: [-]
1 1 cmp Notice of Removal (for Clerk of Court personnel only) Tue 11/14 10:39 AM
NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Westmoreland County, case number 23CI03080 with Plaintiff Copies attached: Complaint and Notice of filing notice of removal (Filing fee, including Administrative fee, $402, receipt number APAWDC-7979305), filed by NAVIENT CORPORATION. (jkn)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 State Court Records,
Att: 2 Exhibit B,
Att: 3 State Court Records