Kansas District Court
Judge:Daniel D Crabtree
Referred: Rachel E Schwartz
Case #: 2:23-cv-02504
Nature of Suit442 Civil Rights - Employment
Cause42:1983 Civil Rights (Employment Discrimination)
Case Filed:Nov 14, 2023
Terminated:Jul 01, 2024
Last checked: Sunday May 12, 2024 3:54 AM CDT
Defendant
Community National Bank, N.A.
Serve: Dorsey Hall, President 210 Main Street
Seneca, KS 66538
Represented By
Jack Rigolizzo Wallace
Constangy, Brooks, Smith & Prophete, Llp - Walnut
contact info
Heather M. Lake
Constangy, Brooks, Smith & Prophete, Llp - Walnut
contact info
Defendant
Dorsey Hall
Serve at Place of Employment: 210 Main Street
Seneca, KS 66538
Represented By
Jack Rigolizzo Wallace
Constangy, Brooks, Smith & Prophete, Llp - Walnut
contact info
Heather M. Lake
Constangy, Brooks, Smith & Prophete, Llp - Walnut
contact info
Defendant
Susan Rash
Serve at Place of Employment: 210 Main Street
Seneca, KS 66538
Represented By
Jack Rigolizzo Wallace
Constangy, Brooks, Smith & Prophete, Llp - Walnut
contact info
Heather M. Lake
Constangy, Brooks, Smith & Prophete, Llp - Walnut
contact info
Plaintiff
Tonia Berry
5125 Overland Drive #C1
Lawrence, KS 66049
Represented By
Kirk D. Holman
Holman Schiavone, LLC
contact info
Aiman Dvorak
Holman Schiavone, LLC
contact info


Docket last updated: 2 hours ago
Tuesday, July 16, 2024
28 28 1 pgs misc Stipulation of Dismissal Tue 07/16 12:58 PM
STIPULATION OF DISMISSAL by Tonia Berry. (Dvorak, Aiman)
Related: [-]
Monday, July 01, 2024
27 27 1 pgs order Administratively Closing Case Mon 07/01 3:57 PM
ORDER ADMINISTRATIVELY CLOSING CASE: Parties shall file stipulation of dismissal by 7/31/2024. Signed by District Judge Daniel D. Crabtree on 7/1/2024. (jal)
Related: [-]
26 26 2 pgs adr ADR Report Mon 07/01 11:54 AM
ADR REPORT by Community National Bank, N.A., Dorsey Hall, Susan Rash. ADR session held on: June 13, 2024 and conducted by Hon. Jay Daugherty. Results of ADR: Case settled at ADR. Status of litigation at time of ADR: Partial Discovery(Wallace, Jack)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, June 11, 2024
25 25 misc Certificate of Service Tue 06/11 12:30 PM
CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE of Defendants' Responses and Objections to First Interrogatories and First Requests for Production of Documents by Community National Bank, N.A., Dorsey Hall, Susan Rash. (Wallace, Jack)
Related: [-]
Friday, April 26, 2024
24 24 misc Certificate of Service Fri 04/26 5:36 PM
CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE of Plaintiff's First Interrogatories to Defendant Susan Rash and Plaintiff's First Request for Production of Documents to Defendant Susan Rash by Tonia Berry. (Dvorak, Aiman)
Related: [-]
23 23 misc Certificate of Service Fri 04/26 5:34 PM
CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE of Plaintiff's First Interrogatories to Defendant Dorsey Hall and Plaintiff's First Request for Production of Documents to Defendant Dorsey Hall by Tonia Berry. (Dvorak, Aiman)
Related: [-]
22 22 misc Certificate of Service Fri 04/26 5:32 PM
CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE of Plaintiff's First Interrogatories to Defendant Community National Bank and Plaintiff's First Request for Production of Documents to Defendant Community National Bank by Tonia Berry. (Dvorak, Aiman)
Related: [-]
Friday, April 12, 2024
21 21 12 pgs order Order on Motion for Protective Order Fri 04/12 1:08 PM
