New York Southern District Court
Judge:Loretta A Preska
Case #: 1:23-cv-10023
Nature of Suit448 Civil Rights - Education
Cause42:2000d Federally Assisted Programs
Case Filed:Nov 14, 2023
Terminated:Jul 12, 2024
Last checked: Sunday May 12, 2024 5:00 AM EDT
Defendant
New York University
Represented By
Daniel M. Petrocelli
O'Melveny & Myers, Llp(c'Tycity)
contact info
Jennifer Sokoler
O'Melveny & Myers
contact info
Daniel L. Cantor
O'Melveny & Myers LLP
contact info
Anton Metlitsky
O'Melveny & Myers, Llp(nyc)
contact info
Intervenor Defendant
Andrew Ross
Represented By
Jonathan Wallace
contact info
Plaintiff
Bella Ingber
Represented By
Andrew Louis Schwartz
Kasowitz Benson Torres LLP
contact info
Andrew L. Schwartz
Kasowitz Benson Torres LLP
contact info
Daniel R. Benson
Kasowitz, Benson, Torres Llp (nyc)
contact info
Marc E. Kasowitz
Kasowitz, Benson, Torres Llp (nyc)
contact info
Joshua Eric Roberts
Kasowitz Benson Torres LLP
contact info
Mark Paul Ressler
Kasowitz, Benson, Torres Llp (nyc)
contact info
Plaintiff
Sabrina Maslavi
Represented By
Andrew Louis Schwartz
Kasowitz Benson Torres LLP
contact info
Andrew L. Schwartz
Kasowitz Benson Torres LLP
contact info
Daniel R. Benson
Kasowitz, Benson, Torres Llp (nyc)
contact info
Marc E. Kasowitz
Kasowitz, Benson, Torres Llp (nyc)
contact info
Joshua Eric Roberts
Kasowitz Benson Torres LLP
contact info
Mark Paul Ressler
Kasowitz, Benson, Torres Llp (nyc)
contact info
Plaintiff
Students Against Antisemitism, Inc.
Represented By
Marc E. Kasowitz
Kasowitz, Benson, Torres Llp (nyc)
contact info
Plaintiff
Avigail Teiler
Represented By
Marc E. Kasowitz
Kasowitz, Benson, Torres Llp (nyc)
contact info
Plaintiff
Nevo Yemini
Represented By
Marc E. Kasowitz
Kasowitz, Benson, Torres Llp (nyc)
contact info
TERMINATED PARTIES
Plaintiff
Saul Tawil
Terminated: 02/01/2024
Represented By
Andrew Louis Schwartz
Kasowitz Benson Torres LLP
contact info
Andrew L. Schwartz
Kasowitz Benson Torres LLP
contact info
Daniel R. Benson
Kasowitz, Benson, Torres Llp (nyc)
contact info
Marc E. Kasowitz
Kasowitz, Benson, Torres Llp (nyc)
contact info
Joshua Eric Roberts
Kasowitz Benson Torres LLP
contact info
Mark Paul Ressler
Kasowitz, Benson, Torres Llp (nyc)
contact info


Docket last updated: 3 hours ago
Thursday, July 11, 2024
79 79 2 pgs misc Stipulation of Voluntary Dismissal Thu 07/11 10:00 AM
STIPULATION OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL It is hereby stipulated and agreed by and between the parties and/or their respective counsel(s) that the above-captioned action is voluntarily dismissed, with prejudice against the defendant(s) New York University pursuant to Rule 41(a)(1)(A)(ii) of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure. Document filed by New York University. Proposed document to be reviewed and processed by Clerk's Office staff (No action required by chambers). ..(Petrocelli, Daniel)
Related: [-]
misc Notice to Attorney Regarding Deficient Voluntary Dismissal Thu 07/11 9:19 AM
***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING DEFICIENT VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL. Notice to Attorney Daniel Petrocelli. RE-FILE Document No. 78 Stipulation of Voluntary Dismissal. The filing is deficient for the following reason(s): the wrong party/parties whom the voluntary dismissal is against was/were selected (Do Not Select Any Group). Re-file the document using the event type Stipulation of Voluntary Dismissal found under the event list Other Documents - select the correct filer/filers - select the correct party/parties the voluntary dismissal is against - and attach the correct signed (scanned signature image) PDF. (tp)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, July 10, 2024
78 78 2 pgs misc Stipulation of Voluntary Dismissal Wed 07/10 2:06 PM
FILING ERROR - DEFICIENT DOCKET ENTRY FILED AGAINST PARTY ERROR - STIPULATION OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL It is hereby stipulated and agreed by and between the parties and/or their respective counsel(s) that the above-captioned action is voluntarily dismissed, with prejudice against the defendant(s) All Parties pursuant to Rule 41(a)(1)(A)(ii) of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure. Document filed by New York University. Proposed document to be reviewed and processed by Clerk's Office staff (No action required by chambers). ..(Petrocelli, Daniel) Modified on 7/11/2024 (tp).
Related: [-]
misc Notice to Attorney Regarding Deficient Voluntary Dismissal Wed 07/10 9:08 AM
***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING DEFICIENT VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL. Notice to Attorney Daniel Petrocelli. RE-FILE Document No. 77 Stipulation of Voluntary Dismissal. The filing is deficient for the following reason(s): the stipulation of voluntary dismissal was not signed by all parties who have appeared. Re-file the document using the event type Stipulation of Voluntary Dismissal found under the event list Other Documents - select the correct filer/filers - select the correct party/parties the voluntary dismissal is against - and attach the correct signed (scanned ink signature image) PDF. (tp)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, July 09, 2024
77 77 2 pgs misc Stipulation of Voluntary Dismissal Tue 07/09 12:41 PM
FILING ERROR - DEFICIENT DOCKET ENTRY - SIGNATURE ERROR - STIPULATION OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL It is hereby stipulated and agreed by and between the parties and/or their respective counsel(s) that the above-captioned action is voluntarily dismissed, with prejudice against the defendant(s) New York University pursuant to Rule 41(a)(1)(A)(ii) of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure. Document filed by New York University. Proposed document to be reviewed and processed by Clerk's Office staff (No action required by chambers). ..(Petrocelli, Daniel) Modified on 7/10/2024 (tp).
Related: [-]
Monday, July 08, 2024
76 76 1 pgs order Order ~Util - Set Deadlines/Hearings Mon 07/08 5:22 PM
ORDER: The Court has received joint notification from the parties that they have settled the above-captioned case and will promptly file a joint stipulation of settlement. Accordingly, the oral argument scheduled for 10:00 a.m. on Tuesday, July 9, 2024, is canceled. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Loretta A. Preska on 7/8/2024) (tg)
Related: [-]