ORDER granting the Parties' Joint Motion for a Protective Order (ECF No. 20). The Court grants the motion and enters the parties' proposed protective order with minor modifications, which the Court has communicated to the parties via email on April 12, 2024. Signed by Magistrate Judge Rachel E. Schwartz on April 12, 2024. (drk)
Related: [-]
20 20 motion Protective Order Fri 04/12 1:07 PM
Joint Motion Requesting Entry of a Protective Order. In accordance with the Guidelines for Agreed Protective Orders, the parties jointly moved for the entry of a protective order by emailing a copy of their proposed order to the Magistrate Judge's chambers on April 11, 2024.(drk)
Related: [-]
Thursday, April 11, 2024
19 19 notice Joint Mediation Notice Thu 04/11 10:45 AM
JOINT MEDIATION NOTICE - Mediation to be held June 13, 2024 by Tonia Berry. (Dvorak, Aiman)
Related: [-]
Monday, April 01, 2024
18 18 notice Notice of Withdrawal of Appearance Mon 04/01 3:57 PM
NOTICE OF WITHDRAWAL OF APPEARANCE by attorney Heather M. Lake as to Community National Bank, N.A., Dorsey Hall, Susan Rash (Lake, Heather)
Related: [-]
Thursday, March 28, 2024
17 17 misc Entry of Appearance Thu 03/28 9:18 AM
ENTRY OF APPEARANCE by Jack Rigolizzo Wallace on behalf of Community National Bank, N.A., Dorsey Hall, Susan Rash. (Wallace, Jack)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, March 27, 2024
16 16 order Scheduling Order Wed 03/27 10:20 AM
SCHEDULING ORDER: Mediation Notice or Confidential Settlement Report Due to Magistrate Judge on 4/12/2024. Mediation deadline 7/1/2024. Discovery deadline 10/15/2024. Proposed Pretrial Order due by 10/22/2024. Final Pretrial Conference set for November 5, 2024, at 1:00 p.m. by telephone (CONFERENCE LINE 1-888-363-4749; ACCESS CODE 5705809) before Magistrate Judge Rachel E. Schwartz. Dispositive motion deadline 11/26/2024. Jury Trial set for 8/5/2025 at 09:00 AM in KC Courtroom 476 (DDC) before District Judge Daniel D. Crabtree. Estimated trial time 5 days. Signed by Magistrate Judge Rachel E. Schwartz on March 27, 2024. (drk) Modified on 3/27/2024 to correct pretrial time (ca)
Related: [-]
utility Set/Reset Hearings - Public Wed 03/27 1:04 PM
Reset Hearings: Final Pretrial Conference set for 11/5/2024 at 01:30 PM by Telephone RES - CONFERENCE LINE 1-888-363-4749 ACCESS CODE 5705809 before Magistrate Judge Rachel E. Schwartz.(ca)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, March 26, 2024
15 15 minutes Scheduling Conference Tue 03/26 2:54 PM
MINUTE ENTRY for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Rachel E. Schwartz: SCHEDULING CONFERENCE held on 3/26/2024. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no.pdf document associated with this entry.) (drk)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, March 20, 2024
14 14 misc Certificate of Service Wed 03/20 8:37 AM
CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE of Amended Rule 26 (a) Disclosures by Tonia Berry. (Dvorak, Aiman)
Related: [-]
Friday, March 15, 2024
13 13 misc Certificate of Service Fri 03/15 4:23 PM
CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE of Defendants' Initial Rule 26(a) Disclosures by Community National Bank, N.A., Dorsey Hall, Susan Rash. (Lake, Heather)
Related: [-]
Monday, March 11, 2024
12 12 misc Certificate of Service Mon 03/11 3:35 PM
CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE of Plaintiff's Initial Rule 26 Disclosures by Tonia Berry. (Dvorak, Aiman)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, February 06, 2024
11 11 order Initial Order Regarding Planning and Scheduling Tue 02/06 9:52 AM
INITIAL ORDER REGARDING PLANNING AND SCHEDULING: Scheduling Conference set for March 26, 2024, at 1:30 p.m. by telephone (CONFERENCE LINE 1-888-363-4749; ACCESS CODE 5705809) before Magistrate Judge Rachel E. Schwartz. Rule 26 Planning Conference Deadline 3/5/2024. Rule 26 Initial Disclosures Deadline set for 3/15/2024. Proposed Scheduling Order Deadline 3/15/2024. Signed by Magistrate Judge Rachel E. Schwartz on 02/06/2024. (drk)
Related: [-]
Friday, February 02, 2024
10 10 misc Corporate Disclosure Statement Fri 02/02 4:48 PM
CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Community National Bank, N.A. identifying Community Bancshares, Inc. as corporate parent . (Lake, Heather)
Related: [-]
9 9 21 pgs answer Answer to Complaint Fri 02/02 4:47 PM
ANSWER to Complaint by Dorsey Hall.(Lake, Heather)
Related: [-]
8 8 24 pgs answer Answer to Complaint Fri 02/02 4:45 PM
ANSWER to Complaint by Susan Rash.(Lake, Heather)
Related: [-]
7 7 22 pgs answer Answer to Complaint Fri 02/02 4:43 PM
ANSWER to Complaint by Community National Bank, N.A..(Lake, Heather)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, January 17, 2024
6 6 order Clerks Order Extending Time to Answer Wed 01/17 3:28 PM
CLERKS ORDER EXTENDING TIME until 2/2/2024 for Defendants Community National Bank, N.A., Dorsey Hall, Susan Rash to answer or otherwise plead. Signed by deputy clerk on 1/17/2024. (nac)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, November 28, 2023
5 5 service Waiver of Service Executed Tue 11/28 8:56 AM
WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Tonia Berry. Dorsey Hall waiver sent on 11/20/2023, answer due 1/19/2024. (Holman, Kirk)
Related: [-]
4 4 service Waiver of Service Executed Tue 11/28 8:54 AM
WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Tonia Berry. Susan Rash waiver sent on 11/20/2023, answer due 1/19/2024. (Holman, Kirk)
Related: [-]
3 3 service Waiver of Service Executed Tue 11/28 8:52 AM
WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Tonia Berry. Community National Bank, N.A. waiver sent on 11/20/2023, answer due 1/19/2024. (Holman, Kirk)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, November 14, 2023
2 2 misc Civil Cover Sheet Tue 11/14 10:09 AM
CIVIL COVER SHEET by Plaintiff Tonia Berry. (Holman, Kirk)
Related: [-]
1 1 21 pgs cmp Complaint (attorney) Tue 11/14 10:08 AM
COMPLAINT with trial location of Kansas City ( Filing fee $402, Internet Payment Receipt Number AKSDC-6202021.), filed by Tonia Berry.(Holman, Kirk)
Related: [-]
notice Notice of Judge Assignment Tue 11/14 1:54 PM
NOTICE OF JUDGE ASSIGNMENT: Case assigned to District Judge Daniel D. Crabtree and Magistrate Judge Rachel E. Schwartz for all proceedings. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no.pdf document associated with this entry.) NOTICE OF MAGISTRATE JUDGE AVAILABILITY: A United States magistrate judge is available to conduct all proceedings in this civil action if all parties voluntarily consent. Information & consent forms are available at http://www.uscourts.gov/forms/civil-forms/notice-consent-and-reference-civil-action-magistrate-judge (nac)
Related: [-]
service Summons Issued Tue 11/14 2:38 PM
SUMMONS ISSUED as to Community National Bank, N.A., Dorsey Hall, Susan Rash. (issued to Attorney for service) Notice, Consent, and Reference of a Civil Action to a Magistrate Judge Form provided to counsel for service with complaint. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no.pdf document associated with this entry) (nac)
Related: [-]